A.M. v. Capital School District
Plaintiff: A.M.
Defendant: Capital School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv01595
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 4 was deleted from the docket and re-filed using the proper event code - Waiver of Service Returned Executed. (dlw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by A.M.: For Capital School District waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (dlw)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Goldsborough filed by A.M. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/9/2019. (dlw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Goldsborough - filed by A.M.. (McAndrews, Caitlin)
September 9, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Former D.I. 3 has been deleted from the docket at the request of counsel. (dlw)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 29, 2019 Remark: Summons mailed per filing party's request on 8/29/2019. (lak)
August 28, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Capital School District on 8/28/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Capital School District - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2718481.) - filed by A.M. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. v. Capital School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Caitlin Elizabeth McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?