MORLEY v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

Plaintiff: JEFFERSON MORLEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2003cv02545
Filed: December 16, 2003
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/29/17. (tb)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/23/14. (tb, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Ordered that the above-captioned case be DISMISSED AS MOOT Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/9/2013. (see memorandum order) (kc )
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2011. (see order) (kc )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINAL JUDGMENT, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby, ORDERED that defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment 88 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 95 is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of the defendant, and the case is dismissed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/30/10. (see final judgment.) (kc )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORLEY v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON MORLEY
Represented By: James H. Lesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?