AL ODAH, et al v. USA, et al
Plaintiff: KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI and HAMAD MADAI SAAD
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO and BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II
Petitioner: ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY and USA TODAY
Amicus Curiae: CHARLES B. GITTINGS, JR.
Case Number: 1:2002cv00828
Filed: May 1, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 779 NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner Al Kandari (ISN 552) by BARACK H. OBAMA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Warden, Andrew)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI. Attorney David H. Remes terminated. (Remes, David)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 777 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court has received Petitioner Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari's #776 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barry D. Wingrad in order to represent him. The motion is DENIED. This matter is closed and nothing remains to be resolved in this action; nor are there any issues in this action on appeal. There is no practice in this Court of allowing appearances in closed cases. The Court understands that counsel seeks access to his client. However, filing an appearance in this closed matter is unnecessary in order to secure that access. Counsel should work directly with the government to orchestrate such access rather than filing an appearance in this closed case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 01/13/2015. (lcckk2)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barry D. Wingard, :Address- 3117 Westchester Drive, Pittsburgh, PA 15238. Phone No. - 412-401-0027. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3936854. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Declaration, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 775 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memordandum of Understanding)(Remes, David)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #774 Notice of Appearance; emailed to remesdh@gmail.com, cc'd 35 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document (znmw, )
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding)(Remes, David) Modified on 12/1/2014 (znmw, ).
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 773 NOTICE of Transfer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Walthall, Timothy)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 772 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Leslie Lewis on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Lewis, Eric)
May 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 771 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Douglas Ross terminated. (Ross, Douglas)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 770 STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, #2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 768 STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 767 NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Board Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 766 NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Warden, Andrew)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 765 NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #764 Notice of Appearance was entered in error as a duplicate of Docket Entry #763 Notice of Appearance. (znmw, )
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ross on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Ross, Douglas) Modified on 5/20/2013 (znmw, ).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Douglas)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 762 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Petitioner's continued access to counsel. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/11/13. (dot)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 761 STIPULATION and Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (O'Donnell, Sean)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classfied National Security Information by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI re #371 Order (Warner, Carlos)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE of Authorization by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Authorization)(Warner, Carlos)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Because all matters in this case, including belated ancillary matters, have been resolved, this action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 7, 2013. (lcckk1)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE of Respondents' Filing (Re: ISN 552) - Public Factual Return by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Dean, Paul)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER granting #756 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File the Public Factual Return for ISN 552 Out of Time. Respondents shall have until DECEMBER 21, 2012 to file on the Court's electronic docket the approved public factual return for Petitioner Faez Mohammed Ahmed Al-Kandari (ISN 552). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 16, 2012. (lcckk1)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 756 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File the Public Factual Return for ISN 552 Out of Time Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Paul)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return, redacted in accordance with this Order and the Court's by 10/31/2012. (tcb)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 232 by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Narrative, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4, #6 Exhibit Part 5, #7 Exhibit Part 6, #8 Exhibit Part 7, #9 Exhibit Part 8, #10 Exhibit Part 9, #11 Exhibit Part 10, #12 Exhibit Part 11, #13 Exhibit Part 12, #14 Exhibit Part 13)(Wolfe, Kristina)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER. Respondents' #752 Supplemental Motion to Deem Protected Additional Words in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 232 is GRANTED. Further,by no later than OCTOBER 31, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return, redacted in accordance with this Order and the Court's #745 Order regarding the proposed public factual return for ISN 232. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 23, 2012. (lcckk1)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Filing ( RE: ISN 213) of Public Factual Return by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Dean, Paul)
October 20, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' #751 Consent Motion for a Three-Day Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's #747 September 24, 2012 Order. Accordingly, by no later than OCTOBER 23, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return for ISN 213. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 20, 2012. (lcckk1)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 752 SEALED MOTION filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) Modified on 10/23/2012 (ztd, ).
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Public Factual Return (ISN 213) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Paul)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Motion to Deem Protected Additional Words in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 232 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wolfe, Kristina)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 749 NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 551 by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Narrative, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4, #6 Exhibit Part 5)(Wolfe, Kristina)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents shall file on the electronic docket by 11/8/2012. (dot )
October 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER. Respondents' #712 Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Factual Finding Return for ISN 552 is GRANTED. By no later than November 8, 2012 Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return has been redacted. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/8/12. (lcckk2)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #714 Respondents' Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Factual Finding Return for ISN 213. Further, by no later than OCTOBER 20, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return, attached as Exhibit 3 to #714 Respondents' Motion, has been redacted. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 24, 2012. (lcckk1)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER granting #738 Respondents' Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Factual Finding Return for ISN 551. Further, by no later than OCTOBER 20, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return, attached as Exhibit 3 to #738 Respondents' Motion, has been redacted. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 24, 2012. (lcckk1)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER granting #713 Respondents' Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Factual Finding Return for ISN 232. Further, by no later than OCTOBER 20, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return, attached as Exhibit 3 to #713 Respondents' Motion, has been redacted.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 24, 2012. (lcckk1)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: by no later than OCTOBER 20, 2012, Respondents shall file on the electronic docket a public version of the factual return from which the information highlighted in green or gray in the Proposed Public Factual Return (ztcb)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE of Filing New Authorizations for Legal Representation by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Legal Representation, #2 Authorization for Legal Representation)(Koslowe, Neil)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 743 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #715 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgement of the district court is affirmed. USCA Case Number 10-5373. (md, )
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 742 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney David Hugh White terminated. (White, David)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ERRATA Notice of Appearance of Thomas B. Wilner by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Memorandum of Understanding of Thomas B. Wilner, #2 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment of Thomas B. Wilner, #3 Exhibit Signed Affirmation of Thomas B. Wilner)(Koslowe, Neil)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 739 RESPONSE re #737 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in Proposed Factual Return for ISN 551 filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 551 by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Murley, Nicole)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 738 SEALED MOTION filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3 Narrative, #5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil H. Koslowe on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Memorandum of Understanding in Support of Appearance of Neil H. Koslowe, #2 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment in Support of Appearance of Neil H. Koslowe, #3 Exhibit Signed Affirmation in Support of Appearance of Neil H. Koslowe)(Koslowe, Neil)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Wilner on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Memorandum of Understanding in Support of Appearance by Thomas B. Wilner, #2 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment in Support of Appearance by Thomas B. Wilner, #3 Exhibit Signed Affirmation in Support of Appearance of Thomas B. Wilner)(Koslowe, Neil) Modified appearing attorney on 12/14/2011 (znmw, ).
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 741 USCA JUDGMENT as to #715 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the district court is affirmed. USCA No. 10-5373 (mmh)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #734 was entered in error as a duplicate of Docket Entry #733. (znmw, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED Supplement to their Pending Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 232 filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #730 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) Modified on 6/13/2011 (znmw, ).
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 733 SEALED Supplement to #712 Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 552 filed by DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Filing (ISN 552) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dean, Paul)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE of Filing (ISN 232) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dean, Paul)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 732 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE of Filing (ISN 213) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dean, Paul) (Main Document 729 replaced on 6/9/2011) (znmw, ).
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MacLean, Matthew)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 727 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION re #717 by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI FOR NEW HEARING PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b) (MacLean, Matthew) Modified to add link on 4/25/2011 (znmw, ).
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Allen, Thomas)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 725 NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Thomas)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 724 NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 723 NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Allen, Thomas)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW HEARING PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b) by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 721 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for New Hearing Pursuant to Rule 60(b) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Allen, Thomas)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER of USCA as to #715 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI ; USCA Case Number 10-5373. ORDERED that this case is held in abeyance pending further order of the court. (Moser, Sarah)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents' Response due by 1/21/2011. Petitioner's Reply due by 2/4/2011. (dot )
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 718 STATUS REPORT of the parties regarding briefing schedule for Rule 60 Motion by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (Allen, Thomas)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Pursuant to the briefing schedule proposed by the parties, see Joint Status Report, Docket No. #718 , Respondents shall serve and file their opposition to Petitioner Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari's Motion for New Hearing Pursuant to Rule 60(b) on or before January 21, 2011, and Petitioner shall serve and file his reply, if any, on or before February 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 3, 2010. (lcckk3)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court is in receipt of Petitioner Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari's Motion for New Hearing Pursuant to Rule 60(b), dated November 29, 2010. On or before Friday, December 3, 2010, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report proposing a date by which Respondents will respond to Petitioner's motion and a date by which Petitioner will file a reply, if any. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 30, 2010. (lcckk3)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 717 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 4/22/2011.....NOTICE of Filing of Motion with Court Security Office by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Allen, Thomas) Modified on 4/25/2011 (znmw, ).
November 21, 2010 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 10-5373 for #715 Notice of Appeal, filed by MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (znmw, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #715 Notice of Appeal,. (znmw, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #705 Order by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2350276. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Allen, Thomas) Modified to add link on 11/15/2010 (znmw, ).
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 714 SEALED MOTION filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit 4)(ztd, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 713 SEALED MOTION filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit 4)(ztd, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SEALED MOTION filed by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit 4)(ztd, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 711 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 552) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carney, Mary) (Main Document 711 replaced on 10/7/2010) (znmw, ).
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 232) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carney, Mary)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 709 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 213) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carney, Mary)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 708 STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Marcus, Lisa)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Attached is the Unclassified Memorandum Opinion accompanying the Court's September 15, 2010 Order denying Petitioner Al Kandari's petition for habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 29, 2010. (lcckk2 )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) AMENDING the Court's September 15, 2010 #705 Order to permit the relevant agencies 14 days to complete a classification review of the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion and to provide the Court with an Unclassified version. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 16, 2010. (lcckk2 )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion issued to the parties on this date, Respondents' motion to augment the record and Petitioner Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari's petition for writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum are DENIED as moot. In addition, Petitioner Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari's petition for habeas corpus is DENIED. The relevant agencies are directed to complete a classification review of the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion and provide the Court with an Unclassified version within 7 days of receiving the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion.This is a Final, Appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 15, 2010. (lcckk2 )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER staying the Court's July 27, 2010 Order pending the hearing scheduled to take place on October 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 15, 2010. (lctfh2)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #640 Notice of Appeal filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed. USCA Case Number 09-5331. (mmh)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 703 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Sarah Maloney terminated. (Maloney, Sarah)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER scheduling a hearing regarding the pending Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. The hearing shall take place on October 7, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on August 19, 2010. (lctfh2) Modified on 8/19/2010 (lctfh2, ).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE of Compliance by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10.(lctfh2) This order was originally entered only in 08-mc-442 but should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (lctfh2)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 7, 2010. (lctfh2)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 701 NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #699 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/2010. (lctfh2) Modified event title on 6/30/2010 (znmw, ).
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 698 NOTICE of Filing by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maloney, Sarah)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/24/2010. (dot, )
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 1952 Respondents' Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors. Accordingly, the respondents' consolidated reply brief shall be due to be filed on or before June 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 13, 2010. (lctfh2)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors re (254 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Respone to the Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. Accordingly, the petitioners consolidated response shall be due to be filed on or before June 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 4, 2010. (lctfh2)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to the Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2020 Order Regarding Public Returns by ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, HAMAD MADAI SAAD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Monday, May 3, 2010, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns [Dkt. No. 1942, 08-mc-442]. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 695 NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents' Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 694 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRITS OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 693 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 692 STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUNSFELD. (Lin, Jean)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE of Filing Reply Memorandum in Support of Respondents' Motion to Augment the Record by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Captain Brian A. Young's #686 unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance as counsel of record for Petitioner in this habeas action. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 17, 2010. (lcckk2 )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Memorandum in opposition to re #686 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Captain Brian A. Young filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (O'Donnell, Sean)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 689 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitions for Writs of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 688 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Supplemental Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 687 NOTICE OF FILING OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO AUGMENT THE RECORD by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Captain Brian A. Young by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 685 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Augment the Record by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 684 NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR WRITS OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 683 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO ADMISSIBILITY OF NEW GOVERNMENT EXHIBITS AND PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's February 3, 2010 Minute Order, a redacted version of the Order addressing the issues raised in the parties' Joint Status Report is hereby provided. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 18, 2010. (lcckk2 )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The parties are hereby given notice that today, February 3, 2010, the Court filed a Classified Order addressing the issues raised in the parties' Joint Status Report via the Court Security Office. A classified version of the Order will be served upon counsel for both parties today, and a redacted version shall be posted on the public docket as soon as it is available. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 3, 2010. (lcckk2 )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 681 NOTICE of Filing Additional Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER granting #677 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brandon E. Boutelle terminated. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/4/10. (dot, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 679 NOTICE to the Court by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #355 Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO ; USCA Case Number 08-5232. It is ORDERED that No. 08-5232 be dismissed as moot with respect to appellees Fawzi Khalid Abdullah Fahad Al Odah, Fayiz Mohammed Ahmed Al Kandari, Khalid Abdullah Mishal Al Mutairi, and Fouad Mahmoud Al Rabiah, and their next friends based on their representation that the district courts order requiring advance notice of transfer does not pertain to them inasmuch as they did not request and do not intend to request such notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that No. 08-5232 be dismissed as moot with respect to the remaining eight appellees and their next friends in light of the transfer of those habeas petitioners from Guantanamo Bay and the district courts dismissal of their habeas corpus claims in No. 02cv828 (D.D.C.). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of No. 08-5232 with Nos. 08-5233, et al., be terminated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the appellants notify the court, within 30 days of the date of this order, which habeas petitioners who are appellees in Nos. 08-5233, et al., remain at Guantanamo Bay and whether any of these appeals can be dismissed as moot or pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (kb)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Thomas)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE of Transfer of Fouad Al Rabia (ISN 551) by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maloney, Sarah)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER. Petitioner Al Rabiah's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Respondents Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court and to Transfer Him to Kuwait Within Fifteen Days is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner Al Rabiah's Motion to Compel Respondents to Submit Document for Review by Court and Attach to Record is also DENIED. Finally, Respondents shall file a status report with the Court, on or before December 21, 2009, advising the Court as to the current status of the Government's progress in complying with the Court's Order to "take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate the release of Petitioner Al Rabiah forthwith." Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 1, 2009. (lcckk2)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 674 NOTICE of Filing Status Report by RICK BACCUS, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maloney, Sarah)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 673 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). On November 9, 2009, Petitioner Al Rabiah filed a Motion to Compel Respondents to Submit Document for Review by Court and Attach to Record, which seeks disclosure to the Court of a document Petitioner contends is relevant and material to his currently-pending #661 Motion for Order to Show Cause. See Notice, Docket No. #672 . Petitioner's counsel indicated in the Amended LCvR 7(m) Certificate that they had been advised by Respondents' counsel that the Government would be filing "a notice with the Court explaining the circumstances surrounding the document and offering to submit it for the Court's review." See id. As of the filing of this minute order, the Court has not yet received any such response from Respondents. To the extent Respondents intend to file a response to Petitioner's Motion to Compel, they shall do so by no later than 4 P.M. on Thursday, November 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 16, 2009. (lcckk2 )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 672 NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONDENTS TO SUBMIT DOCUMENT FOR REVIEW BY COURT AND ATTACH TO RECORD by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 671 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RESPONDENTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 670 NOTICE of Filing Response to Petitioner Al Rabiah's Motion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re Order,,, (Maloney, Sarah)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2010. (dot, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 10/23/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 669 SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties shall abide by the schedule set herein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 23, 2009. (lcckk2 )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 10/22/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand (AM); Catalina Kerr(PM).) (dot, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 10/21/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand (AM); Catalina Kerr(PM).) (dot, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 10/20/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand (AM); Catalina Kerr(PM).) (dot, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 10/19/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE OF FILING OF PROTECTIVE ORDER ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS AND MEMORANDA OF UNDERSTANDING BY MILITARY COUNSEL ASSISTANTS by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Protective Order Acknowledgements and MOUs)(MacLean, Matthew)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 667 NOTICE Regarding Task Force (ISN 552) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 10/16/2009. Merits Hearing set for 10/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE of Filing of Documents with CSO by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Allen, Thomas)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Dalin Riley Holyoak terminated. (Holyoak, Dalin)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Pursuant to this Court's September 9, 2009 Order, the parties have each filed their respective motions for leave to amend, both of which are opposed in part. Petitioner has also filed separately to further explain his specific objections to Respondents' motion and, in particular, twelve of the additional exhibits proposed by Respondents. Upon review of Petitioner's objections, the Court concludes that it would benefit from a targeted reply by Respondents specifically responding to Petitioner's objections. Accordingly, the Court requires Respondents to file such a reply by no later than 1:00 P.M. Thursday, October 15, 2009. The Court shall then hold an on-the-record conference call with counsel for both parties at 12:30 PM Friday, October 16, 2009. Counsel are requested to jointly call into Chambers at that time. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 14, 2009. (lcckk2 )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 664 NOTICE Pursuant Court's Merits Hearing Procedures by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 663 STATUS REPORT Joint List of Contested Issues of Fact by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Walthall, Timothy)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 662 NOTICE OF LINE ATTACHING TABS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH re #661 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Respondents Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court (Attachments: #1 Tabs 1-3)(MacLean, Matthew)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Respondents Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David J. Cynamon, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). On October 13, 2009, Petitioner Al Rabiah filed a #661 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Respondents Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court and to Transfer Him to Kuwait Within Fifteen Days. In consideration of the upcoming merits hearing for Petitioner Al Kandari, which is scheduled to begin on October 19, 2009 and continue through and including October 23, 2009, and in which counsel for both parties and the Court shall be participating, the Court hereby sets forth a modified briefing schedule with respect to Petitioner Al Rabiah's Motion for Order to Show Cause as follows. Respondents' Opposition to Al Rabiah's Motion shall be due on or before November 2, 2009, and Petitioner's Reply, if any, shall be due on or before November 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 13, 2009. (lcckk2)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 660 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 658 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court has conducted an in camera ex parte review of the two memoranda at issue in Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed under seal. The Court concludes that the memoranda do not contain the information Petitioner seeks and are neither relevant or material to Petitioner's habeas corpus petition. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition is therefore DENIED. Accordingly, there is no basis for a request to continue the merits hearing at this time. In addition, as it is no longer necessary to hold a conference call to discuss Petitioner's emergency request for this material, the conference call currently scheduled for 1:30 P.M. this afternoon is VACATED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 8, 2009. (lcckk2)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 659 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 657 SEALED MOTION filed by KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Maclean Unredacted, #2 Declaration Maclean Redacted)(ztd, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 656 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Opposition to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Compel by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING AS MOOT Petitioner's #655 Motion for Leave to File Emergency Motion for Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and Supporting Declaration of Matthew J. MacLean Under Seal. As Petitioner's counsel has now advised the Court that the materials were filed under seal pursuant to paragraph 49 of the Protective Order because they were reasonably suspected of containing protected information, the materials may be filed under seal without prior leave of the Court as provided under the terms of the Protective Order. Counsel are reminded that, when filing materials under seal pursuant to the Protective Order in this case, they must specify in their Notice lodged on the public docket "that a protected information submission was made." That is, counsel should identify the specific authority for the filing under seal (e.g., that the materials are reasonably suspected of containing protected information and are therefore filed under seal pursuant to paragraph 49 of the Protective Order). Such notice is required to alert both the Court and the Clerk's Office that the materials are properly filed under seal pursuant to the Protective Order and that no motion for leave to seal is required (and that the materials should not be placed on the public docket in the absence of such a motion). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 7, 2009. (lcckk2 )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court has reviewed Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel and Opposition to Petitioner's Submission of Materials Ex Parte, which was filed today under seal. The Court requires Respondents to submit to the Court the two memoranda at issue in Petitioner's motion for the Court's ex parte review by no later than 10 A.M. Thursday, October 8, 2009. In addition, the Court shall hold a conference call with counsel for both parties, as may be necessary, at 1:30 P.M. Thursday, October 8, 2009. Counsel are to jointly call Chambers at that time. Finally, Respondents indicate in their opposition that they intend to seek leave to continue the merits hearing for two weeks. The Court strongly advises Respondents' counsel that any such motion will not be favorably viewed by this Court. Counsel will have had seven weeks since the last merits hearing in this habeas action to prepare for the upcoming hearing, which has been scheduled since August 28, 2009, and, given scheduling constraints in the Court's calendar, the Court is not in a position to grant leave to continue Petitioner's merits hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 7, 2009. (lcckk2 )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 655 MOTION for Leave to File EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. MACLEAN UNDER SEAL by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 654 NOTICE OF FILING EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. MACLEAN IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 653 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed under seal and the supporting Declaration of Matthew J. MacLean filed ex parte and under seal. In light of the emergency nature of Petitioner's motion, Respondents are required to file an expedited response to Petitioner's Emergency Motion that must, at a minimum, address the two discrete questions raised during an off-the-record telephone call held today between Chambers and counsel for both parties. Such response shall be due no later than 4:00 PM, Wednesday, October 7, 2009. Upon receipt, the Court shall, if appropriate, schedule a conference call to discuss this matter further. Finally, the Court notes that Petitioner's counsel did not file a motion requesting leave to file the emergency motion and declaration under seal as is required by LCvR 5.1(j)(1) ("Any pleading filed with the intention of being sealed shall be accompanied by a motion to seal.... Failure to file a motion to seal will result in the pleading being placed in the public record."). The Court is unaware of any provision of the Protective Order or other relevant order that alters or otherwise excuses compliance with the local rules when a party seeks to file a document under seal in these habeas proceedings. Accordingly, Petitioner's counsel is advised that they must immediately comply with LCvR 5.1(j), or provide the Court with legal authority excusing such compliance, by no later than 9 A.M. Wednesday, October 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 6, 2009. (lcckk2 )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE of Production of Documents re ISN 552 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 652 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 651 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 649 NOTICE of Filing Submission Under Seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #646 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Barry D. Wingard, Jr.; and granting #647 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian A. Young. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 30, 2009. (SM)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 648 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald D. Lee on behalf of FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Lee, Ronald)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Pursuant to the Court's #582 June 15, 2009 Order, counsel for Respondents have an affirmative obligation to ascertain whether the Guantanamo Review Task Force and/or the Review Panel have made any recommendations or decisions regarding the disposition of Petitioners in this habeas action. Recent media reports suggest that the Review Panel may have reached a decision with respect to two of the Petitioners. Respondents' counsel is therefore required to file a notice with this Court, in compliance with the Court's June 15, 2009 Order, advising the Court as to whether any such recommendations or decisions have in fact been made. Respondents shall file the notice on or before 5 P.M. on Wednesday, September 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 29, 2009. (lcckk2 )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 09-5331 for #640 Notice of Appeal filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH. (td, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian Young, :Firm- Office of Military Commissions, :Address- 1555 Wilson Blvd., Suite 620, Arlington, VA 22209. Phone No. - 703-696-9490. Fax No. - 703-696-9575 by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Young, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Protective Order Acknowledgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 646 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Barry Wingard, :Firm- Office of Military Commissions, :Address- 1555 Wilson Blvd., Suite 620, Arlington, VA 22209. Phone No. - 703-696-9490. Fax No. - 703-696-9575 by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barry Wingard, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Protective Order Acknowledgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Attached is the Unclassified Memorandum Opinion accompanying the Court's September 17, 2009 Order granting Petitioner Al Rabiah's petition for habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 25, 2009. (lcckk1)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 644 NOTICE Regarding Participation in Merits Hearing by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Allen, Thomas)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Unclassified Memorandum Opinion to the Court by 10:00 A.M. on 9/25/2009. (dot, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion issued to the parties on this date, Petitioner Fouad Mahmoud Al Rabiah's petition for habeas corpus is GRANTED. The Government is directed to take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate the release of Petitioner Al Rabiah forthwith. The Government is directed to comply with any reporting requirements mandated by the Supplemental Appropriations Act, Pub. L. No. 111-32, 123 Stat. 1859 (2009), if applicable, to facilitate the release of Petitioner Al Rabiah forthwith. The relevant agencies shall complete a classification review of the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion and shall provide the Court with an Unclassified version no later than 10:00 A.M. on September 25, 2009. This is a Final, Appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 17, 2009. (lcckk1)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 642 NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly of proceedings held on 8/12, 8/13, Submitted to CSO: September 18, 2009. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Stonestreet, Rebecca)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #640 Notice of Appeal (td, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Status Conference held on 9/9/2009. Merits Hearing set for 10/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (dot, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES ORDER for Petitioner Al Kandari. Counsel are directed to carefully review this Order and to comply with each of the items included therein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 9, 2009. (lcckk1)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Improper Respondents (Dkt. No. 723, 08-mc-0442). In light of subsequent rulings by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and pending matters before this Court that are related to the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/9/09. (lctfh1)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE OF APPEAL by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001954610. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Allen, Thomas)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/31/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 639 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Attached is the Unclassified Memorandum Opinion accompanying the Court's August 24, 2009 Order denying Petitioner Al Odah's petition for habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/28/2009. Status Conference set for 9/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court shall hold a Status Hearing in this case on September 9, 2009, at 9:00 A.M., in Courtroom 28A, to set further dates and discuss issues related to Petitioner Al Kandari's Merits Hearing. The Court shall also hold Petitioner Al Kandari's Merits Hearing from October 19, 2009, through October 23, 2009, in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 28, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/27/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/26/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 8/24/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion issued to the parties on this date, Petitioner Fawzi Khalid Abdullah Fahad Al Odah's petition for habeas corpus is DENIED. The relevant agencies shall complete a classification review of the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion and shall provide the Court with an Unclassified version within 72 hours of receiving the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion. This is a Final, Appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 24, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 637 REPLY re Order, Motion to Amend Exhibit List re Respondents' Motion to Amend the Exhibit List for ISN 551 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (O'Donnell, Sean) Modified on 8/25/2009 (znmw, ).
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a conference call on the record with counsel for both parties on August 24, 2009, to discuss Petitioner's objections to certain of Respondents' proposed exhibits and to discuss other matters related to the parties' exhibits for Petitioner Al Rabia's Merits Hearing. For the reasons discussed on the record, the Court shall GRANT Al Rabia's Unopposed Motions to Amend his Exhibit List and shall GRANT-IN-PART the Government's Motions to Amend its Exhibit List as to all exhibits except those to which Petitioner objected in his Partial Opposition to the Governments Motion to Amend. The Court shall determine at the Merits Hearing whether the exhibits to which Petitioner objected are appropriately admitted into the record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 24, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Motion for Leave to Amend Exhibit List for ISN 551 Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 635 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 634 NOTICE OF FILING PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 633 RESPONSE re #632 Notice (Other) RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 632 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record in Petitioner Al Odah's habeas corpus proceeding, which Petitioner indicated in an August 21, 2009 filing is unopposed, as it was submitted in response to a question the Court asked during the course of the Merits Hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 21, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Respondents shall file a Reply to Petitioner Al Rabia's Partial Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Amend Exhibit List no later than noon on August 24, 2009. Among other things, the Reply must address the source of the documents identified in paragraph 1 of Petitioner's Opposition (i.e. whether they are from the Department of Justice, the Guantanamo Review Task Force, or another location), whether the documents have been declassified such that they may be shared with Petitioner, and for what purpose (in summary form) the Government seeks to admit each of the documents. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 21, 2008. (lcckk1)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 631 AFFIDAVIT OF BRANDON E. BOUTELLE CERTIFYING FAMILIARITY WITH LOCAL RULES by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon E. Boutelle)(MacLean, Matthew)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 630 NOTICE OF INTENT TO LISTEN TO UNCLASSIFIED PORTION OF HEARING by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE OF FILING LINE ATTACHING CONSOLIDATED EXHIBIT LIST by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 628 NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO AMEND EXHIBIT LIST by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court is disappointed that counsel for the parties failed to engage in a civil discourse prior to submitting their respective Motions to Amend Exhibit Lists for Petitioner Al Rabia's Merits Hearing. Not only would such a discussion have benefitted the parties by allowing both to determine which exhibits were appropriately included in their Exhibit Lists, such a discussion would also have ensured compliance with the Court's Merits Hearing Procedures Order, which requires the parties to identify all exhibits (with two enumerated exceptions) prior to the deadline set by the Court. The purpose of this deadline is to ensure that the evidence is known by the Court and the parties sufficiently in advance of the hearing to know what evidence will likely be presented and what issues will likely be in dispute. Because counsel failed to act appropriately, the Court is now unsure whether either party intends to oppose any of the proposed exhibits attached to the parties' respective Motions to Amend, and now faces the prospect of rolling Motions to Amend despite the deadline set in its Order. The Court advises the parties that it expects them to confer in a civil and detailed manner with respect to their Motions to Amend, and to only file well-reasoned objections to exhibits that cannot be resolved absent Court intervention. The Court further advises the parties that it expects going forward that they shall engage in a civil discourse concerning these and other issues associated with the Merits Hearings in this case, as is required by the local rules of this Court and the rules of professional conduct. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 20, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Amend the Exhibit List for Petitioner Al Odah's Merits Hearing to include a copy of the classified opinion in Al Adahi v. Obama. Decisions by other judges of this Court are not evidence, and the proper method for bringing new legal authority to the attention of the Court is through a Notice. The parties are advised that the judges of this Court are generally aware of each other's merits opinions issued in Guantanamo Bay habeas cases and Petitioner need not continue submitting them to the Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 20, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE of Joint List of Contested Issues by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 626 NOTICE Pursuant to the Court's Merits Hearing Procedures Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of Motion to Amend Statement of Facts and Exhibit List by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 624 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Fawzi Al Odah's Motion for Leave to File Additional Exhibit by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Cynamon, David)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 623 NOTICE of Filing Substitution of Trial Exhibit by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 622 NOTICE of Intention Not to Call Petitioner as a Witness by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER OF KEVIN BOGUCKI by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Protective Order of Kevin Bogucki)(MacLean, Matthew)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 620 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin B. Bogucki on behalf of FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Bogucki, Kevin)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 619 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY BRANDON E. BOUTELLE by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding and Protective Order Acknowledgement)(MacLean, Matthew)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 618 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brandon E. Boutelle, :Firm- Office of Military Commissions, Office of the Chief Defense Counsel, :Address- 1555 Wilson Blvd., Suite 620, Arlington, VA 22209. Phone No. - 703-696-9490. Fax No. - 703-696-9575 by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon E. Boutelle, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). For the reasons discussed with counsel on the record on August 13, 2009, the Court shall AMEND its July 30, 2009 Merits Hearing Procedures Order for Petitioner Al Rabiah's Merits Hearing as follows. Petitioner Al Rabiah's Merits Hearing shall be RESCHEDULED for August 26-27, 2009, to continue on August 28, 2009, if necessary. The hearing shall begin promptly at 9:00 A.M. each day. The presentation of the parties' unclassified opening statements shall be limited to 30 minutes for each party, and the presentation of the parties' classified opening statements shall be limited to 15 minutes for each party. All due dates previously set for August 17, 2009, shall be re-set for August 19, 2009. The Government's notice regarding the Guantanamo Review Panel pursuant to item seven of the Court's Merits Hearing Procedures Order shall be filed on August 25, 2009. Finally, the procedures related to unanticipated issues as described in item nine of the Court's Merits Hearing Procedures Order shall apply after the close of business on August 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 14, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). For the reasons discussed with counsel on the record on August 13, 2009, the Government shall file a notice no later than 12:00 P.M. on August 17, 2009, indicating whether the Government wants to call Petitioner Al Rabia as a witness during Petitioner Al Rabia's Merits Hearing, and the scope of the testimony. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 14, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #618 Unopposed Motion for for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Brandon E. Boutelle, contingent upon Attorney Boutelle certifying to the Court that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 14, 2009. (SM)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/13/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/12/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING Petitioner's #615 Motion to Allow Ronald D. Lee to Attend the Merits Hearing of Petitioner Al Odah because Mr. Lee has not entered a notice of appearance on behalf of Petitioner Al Odah. For the reasons stated on the record during the unclassified portion of Petitioner Al Odah's Merits Hearing on August 11, 2009, and for the reasons stated in the Court's April 3, 2009 Order concerning military defense counsel's access to classified materials, all attorneys accessing classified information on behalf of Petitioner must first enter a notice of appearance, which may include a limited appearance, if applicable. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 12, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 8/11/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Petitioner's Unopposed Second Motion to Amend his Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 11, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Memorandum in opposition to re #615 MOTION to Allow Ronald D. Lee to Attend Hearing filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Holyoak, Dalin)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE of Appearance by Dalin Riley Holyoak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Holyoak, Dalin)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MOTION to Allow Ronald D. Lee to Attend Hearing by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Thomas)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a conference call on the record with counsel for both parties on August 4, 2009. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court shall GRANT Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Amend his Exhibit List and GRANT Respondents' Opposed Motion to Amend their Exhibit List and Statement of Facts. Accordingly, Respondents shall file an updated and complete version of their Statement of Facts no later than August 5, 2009. Respondents shall also provide Petitioner with an updated and complete list of their exhibits no later than August 5, 2009. Petitioner shall provide Respondents with a copy of a particular exhibit discussed on the conference call no later than August 4, 2009. After conferring with Respondents, Petitioner shall file a Second Motion to Amend his Exhibit List no later than August 6, 2009. Petitioner shall also consolidate the Respondents' Exhibit List with his own exhibits (including any additional exhibits proposed by his Second Motion to Amend) into a Consolidated Exhibit List to be filed with the Court no later than August 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 4, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to Exculpatory Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Paul Edward Ahern terminated. (Ahern, Paul)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 612 NOTICE of Joint List of Contested Factual Issues filed by Respondents by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE Regarding Participation in Merits Hearing by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Allen, Thomas)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 610 NOTICE of Filing (1) unopposed motion to amend exhibit list (2) exhibit list and (3) consolidated exhibit list by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Allen, Thomas)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 609 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Attached is the Unclassified Memorandum Opinion accompanying the Court's July 29, 2009 Order granting Petitioner Al Mutairi's petition for habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 3, 2009. (lcckk1)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court shall hold a conference call on the record with the parties on August 4, 2009, at 10:00 A.M, relating to Respondents' Opposed Motion to Amend their Statement of Material Facts and Exhibit List as to Petitioner Al Odah. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 3, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 608 STATUS REPORT of the Parties Regarding Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (O'Donnell, Sean)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES ORDER for Petitioner Al Rabiah. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 30, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion issued to the parties on this date, Petitioner Khalid Abdullah Mishal Al Mutairi's petition for habeas corpus is GRANTED. The Government is directed to take all necessary and appropriate diplomatic steps to facilitate the release of Petitioner Al Mutairi forthwith. The Government is directed to comply with any reporting requirements mandated by the Supplemental Appropriations Act, Pub. L. No. 111-32, 123 Stat. 1859 (2009), if applicable, to facilitate the release of Petitioner Al Mutairi forthwith. The relevant agencies shall complete a classification review of the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion and shall provide the Court with an Unclassified version within 48 hours of receiving the Court's Classified Memorandum Opinion. This is a Final, Appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 29, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for Faez Mohammed Ahmed al-Kandari (ISN 552) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Factual Return - Narrative, #2 Appendix B - Factual Return - Exhibits)(O'Donnell, Sean)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return (ISN 232) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits, Part 1, #3 Exhibits, Part 2, #4 Exhibits, Part 3, #5 Exhibits, Part 4)(Walthall, Timothy)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return (ISN 551) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits, Part 1, #3 Exhibits, Part 2, #4 Exhibits, Part 3, #5 Exhibits, Part 4, #6 Exhibits, Part 5)(Walthall, Timothy)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 602 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Factual Return - Narrative, #2 Exhibit B - Factual Return - Exhibits (part 1), #3 Exhibit C - Factual Return - Exhibits (part 2))(O'Donnell, Sean)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 601 NOTICE of Filing Substitution by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES ORDER for Petitioner Al Odah. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Merits Hearing set for 8/11/2009 09:00 AM and 8/12/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, ) Modified on 7/22/2009 (dot, ).
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 597 SEALED DOCUMENT re #596 filed by MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztd, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE OF FILING LINE ATTACHING DECLARATION OF ADNANE ETTAYEBI AND ARABIC LANGUAGE VERSIONS OF DECLARATIONS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Based on the discussions between the Court and counsel on July 7, 2009, the Court shall VACATE the merits hearing scheduled for Petitioner Al Odah on July 20-21, 2009, and RESCHEDULE the hearing for August 11-12, 2009, in Courtroom 28A. By separate Order, the Court shall re-set the deadlines for pre-hearing submissions associated with this hearing, as well as set dates for any other required submissions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 9, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing (CLOSED SESSION) held on 7/7/2009; taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Merits Hearing held on 7/6/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER GRANTING Respondents' Motion to Amend their Statement of Facts and Exhibit List for Petitioner Mutairi's merits hearing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 2, 2009. (lcckk1)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER. Counsel shall comply fully with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 1, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 593 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND STATEMENT OF FACTS AND EXHIBIT LIST by KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI (MacLean, Matthew)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 591 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #590 Consent Motion to Continue Deadline for filing the Joint List of Contested Issues by one business day to allow the parties to file the submission as protected. Accordingly, the parties shall file their Joint List of Contested Issues no later than June 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 30, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court shall hold a conference call on the record in this case on July 1, 2009, at 11:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 30, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Consent MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Joint List of Contested Issues by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (O'Donnell, Sean)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 587 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (O'Donnell, Sean)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #221 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICK BACCUS, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO ; USCA Case Number 05-5117.Ordered and Adjudged that the order of the the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby vacated and the cases are remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(ls, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER REGARDING MERITS HEARING PROCEDURES. The Court shall adopt the parties' proposal for opening statements. Accordingly, the parties shall begin with unclassified opening statements, with Respondents presenting their unclassified opening statement first. The parties shall then present classified opening statements, with Respondents presenting their classified opening statement first. Petitioner shall be responsible for translators and Respondents shall be responsible for all other logistical arrangements necessary so that Petitioner may listen to the unclassified opening statements. The Court shall adopt the parties' proposal for closing statements. Accordingly, the parties shall present their closing statements in closed court. Respondents shall present their closing argument first, followed by Petitioner. Respondents shall be allowed to make a rebuttal closing argument. The parties shall confer with respect to the contested issues that they expect to present during the merits hearing, and shall submit a Joint List of Contested Issues to the Court on the date that the parties shall make their final pre-hearing submissions. For Petitioner Al Mutairi, the Joint List of Contested Issues shall be due on June 29, 2009. For Petitioner Al Odah, the Joint List of Contested Issues shall be due on July 13, 2009. The Court shall make a final determination with respect to the format the parties shall follow during the presentation of evidence after reviewing the submission of the parties' Joint List of Contested Issues. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 22, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 585 STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by Respondents by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Lohrer, John)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court held a conference call on the record with counsel for both parties on June 17, 2009, to discuss Respondents' obligations to search the Guantanamo Review Task Force database in accordance with the Court's April 7, 2009 Order. By agreement of the parties, and in order to expedite Respondents' production of documents in which Petitioners may be particularly interested, Respondents' obligations to review the database shall be limited to documents related to one particular witness (who the parties have identified) in connection with the habeas proceedings of Petitioners Al Mutairi and Al Odah. The parties shall confer periodically during Respondents' review, and Respondents shall produce responsive documents on a rolling basis until June 29, 2009, with respect to Al Mutairi, and July 13, 2009, with respect to Petitioner Al Odah, unless good cause is shown to extend the deadlines. On or before June 24, 2009, Respondents shall also determine the volume of documents in the database associated with the habeas proceedings of Petitioners Al Kandari and Al Rabiah, and shall confer with Petitioners regarding the same. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before June 26, 2009, describing the volume of documents and indicating whether the parties have reached an agreement that narrows or otherwise expedites Respondents' search obligations as to these documents. Finally, during the conference call with the parties, Petitioners requested that the Court set a date by which Respondents would certify that they have reviewed all factual returns and traverses that would have been filed as of that date in compliance with Respondents' obligations to review and produce exculpatory information to Petitioners. Respondents' counsel subsequently informed the Court that Respondents would agree to such a certification. Accordingly, on June 29, 2009, Respondents shall file a notice with the Court in connection with Petitioner Al Mutairi's habeas proceeding, certifying that Respondents have completed their review of all reasonably available information (which includes factual returns and traverses filed as of that date) and disclosed all exculpatory evidence pursuant to the Case Management Order, as amended, this Court's Discovery Orders, and the Court's June 16, 2009 Order. Respondents shall make the same certification on July 13, 2009, in connection with Petitioner Al Odah's habeas proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 17, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2009. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (dot, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER. Respondents' Motion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity is GRANTED-IN-PART as to the admission of hearsay and HELD-IN-ABEYANCE-IN-PART as to presumptions of accuracy and authenticity, which shall be resolved in the context of the individual Petitioners' Merits Hearings. Petitioners' Motion to Admit Hearsay is GRANTED. Respondents' Motion to Amend the Statement of Facts and Exhibit List as to Petitioner Fayiz Al Kandari is GRANTED. Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Documents Provided to Counsel Only in Redacted Form is DENIED-AS-MOOT. The following motions shall be HELD-IN-ABEYANCE and resolved in the context of the individual Petitioners' Merits Hearings: Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Certain Statements of Petitioner Fouad Al Rabiah; Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Certain Evidence and Allegations that Have Not Been Shown to Them; Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Certain Documents as to which the Government Has Failed to Establish Authenticity or Relevance to Petitioners; and Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Reports Related to Alleged Photographic Identifications. Petitioners' Motion for Sanctions is HELD-IN-ABEYANCE, but the Court shall ORDER that the traverses filed by other petitioners in Guantanamo Bay habeas proceedings shall be considered reasonably available for purposes of Respondents' obligations to review and disclose exculpatory evidence pursuant to the Case Management Order, as amended, and this Court's Discovery Orders. The Court shall hold a Merits Hearing for Petitioner Khaled Al Mutairi on July 6, 2009, at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A, to continue on July 7, 2009, at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A, if necessary. The Court shall hold a Merits Hearing for Petitioner Fawzi Al Odah on July 20, 2009 at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A, to continue on July 21, 2009, at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A, if necessary. The parties shall confer and file Joint Proposed Procedures for Petitioners' Merits Hearings on or before June 19, 2009. The Court shall hold a conference call on June 17, 2009, at 10:00 A.M., during which Respondents shall describe the volume of documents in the Guantanamo Review Task Force database associated with each of the four Petitioners, and the estimated time it would take to review and disclose documents to Petitioners in accordance with the Court's April 7, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 16, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 583 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Maloney, Sarah)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER. Respondents' counsel shall have an affirmative obligation to ascertain whether the Guantanamo Review Task Force has made any recommendations regarding the disposition of Petitioners and, if it has, to notify the Court of the same. If a recommendation regarding the disposition of Petitioners has been made, Respondents' counsel shall also have an affirmative obligation to ascertain whether the Review Panel has made any decisions in connection with the recommendations and, if so, to notify the Court with the results of such decisions. The obligations imposed on Respondents' counsel pursuant to the attached Order shall be immediate and ongoing. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). In light of Judge Thomas F. Hogan's order denying without prejudice Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force, and in connection with the Status Hearing scheduled in this case for June 16, 2009, counsel for all parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report no later than 9:30 A.M. on June 16, 2009. The Joint Status Report shall describe how Respondents intend to comply with the Court's April 7, 2009 Order requiring disclosure of certain materials associated with the Guantanamo Review Task Force, and shall propose dates by which Respondents' counsel shall have reviewed and disclosed all such materials to Petitioners' counsel for each of the four Petitioners. The Joint Status Report should also indicate whether Petitioners' counsel continues to seek these materials for each of the four Petitioners. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Response to Petitioners' Supplemental Reply Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE STATEMENTS RESULTING FROM ABUSIVE AND COERCIVE TREATMENT by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (MacLean, Matthew)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 578 REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF HEARSAY by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHI
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court shall hold a closed-session Status Hearing in this case on June 16, 2009, at 10:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 29, 2009. (lcckk1)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PETITIONERS' RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS' PROPOSED STIPULATIONS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 571 NOTICE of Service of Respondents' Proposed Stipulations of Fact by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Rabiah's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #547 Notice (Other) (Ahern, Paul)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part Petitioners' Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines (Dkt. No. 1772, 08-mc-0442). Petitioners may file one consolidated opposition to the government's Motion for Reconsideration by Friday, May 29, 2009. The government may file a reply brief by Friday, June 5, 2009. The hearing date is reset from June 8, 2009 to June 9, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/26/09. (lctfh1)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE of Filing Reply Memorandum in Support of Respondents' Motion to Admit Hearsay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 567 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PETITIONERS' PROPOSED STIPULATIONS OF FACT by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 566 NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONERS' REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE, MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION OF HEARSAY, AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE of Filing Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Factual Statement Pertaining to Petitioner Al Kandari (ISN 552) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 564 REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Allen on behalf of FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI (Allen, Thomas)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, May 27, 2009, petitioners shall file one consolidated opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force (Dkt No. 1755, 08-mc-0442). The government's reply is due by Wednesday, June 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/20/09. (lctfh1)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Government's Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures (Dkt. No. 1762, 08-mc-0442). The government is ordered to file its reply on or before Friday, May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 05/18/09. (lctfh1)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE of Filing of Oppositions to Motions in Limine and Other Filings and Submissions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #547 Notice (Other) (Lohrer, John)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Lohrer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Lohrer, John)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO ADMIT HEARSAY AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND STATEMENT OF FACTS AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR PETITIONER FAYIZ AL KANDARI by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #555 Opposed Motion for an eleven-day extension of time to respond to Petitioner Al Rabia's Motion in Limine to exclude evidence allegedly obtained by abuse or coercion. The Court reluctantly grants this extension despite Respondents' failure to detail the steps it has already taken to respond to this motion and the steps it will take in the additional eleven days. Given the importance of this information as it relates to Petitioner Al Rabia, the Court finds that a one-time extension to allow Respondents to submit an appropriate and complete response to this motion is warranted. Because the Court assumes that Respondents have thoughtfully sought this extension and determined that only eleven additional days are necessary to file their response, there shall be NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS as to this Motion in Limine. Accordingly, Respondents shall file their Opposition to Petitioner Al Rabia's Motion in Limine on or before May 26, 2009. Petitioners shall file a Reply, if any, on or before June 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Memorandum in opposition to re #555 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion in Limine filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI. (Cynamon, David)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion in Limine by GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 554 MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #549 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Amend the Statement of Facts and Witness and Exhibit Lists, without prejudice to Petitioners' right to oppose the Motion for Leave to Amend the Statement of Facts and Witness and Exhibit Lists. Accordingly, Petitioners shall file an Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Statement of Facts and Witness and Exhibit Lists on or before May 15, 2009, and Respondents shall file a Reply, if any, on or before May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 12, 2009. (lcckk1)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 552 RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE,
May 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 551 STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REPLY re #504 Memorandum,,,,,,,,,,,, Regarding the Government's Detention Authority filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Hardee, Norman)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Statement of Fact and Witness and Exhibit Lists by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Sean)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/15/2009. Reply due by 5/22/2009. (dot, )
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Petitioners' #546 Motion for Leave to file a Motion for Sanctions. Accordingly, Respondents shall file a Response to this Motion on or before May 15, 2009, and Petitioners shall file a Reply, if any, on or before May 22, 2009, in accordance with the Court's April 14, 2009 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 5, 2009. (lcckk1)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Motion to Admit Hearsay and Disclosure of Document by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE OF FILING STATUS REPORT, MOTIONS IN LIMINE, AND MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF HEARSAY by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Sanctions by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #545 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to file a Reply regarding the Government's detention authority to allow Respondents additional time for the multi-level interagency review to be completed in connection with the Reply. Accordingly, Respondents shall file their Reply regarding the Government's detention authority on or before May 8, 2009. All other filing deadlines set by the Court's prior scheduling orders remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 4, 2009. (lcckk1)
May 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Regarding the Governments Detention Authority by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 544 STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Orders, on April 3, 2009, Petitioners timely submitted a list of witnesses and exhibits on which they intend to rely in connection with Petitioners' merits hearings, and Respondents timely submitted their pre-hearing materials (which included a list of witnesses and exhibits on which they intend to rely) on April 27, 2009. Because Petitioners did not have the benefit of Respondents' pre-hearing materials when they submitted their list of witnesses and exhibits, the Court shall require Petitioners to file a Status Report on or before May 7, 2009, indicating whether they want to eliminate or otherwise change any witnesses or exhibits identified in their April 3, 2009 submission. Petitioners shall also clarify in their Status Report which of their proposed witnesses, if any, they intend to call for live testimony, as opposed to relying on the witnesses' declarations. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 30, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE of Filing of Pre-Hearing Materials by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 542 RESPONSE re #504 Memorandum,,,,,,,,,,,, Regarding Detention Authority filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ghereni Opinion, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ghereni Transcript)(MacLean, Matthew)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Status Report pursuant to Order of March 11, 2009 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Filing Documents with Court Security Officer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Declassified, Protected Factual Return of ISN 232 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 537 STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO MINUTE ORDER OF APRIL 15, 2009 by KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI. (MacLean, Matthew)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2009. (dot, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). Although the parties previously represented to the Court that "merits hearing [were] necessary with respect to all four of the Petitioners," Joint Status Report at 1 (Apr. 3, 2009), Petitioners have now indicated that they intend to seek the Court's permission to file a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Petitioner Al Mutairi. See Joint Status Report at 5 (Apr. 10, 2009). To proceed with such a motion, Petitioners are advised (1) that the Court would not reach the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings until the parties had completed briefing (and the Court was able to consider) their evidentiary and other motions that could implicate the evidence contained in Al Mutairi's factual return, (2) that Petitioners would have to agree to accept all of the evidence presented in the factual return (subject to the Court's resolution of any evidentiary or legal motions) without seeking to controvert any of the evidence contained therein, and (3) if the Court were to deny the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings at a motions hearing, that the parties would have to be prepared to immediately proceed with a merits hearing. The Court is concerned that the filing of a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings will only delay further the resolution of the Al Mutairi's habeas petition. The option of having a merits hearing with an appropriate motion at the end of Respondents' case would appear to be a better and more efficient option. Accordingly, on or before April 21, 2009, Petitioners shall file a Status Report indicating whether they want to file a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in light of these considerations. Respondents may also file a Status Report by that date if they want to present any relevant information for the Courts consideration. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 536 SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties shall file all Motions in Limine and the Legal Motions described in their April 10, 2009 Joint Status Report no later than May 4, 2009, with Oppositions due no later than May 15, 2009, and Replies, if any, due no later than May 22, 2009. Petitioners shall respond to Respondents' Memorandum Regarding the Government's Detention Authority Relative to Detainees Held at Guantanamo Bay no later than April 27, 2009, with a Reply due no later than May 4, 2009. The parties shall exchange proposed stipulations no later than May 25, 2009, shall respond to each other's proposed stipulations no later than May 29, 2009, and shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court indicating what stipulations have been reached, if any, no later than June 5, 2009. The Court's May 5, 2009 Status Hearing is VACATED. The Court shall set a new date for the Status Hearing after reviewing the briefing associated with the parties' Motions, in all likelihood in early June. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 14, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING Respondents' #534 Motion to File a Supplemental Status Report. On April 6, 2009, the Court ordered Respondents to produce certain materials to Petitioners' counsel in connection with Section 4(c)(1) of Executive Order 13,492. The Court stated that this obligation was immediate and ongoing. Respondents' Motion appears to be an improperly-denominated Motion for Reconsideration, seeking an apparent stay of this obligation until the filing of a Status Report later this month. To the extent that the Motion seeks to have the Court reconsider the obligations imposed by its previous Order, the Motion is denied because it fails to include any reasoning supporting such a request for relief. To the extent that the Motion merely requests leave to file a Status Report providing an update on Respondents' compliance, leave of Court is not required. Accordingly, the Court shall DENY Respondents Motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 14, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Memorandum in opposition to re #534 MOTION Motion To File A Supplemental Status Report filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION Motion To File A Supplemental Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maloney, Sarah)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 533 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report (April 10, 2009) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Maloney, Sarah)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 531 SCHEDULING ORDER. Counsel shall comply fully with the attached Order supplementing the Court's January 7, 2009 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 7, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1526, 08-mc-0442). For the reasons set forth during the hearing on March 26, 2009, Press Applicants are permitted to intervene only to oppose the government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1416, 08-mc-0442) before this Court. This order does not permit Press Applicants to intervene in any case before the Merits Judges. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/2/09. (lctfh1)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Further Supplemental Status Report and Discovery Response Pursuant to Order of March 11, 2009 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maloney, Sarah)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER DENYING Respondents' #500 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's February 12, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) VACATING the closed-session Status Hearing scheduled in this case on April 7, 2009, and RESCHEDULING the closed session Status Hearing for May 5, 2009, at 9:30 A.M., in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #523 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to submit pre-hearing materials. Accordingly, Respondents shall file their pre-hearing materials as required by the Court's January 7, 2009 Scheduling Order on or before April 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER DENYING Petitioners' #436 Motion for Production of Complete Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 2, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER DENYING Petitioners' #488 Motion to Allow Defense Counsel to Access Classified Information. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 3, 2009. (lcckk1)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 525 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report (April 3, 2009) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Maloney, Sarah)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE OF FILING LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Pre-Hearing Materials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Maloney on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Maloney, Sarah)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 521 RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE of Filing of Traverses with Court Security Office by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI (MacLean, Matthew)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 519 STATUS REPORT Regarding Certain Videotapes by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Walthall, Timothy)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Emergency MOTION Access to Classified Material by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING AS MOOT Petitioners' #518 Emergency Motion for Access to Classified Material. Pursuant to the communications between Chambers and counsel, the Court understands the parties have reached a resolution as to this motion and the Court therefore denies it as moot. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 26, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHME
March 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPLY re #513 Notice (Other), #508 Notice (Other) Regarding Documents Found on SIPRNET filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Walthall, Timothy)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Memorandum Regarding SIPRNET Documents by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #508 Notice (Other) (Walthall, Timothy)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITIONERS REPLY TO MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF REDACTIONS TO DECLASSIFIED RETURNS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #509 Notice (Other) (MacLean, Matthew)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM REGARDING EXCULPATORY DOCUMENTS FOUND ON SIPRNET BY MILITARY COMMISSION COUNSEL by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #508 Notice (Other) (MacLean, Matthew)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1)
March 15, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #505 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Supplemental Status Report regarding certain videotapes of detainees mantained at Guantanamo, as to which Petitioners take no position. Accordingly, Respondents shall file a Supplemental Status Report regarding these videotapes no later than March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 15, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING Respondents' #499 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Factual Returns to Include Additional Declarations. Accordingly, the Factual Returns associated with the four Petitioners shall be amended to include Respodnents' additional declarations. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Filing Declarations by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #508 Notice (Other) (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Filing Ex Parte, In Camera Submission by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #509 Notice (Other) (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 509 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum in Further Support of Redactions to Declassified Factual Returns by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 508 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum Regarding "SIPRNET" Documents by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Filing Ex Parte, In Camera Submission by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #506 Notice (Other) (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 505 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report by GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR DISCLOSURE OF ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF A STATUS REPORT. Counsel shall comply fully with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 11, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MOTION for Order To Reconsider Order of February 12, 2009, In Part by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns to Include Additional Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 498 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #497 MOTION for Order to Amend Joint Status Report and Extend Time Within Which to File Brief filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Walthall, Timothy)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc Respondents' #496 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to file a response to the Court concerning "SIPRNet" materials. Accordingly, on or before March 13, 2009, Respondents shall provide the Court with an explanation as to why allegedly exculpatory documents provided to Respondents by Petitioners' military defense counsel were not located in Respondents' search for exculpatory documents in this case, and whether other potentially exculpatory documents are likely to be found by searching SIPRNet. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc Respondents' #497 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to file a brief regarding information that has not been declassified. Accordingly, Respondents shall file their brief regarding information that has not been declassified on or before March 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MOTION for Order to Amend Joint Status Report and Extend Time Within Which to File Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Provide Report on SIPRNet Materials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE OF RESPONSE TO MINUTE ORDER OF MARCH 5, 2009 by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re Order,, (MacLean, Matthew)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Filing Third Status Report Pursuant to Order of February 12, 2009 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). On or before March 11, 2009, Petitioners shall file a notice with the Court indicating whether the parties conferred prior to the filing of Respondents' February 18, 2009 Status Report, and if not, whether Petitioners object to the time frames specified therein. If Petitioners object to any of Respondents' proposed time frames for locating and disclosing discovery, they should provide a corresponding basis for each objection, if any. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 5, 2009. (lcckk1)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 493 REPLY to opposition to motion re #488 MOTION for Order Allowing Petitioners' Military Defense COunsel Access to Classified Information filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (MacLean, Matthew)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Memorandum in opposition to re #488 MOTION for Order Allowing Petitioners' Military Defense COunsel Access to Classified Information filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Second Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 489 NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On Thursday, March 26, 2009, at 2:00 pm, the parties shall appear for a hearing on Respondents' Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1416, 08-mc-0442) AND Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1526, 08-mc-0442) in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Each party (Petitioners, Respondents, and Press Applicants) shall designate one counsel to speak on their behalf. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MOTION for Order Allowing Petitioners' Military Defense COunsel Access to Classified Information by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Bogucki, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Barry Winguard, #3 Exhibit C - Protective Order Acknowledgements, #4 Exhibit D - E-mail Exchange, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE OF FILING OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PRODUCE DECLASSIFIED RETURNS OR ADEQUATE SUBSTITUTES by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #436 MOTION to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes (MacLean, Matthew)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc Respondents' #475 Unopposed Motion for a one-day Extension of Time to complete their discovery responses required by the Amended Case Management Order based on the extraordinary circumstances described by Respondents. Accordingly, Respondents shall serve any remaining documents required to be disclosed by Sections I.D.1 and I.E.1 of the Amended Case Management Order no later than February 19, 2009. The Court notes that, although Petitioners do not oppose this motion, they have filed a response arguing that Respondents' disclosures under the Case Management Order are narrower than the discovery ordered to be produced by the Court's February 12, 2009 Discovery Order. The Court shall address, by separate order, Respondents' discovery obligations arising under the February 12, 2009 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 23, 2009. (lcckk1)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 486 REPLY re #475 to Petitioners' Response to Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time filed by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Walthall, Timothy) Modified on 2/23/2009 (nmw, ).
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to Petitioners' Response to Respondents' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time filed by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Walthall, Timothy) Modified on 2/20/2009 (jf, ).
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Memorandum in opposition to re #475 Unopposed MOTION for Order Extending Time In Which to Complete Discovery Responses filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #485 Reply to Document was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with corrected heading. (jf, )
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE of Compliance Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE of Classified Filings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Henry, Terry)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE of Status Report in Response to Order of February 12, 2009 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Walthall, Timothy)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Unopposed MOTION for Order Extending Time In Which to Complete Discovery Responses by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walthall, Timothy)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER. Counsel shall comply fully with the attached Order, which has been redacted for publication on the public docket. Counsel are separately receiving the classified version of this Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 12, 2009. (lcckk1)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY AUTHORIZATION by KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI re #383 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Cynamon)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM IDENTIFYING DOCUMENTS NOT DECLASSIFIED by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #436 MOTION to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes (MacLean, Matthew)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Closed hearing held on 2/11/2009. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (kc)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 471 NOTICE of Filing Declaration by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(White, David)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 470 NOTICE Pertaining to the Production of Exculpatory Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 483 SUPPLEMENT TO PROTECTED FACTUAL RETURN regarding ISN 552 by Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, ET Al. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 469 REPLY to opposition to motion re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY. (Bead, Jeanette)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Declassified Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) advising that counsel should also be prepared to discuss Petitioners' Motion for Additional Discovery at the Status Hearing set for February 11, 2009, in addition to the other issues noted in the Court's February 4, 2009 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 9, 2009.(lcckk1)
February 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Memorandum in opposition to re #466 MOTION for Order For Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Justifications for Redactions from Declassified Returns filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail chain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 481 AMENDED FACTUAL RETURN regarding ISN 551 by Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, ET Al. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 480 AMENDED FACTUAL RETURN regarding ISN 213 by Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, ET Al. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 479 AMENDED FACTUAL RETURN regarding ISN 232 by Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, ET Al. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb).
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 478 AMENDED FACTUAL RETURN regarding ISN 552 by Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, ET Al. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jeb, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MOTION for Order For Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Justifications for Redactions from Declassified Returns by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Submission by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE of Filing Declarations under seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 462 NOTICE of Filing Declassified Returns by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Response to Petitioners' Request for Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO re #458 Notice (Other) (White, David)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court shall hold a closed session Status Hearing in this case on February 11, 2009, at 1:30 P.M., in Courtroom 28A. The Government should be prepared to discuss in very specific detail whether and to what extent it has violated any deadlines set by the Court, including those set forth in the Scheduling Order and any Orders related to extensions of time, and to describe the agency resources the Government has marshaled in support of its efforts to comply with the Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 4, 2009. (lcckk1)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR CONFERENCE by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail from Matthew MacLean, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail from Matthew MacLean)(MacLean, Matthew)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 457 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Memorandum by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #436 MOTION to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes (MacLean, Matthew)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 456 NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (Henry, Terry)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE Pertaining to the Production of Exculpatory Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (White, David)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting Respondents' #451 Motion for an Extension of Time. Respondents shall file their Opposition to Petitioners' Motion for More Complete Declassified Factual Returns no later than February 6, 2009, which shall include as attachments the copies of the declassified factual returns and an explanation for why Respondents have not declassified any items identified in Petitioners' Motion. Beginning on this day and continuing until February 6, 2009, Respondents shall produce declassified portions of the returns on a rolling basis to Petitioners as they become available. Respondents' failure to include the declassified returns and relevant attachments as exhibits, or provide a justification for each item that was identified in Petitioners' Motion that Respondents have determined not to declassify, may result in sanctions, including possible exclusion of allegations or documents going forward. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Memorandum in opposition to re #451 MOTION for Order for extension of time to file declassified factual return filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail of Jan. 28, 2009, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail of Sep. 22, 2008, #3 Exhibit C - E-mail of Jan. 22, 2009, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MOTION for Order for extension of time to file declassified factual return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (O'Donnell, Sean)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) STRIKING Respondents' #447 Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Respondents' #448 Motion for Amendment or Clarification of the Court's Scheduling Order. The Court's January 7, 2009 Scheduling Order required Respondents to file an Opposition no later than January 23, 2009, that "include[s] the declassified return and relevant attachments as an exhibit, and [ ] provide[s] a justification for each item that was identified in Petitioners' Motion that Respondents have determined not to declassify." Respondents' Opposition fails to comply with the Court's Scheduling Order and is, therefore, non-responsive. Further, Respondents' Motion for Clarification is really an improperly denominated request for an extension. The Court's January 7, 2009 Scheduling Order made clear that a motion for an extension must be accompanied by "demonstrable extraordinary circumstances" that are unique to this case, which Respondents' Motion for Clarification fails to provide. Accordingly, the Court shall strike Respondents' Opposition and deny without prejudice Respondents' Motion because neither complies with the directives contained in the Court's January 7, 2009 Scheduling Order. The Court shall also require Respondents to (again) file an Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes that "include[s] the declassified return and relevant attachments as an exhibit, and [ ] provide[s] a justification for each item that was identified in Petitioners Motion that Respondents have determined not to declassify." Respondents shall file this Opposition no later than January 28, 2009. The Court advises the parties that failure to comply with its Scheduling Order in the future shall be looked upon with great disfavor and may result in the striking of pleadings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 449 NOTICE of Filing Motion for Additional Discovery by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION for Order to Amend or Clarify Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 447 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 1/26/2009.....Memorandum in opposition to re #436 MOTION to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) Modified on 1/27/2009 (nmw, ).
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Scott Michael Marconda terminated. (Marconda, Scott)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 444 NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting nunc pro tunc Respondents' #438 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to provide discovery pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) based on the extraordinary circumstances described therein and the lack of opposition by Petitioner. Accordingly, Respondents shall serve disclosures pursuant to Section 1.E.1 on or before January 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 21, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 4:00 p.m. on Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall reply to Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket # 1526, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/21/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION to Intervene by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(nmw, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 440 REPLY to opposition to motion re (150 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 226 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 40 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 378 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 92 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 134 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 425 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 55 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 105 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 828 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 42 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 87 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 14 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 183 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 86 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 111 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 94 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 124 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 60 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 157 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 76 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 159 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 118 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 78 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 174 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 31 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 113 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 155 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 105 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 101 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 316 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 153 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 137 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 101 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 127 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 61 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 179 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 95 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 73 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 107 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 95 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 120 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 44 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 94 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 12 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 157 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 77 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 137 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 223 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 133 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 176 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 130 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 118 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 128 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 166 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 135 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 69 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 112 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 120 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 22 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 75 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 120 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 100 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 117 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 78 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 7 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 31 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 154 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 68 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 132 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 46 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 185 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 131 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 60 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB) MOTION for Order, (166 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) MOTION for Order to Designate Unclassified Returns as "Protected" Information filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 439 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH. Attorney Arlene Pianko Groner terminated. (Groner, Arlene)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Under CMO Section I.E.1 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE of Filing With CSO by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION to Produce Declassified Factual Returns or Adequate Substitutes by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burke Walthall on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH (Walthall, Timothy)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that all filings related to the November 6, 2008, Case Management Order, as amended by the Court's December 16, 2008, order ("Amended Case Management Order"), shall only be filed in the individual civil case(s) to which they apply. For example, filings related to discovery, presumptions, use of hearsay, and extensions of time to comply with the Amended Case Management Order need not be filed in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/8/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents' exculpatory disclosures/certificated are due by 1/30/2009. (dot, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Memorandum in opposition to re (1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information filed by FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, PRIVILEGE TEAM, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 433 SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties shall comply with the attached Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 7, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting Respondents' #426 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certificates. Accordingly, Respondents' exculpatory disclosures/certificates are due January 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 7, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioners' Motion to Transfer Case (docket # 550, 08-mc-442; docket # 384, 02-cv-828) and Petitioners' Motion for Status Conference (docket # 329, 02-cv-828) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART the Government's [409, 1060] Motion to Hold in Abeyance the habeas petitions of Fouad Mahmoud Al Rabiah and Fayiz Mohammed Ahmen Al Kandari (collectively, "Petitioners"), and DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Government's #407 Motion to Dismiss. A stay shall be entered as to the Petitioners' habeas petitions, to commence upon the Convening Authority's referral of charges against Petitioners to military commissions. Unless and until such charges are referred by the Convening Authority, the parties must continue to proceed fully with Petitioners' habeas cases. If and when such charges are referred to military commissions, the Government shall file a notice with the Court and shall file Status Reports every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 6, 2009. (lcckk1)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 430 STATUS REPORT in Response to Order of December 22, 2008 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners approved for transfer or release for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. The Court further ORDERS that, by Friday, February 27, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners charged with violations of the laws of war under the Military Commission Act of 2006 for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MOTION for Exception from Sequencing Regarding Factual Returns (also filed as dkt. no. 1443 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 428 STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns for December 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Because the government's Notice of Prior Disclosure of Exculpatory Evidence and Motion for Extension of Time (docket # 1431, 08-mc-442) and Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) (docket # 1432, 08-mc-442) are motions to amend the Case Management Order this Court entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, as well as case management orders entered by many of the Merits Judges, pursuant to this Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Merits Judges will address the motions in their individual cases. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the motions are DENIED in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/31/08. (lctfh1, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, January 7, 2009, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the government's Motion To Confirm Designation Of Unclassified Factual Returns As Protected (docket # 1416, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/30/08. (lctfh1)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to (100 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (84 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (123 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (103 in 1:04-cv-01137-RMC) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (165 in 1:02-cv-00299-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE A. GYURISKO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., (78 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, (136 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (108 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (105 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (106 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RUNSFELD, RICK BACCUS, WILLIAM L. CLINE granting motion for leave to file; discharging order to dismiss case as moot in 05-5118,05-5119,05-5122; dismissing cases 05-5118, 05-5119, and 05-5122 as moot in light of the district court's orders dismissing the habeas cases underlying these appeals; the district court's order filed January 31, 2005, granting petitioners' motion for access to unredacted factual returns in Civil Action Nos. 02-2199, 02-1130, and 04-1137, be vacated; the consolidation of Nos. 05-5118, 05-5119, and 05-5122, with Nos. 05-5117, et al. be terminated.(jeb, )
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than January 2, 2009, in compliance with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 22, 2008. (lcckk1)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/2/2009. (dot, )
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REPLY to opposition to motion re (1060 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 407 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order andSupplemental Amended Orders or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certification for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and to Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution of the Motion and any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/16/08. (lctfh1)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 419 NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 418 NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Barish, Daniel)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return (ISN 552) by GEORGE W. BUSH (Battaglia, John)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 416 NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH (Battaglia, John)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #412 Order, Set Hearings (MacLean, Matthew)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Memorandum in opposition to re #407 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 413 REPLY to opposition to motion re (1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boumediene Case Mgmt. Order)(Prince, Robert)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER setting hearing for December 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/2/08. (lctfh1)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) by JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
November 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, December 3, 2008, the government shall file one consolidated reply to the petitioners' oppositions to the Government's Motion For Clarification And Reconsideration Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order And Supplemental Amended Orders Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Certification For Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) And To Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution Of The Motion And Any Appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/28/2008. (lctfh1)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re (407 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO; (See Docket Entry No. #407 to view document) (td, )
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STATUS REPORT by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Hold in Abeyance by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Memorandum in opposition to re #400 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay and Cross-Motion to Strike filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - e-mail chain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Wolfe, Kristina)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER attached staying due dates pending resolution of the Government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration 1004 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 21, 2008. (lctfh2)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Ahern, Paul)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioners shall respond by Wednesday, November 26, 2008, to the government's Motion For Clarification And Reconsideration Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order And Supplemental Amended Orders Or, In the Alternative, Motion For Certification For Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) And To Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution Of The Motion And Any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/20/08. (lctfh1)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 402 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (150 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 92 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 112 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 397 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 204 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 50 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 71 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 107 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 86 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 93 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 73 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 113 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 98 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 102 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 94 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 115 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 108 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 85 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 195 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 99 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 112 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 98 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 89 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 149 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 940 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 79 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 99 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 130 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 91 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 130 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 142 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 142 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 90 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 86 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 92 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 136 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 115 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 285 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 68 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 91 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 158 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 329 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 140 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 80 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 78 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 125 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 83 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 119 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 85 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) Order of November 6, 2008 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 401 NOTICE Of Filing Of Classified Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit England Declaration, #2 Exhibit Mueller Declaration, #3 Exhibit Request Letter #1, #4 Exhibit Request Letter #2, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER. The parties shall comply with the Case Management Order issued in In re Guantanamo Bay Detainee Litigation, Misc. No. 08-442 (Nov. 6, 2008), Docket No. 940 , until further Order of the Court. On or before November 26, 2008, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report, not to exceed ten pages, identifying any additional matters that were not decided in the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 14, 2008. (lcckk1)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of the Case Management Order (docket # 940, 08-mc-442), the Court denies as moot the government's motion to enter a case management order (docket # 205, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/12/08. (lctfh1)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting government's motions to amend factual returns and amending the Court's July 11, 2008, order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/7/08. (lctfh1)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 397 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/6/08. (lctfh1)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 396 STATUS REPORT of Oct.31, 2008 Regarding Filing of Factual Returns by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 395 REPLY to opposition to motion re (628 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 84 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 391 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 135 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 28 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 80 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 26 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 198 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 70 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 723 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 82 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 27 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 26 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 108 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Mason, Kathryn)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Mason on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Mason, Kathryn)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs counsel in these consolidated cases to the Court's Minute Order of October 2, 2008, which directed counsel to the Court's previous orders that require all filings, with the exception of notices of appearance, be filed in the applicable civil case and in 08-mc-442 and directed counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(c), which reads: "Each motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Further, the Court directs counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(m), which reads: "Before filing any nondispositive motion in a civil action, counsel shall discuss the anticipated motion with opposing counsel, either in person or by telephone, in a good faith effort to determine whether there is any opposition to the relief sought and, if there is opposition, to narrow the areas of disagreement.... A party shall include in its motion a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Finally, the Court cautions counsel that failure to follow the Court's orders and local rules may result in the Court denying motions and striking filings. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/28/08. (lctfh1)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE DIRECTOR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Memorandum in opposition to re #391 MOTION to Dismiss "Improper Respondents" filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail from M. MacLean to S. Marconda, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marconda, Scott)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Marconda, Scott)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Memorandum in opposition to re (384 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA) MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Executive Session Resolution of the Court, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs counsel in these consolidated cases to its order of July 2, 2008, and its minute order of July 3, 2008, which require that, with the exception of notices of appearance, all filings be filed in the applicable civil case and in 08-mc-442. For instructions on how to file in multiple cases, see http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/public-docs/files/filing_instructions.pdf. Additionally, the Court directs counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(c), which reads, "Each motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/2/08. (lctfh1)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Barish on behalf of all defendants (Barish, Daniel)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Barish on behalf of all defendants (Barish, Daniel)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STATUS REPORT Regarding the Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REPLY to opposition to motion re #373 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #376 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #369 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #370 MOTION to Amend/Correct Reply in support of Motion to Amend (Redacted for Public Filing) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Groner, Arlene)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MOTION to Transfer Case by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF FILING OF ATTORNEY AUTHORIZATIONS by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #358 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Al Kandari authorization, #2 Exhibit Al Mutairi Authorization, #3 Exhibit Al Odah Authorization, #4 Exhibit Al Rabiah Authorization, #5 Declaration of David J. Cynamon)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Memorandum in opposition to re #376 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Memorandum in opposition to re #373 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Opposition [Al Rabiah], #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Memorandum in opposition to re #370 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Opposition [Al Rabiah], #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE regarding Court's Website. Please be advised that the Court has on its external website information regarding the Guantanamo Bay Cases. The information gives instructions for filing in these cases. The website is http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/public-docs/gitmo (jeb, )
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Memorandum in opposition to re #369 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MEMORANDUM OPINION re government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08 (lctfh1)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting (204) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (129) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01164-UNA; granting (227) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01194-UNA; granting (273) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01254-UNA; granting (41) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01937-UNA; granting (181) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02022-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02035-GK; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02046-UNA; granting (93) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02215-UNA; granting (122) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00023-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00247-UNA; granting (119) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00270-UNA; granting (152) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00280-UNA; granting (104) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00329-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00359-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00392-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00492-UNA; granting (138) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00520-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00526-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00569-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00634-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00748-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00763-UNA; granting (75) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00877-UNA; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00889-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00892-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00883-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00993-UNA; granting (56) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00998-UNA; granting (78) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00999-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00994-UNA; granting (135) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01048-UNA; granting (52) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01189-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01244-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01220-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01347-UNA; granting (101) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01353-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01429-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01458-UNA-AK; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01457-UNA; granting (87) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01487-UNA; granting (157) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01509-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01497-UNA; granting (98) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01490-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01504-UNA; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01506-UNA; granting (84) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01505-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01555-UNA; granting (106) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01592-UNA; granting (97) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01601-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01602-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01607-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01623-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01645-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01646-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01638-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01639-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01678-UNA; granting (114) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01704-UNA; granting (60) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01971-UNA; granting (72) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01983-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02010-UNA; granting (59) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02088-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02104-UNA; granting (83) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02185-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02186-UNA; granting (71) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02199-UNA; granting (89) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02249-UNA; granting (65) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02349-UNA; granting (116) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02367-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02371-UNA; granting (115) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02378-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02379-UNA; granting (37) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02381-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02384-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02398-UNA; granting (43) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02387-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02380-UNA; granting (549) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02386-UNA; granting (33) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02444-UNA; granting (58) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02385-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02479-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-00618-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01684-UNA; granting (34) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01668-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting (48) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01758-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01767-UNA; granting (30) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01759-JDB; granting (51) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01766-UNA; granting (46) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01761-UNA; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01765-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-01710-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02337-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02338-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-00987-UNA; granting (29) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01085-UNA; granting (20) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01104-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01101-UNA; granting (317) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01153-UNA; gran
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Amended Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Ahern, Paul)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 374 REPLY to opposition to motion re (317 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT GATES. (Prince, Robert)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Amended Factual Return by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Ahern, Paul)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall reply by Monday, September 15, 2008, to petitioners' oppositions to the government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/12/08. (lctfh1)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 371 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/11/08. (lctfh1)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Pursuant to transfer order of this Court, this case is administratively assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management. (jeb, )
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By September 19, 2008, petitioners Al Swidhi (ISN 578), 04-cv-1194, Al Haj (ISN 256), 04-cv-1194, Amer (ISN 564), 04-cv-1194, Al Baidhani (ISN 553), 04-cv-1194, Al Wrafie (ISN 117), 04-cv-1254, Al-Mohammed (ISN 537), 05-cv-247, Bawazir (ISN 440), 05-cv-280, and Tumani (ISN 312), 05-cv-526, shall respond to the government's Motion For Leave To File Amended Factual Return. Additionally, hereafter, in all cases in which the government moves for leave to file amended factual returns, petitioners shall respond to the government's motions within 10 days of the date of filing. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/5/08. (lctfh1)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Memorandum in opposition to re #367 MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioners shall respond by Monday, September 8, 2008, to the government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order (08-mc-0442, docket number 317). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/08. (lctfh1)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, of Aug. 20, 2008 filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER denying #335 Motion for Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/26/08. (lctfh1)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas F. Hogan: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2008 re #335 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI; Heard and Denied by the Court. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (hs)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By August 26, 2008, the government shall file a response to petitioners' request that the Court amend the Standard Protective Order to require the government to do the following: "provide to [petitioners'] counsel and the Court a version of each court filing containing classified or protected information that is suitable for filing on the public record within two weeks of the original filing date." Joint Report In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order 3 n.1 (08-mc-442, docket # 170). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/20/08. (lctfh1)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 08-5232 for #355 Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO. (td, )
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants #364 Petitioners' Motion To Reschedule Oral Argument. Accordingly, the argument previously scheduled for August 19, 2008, is canceled. Argument on Petitioners' motion is rescheduled for Tuesday, August 26, 2008, at 11:00 am in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/7/08. (lctfh1)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: The argument on Petitioners' Motion For Injunction, which was previously set for 8/19/08, is reset for 8/26/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (lctfh1)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Consent MOTION Reschedule Hearing re #360 Order by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (MacLean, Matthew)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 363 RESPONSE re (356 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 205 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order on Procedural Framework Issues filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Flentje, August)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REPLY ADDRESSING PROCEDURAL FRAMEWORK ISSUES filed by BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, ATAG ALI ABDOH, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, SHAKER AAMER, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SHAKER AAMER, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABDULZAHER, BISHER AL-RAWI, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, AHMED "DOE", SHAKER AAMER, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, FARID AHMED, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, BANDAR AL JAABIR, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, SAIF ULLAH, SHARAF AL SANANI, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, ADEL LNU, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, SAD AL MATERI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ADEL AL TUNISI, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDULLA, ADEL, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (MacLean, Matthew)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER scheduling argument on Petitioners' Motion For Injunction in 02-CV-0828 (docket # 335) for Tuesday, August 19, 2008, at 11:00 am in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/1/08. (lctfh1)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 359 REPLY to opposition to motion re #346 MOTION to Substitute Parties filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER lifting stays, vacating dismissals, entering protective order, requiring authorizations, and holding motions in abeyance. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/29/08. (lctfh1)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (17 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 107 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 355 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 44 in 1:05-cv-02112-RBW, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 17 in 1:05-cv-01590-JDB, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) Notice of Appeal, (ks)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, KHIALI-GUL, MOHAMEDOU OULD SLAHI, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, MOHAMEDOU OULD SLAHI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABDULZAHER, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, ABDUL HADI OMER HAMOUD FARAJ, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABRAHIM OTHMAN ABRAHIM EDRIES, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, ABDULKADR ABDULKHALIK DAD, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, JABBAROW OYBEK JAMOLIVICH, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, ALI THABID, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ALI LNU, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, MSTAFA AL SHAMILI, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, QARI SAAD IQBAL, MOHAMMAD SHARIEF, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, QARI HAMDULLAH, MOHAMMAD N
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MOTION for Order Regarding Procedural Framework Issues by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (52 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 52 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 52 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH) Order by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, J. HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Subar, Judry)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Memorandum in opposition to re (346 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) MOTION to Substitute Parties filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ERRATA -- Corrections To Exhibts To Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 -- Corrected)(Warden, Andrew)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STATUS REPORT Submitted Jointly By Petitioners and Respondents In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioners' Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Respondents Exhibits)(Warden, Andrew)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 351 STATUS REPORT And Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 -- Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 -- Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 -- Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 -- Part 5, #6 Exhibit 1 -- Part 6, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3)(Warden, Andrew)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO SCHEDULING ORDER OF JULY 11, 2008 by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). On July 10, 2008, the parties filed an #345 Agreed Motion to Dismiss As to the following Petitioners, each of whom has been transferred to the custody of the State of Kuwait, as well as their next friends: (1) Omar Rajab Amin and his next friend, Mohammad R. M. R. Ameen; (2) Nasser Nijer Naser Al Mutairi and his next friend, Nayef N.N.B.J. Al Mutairi; (3) Abdullah Kamal Abdullah Kamal Al Kandari and his next friend, Mansour K.A. Kamel; (4) Abdulaziz Sayer Owain Al Shammari and his next friend, Sayer O.Z. Al Shammari; (5) Abdullah Saleh Ali Al Ajmi and his next friend, Mesfer Saleh Ali Al Ajmi; (6) Mohammed Funaitel Al Dihani and his next friend, Mubarak F.S.M. Al Daihani; (7) Adil Zamil Abdull Mohssin Al Zamil and his next friend, Walid Z.A. Al Zamel; and (8) Saad Madai Saad Hawash Al Azmi and his next friend, Hamad Madai Saad. Accordingly, after consultation with Judge Thomas F. Hogan, the #345 Agreed Motion is GRANTED and the Court hereby DISMISSES the foregoing eight (8) Petitioners and their next friends from the instant action as well as Miscellaneous Action 08-442 (TFH). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 17, 2008. (lcckk2)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 348 SCHEDULING ORDER: setting forth deadlines: Parties' Status Report due by 7/18/2008; Joint Report due 7/21/08; Simultaneous Briefing on procedural framework issues due 7/25/08, and counsel for government and petitioners to file Responses by 8/1/08; Factual Returns and Motions to Amend Factual Returns due 8/29/08. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/11/08. (jeb, )
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER; Regarding Representative Counsel's request for 30 days advance notice,Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 07/10/08. (hs)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION to Substitute Parties by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Detainees Transferred to Kuwait by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 344 REPLY to opposition to motion re #335 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI. (MacLean, Matthew)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE OF FILING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI re #335 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction (MacLean, Matthew)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE Regarding Status Conference by MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Subar, Judry)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 STATUS REPORT STATEMENT REGARDING HEARING OF JULY 8, 2008 by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Memorandum in opposition to re #335 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioners' CMRC Writ)(Haas, Alexander)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Katerberg, Robert)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/7/08. (lctfh1)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that, in the interest of convenience and judicial economy, notices of appearance need not be refiled under this Miscellaneous Case Number (08-MC-4422) if such a notice already has been filed in the docket for the corresponding Civil Action Number. New notices of appearance likewise should be filed exclusively in the docket for the applicable Civil Action Number. Accordingly, no notices of appearance need be filed in the docket for this Miscellaneous Case Number. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION: Hearing set for July 8, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom. (ds)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER. Local Civil Rule 40.6(a) permits the judges of this Court to "transfer directly all or part of any case on the judge's docket to any consenting judge." L. Civ. R. 40.6(a). Furthermore, on July 1, 2008, the United States District Court for the District of Columbia adopted a Resolution of the Executive Session, in which the judges agreed to, among other things, transfer cases filed by the detainees held at Guantanamo Bay to Senior Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management, while retaining the cases for all other purposes. In the interest of facilitating Judge Hogan's case-coordination process, the Court will transfer this case to Judge Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 2, 2008. (lcckk1)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit CMCR Order on Mandamus Petition, #4 Declaration of David Cynamon, #5 Declaration of Matthew MacLean)(MacLean, Matthew)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE REQUIRED BY LCvR 7(m) by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI re #333 Notice (Other) (MacLean, Matthew)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Court has reviewed Petitioners' Notice of Filing of Emergency Motion for Injunction. The Court notes that the Certificate of Service fails to include a representation, as required by LCvR 7(m), that counsel discussed this motion with opposing counsel "in a good faith effort to determine whether there is any opposition to the relief sought and, if there is opposition, to narrow the areas of disagreement," and to apprise the Court "as to whether the motion is opposed." Although the Court shall not strike the Motion at this time, the Court shall require Petitioners' counsel to file an amended Certificate of Service on or before July 3, 2008, indicating the results of this consultation. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 2, 2008. (lcckk1, )
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless). The Government shall file a Response to Petitioners' #335 Emergency Motion for Injunction no later than close of business on July 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 2, 2008. (lcckk1)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/8/2008 (clv, )
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE OF FILING WITH CSO by FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI (MacLean, Matthew)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REPLY to opposition to motion re #329 MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (MacLean, Matthew)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #207 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, it is ORDERED, on the court's own motion that in light of the Supreme Court's opinion in Boumediene v. Bush, No. 06-1195, et al. (June 12, 2008), the court's judgment filed 2/20/07 in the above captioned consolidated cases be vacated; further ordered and adjudged that these cases be remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Court's opinion in Boumediene v. Bush. (USCA No. 05-5064)(kb, ) (kb, )
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Memorandum in opposition to re #329 MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Warden, Andrew)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference by KHALED A.F. AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacLean, Matthew)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Osman A. Handoo by MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handoo, Osman)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents Motion for Designation of Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby as Protected Information Under the Protective Orders. The Court notes that no Petitioner has opposed this Motion and that several Petitioners have filed Notices of Non-Opposition. Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby, and any other documents repeating or incorporating its contents or otherwise establishing its protected nature, shall be accorded the status of protected information and subject to the applicable provisions of the protective orders entered in the Guantanamo Bay detainee litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 4/2/08. (jeb)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE OF FILING of Motion for designation of Paragraph 9 of the 2/8/08 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby (filed 2/13/08) as protected information under the protective orders by GEORGE W. BUSH,et al. (jeb, )
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, et al. (jeb, )
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE OF RECALL OF MANDATE by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order recalling mandate)(MacLean, Matthew)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER of USCA filed 7/26/07 recalling mandate as to (183 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 101 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 124 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 180 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 215 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 120 in 1:04-cv-01137-RMC, 200 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 117 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 173 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 227 in 1:02-cv-00299-CKK) USCA Mandate (324 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) (jeb, ) (jeb, ). Modified on 6/25/2008 (jeb, ).
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) vacating cases and dismissing for lack of jurisdiction as to #222 Notice of Appeal filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, #207 Notice of Appeal filed by FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, #221 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO, #229 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. USCA #'s 05-5064; 05-5095; 05-5096; and 05-5117. (cp, )(MANDATE RECALLED PURSUANT TO USCA ORDER dated 7/26/07)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE OF ACTIVITY by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Recall Mandates)(MacLean, Matthew)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 322 REPLY to opposition to motion re #320 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Memorandum in opposition to re #320 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Abdah Motion to Withold Mandate#2 Exhibit B - Al Odah Motion to Withhold Mandate#3 Exhibit C - Application to Suspend Denial of Cert#4 Exhibit D - Application of Extension of Time to Move for Rehearing)(MacLean, Matthew)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker#2 Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees#3 Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees#4 Exhibit D-USCA Judgment -Kiyemba#5 Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha#6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthews C. Waxman#7 Text of Proposed Order)(jeb)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of Respondents GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, et al. (jeb, )
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Preeya M. Noronha terminated. (jeb, )
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REPLY to opposition to motion re #313 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2006 Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Warden, Andrew)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of Filing of Military Commissions Act of 2006 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Military Commissions Act of 2006)(Henry, Terry)
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #286 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 9/25/2006. (lckay1, )
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ERRATA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO #313 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2006 Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, GEORGE W. BUSH,, DONALD H. RUMSFELD,, TERRY CARRICO,, RICHARD B. MYERS,, RICK BACCUS,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS) granting Shearman & Sterling LLP's #312 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs-Petitioners. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 16, 2006. (lcckk1)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Magistrate Judge's September 25, 2006 Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw Appearance)(Koslowe, Neil)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 311 AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06.
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioners by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Warden, Andrew)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 309 REPLY to Defendants-Respondents' Supplemental Memorandum Corrrecting July 7, 2006 Motion filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Neil H. Koslowe)(Koslowe, Neil)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 308 RESPONSE to Order of Court directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications) (jeb, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt) (jeb, ) (jeb, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE in Response to Order of August 7, 2006 by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #302 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, (MacLean, Matthew)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #293 MOTION for Sanctions and Interim Deposit with Court of Confiscated Attorney-Client Materials filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH; #295 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 9, 2006. (lcckk1)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 304 REPLY to opposition to motion re #293 MOTION for Sanctions and Interim Deposit with Court of Confiscated Attorney-Client Materials (approved for public filing by CSO) filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Olson, Lisa)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER directing counsel for petitioners to file a notice by 8/15/06 identifying any petitioner as to whom counsel lacks a good-faith belief that any attorney-client communications occurred prior to 6/18/06; directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel (either through written correspondence or in-person conversation) prior to 6/18/06. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/06. (jeb)
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Osman Ahmad Handoo on behalf of MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Handoo, Osman)
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. MacLean on behalf of MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (MacLean, Matthew)
August 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cynamon on behalf of MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Cynamon, David)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Memorandum in opposition to re #293 MOTION for Sanctions and Interim Deposit with Court of Confiscated Attorney-Client Materials (also filed as dkt. no. 297) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY to opposition to motion re #295 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM re #293 MOTION for Sanctions and Interim Deposit with Court of Confiscated Attorney-Client Materials filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MOTION for Sanctions and Interim Deposit with Court of Confiscated Attorney-Client Materials by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER sealing motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/14/2006. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00828-CKK,1:04-cv-01194-HHK,1:05-cv-01490,1:05-cv-00247-HHK,1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 1:05-cv-01254-UNA,1:05-cv-01353-RMC,1:05-cv-01429-RMU,1:05-cv-01504-RMC,1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 1:05-cv-01506-RMC,1:05-cv-01592-RCL,1:05-cv-01806-CKK,1:05-cv-02087-RMC(lckay1, )
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting settlement conference regarding Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials. The mediation will take place in chambers on Wednesday, July 19, 2006 at 2:30 p.m. Certain designated representatives will attend on behalf of Habeas Petitioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/17/2006. (lckay1, )
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE regarding steps being taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (jeb, )
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and MOTION for expedited briefing by Respondents UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris#2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt#3 Text of Proposed Order for Briefing#4 Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)(jeb, )
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Compel Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order (refiled as per clerk's instructions) filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)(SEALED)
April 21, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 290 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the signature of an attorney who is a member of the bar of this court. (nmw, )
April 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 MOTION to Compel Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil) Modified on 4/21/2006 (nmw, )(SEALED).
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE of Withdrawl of Filing by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #288 Notice (Other) (Raut, Anant)
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Filing by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Raut, Anant)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Memorandum in opposition to re #286 Respondents' Opposition To Petitioners' Motion To Compel Privilege Team Compliance With Amended Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Compel Privilege Team Compliance with the Amended Protective Order by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)(SEALED)
March 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Error in Case Caption by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #283 Notice (Other) (Koslowe, Neil)
March 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER assigning special litigation team. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/2/2006. (lckay1, )
February 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Filing by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Notice of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
January 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jeb, )
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #279 production of writings and for reconsideration filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, Edward)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION to Produce Writings Relied upon by Dr. X and for Reconsideration (submitted to and cleared by the CSO) by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Filing of Declarations (submitted to and cleared by the CSO) by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #275 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Koslowe, Neil)
November 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on November 8, 2005 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (lc, )
November 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/10/05 before Judge Colleen Kollar_Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (SEALED) (td, )
November 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying Petitioner's Oral Motion for Immediate Medical Evacuation. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 10, 2005. (lcckk1)
November 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Filing of Affidavits and Medical Records (submitted to and cleared by the CSO) by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Koslowe, Neil)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2005. (lcckk1)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER denying without prejudice in part and rendering moot in part #260 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 8, 2005. (lcckk1)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Koslowe, Neil)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 269 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the signature of a member of the bar of this Court. (nmw, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/31/05 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/12/05 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/13/05 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/30/05 before Judge Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #264 Memorandum in Opposition, to Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt. no. 260) [also filed as dkt. no. 270] filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE of Transfer and Supplemental Response to Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt. no. 260) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Henry, Terry)
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Koslowe, Neil) Modified on 11/7/2005 (nmw, ).
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05.
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ERRATA attaching correct Exhibit 5 to Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Koslowe, Neil)
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPLY to opposition to motion re #260 Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #260 preliminary injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I)(White, Edward)
October 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE of Filing Unsealed Medical Records Exhibits H & I by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #260 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Compel Defendants-Respondents to Provide Access to Medical Records, Timely Reports, and Direct Communications with Family Members Regarding Two Force-Fed Plaintiffs-Petitioners who are in Danger of Dying, and Re (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H (Public)#2 Exhibit I (Public))(Koslowe, Neil)
October 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ERRATA for [Docket Entry 260] Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Compel Defendants-Respondents to Provide Access to Medical Records, Timely Reports, and Direct Communications with Family Members Regarding Two Force-Fed Plaintiffs-Petitioners who are in Danger of Dying, and Request for Expedited Consideration by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 26, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Paperless): Pursuant to a telephone conference call between Petitioners' counsel and Respondents' counsel, the following briefing schedule was established: Respondents' Opposition to #260 Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due to the Court by October 28, 2005; any Reply by Petitioners is due to the Court by October 31, 2005; Petitioners' counsel will notify the Court via telephone before COB October 31, 2005 if they will not file a Reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 26, 2005. (lcckk1)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Koslowe, Neil)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Compel Defendants-Respondents to Provide Access to Medical Records, Timely Reports, and Direct Communications with Family Members Regarding Two Force-Fed Plaintiffs-Petitioners who are in Danger of Dying, and Request for Expedited Consideration by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Errata D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal#9 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal#10 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE of Submission to Court Security Officer of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Trip to GTMO Oct 9-12 and Reservation of Right to Seek Reconsideration or Other Emergency Relief from Court by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas Wilner)(Koslowe, Neil)
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Withdraw his attorney of record by ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI. (td, )
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE Addendum to Notice by Plaintiffs-Petitioners of Trip to Guantanamo October 9-12, 2005, and Reservation of Right to Seek Reconsideration or other Emergency Relief From the Court by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Koslowe, Neil)
October 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION TO COURT SECURITY OFFICER OF NOTICE BY PLAINTIFFS-PETITIONERS OF TRIP TO GUANTANAMO OCTOBER 9-12, 2005, AND RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION OR OTHER EMERGENCY RELIEF FROM THE COURT by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #254 Order (Attachments: #1)(Koslowe, Neil)
September 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 30, 2005. (lcckk1)
September 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #248 Motion to Unseal, denying #249 Petitioners' Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 30, 2005. (lcckk1)
September 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE to #248 Petitioners' Motion to Unseal Transcript filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry) Modified on 9/26/2005 (nmw, ).
September 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 251 REPLY to opposition to motion re #249 Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Hearing filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
September 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #249 for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Hearing filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Hearing for Judicial Supervision and Family Communications Regarding Force-Feeding of Kuwaiti Detainees by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: The Court informed the parties today in a teleconference that the Government shall file its response to Petitioners' motion for temporary restraining order on ECF by 5pm on September 22, 2005, and shall provide the Court with a courtesy copy of the response by 6pm on that same day. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 21, 2005. (lcckk1)
September 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION to Unseal Document 246 Transcript by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
September 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE OF FILING WITH COURT SECURITY OFFICER RENEWED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND EMERGENCY HEARING by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re 246 Transcript (Koslowe, Neil)
September 14, 2005 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. 244 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/13/05 before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Court Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins. (SEALED) (td, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SUPPLEMENT to Petitioner's Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance with Exhibits H-I by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH #243 (jf, )
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ENTERED IN ERROR.....APPLICATION for Supplement to Petitioners' Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance with Exhibits H-I attached by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil) Modified on 9/14/2005 (nmw, ).
September 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 243 APPLICATION for Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Filing of Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #240 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order TO COMPEL GOVERNMENT TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR COUNSEL VISIT TO GUANTANAMO BAY DETENTION FACILITY SEPTEMBER 12-16, 2005 with Exhibits A-E and Proposed Order attached (Attachments: #1 Description of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
September 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Compel Government to Approve Request for Counsel Visit to Guantanamo Bay Facility September 12-16, 2005, including Exhibits F & G by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
August 31, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a conference call with the parties on the record on August 30, 2005, to discuss whether Petitioners' proposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order could be resolved by agreement between the parties. Counsel for the Government needed to discuss certain options with its client. On August 31, 2005, at 12:00 noon, the Court held another conference call on the record with the parties to discuss the issues raised in Petitioners' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and the proposals by the Government and Petitioners as to a resolution. Pursuant to that discussion, the parties have agreed that counsel for Petitioners shall schedule a visit with at least 4 detainees, arriving September 12, 2005, interviewing on September 13-14, and possibly September 15, and then departing on September 16, 2005. Counsel for the Government has indicated that it understands from its client that a visit would also be possible this coming weekend, September 3-5, 2005, and shall confirm this, with the understanding that an additional visit would allow Petitioners' counsel to meet with additional detainees. Counsel for Petitioners shall determine whether an additional visit this weekend would be feasible, and the parties shall communicate with each other about scheduling such a visit. In addition, counsel for Petitioners shall provide the Government with a prioritized list of detainees they propose to interview, and the parties shall negotiate in good faith over the number of interviews that can be scheduled during Petitioners' counsel's visit(s). If the parties are unable to reach a resolution, the Government shall file its response to Petitioners' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by 5pm on Tuesday, September 6, 2005. The parties shall inform the Court if they reach an agreement that makes such a response unnecessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2005. (lcckk1)
August 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order TO COMPEL GOVERNMENT TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR COUNSEL VISIT TO GUANTANAMO BAY DETENTION FACILITY SEPTEMBER 12-16, 2005 with Exhibits A-E and Proposed Order attached by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
August 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE to #141 Amended Protective Order (Entry 141) filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil) Modified on 8/3/2005 (nmw, ).
August 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : Telephone Conference held on 8/2/2005. Telephone Conference set for 8/5/2005 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Edward Hawkins.) Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(dot, )
May 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REPLY to opposition to motion re #233 for Writ of Injunction, Submitted to and Cleared by the CSO as per docket entry no. 237 filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koslowe, Neil)
May 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Filing Reply by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH re #236 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Description of Document to be Filed with Notice of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
May 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #233 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #233 MOTION for Writ of Injunction (submitted to and cleared by the CSO as per docket entry #232) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
April 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER finding as moot #43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and noting that #177 Motion for Discovery, 178 Motion for Preservation Order, and #185 Motion to Dismiss were stayed under Judge Green's Feb. 3, 2005 Certification and Stay Order #196 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 25, 2005. (lcckk1)
April 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Writ of Injunction (submitted to and cleared by the CSO as per docket entry #232) by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koslowe, Neil)
April 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Filing (Motion for Writ of Injunction) by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Description of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: ORDERED that #47 Motion for Case Management Conference is MOOT and shall be terminated, #64 Motion to Amend/Correct is GRANTED as unopposed, #200 Motion for Hearing is MOOT and shall be terminated, #225 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 19, 2005. (lcckk1)
April 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REPLY to opposition to motion re #214 for a Preliminary Injunction, Provisional Motion to Modify Stay Pending Appeals, and Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Koslowe, Neil)
April 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Filing of Reply to Opposition Motion for PI, Modify Stay and Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Description of Document filed with Notice of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
April 4, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5096 for #229 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, GEORGE W. BUSH,, DONALD H. RUMSFELD,, TERRY CARRICO,, RICHARD B. MYERS,, RICK BACCUS,. (lc, )
April 4, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5095 for #222 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by KHALED A.F. AL ODAH,, OMAR RAJAB AMIN,, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN,, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI,, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI,, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI,, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL,, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI,, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI,, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI,, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI,, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI,, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI,, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI,, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI,, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH,, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH,, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL,, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL,, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH,, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI,, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI,, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI,, HAMAD MADAI SAAD,. (lc, )
April 4, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5117 for #221 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, GEORGE W. BUSH,, DONALD H. RUMSFELD,, TERRY CARRICO,, RICHARD B. MYERS,, RICK BACCUS,. (jf, )
April 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #214 Respondents Opposition to Plaintiffs-Petitioners Motion For A Preliminary Injunction and Provisional Motion To Modify Stay Pending Appeals And Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplement to) submitted to and cleared by the CSO as per docket entry #226 by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Koslowe, Neil)
April 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Regarding Defendants-Respondents' Denial of Koran With Commentary to Plaintiffs-Petitioners by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH (Attachments: #1 Summary of Filing)(Koslowe, Neil)
March 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs-Petitioners Motion For A Preliminary Injunction And Provisional Motion To Modify Stay Pending Appeal, and Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
March 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #222 Notice of Appeal,,, (lc, )
March 30, 2005<