May 3, 2018 |
Filing
633
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot the request of the United States in its trial brief 542 to admit the statements of Itochu International, Inc. and N.I. Teijin Shoji Co., Ltd. as co-conspirators of Toyobo; and deferring a final decision on the request of the United States in its trial brief 542 to admit the statements of Second Chance. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 3, 2018. (MA)
|
April 18, 2018 |
Filing
629
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the conspiracy claim asserted under the False Claims Act in Count 3 of the United States' second amended complaint remains at issue in this case and will be decided following the bench trial currently set to begin on June 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 18, 2018. (MA)
|
April 17, 2018 |
Filing
628
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 619 the United States' motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Angela Watson-Spitler. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 17, 2018. (MA)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
607
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 533 the United States' motion in limine to exclude evidence of substantially different Zylon vests by Pacific Safety Products, Inc. All evidence relating to the PSP vests and ZIP testing is excluded from the trial. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 21, 2018. (MA)
|
February 1, 2018 |
Filing
527
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice the request of the United States to impose certain procedures for trial on Messrs. Bachner and Davis. The parties shall confer and file one joint pretrial statement on or before February 12, 201 8; the parties shall confer and file one joint proposed jury questionnaire and statement of the case on or before February 15, 2018; and should the government have concerns regarding specific matters not already addressed by this Court, it may file an additional motion in limine on or before February 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 1, 2018. (MA)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
522
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 500 the United States' motion in limine to exclude any evidence of the allegations made in Mr. Bachner's counterclaim or sanctions motion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 30, 2018. (MA)
|
January 17, 2018 |
Filing
514
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 496 the United States' motion for leave to supplement the report of Joseph T. Anastasi; and the United States is directed to tender Mr. Anastasi for a deposition at a time convenient to defendants and their counsel. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 17, 2018. (MA)
|
December 28, 2017 |
Filing
498
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding pending motions in limine. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/28/2017. (lcplf1)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
497
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 492 United States' motion for leave to designate Dr. Phillip Bishop as an expert for rebuttal purposes in these matters. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/27/2017. (lcplf1)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
488
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 487 the parties' joint motion for a status conference. The parties shall appear for a status conference at 10:00 a.m. on October 12, 2017, and be prepared to discuss the issues identified in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 17, 2017. (lcplf2)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
486
OPINION granting in part and denying in part the United States' motion for reconsideration. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 14, 2017. (MA)
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
448
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that Toyobo's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Civil Action 04-280 270 , and Toyobo's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Civil Action 07- 1144 95, be, and hereby are, DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Summary judgment is granted as to the government's claims related to Zylon vests sold off of the GSA MAS before the 2002 contract modification, but denied as to the government 9;s claims related to Zylon vests sold off of the GSA MAS after the 2002 contract modification. It is further ORDERED that Toyobo's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Civil Action 04-280 343 be, and hereby is, DENIED. It is further ORDER ED that the United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Civil Action 04-280 344 be, and hereby is, DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Civil Action 07-1144 97 be, and her eby is, DENIED. It is further ORDERED that all pending motions in limine in Civil Action 04-280, namely, ECF Nos. 374 , 375 , 376 , 377 , 378 , 379 , 380 , 381 , 382 , 383 , 384 , 385 , 386 ; and Civil Action 07-1144, namely, ECF Nos. 1 23, 124, 125, 126, 127, 128, 129, 130, 131, 132, 133, 134, be, and hereby are, STAYED. The parties shall confer and file a joint status report no later than 11/4/2015 detailing which motions in limine still must be resolved after this Opinion and setting forth a proposed schedule on which these cases should proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/4/2015. (lcrwr1)
|
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
407
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the government's motion 292 for leave to file its second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/30/2013. (DCL)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
335
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Motion by the United States to Compel Production of Documents by James W. Murray and Deposition of James W. Murray. A separate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/18/12. (DM)
|
September 30, 2012 |
Filing
324
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying leave to file counterclaim, denying motion 254 for appointment of an independent investigator, for suspension of the current scheduling order, for sanctions, and for reconsideration of the order denying a transfer of venue, and granting motion 257 to dismiss and/or strike counterclaim. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/30/2012. (lcrwr1)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
248
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the individual defendants' motion 237 to transfer venue and motion 245 for a hearing. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/24/11. (lcrwr1)
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
228
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendants' motion 219 for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/4/10. (lcrwr1)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
217
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Toyobo's motion 25 to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/23/10. (lcrwr1)
|