MWANI, et al v. UNITED STATES, et al

Case Number: 1:1999cv00125
Filed: January 15, 1999
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/10/12. (lcjmf1)
May 29, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 5/29/13. (lcjmf1, )
August 22, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/22/14. (SP, )
September 25, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/25/14. (SP, )
November 18, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/18/14. (SP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MWANI, et al v. UNITED STATES, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.