VALORE et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al Featured Case

Cases arising out of the October 23, 1983, bombing of the United States Marine barracks in Beirut Lebanon, where a suicide bomber murdered 241 American military servicemen.

Plaintiff: TERANCE J. VALORE, JUANITA R. GOLDFARB, MARY V. HERNANDEZ, ROBERT MUFFLER, JR., JUTTA YARBER, RONALD L. TISHMACK, CELIA WALKER, DOROTHY C. WINT, PEDRO ALVARADO, JR., ANDRES ALVARADO TULL, ANGEL ALVARADO, GERALDO ALVARADO, GRISSELLE ALVARADO, LUIS ALVARADO, LUISA ALVARADO, MARIA ALVARADO, MARTA ALVARADO, MINERVA ALVARADO, YOLANDA ALVARADO, ZORAIDA ALVARADO, DENNIS JACK ANDERSON, FLOYD CARPENTER, MICHAEL HARRIS, BENNIE HARRIS, ROSE HARRIS, DONALD R. PONTILLO, DEBORAH TRUE, DOUGLAS PONTILLO, LEONORA PONTILLO, JOHN E. SELBE, ELOISE F. SELBE, BELINDA SKARKA, DON SELBE, JAMES SELBE, WILLY G. THOMPSON, ALLISON THOMPSON, IFALINE THOMPSON, CHERYL BASS, JOHNNY THOMPSON, WANDA FORD, ORLANDO MICHAEL VALORE, SR., ORLANDO M. VALORE, JR., JANICE VALORE, MARCY LYNN PARSON, FLOYD MARTIN CARPENTER, TIMOTHY BROOKS, EDWARD J. BROOKS, PATRICIA A. BROOKS and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN and IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2003cv01959
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Filing 70 Revised Order for Payment of Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/2/2010. (lcrcl6, )
July 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 7/30/2010. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 63 MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/16/2010. (lcrcl6, )
June 14, 2010 Filing 68 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 66 Order filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration as to Joye E. Frost)(dr)
June 10, 2010 Filing 67 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order, 64 Status Report Order filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Fay, Thomas)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER FOR RECOMMENDATION CONCERNING PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/2010. (lcrcl6, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavits Valore, # 2 Exhibit Affidavits Arnold, # 3 Exhibit Affidavits Bonk, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Fay, Thomas)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Vacating 64 Status Report Order. With the subsequent filing of 65 Motion for Final Judgment and attached affidavits concerning plaintiffs eligibility under 28 U.S.C. § 1605A(c), the Court has been apprised of plaintiffs attempts to provide evidence of such eligibility.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/14/2010. (lcrcl6, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 5/17/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/12/2010. (lcrcl6, )
May 4, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Order Directing Payment of Special Master Balaran by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Donahue, Patrick)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/15/2010. (lcrcl6, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/31/2010. (lcrcl6, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/31/2010. (lcrcl6, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/31/2010. (lcrcl6, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Patrick Lyell Clawson, Ph.D. by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Drennan, Joseph)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/30/10. (lcrcl6, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 56 Second Order Appointing Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/29/2010. (lcrcl6, )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/18/10. (lcrcl6, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fay, Thomas)
March 15, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 3/15/2010. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith.) (rje)
March 12, 2010 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT re 49 Order to File Affidavut(Corrected Entry) by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
March 10, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/15/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
March 7, 2010 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT re 49 Order To File Affidavit by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Fay, Thomas)
February 23, 2010 Filing 51 Supplemental REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 3 Counts XXV-XXVIII, the Estate of James Yarber Signed by Special Master Alan L. Balaran on February 23, 2010. (BALARAN, ALAN)
February 19, 2010 Filing 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Alan L. Balaran re 27 PEDRO ALVARADO, JR. Counts XXXIII - XXXVIISigned by Special Master Alan L. Balaran on 02/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paige Economic Report) (BALARAN, ALAN)
February 17, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 2/17/2010. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (rje)
February 4, 2010 Filing 49 Order Regarding Appointment of Special Masters. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/4/10. (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Plan Governing Appointed Special Masters) (lcrcl6, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 2/4/2010Status Memorandum for Terrance J. Valore, et al, v. The Islamic Republic of Iran respectfully submitted by Dan Gaskill, Attorney for Plaintiffs(Fay, Thomas)
February 4, 2010 NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 2/17/2010 05:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (lin, )
February 2, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/11/2010. (hs)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/1/10. (lcrcl6, )
December 18, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/18/2009. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim.) (rje)
December 15, 2009 Filing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Paul G. Griffin, dated 12/15/2009, for Survivor Jack Anderson, pursuant to Counts XLVIII-LII.(Fay, Thomas)
December 11, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/18/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
December 2, 2009 Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Alan L. Balaran regarding Counts XXV-XXVIII (Yarber) dated December 2, 2009(BALARAN, ALAN)
November 30, 2009 Filing 44 RESPONSE re (21 in 1:06-cv-00750-RCL, 17 in 1:07-cv-01302-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01807-RCL, 3 in 1:08-cv-00520-RCL, 38 in 1:06-cv-00596-RCL, 10 in 1:08-cv-00531-RCL, 35 in 1:02-cv-01811-RCL, 35 in 1:06-cv-00473-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01273-RCL, 9 in 1:08-cv-01615-RCL, 6 in 1:08-cv-01814-RCL, 15 in 1:06-cv-00690-RCL, 15 in 1:06-cv-00516-RCL, 27 in 1:06-cv-01116-RCL) Memorandum & Opinion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (znmw, )
November 17, 2009 Filing 43 Report and Recommendation of Special Master Alan L. Balaran, dated November 17, 2009, Counts LIII-LVII regarding Willie George Thompson
November 17, 2009 Filing 42 Supplemental Report and Recommendation of Special Master Alan L. Balaran, dated November 17, 2009, pursuant to Counts XIII-XVI regarding John Jay Tishmack
October 14, 2009 Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Resubmitting Report for Special Master Alan Balaran, dated October 9, 2009, pursuant to Counts IX-XII of Decedent John Frederick Muffler with attachment of Economic Report from Dr. Jerome Paige. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Econ Report for Muffler)(Fay, Thomas)
October 13, 2009 Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master, Alan L. Balaran, Esq., signed October 13, 2009, pursuant to Counts XIII-XVI of Decedent John Jay Tishmack with attachment of Economic Report prepared by Economist Jerome S. Paige. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix econ report for Tishmack)(Fay, Thomas)
October 13, 2009 Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Alan Balaran, Esq., dated October 9, 2009, pursuant to Counts IX-XII of Survivor John Frederick Muffler. (Fay, Thomas)
October 13, 2009 Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Alan L. Balaran, signed October 12, 2009, pursuant to Counts XXXVIII-XLII for Survivor Michael Barton Harris. (Fay, Thomas)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 435 MOTION Authorize Payment To Special Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS; denying 30 MOTION for Reconsideration of Judgment by ESTELLE CARROLL, HARRY BEER, ANNA BEER, PHYLLIS MAISEL;denying MOTION 31 for Hearing on Issues Presented in Motion to Reconsider and Leave to File a 1083(c)(2) Motion Nunc Pro Tunc by ESTELLE CARROLL, HARRY BEER, ANNA BEER, PHYLLIS MAISEL; denying 32 MOTION for Reconsideration of Judgment and Leave to file motion nunc pro tunc by ALL PLAINTIFFS; denying MOTION 33 for Hearing on Issues Presented in Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Leave to File 1083(c)(2) Motion Nunc Pro Tunc by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/30/2009. (lcrcl6, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/30/2009. (lcrcl6, )
May 12, 2009 Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master, Paul G. Griffin, Esq. Report, signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts XXI - XXIV, regarding Survivor Walter Emerson Wint, Jr.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master, Paul G. Griffin Report, signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts XVII - XX, regarding Survivor Leonard Warren Walker.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master, Paul G. Griffin, Esq. report, signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts XLVIII - LII, regarding Survivor John Selbe.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master, Paul G. Griffin, Esq. Report, signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts XLIII - XLVII, regarding Survivor Donald Pontillo. (Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master, Paul G. Griffin, Esq. Report, signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts LXVII - LXXI, regarding Survivor Timothy Brooks.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Special Master Paul G Griffin, Esq., report, signed April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts V to VII, for Survivor Matilde Hernandez, Jr.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Paul G. Griffin, Esq., signed on April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts I-IV, for Survivor David L. Battle.(Fay, Thomas)
May 12, 2009 Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Special Master Paul G. Griffin, Esq., signed April 24, 2009, pursuant to Counts LVIII-LXII for Terance J. Valore.(Fay, Thomas)
February 12, 2009 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, MARY V. HERNANDEZ, ROBERT MUFFLER, JR, JUTTA YARBER, RONALD L. TISHMACK, CELIA WALKER, DOROTHY C. WINT, PEDRO ALVARADO, JR, ANDRES ALVARADO TULL, ANGEL ALVARADO, GERALDO ALVARADO, GRISSELLE ALVARADO, LUIS ALVARADO, LUISA ALVARADO, MARIA ALVARADO, MARTA ALVARADO, MINERVA ALVARADO, YOLANDA ALVARADO, ZORAIDA ALVARADO, DENNIS JACK ANDERSON, FLOYD CARPENTER, MICHAEL HARRIS, BENNIE HARRIS, ROSE HARRIS, DONALD R. PONTILLO, DEBORAH TRUE, DOUGLAS PONTILLO, LEONORA PONTILLO, JOHN E. SELBE, ELOISE F. SELBE, BELINDA SKARKA, DON SELBE, JAMES SELBE, TERANCE J. VALORE, WILLY G. THOMPSON, ALLISON THOMPSON, IFALINE THOMPSON, CHERYL BASS, JOHNNY THOMPSON, WANDA FORD, ORLANDO MICHAEL VALORE, SR, ORLANDO M. VALORE, JR, JANICE VALORE, MARCY LYNN PARSON, JUANITA R. GOLDFARB, TIMOTHY BROOKS, EDWARD J. BROOKS, PATRICIA A. BROOKS.(nmw, )
January 30, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 1/30/2009. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
December 15, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/15/2008. Status Conference set for 1/30/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
December 8, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/15/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
September 11, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 9/11/2008. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
August 13, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 8/13/2008. Status Conference set for 9/11/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
July 8, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 7/8/2008. Status Conference set for 8/13/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
May 21, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/8/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
April 4, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 4/4/2008. Status Conference set for 5/21/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones.) (rje)
March 26, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 4/4/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
January 17, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 1/17/2008, ( Status Conference set for 3/27/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth.). (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
January 4, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/17/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
October 10, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Status Conference held on 10/10/2007. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
October 3, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/10/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, plaintiffs' Motion 19 to Amend the Court's Administrative Plan. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/30/07. (lcrcl2, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that judgment is entered on behalf of plaintiffs as to all issues of liability against the defendants Islamic Republic of Iran and the Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, and that defendants are jointly and severally liable for tortious conduct arising out of and relating to the October 23, 1983 attack on the U.S. Marine barracks in Beirut, Lebanon; and that all claims for damages for each individual plaintiff in the above-captioned matter be submitted to Special Masters appointed by this Court; and that, following receipt by this Court of the reports from the Special Masters, and in consideration of the findings and evidence presented in those proceedings, this Court will enter judgment as to each claim for compensatory damages. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/27/07. (lcrcl2, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/27/07. (lcrcl2, )
August 21, 2006 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Peter Drennan on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Drennan, Joseph)
August 21, 2006 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Appointment of Alan Balaran, Esq., Qua Special Master by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae of Alan Balaran, Esq.# 2 Text of Proposed Order in re Appointment of Alan Balaran, Esq., qua Special Master)(Drennan, Joseph)
August 14, 2006 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Administrative Plan Governing Appointed Special Masters by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Administrative PLan Governing Appointed Special Masters)(Donahue, Patrick)
August 10, 2006 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY (tg, )
August 10, 2006 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (tg, )
August 10, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Bench Trial held on 8/10/2006. The Court's Rulings will be issued via Chambers. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default on against both Defendants and Motion to take Judicial Notice; Heard and Granted. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (hs,)
August 9, 2006 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT re 15 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Both Defendants by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Donahue, Patrick)
July 7, 2006 Filing 17 MOTION Motion to Take Judicial Notice of 30 May 2003 Memorandum Opinion in Related Case by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" 30 May 2003 Memorandum Opinion in C.A. 01-2094)(Donahue, Patrick)
July 7, 2006 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Donahue on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Donahue, Patrick)
June 22, 2006 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Donahue, Patrick)
June 14, 2006 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service documents for Islamic Republic of Iran# 2 Exhibit Service documents for Iranian Ministry of Information and Security)(Donahue, Patrick)
May 26, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Status Conference held on 5/26/2006. Bench Trial set for 8/10/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Soensen.) (mon, )
May 25, 2006 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 13 MOTION for Entry of Default was entered in error as counsel used the wrong event to docket an affidavit for default. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Entry of Default by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donahue, Patrick) Modified on 5/25/2006 (tg, ).
May 19, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/26/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mon, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint, and notice of suit Executed. IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY served on 2/13/2006, answer due 3/6/2006; Attachment - filed in paper. (tg, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint, and notice of suit Executed. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN served on 2/13/2006, answer due 3/6/2006; Attachment - filed in paper. (tg, ) Modified on 4/12/2006 (tg, ).
May 16, 2005 REQUEST for the Clerk to send copies of summons and complaint, notice of suit together with translation of each into the official language of the foreign state by certified mail to the Director of Special Consular Services, Department of State, 1800 G Street, NW, Washington, DC 20522 pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1608 (a)(4). (rje,)
March 1, 2005 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Clerk of mailing two copies of the summons and complaints and a notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by register mail to the Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Khomeini Avenue, United Nations Street, Tehran, Iran, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 1608 (a)(3). (rje, )
January 7, 2005 REQUEST for the Clerk to perfect service of summons and complaint, together with translation of each into the official language of the foreign state pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1608(a)(3) and 28 U.S.C. Section 1608(b)(3)(B) to the Islamic Republic of Iran and Iranian Ministry of Information and Security by registered mail by all plaintiffs. (rje, )
January 5, 2005 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Donahue, Patrick)
January 4, 2005 SUMMONS (2) REISSUED as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (rje, )
December 16, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Reportfrom plaintiffs due by 1/5/2005. (mon, )
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that counsel for plaintiffs shall file a status report with the Court on or before January 5, 2005.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/2004. (lcrcl1, )
November 18, 2004 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick M. Donahue (Donahue, Patrick)
January 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute ORDER granting 6 Motion for Order Permitting Plaintiffs to Proceed with Services Through Diplomatic Channels. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/26/04. (lcrcl1)
January 6, 2004 Filing 6 MOTION for Order permitting plaintiffs to proceed with service through diplomatic channels by ALL PLAINTIFFS, ANGEL ALVARADO, GERALDO ALVARADO, GRISSELLE ALVARADO, LUIS ALVARADO, LUISA ALVARADO, MARIA ALVARADO, MARTA ALVARADO, MINERVA ALVARADO, PEDRO ALVARADO JR., YOLANDA ALVARADO, ZORAIDA ALVARADO, DENNIS JACK ANDERSON, CHERYL BASS, EDWARD J. BROOKS, PATRICIA A. BROOKS, TIMOTHY BROOKS, FLOYD CARPENTER, FLOYD MARTIN CARPENTER, WANDA FORD, JUANITA R. GOLDFARB, BENNIE HARRIS, MICHAEL HARRIS, ROSE HARRIS, MARY V. HERNANDEZ, ROBERT MUFFLER JR., MARCY LYNN PARSON, DONALD R. PONTILLO, DOUGLAS PONTILLO, LEONORA PONTILLO, DON SELBE, ELOISE F. SELBE, JAMES SELBE, JOHN E. SELBE, BELINDA SKARKA, ALLISON THOMPSON, IFALINE THOMPSON, JOHNNY THOMPSON, WILLY G. THOMPSON, RONALD L. TISHMACK, DEBORAH TRUE, ANDRES ALVARADO TULL, JANICE VALORE, ORLANDO M. VALORE JR., ORLANDO MICHAEL VALORE SR., TERANCE J. VALORE, CELIA WALKER, DOROTHY C. WINT, JUTTA YARBER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rje, )
October 16, 2003 Filing 5 NOTICE by plaintiffs' of listing of addresses under seal to comply with Local Rule 5.1.(e). (jf, )
September 16, 2003 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Case related to Case No. 01cv2684, 01cv2094. (mpt, )
September 16, 2003 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(mpt, )
September 16, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion Waiver of Local Rule Civil 5.1.(e) . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/16/03. (mpt, )
September 16, 2003 Filing 1 MOTION of Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1 (e) by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (mpt, )
September 16, 2003 Summons (2) Issued as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (mpt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALORE et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERANCE J. VALORE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA R. GOLDFARB
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY V. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MUFFLER, JR.
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUTTA YARBER
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD L. TISHMACK
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELIA WALKER
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY C. WINT
Represented By: Joseph Peter Drennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO ALVARADO, JR.
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRES ALVARADO TULL
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALDO ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRISSELLE ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUISA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINERVA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZORAIDA ALVARADO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS JACK ANDERSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD CARPENTER
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HARRIS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE HARRIS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE HARRIS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD R. PONTILLO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH TRUE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS PONTILLO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONORA PONTILLO
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. SELBE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELOISE F. SELBE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA SKARKA
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON SELBE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SELBE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLY G. THOMPSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON THOMPSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IFALINE THOMPSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL BASS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY THOMPSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA FORD
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO MICHAEL VALORE, SR.
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO M. VALORE, JR.
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE VALORE
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCY LYNN PARSON
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD MARTIN CARPENTER
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY BROOKS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. BROOKS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. BROOKS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Patrick M. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?