Johnson v. Xootr, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Defendant: Xootr, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00820
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to August 31, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Xootr, LLC answer due 8/31/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/13/2020. (dlw)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to August 31, 2020 - filed by Xootr, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Johnson. Xootr, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Wrobel, Mackenzie)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VAu 714-629;. (mal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Xootr, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3001172.) - filed by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Xootr, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Mackenzie Marie Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xootr, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?