Mathis et al v. Norman et al
Plaintiff: Diwann M. Mathis, Marketa I. Mathis, N.W. and D.M.
Defendant: Saralee Norman, Avi Norman, John Does 1-10 (fictitious names), Richard Roes 1-10 (fictitious names) and ABC Companies, Inc. 1-10 (fictitious names)
Case Number: 1:2022cv01357
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for a change of venue is GRANTED. (D.I. #8 ) Defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer venue is GRANTED to the extent it requests transfer venue, and is DENIED without prejudice to renew to the extent it requests dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2022. (apk)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2022. (apk)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Exhibit to a Document Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Avi Norman, Saralee Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C [D.I. 10] Redacted in Its Entirety, #2 Exhibit D [D.I. 10] Redacted in Its Entirety)(Logullo, Christopher)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Avi Norman, Saralee Norman re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or Transfer Venue (Logullo, Christopher)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Per counsel's request, D.I. #9 Main Document has been replaced and a Certificate of Compliance has been added. Per counsel's request, Exhibit E has been removed. (mpb)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or Transfer Venue B by Avi Norman, Saralee Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Logullo, Christopher)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or Transfer Venue - filed by Avi Norman, Saralee Norman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order Transfer Venue, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Unreported Case Law)(Logullo, Christopher) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/18/2022) (mpb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2022: #8 Certificate of Compliance) (mpb).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue - filed by Diwann M. Mathis, Marketa I. Mathis. (apk)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of request for waiver of service to Avi Norman - filed by Diwann M. Mathis (smg)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Saralee Norman on 10/14/2022. (mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Avi Norman. (mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Avi Norman on 10/14/2022. (mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for F.R. Civ. P. 4. Acknowledgment filed by D.M.(Minor Child ), D.M., Diwann M. Mathis, Marketa I. Mathis, and N.W. (mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against ABC Companies, Inc. 1-10 (fictitious names), John Does 1-10 (fictitious names), Richard Roes 1-10 (fictitious names), Avi Norman and Saralee Norman ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number DEX038084.)- filed by N.W., Marketa I. Mathis, D.M.(Minor Child ), Diwann M. Mathis and D.M. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Acknowledgement of Receipt of Magistrate Consent Forms mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff. (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis et al v. Norman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diwann M. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketa I. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saralee Norman
Represented By: Christopher T. Logullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Norman
Represented By: Christopher T. Logullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roes 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies, Inc. 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?