Treis v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: James Treis
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00796
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Filing 10 Record of case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 4:12-cv-00433. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of Delaware. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 6/22/12. (TRC) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
April 5, 2012 Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 6 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Michael) filed by Google, Inc.; SO ORDERED JCH. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/5/12. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
April 4, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael H. Rubin (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Google, Inc. ; ORDERED: SO ORDERED, Attorney Michael H Rubin for Google, Inc. added.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/2/12. (CEL) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 30, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael H. Rubin (Filing fee $100) by Defendant Google, Inc. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 14, 2012 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen F. Meyerkord for Plaintiff James Treis. (Meyerkord, Stephen) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 13, 2012 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey S. Meyerkord for Plaintiff James Treis. (Meyerkord, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]
March 9, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Google, Inc. with receipt number 0865-3182585, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by James Treis. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet , # 2 Original Filing Form , # 3 Waiver of Service )(Steward, John) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 6/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treis v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Treis
Represented By: Geoffrey S. Meyerkord
Represented By: Stephen F. Meyerkord
Represented By: John S. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?