UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT AT
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT CREDIT, ALL ASSETS HELD AT BANK JULIUS, ALL ASSETS HELD AT BANQUE SCS, ALL ASSETS HELD AT VERWALTUNGS-UND PRIVATBANK AG, ALL ASSETS HELD AT VILNIAUS, ALL ASSETS TRACEABLE TO, APPROXIMATELY $1.6 MILLION and APPROXIMATELY $85.5 MILLION
Claimant: ALEXANDER LAZARENKO, PAVEL LAZARENKO, ALEXEI DITIATKOVSKY, EUROFED BANK LIMITED, UNIVERSAL TRADING & INVESTMENT CO INC and OAO GAZPROM
Case Number: 1:2004cv00798
Filed: May 14, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1263 Pavel Lazarenko's motion for summary judgment on the United States' allegations related to the Ylorex Establishments account. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 1, 2021. (lcan)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re 1297 MOTION to Unseal Document 1268 Sealed Document, filed by PAVEL LAZARENKO filed by PAVEL LAZARENKO. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 12/30/20. (MFB)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 OPINION granting 1275 motion to strike Pavel Lazarenko's claim to all assets held in the Liechtenstein Accounts. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 23, 2020. (lcan)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 1289 Pavel Lazarenko's Motion for Reconsideration and Leave to Amend and denying 1309 Pavel Lazarenko's Motion to Modify the Court's Restraining Order, consistent with the Court's order 1376 denying same. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 11, 2020. (lcan)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 OPINION granting 554 motion to strike claimant Pavel Lazarenko's claim to all assets held in the Balford Trust. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 2, 2020. (lcdr)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting, approving and accepting the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Harvey; granting in part and denying in part 1182 the government's motion for sanctions; and Alexander Lazarenko is dismissed as a claimant in this case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 19, 2019. (MA)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/13/19. (lcgmh1)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 OPINION granting the motion 970 of the United States for clarification or partial reconsideration of the Court's Opinion of April 27, 2017. An Order consistent with this Opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 23, 2018. (MA)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 OPINION denying claimants' motion for reconsideration 997 of the portion of the Court's Opinion of August 3, 2017, denying them leave to plead an Eighth Amendment excessive fines affirmative defense. An Order consistent with this Opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 4, 2018. (MA)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the United States shall file a supplemental memorandum on or before January 26, 2018 discussing interplay between excessive fines and innocent interest defenses; and counsel for the children shall file a reply on or before February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 5, 2018. (MA)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1000 The Lazarenkos' motion for leave to add the "undue delay" affirmative defense. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 4, 2018. (MA)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 861 Claimant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and 893 Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 09/20/2017. (lcgmh2)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re [Dkt. 987-1] Letter Brief filed by Plaintiff and [Dkt. 991-1] Letter Brief filed by Claimant Pavel Lazarenko. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 09/13/2017. (lcgmh2)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 993 OPINION granting claimant Pavel Lazarenko's motion for reconsideration 860 and granting in part and denying in part 877 motion of claimants Alexander, Ekaterina and Lecia Lazarenko for leave to file an answer to the amended complaint. An Order consistent with this Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2017. (MA)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 950 OPINION granting in part and denying in part Lazarenko's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. An Order consistent with this Opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 27, 2017. (MA)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 926 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 538 claimant Lazarenko's emergency motion for clarification of restraining order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 23, 2017. (MA)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling 715 the United States' Objections; overruling 716 claimant Pavel Lazarenko's Objections; affirming Magistrate Judge Harvey's November 3, 2015 Memorandum Opinion 488 and Order 489 , as well his May 18, 2016 Memorandum and Order 694 ; and vacating 393 the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 2, 2017. (MA)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 857 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling 504 claimant Pavel Lazarenko's objections; affirming Magistrate Judge Harvey's Memorandum Opinion 490 and Order 491 ; and Claimant Pavel Lazarenko shall respond to the United States Requests for Production Nos. 28 and 29 on or before February 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 17, 2017. (MA)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 853 OPINION AND ORDER 367 granting in part and denying in part Claimant Pavel Lazarenko's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 775 Claimant Lazarenko's Second Motion for Leave to Amend His Answer to the Amended Complaint; and Claimant Pavel Lazarenko shall file on the public docket on or before February 3, 2017 an amended answer consistent with this Opinion that includes changes to paragraphs 62, 81 and 160 but no new affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 10, 2017. (MA)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 851 OPINION denying the motion to strike the claim of Alexander Lazarenko for himself and as agent for Lecia Lazarenko and Ekaterina Lazarenko. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 6, 2017. (MA)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 789 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 778 the United States' motion for clarification of filing deadline or, in the alternative, for a three-day enlargement of time nunc pro tunc to respond to claimant Pavel Lazarenko's second motion for leave to amend his answer to the amended complaint; granting 780 the United States' motion for leave to file under seal its opposition to claimant Pavel Lazarenko's second motion for leave to amend his answer to the amended complaint; and granting 782 claimant Pavel Lazarenko's motion requesting a status conference. A status conference is scheduled for October 27, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 24, 2016 listing the issues to be discussed at the October 27, 2016 status conference. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 17, 2016. (MA)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 752 REDACTED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 07/29/16. (ldc)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 6/3/2016. (lcgmh2)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 616 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Claimant Lazarenko's Objections [Dkt. 424] to Magistrate Judge Harvey's Memorandum Opinion of July 20, 2015 [Dkt. 417], granting in part and denying in part Claimant Pavel Lazarenko's First Motion to C ompel [Dkt. 336], and the government's Motion to Compel Claimant's First Set of Interrogatories and to Stay Discovery Pending Such Responses [Dkt. 365] are OVERRULED; and Magistrate Judge Harvey's Memorandum Opinion and Order of July 20, 2015 [Dkts. 417, 418] are AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 17, 2016. (MA)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling claimant's objection 465 to Magistrate Judge Harvey's Memorandum Opinion denying the motion to compel production of the SAR, and affirming Magistrate Judge Harvey's Memorandum Opinion of August 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 12, 2016. (MA)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Counsel are admonished that the Rules of this Court do not allow direct contact between the Court and counsel by letter, fax, or email unless the Court has so directed or requested, which it has not in this case. The und ersigned will not accept or consider letters on any matter. Letters, faxes, and emails from counsel also will not be accepted as exhibits to motions. Counsel's letter to the Court of December 22, 2015 533 , and Claimant's Motion to Conve ne a Status Conference 534 , thus are STRICKEN from the record and the Court will not consider the matters raised therein, unless and until counsel files a proper motion in compliance with this Order and the Federal Rules and Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 23, 2015. (lcplf1) (zcdw).
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Redacted version of the Memorandum Opinion and Order issued by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 9, 2015. (MA)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 513 claimant Pavel Lazarenko's motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 9, 2015. (MA)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 429 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 11/3/2015. (lcgmh2)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The United States' Motion For Leave to File Under Seal 458 is GRANTED. The United States' Motion for a Second Extension of Time to Respond to Claimant Pavel Lazarenko's Motion for Partial Summary Judgm ent may be filed under seal and the Clerk of the Court is directed to docket it. The United States will within five business days file on the public record a copy of its Motion for a Second Extension of Time in which the confidential material is redacted. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 29, 2015. (lcplf2)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 336 , 365 . Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/20/15. (lcgmh1, )
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting joint motion 314 of the United States and Eurofed for approval and entry of Stipulation and Settlement Agreement; denying as moot Eurofed's motion for summary judgment 269 ; and granting Pavel Lazarenko's motion for leave to file surreply 329 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 14, 2014. (lcplf2)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 OPINION granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion for summary judgment to strike the claim of Eurofed Bank Limited and the answer of Liquidators of European Federal Credit Bank. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 12, 2013. (MA)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPINION concluding that UTICo lacks standing to challenge the plaintiff's complaint for forfeiture. The plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings will be granted; UTICo's motion for leave to file a second amended claim and answ er will be denied as futile; UTICo's motion for a round of briefing on Guernsey law will be denied, as will UTICo's motions to "supplement evidence" and for judicial notice; and UTICo's motion for leave to file a surreply will be denied. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 25, 2011.(MA)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OPINION granting the motion to strike the claims of Ms. Collazo, Mr. Munro, Mr. Onyshko and the Postles and ordering summary judgment entered for the United States as to the claims of Mr. Munro, Mr. Onyshko and the Postles. The individual claimants are advised that the 9/30/09 order, as amended by separate order issued today, disposes of their claims in this litigation. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 20, 2009. (MA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT AT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Hocker Claman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ALEXANDER LAZARENKO
Represented By: Debra S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: PAVEL LAZARENKO
Represented By: Debra S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ALEXEI DITIATKOVSKY
Represented By: Theresa M. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: EUROFED BANK LIMITED
Represented By: Terry W. Ahearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: UNIVERSAL TRADING & INVESTMENT CO INC
Represented By: George Alex Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: OAO GAZPROM
Represented By: W. Gordon Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT CREDIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT BANK JULIUS
Represented By: Bryant Everett Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT BANQUE SCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT VERWALTUNGS-UND PRIVATBANK AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS HELD AT VILNIAUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS TRACEABLE TO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $1.6 MILLION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $85.5 MILLION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?