Drumgo v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: De Shawn Drumgo
Defendant: Reginald Brown, Thompson, James Thomas, Stevenson, Karen D. Hawkins, Ron Hosterman, Lloyd Mcgill, Betty Brian, Pierce, Perry Phelps, Thomas Seacord and Michael Maans
Case Number: 1:2008cv00592
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM ORDER that: 1. The plaintiffs motion for reconsideration (D.l. 146 ) is granted in part and denied in part. 2. That portion ofthe March 11,2011 order (D.l. 145 ) denying the motion to withdraw attorney is vacated.3. The motion to wi thdraw attorney (D.1. 142 ) is granted. 4. Thad J. Bracegirdle is withdrawn as counsel for the plaintiff who will proceed pro sepending a second attempt to refer his representation to a member ofthe Federal Civil Panel. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERE D that: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to attempt to refer representation of the plaintiff to a member of the Federal Civil Panel. 2. The court's Standing Order regarding the establishment of a Federal Civil Panel to provide legal represe ntation to indigent parties in certain civil litigation is incorporated herein by reference. 3. The matter is stayed pending the attempt to refer representation of the plaintiff to a member of the Federal Civil Panel. Attorney Thad J. Bracegirdle terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/4/14. (rwc)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 135 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/18/13. (cla, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/4/2011. (lid)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION regarding pending Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, Motions for Default Judgment, Motion to Depose Plaintif, and Motion to Amend (D.I. Nos. 33,35,39,43,54). Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 9/15/2010. (dlk)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 8/24/10. (rwc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drumgo v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De Shawn Drumgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Hosterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Mcgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Seacord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Maans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?