ABDAH et al v. BUSH et al
Petitioner: MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MAHMOOD ABDO AHMED BIN AHMED, MAJED MOHMOOD, MAJID M. ABDU AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY and USA TODAY
Respondent: GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON and BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II
Amicus Curiae: CHARLES B. GITTINGS, JR.
Case Number: 1:2004cv01254
Filed: July 27, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 MANDATE of USCA as to #1108 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD ; USCA Case Number 20-5319. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order 7/7/2023)(znmw)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Jose F. Giron, Madeline E. Sanderford, and Anne Warnke by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B (Giron), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Sanderford), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (Warnke))(Garrahan, Andrew)
August 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Ford Phelps by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Memorandum of Understanding, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Acknowledgement)(Garrahan, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 NOTICE of filing Marc Falkoff Exhibit B Acknowledgment by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD re #1125 Notice (Other) (Jacob, Beth)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 NOTICE of filing Marc Falkoff memorandum of understanding regarding access to classified national security information by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Jacob, Beth)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ANTONY BLINKEN, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD J. TRUMP, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, LANCE A. OKAMURA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, ALL RESPONDENTS, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONNIE THOMAS, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE CORPORATION, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, DONALD J. TRUMP, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, PETER J. CLARKE, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Heiman, Julia)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 NOTICE REGARDING CERTAIN BUILDINGS WITHIN CAMP DELTA by ALL RESPONDENTS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ztnr)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Azza Khalifa by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgement))(Garrahan, Andrew)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Amee Frodle by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Acknowledgement))(Garrahan, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER granting #1118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bethany Ruth Brown Theriot withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/19/2021. (lcrcl1)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Garrahan on behalf of ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Garrahan, Andrew)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Bethany Theriot by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Theriot, Bethany)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for David Leapheart by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Garrahan, Andrew)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Robert A. Long by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Garrahan, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Amee Frodle and David M. Zionts by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order) (Frodle), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order) (Zionts))(Garrahan, Andrew)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #1113 Notice (Other) ;USCA Case Number 20-5319. (zjf)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 NOTICE of New Docket Entry Under Appeal by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD re #1108 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, #1111 Memorandum & Opinion, #1106 Order on Motion for Writ, (Theriot, Bethany)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Kathryn Celia Davis terminated. (Davis, Kathryn)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Larissa England and Carter Ware by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order) (Ware), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order) (England))(Garrahan, Andrew)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 20-5319 for #1108 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (zmd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #1108 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjf)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #1106 Order on Motion for Writ by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7752889. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Theriot, Bethany)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Ruth Brown Theriot on behalf of OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Theriot, Bethany)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re ORDER #1106 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/2020. (lsj)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER DENYING #1072 Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman's Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/20. (lcrcl1) Modified on 12/1/2020 (lsj). (Main Document 1106 replaced on 12/1/2020) (zlsj).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Alexandra Francis by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Garrahan, Andrew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI. Attorney Marc D. Falkoff terminated. (Falkoff, Marc)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 NOTICE Acknowledgement of Protective Order Exhibit B by Ureib Qassis by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Jacob, Beth)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by Ureib Qassis by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Jacob, Beth)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 NOTICE Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Alexis Mozeleski by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order) (Alexis Mozeleski))(Garrahan, Andrew)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Kaitlyn Demers by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding) and Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Garrahan, Andrew)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by Nabil Haj by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Protective Order)(Jacob, Beth)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Meredith Gillespie), #2 Exhibit 2 (Kate McNulty), #3 Exhibit 3 (Megan O'Neill))(Foster, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 NOTICE of Memorandum of Understanding of Masud Hasnain by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Jacob, Beth)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth D. Jacob on behalf of OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Understanding, #2 Exhibit B to Protective Order)(Jacob, Beth)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 REPLY re #1094 Reply to Document Reply to Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Foster, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 RESPONSE re #1093 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified event title on 7/31/2019 (znmw).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Djoukeng, Cyril)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Lauren Moxley by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Foster, Brian)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Trisha B. Anderson by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order)(Foster, Brian)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 NOTICE of Filing of Memoranda of Understanding and Acknowledgments of Terms of Protective Order by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Rebecca Mooney), #2 Exhibit 2 (Ghalia Estaiteyeh))(Foster, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 NOTICE by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding of Felice Bazri, translator)(Remes, David)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald James Wiltsie (Wiltsie, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Marcus Henry (Henry, Terry)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew I. Warden (Warden, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #1084 sent to Stephen I. Vladeck on 8/28/18. New Address not provided; unable to forward. (lsj)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER granting #1073 , nunc pro tunc, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/29/2018. (lcrcl1)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 RESPONSE re #1081 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, #1082 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Foster, Brian)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Alexander Johnston by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Foster, Brian)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Bethany Theriot by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order))(Foster, Brian)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Foster, Brian)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER granting #1076 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Replies due by 6/27/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/20/18. (lsj)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 Memorandum in opposition to re #1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Slip Opinion, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Letter, #5 Exhibit Letter, #6 Exhibit Letter, #7 Exhibit Letter, #8 Errata Speech, #9 Exhibit Report, #10 Exhibit Testimony, #11 Exhibit Summary, #12 Exhibit Article, #13 Exhibit Press Release, #14 Exhibit Press Release, #15 Exhibit Press Briefing, #16 Supplement Report, #17 Exhibit Article, #18 Exhibit Article, #19 Exhibit Press Briefing, #20 Exhibit Statement, #21 Exhibit Testimony, #22 Exhibit Testimony, #23 Exhibit Report, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Timothy Andrew Johnson terminated. (Johnson, Timothy)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 MOTION for Writ Motion to Grant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD. Attorney David H. Remes terminated. (Remes, David)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building (refiled due to linkage issue) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD J. TRUMP, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building 8 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified on 4/24/2018 to enter in error due to linkage issues; counsel will refile.(ztnr)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 NOTICE Regarding Camp Four by ALL RESPONDENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rear Admiral Cashman)(Warden, Andrew)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 NOTICE Regarding Camp Five Echo Block by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 NOTICE Regarding Camp Iguana by ALL RESPONDENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 NOTICE of Transfer by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Schwartz, James)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ERRATA to Notice to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO (239 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1876 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 264 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 452 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 101 in 1:09-cv-00031-UNA, 360 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 277 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 287 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 234 in 1:05-cv-01983-UNA, 413 in 1:08-cv-01360-UNA, 673 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 279 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 175 in 1:05-cv-01623-UNA, 171 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 126 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 2005 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 422 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 410 in 1:05-cv-01048-UNA, 301 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 351 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 149 in 1:07-cv-02337-UNA, 241 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 22 in 1:08-cv-01645-RJL, 222 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 1088 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA, 403 in 1:05-cv-02479-UNA, 481 in 1:05-cv-00569-UNA, 184 in 1:08-cv-01238-UNA, 255 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 152 in 1:06-cv-01725-EGS, 155 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL, 255 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 2053 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 122 in 1:05-cv-02348-EGS, 356 in 1:05-cv-01607-RCL, 450 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 258 in 1:08-cv-01207-RCL, 1063 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 185 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 127 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 321 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 309 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 328 in 1:05-cv-00023-UNA) Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice to Court, #2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner Abdah by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner Ahmed (ISN 41) by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner al Wahab (ISN 37) by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PETITIONERS. Attorney Philip A. Scarborough terminated. (Scarborough, Philip)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for Erin E. Thomas by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective order)(Foster, Brian)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order for James Coury by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, ALI YAHYA MAHDI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum of Understanding), #2 Exhibit B (Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order))(Foster, Brian)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James J. Schwartz on behalf of GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD Substituting for attorney Scott Levin (Schwartz, James)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK H. OBAMA. Attorney Scott Douglas Levin terminated. (Levin, Scott)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 RESPONSE re #1049 SEALED MOTION filed by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioner Obaid (ISN 165) by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 SEALED ORDER; granting Sealed Motion #1050 , Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/3/2015. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(hs)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 SEALED MOTION filed by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (March 20 2014 R. Wiltsie Email), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Dr. Stephen N. Xenakis), #3 Exhibit C (Medical Records), #4 Exhibit D (May 13 2015 R. Wiltsie Email), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 NOTICE of Filing of Memoranda of Understanding and Acknowledgments of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, ALI YAHYA MAHDI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (K. Alex Kiles), #2 Exhibit 2 (Eve Stoffel))(Foster, Brian)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER re: Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37)'s Status Report. ORDERED that this case is continued indefinitely. It is further ORDERED that the Petitioner shall submit a status report by March 4, 2016, or earlier if developments warrant an earlier report. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/5/15. (mpt, )
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian) Modified text removing the word "joint" per counsel on 3/4/2015 (td, ).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian E. Foster (Foster, Brian)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER GRANTING #1033 LIFT STAY OF THE PETITION OF ADIL SAID AL HAJ OBEID AL BUSAYSS (ISN 165) FOR PURPOSE OF OBTAINING DISCOVERY OF MEDICAL RECORDS : Directing that the Government shall promptly provide Mr. Busayss's counsel with his medical and psychiatric records; signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/14. (kk)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Foster, Brian)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 NOTICE of Filing of Memoranda of Understanding and Acknowledgments of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, ALI YAHYA MAHDI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Isabelle Chammas), #2 Exhibit 2 (Samantha Coffey), #3 Exhibit 3 (Andrew Garrahan), #4 Exhibit 4 (Catlin Meade), #5 Exhibit 5 (Edward Smith))(Foster, Brian)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER: Upon consideration of the Respondents' #1034 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion to Lift Stay to Discover Medical Records; the Court hereby orders that the motion is GRANTED. Respondents shall now respond to petitioner's Motion to Lift Stay on or before 6/9/2014, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/03/14. (tb, )
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1033 MOTION to Lift Stay of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165) MOTION for Discovery of Medical Records filed by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID. (Foster, Brian)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER Granting #1037 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1033 of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165) MOTION Seeking Discovery of Medical Records Replies due by 6/27/2014.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/24/14. (mpt, )
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1033 MOTION to Lift Stay of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165) MOTION for Discovery of Medical Records by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 Memorandum in opposition to re #1033 MOTION to Lift Stay of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165) MOTION for Discovery of Medical Records filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
May 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 NOTICE Memorandum of Understanding by Tasnim Motola by ALL PETITIONERS (Remes, David)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1033 MOTION to Lift Stay of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165) MOTION for Discovery of Medical Records by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 MOTION to Lift Stay of the Petition of Adil Said al Haj Obeid al Busayss (ISN 165), MOTION for Discovery of Medical Records by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, #2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PETITIONERS. Attorney Danielle S. Barbour terminated. (Barbour, Danielle)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Board Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Warden, Andrew)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Melanie Bellini) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Steven W. Samols) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Emily A. White) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 12-5350 for #1015 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD. (rdj)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re #1015 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to (235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 235 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 31 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 273 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 291 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 1010 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (32 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 274 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 292 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 292 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 236 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 1011 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL) Memorandum & Opinion, (30 in 1:12-mc-00398-RCL, 234 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 290 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 1009 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 290 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 272 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK) Memorandum & Opinion by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Gilligan, James)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPERMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER amending memorandum opinion filed 9/6/12. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/12. (jeb, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/12. (jeb, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER granting motions for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and for continued access to counsel pursuant to the protective order in certain civil actions and dismissing certain petitioners' cases without prejudice; directing that the protective order issued by Judge Hogan on 9/11/08 shall remain in effect and provide the rules under which certain detainees held at U.S. Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba may have access to counsel so long as they remain confined and have the right to seek further reliefby habeas corpus, whether or not a petition is currently pending before the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/12.
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/6/12. (jeb, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Kevin Glandon) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD (Foster, Brian)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Respondents Opposition due by 8/6/2012. Petitioners Replies due by 8/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 SCHEDULING ORDER setting dates for disposition of issue of detainees' continued access to counsel following dismissal of their habeas petitions. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 27, 2012. (lcrcl2)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Elle Metzger) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement of Terms of Protective Order (Nicole Cahill) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1003 Motion for Order and referring issue of detainees' continued access to counsel following dismissal of their habeas petitions to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth for disposition. Parties are instructed to consult the contemporaneously issued scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 27, 2012. (lcrcl2)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 NOTICE of Errata by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II re #1003 MOTION for Order to Refer the Counsel-Access Issue for Decision by a Single District Judge and to Hold in Abeyance Former Petitioners Esmails and Uthmans Motions for Order Concerning the Protective Order (Prince, Robert)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 MOTION for Order to Refer the Counsel-Access Issue for Decision by a Single District Judge and to Hold in Abeyance Former Petitioners Esmails and Uthmans Motions for Order Concerning the Protective Order by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Prince, Robert)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 MOTION for Order Concerning the Protective Order Entered by Judge Hogan on September 11, 2008 by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 MOTION for Order Concerning the Protective Order Entered by Judge Hogan on September 11, 2008 by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 999 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Reply by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI re #998 Notice (Other) (Barbour, Danielle)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 998 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Opposition to Petitioner's (ISN 37) Motion for Reconsideration by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Dean, Paul)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 997 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Barbour, Danielle)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 996 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle S. Barbour on behalf of ALL PETITIONERS (Barbour, Danielle)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 995 NOTICE of Filing by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Smith, James)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 994 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Stephen McCoy Elliott terminated. (Elliott, Stephen)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER denying #985 motion for leave to depose. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 20, 2012. (lcrcl2)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 992 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRIES regarding ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, entered subsequent to 12/23/11, will be found in Civil Action No. 11-2294 (RWR). (jeb, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. This case, which had previously been assigned to Judge Kennedy, has been reassigned as Judge Kennedy has retired. (gt, ) (Main Document 991 replaced on 3/8/2012) (jf, ).
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 990 REPLY to opposition to motion re #985 MOTION For Leave to Depose Ali H. Soufan filed by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Smith, James)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 989 Memorandum in opposition to re #985 MOTION For Leave to Depose Ali H. Soufan by Petitioner ISN 37 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Dean, Paul)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 988 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 681 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4, #6 Exhibits Pt. 5, #7 Exhibits Pt. 6, #8 Exhibits Pt. 7, #9 Exhibits Pt. 8)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 987 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 508 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4, #6 Exhibits Pt. 5, #7 Exhibits Pt. 6)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 986 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MOTION For Leave to Depose Ali H. Soufan by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, James)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 984 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 165 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 983 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 032 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Part 1, #3 Exhibits Part 2, #4 Exhibits Part 3, #5 Exhibits Part 4, #6 Exhibits Part 5, #7 Exhibits Part 6, #8 Exhibits Part 7, #9 Exhibits Part 8)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 982 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 156 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 981 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 031 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4, #6 Exhibits Pt. 5, #7 Exhibits Pt. 6, #8 Exhibits Pt. 7, #9 Exhibits Pt. 8, #10 Exhibits Pt. 9, #11 Exhibits Pt. 10)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 980 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 037 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4)(Marcus, Lisa)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 979 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return for ISN 027 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibits Pt. 1, #3 Exhibits Pt. 2, #4 Exhibits Pt. 3, #5 Exhibits Pt. 4, #6 Exhibits Pt. 5, #7 Exhibits Pt. 6, #8 Exhibits Pt. 7, #9 Exhibits Pt. 8, #10 Exhibits Pt. 9, #11 Exhibits Pt. 10, #12 Exhibits Pt. 11, #13 Exhibits Pt. 12, #14 Exhibits Pt. 13)(Marcus, Lisa)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 978 NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 522 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER granting respondents' renewed motions to deem protected highlighted information in certain proposed factual returns that have been filed in this case #929 #930 #931 #932 #933 #942 #943 #944 #948 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 25, 2011. (lchhk3)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 976 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 975 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (125 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD ; USCA Case Number 05-5224. ORDERED that the order to show cause be discharged. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to hold in abeyance be dismissed as moot in light of the court's order denying the petition for initial hearing en banc. FURTHER ORDERED that the district court's orders requiring advance notice of transfer are hereby vacated.(kb)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #885 Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD ; USCA Case Number 10-5235. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded with instructions to deny Uthman's petition for writ of habeas corpus, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (kb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: #1 USCA Opinion) (kb).
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 973 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #902 Notice of Appeal, filed by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL ; USCA Case Number 10-5282. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed. (smm)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting #962 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Order Denying Petitioner Uthman's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 23, 2011. (lchhk3)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 972 SEALED Supplement to Their Pending Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 681, filed by BARACK OBAMA. re #966 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 971 SEALED Supplement to Their Pending Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 522, filed by BARACK OBAMA. re #965 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 970 SEALED Supplement to Their Pending Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 508, filed by BARACK OBAMA. re #964 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 969 SEALED Supplement to Their Pending Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 031, filed by BARACK OBAMA. re #963 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 967 NOTICE of Coordinated Ruling Regarding Protected Information Contained in Factual Returns and Respondents Renewed Motions to Approve Proposed Public Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA (Murley, Nicole)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 966 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Proposed Public Factual Return Motion for ISN 681 by BARACK OBAMA re #928 Notice (Other) (Marcus, Lisa)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 965 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Proposed Public Factual Return Motion for ISN 522 by BARACK OBAMA re #926 Notice (Other) (Marcus, Lisa)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 964 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Proposed Public Factual Return Motion for ISN 508 by BARACK OBAMA re #925 Notice (Other) (Marcus, Lisa)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 963 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Proposed Public Factual Return Motion for ISN 031 by BARACK OBAMA re #924 Notice (Other) (Marcus, Lisa)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 962 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #961 Order Denying the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Phillips, Anthony)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER denying petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman's petition for a writ of habeas corpus in accordance with the judgment of the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 29, 2011. (lchhk3)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to (34 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (125 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD ; USCA Case Number 05-5224. ORDERED that the district court's orders requiring advance notice of transfers are hereby vacated. (zsmm, )
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 959 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Phillips, Anthony)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 958 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Needle on behalf of NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Needle, Jonathan)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 957 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Stephen P. Finn terminated. (Finn, Stephen)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 956 USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to #885 Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby reversed and the case is remanded with instructions to deny Uthman's petition for writ of habeas corpus, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (Attachments: #1 USCA Opinion)(smm)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 955 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Ann E. Nash terminated. (Nash, Ann)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 954 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) dismissing 05-5239, 05-5242, 05-5246, 05-5486, 06-5037, 06-5043, 06-5062, and 06-5094 as moot because the stay orders challenged in these appeals are no longer in effect, and terminating the consolidation of 05-5239, 05-5242, 05-5246, 05-5486, 06-5037, 06-5043, 06-5062, and 06-5094 with Nos. 05-5224, et al. as to (14 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR) Notice of Appeal filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, (42 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR) Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (32 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL) Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (33 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (151 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (125 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (12 in 1:05-cv-01189-UNA) Notice of Appeal filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, (11 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR) Notice of Appeal filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, (19 in 1:05-cv-00569-EGS) Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (11 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR) Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (19 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU) Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD ; USCA Case Number: 05-5224 (consolidated with 05-5225, 05-5227, 05-5229, 05-5230, 05-5232, 05-5235, 05-5236, 05-5237, 05-5238, 05-5239, 05-5242, 05-5243, 05-5244, 05-5246, 05-5248, 05-5337, 05-5338, 05-5374, 05-5390, 05-5398, 05-5479, 05-5484, 05-5486, 06-5037, 06-5041, 06-5043, 06-5062, 06-5065, and 06-5094.) (ztnr, )
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 953 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) discharging the order to show cause, granting the motion to exceed the page limit, ordering the Clerk to file the lodged joint response, and vacating the District Court's order requiring advance notice of transfer as to (42 in 1:05-cv-00833-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 83 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 47 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 63 in 1:05-cv-02199-UNA, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-UNA, 49 in 1:06-cv-01684-UNA, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 75 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-UNA, 43 in 1:06-cv-01766-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-ESH, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 28 in 1:05-cv-01725-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 40 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 72 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 50 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-UNA, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH -AK, 13 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 44 in 1:05-cv-01189-UNA, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 109 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 21 in 1:05-cv-00995-UNA, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 39 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01353-UNA, 39 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-UNA, 204 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 39 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 102 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 100 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 87 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 56 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK -AK, 39 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 96 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 114 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 521 in 1:10-cv-01020-RJL, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 62 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 26 in 1:06-cv-01668-UNA, 58 in 1:05-cv-01497-UNA, 46 in 1:06-cv-01765-UNA, 52 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 25 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 521 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-UNA, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 102 in 1:05-cv-00569-EGS, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 83 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 19 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 83 in 1:05-cv-01601-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 85 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 34 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 77 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 24 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 143 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Notices of Appeal filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, and TERRY CARRICO; USCA Case Number: 08-5233 (consolidated with 08-5234-08-5262, 08-5264-08-5270, 08-5272-08-5278, 08-5280-08-5286, 08-5288, 08-5289, 08-5291-08-5297, 08-5299-08-5306, 08-5308-08-5315, 08-5317-08-5323, 08-5325-08-5330, 08-5332-08-5336, 08-5338-08-5343, and 08-5345-08-5347.) (tnr, )
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 952 NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 951 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Mildred Knowlton) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 950 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Matthew Kudzin) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 949 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order (Nina Gleiberman) by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #929 , #930 , #931 , #932 , #933 , #942 , #943 , #944 , #948 , Respondents' Sealed Motions to Deem Protected Information in Accompanying Proposed Factual Returns. Respondents shall notify the Court of Judge Hogan's decision regarding whether the six categories of information constitute protected information no later than seven days after such ruling is posted. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 10, 2011. (lchhk3)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 948 SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 32 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 947 NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 32 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 946 NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 41 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 945 STATUS REPORT by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 944 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 27 filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, )
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 943 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 156 filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, )
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 942 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 37 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 with Narrative, #4 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 941 NOTICE Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 156 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 940 NOTICE Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 37 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 939 NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 27 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 938 NOTICE of Filing of Jason Levine of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 937 SEALED REPLY in Support of Motion for Stay Pending AppellateReview re #936 Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 936 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Nash, Ann)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 935 SEALED Opposition to Respondents Motion for Stay Pending AppellateReview re #934 Notice (Other) filed by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 934 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF re #918 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal (ISN 156) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, James)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 933 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 681 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Narrative, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 932 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 165 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Narrative, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 931 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 522 filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 930 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 508 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: Exhibit 1 is Main Document, #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Narrative - Exh. 3, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 90 - extracted pages, #5 Exhibit 91 - extracted pages, #6 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 929 SEALED Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 031 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: Exhibit 1 is Main Document, #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Narrative - Exh. 3, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(zdr)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 928 NOTICE of Filing: Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 681 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 927 NOTICE of Filing: Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 165 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 926 NOTICE of Filing: Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 522 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 925 NOTICE of Filing: Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 508 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 924 NOTICE of Filing: Unopposed Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 031 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 923 NOTICE of Filing of Kate Mueting of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 922 STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK H. OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/21/2011. (tj )
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 921 NOTICE of Filing Transcript Order Form (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Nash, Ann)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 10-5319 for #913 Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (rdj)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #916 Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab's Motion for a Continuance. Petitioner shall confer with Respondents and file a status report by no later than January 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 28, 2010. (lchhk3)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 920 NOTICE of Appearance (Remes, David)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 919 REPLY to opposition to motion re #916 MOTION for a Continuance filed by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Smith, James)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 918 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Nash, Ann)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 917 Memorandum in opposition to re #916 MOTION for a Continuance filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Dean, Paul)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 916 MOTION for a Continuance by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, James)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER granting #912 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Traverse by Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 20, 2010. (lchhk3)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re #913 Notice of Appeal. (dr)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #890 Order, #891 Judgment, #907 Memorandum & Opinion, by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. Filing fee $ 0.00. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (dr)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 912 NOTICE of Filing of Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Traverse by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Smith, James)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 10-5282 for #902 Notice of Appeal, filed by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL. (dr)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting #906 respondents' motion for leave to amend the factual return in the case of Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 31, 2010. (NP)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 910 RESPONSE re #906 Notice (Other) of Filing of Respondents' Motion to Amend the Factual Return filed by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI. (Foster, Brian)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 909 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's Order of July 21, 2010 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Mason, Kathryn)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 908 NOTICE of Filing of Mahika Roy of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Foster, Brian)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 907 Unclassified version of the MEMORANDUM OPINION granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156), pursuant to #890 the Court's Notice of Filing docketed on July 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 16, 2010. (NP)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 906 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Motion to Amend the Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Jones, Luke)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 904 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #902 Notice of Appeal,. (dr)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 903 REPLY re 905 to Respondents' "Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing" filed by SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD. (Foster, Brian) Modified on 8/13/2010 to edit relationship and create link (dr).
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 902 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #801 Memorandum & Opinion, #825 Memorandum & Opinion, #800 Order, #877 Memorandum & Opinion, Order,, #874 Order, by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-2264790. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Foster, Brian)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #901 Notice (Other); emailed to bfoster@cov.com, cc'd 50 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in Error; Refile as a Notice of Appeal (under Appeal Documents) and pay the filing fee. (znmw, )
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appeal by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL re #801 Memorandum & Opinion, #825 Memorandum & Opinion, #800 Order, #877 Memorandum & Opinion, Order,, #874 Order, (Foster, Brian) Modified on 8/12/2010 (znmw, ).
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER granting #893 Motion for Stay Pending Appellate Review in the case of Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 10, 2010. (NP)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Memorandum in opposition to re #893 MOTION to Stay Order Pending Appeal (ISN 27) filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Livingston, Schuyler)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #898 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's June 7, 2010 Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 9, 2010. (NP)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's June 7, 2010 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Paul)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 905 MOTION to Respondents' "Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing" filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Kelly, Wynne) Modified on 8/13/2010 to edit event and create correct relationship (dr).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 896 NOTICE of Compliance with Discovery Order (ISN 31) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 895 NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 894 NOTICE of Appearance (Maskew, Trish)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #892 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; emailed to wlivingston@cov.com, cc'd 50 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Modified to reflect the entry is a Response, not a Motion. (znmw, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 905 MOTION Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing with the Court Pursuant to Section I.F. of the CMO, by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (See Docket Entry #892 to view document) (dr)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 893 MOTION to Stay Order Pending Appeal (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Response re #889 to Respondents' "Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing" by SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler) Modified event title and added link on 7/26/2010 (znmw, ).
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 891 JUDGMENT granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 21, 2010. (NP)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 890 NOTICE OF FILING of the Court's opinion granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 21, 2010. (NP)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 10-5235 for #885 Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (znmw, )
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 889 NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing with the Court by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Vetter, Mark)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE of Transfer of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re #885 Notice of Appeal. (dr)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Proposed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 885 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #772 Judgment, #842 Order, #771 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Gilligan, James)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE of Filing of Roger Ford of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 7, 2010. (lctfh2)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 883 NOTICE of Filing of Danielle S. Barbour of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 882 NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 881 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting (310) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (264) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01164-RBW; granting (776) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01194-TFH; granting (878) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01254-HHK; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01937-PLF; granting (343) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-02022-PLF; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-02215-RMC. Reply due by 7/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/2010. (lctfh2, ) Modified event title on 6/30/2010 (znmw, ).
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 880 SEALED STATUS REPORT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 879 NOTICE of Filing under Seal (ISN 681 Status Report) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 877 Per #874 the Court's notice of filing docketed on June 14, 2010, unclassified version of the MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying Petitioner's Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail's (ISN 522) motion for reconsideration of the Court's ruling denying his petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 23, 2010. (NP)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #876 Unopposed Second Motion For Extension Of Time To Comply With The Court's April 15, 2010 Order With Respect To Petitioner Mahmoud Al Mujahid (ISN 31). Respondents shall complete I.D.1 and I.E.1 discovery by August 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 21, 2010. (NP)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 876 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (31), MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 875 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 874 NOTICE of filing of the Court's memorandum opinion and order denying Petitioner's motion for reconsideration of the Court's ruling denying the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 14, 2010. (NP)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 873 Unclassified version of the MEMORANDUM OPINION granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681), pursuant to #858 the notice of filing docketed on May 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 10, 2010. (NP)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 872 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PETITIONERS, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA. Attorney Anna Elizabeth Cross terminated. (Cross, Anna)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Closed Conference set for 11/12/2010 @ 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. Closed Conference set for 11/15/2010 @ 9:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 6/8/2010. (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 6/7/2010. ( Closed Hearing continued to 6/8/2010 @ 9:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy.). (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER adopting the deadlines proposed by the parties in #865 their jointreport regarding petitioner Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37), and scheduling a prehearing conference and merits hearing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 7, 2010. (NP)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 870 NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 869 NOTICE of Appearance (Kelly, Wynne)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 868 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's List of Non-English Words to Which Petitioner Will Refer at Merits Hearing by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 867 NOTICE of Filing List of Foreign Terms that May be Used in the Merits Hearing (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Closed Hearing set for 6/7/2010 @ 9:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER denying #847 , #848 the parties' Motions for Judgment on the Record in the case of Petitioner Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 3, 2010. (NP)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 865 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Jones, Luke)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 864 NOTICE of Resubmission of Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 863 NOTICE of Joint Statement of Issues in Dispute (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 862 NOTICE of Filing Joint Exhibits and Joint Statement of Issues in Dispute by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 861 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 860 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitioner's (ISN 156) Motion for Judgment on the Record by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 859 JUDGMENT granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 26, 2010. (NP)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 858 NOTICE of filing of the Court's opinion granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 26, 2010. (NP)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents inform the Court of Odaini's status by 6/25/2010. (gdf)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #857 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, by June 7, 2010, respondents shall complete the discovery ordered by the Court on March 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 25, 2010. (NP)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 857 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 856 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 8, 2010 Order Denying the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus with respect to petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Prince, Robert)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 855 NOTICE of Filing of Unclassified Factual Return Pursuant to Section I.C of the Case Management Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Narrative, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Elliott, Stephen)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #853 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Judgment on the Record in the case of Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Accordingly, the parties' oppositions are due on May 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 21, 2010. (NP)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Closed Conference currently scheduled for 6/3/2010 @ 10:30am is hereby RESCHEDULED for 3:00 PM on the same day in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 854 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Roger Alan Keller terminated. (Keller, Roger)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Judgment on the Record by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Unclassified version of the MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying #790 respondents' motion for reconsideration of the Court's ruling that granted the habeas corpus petition of Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27), pursuant to #842 the Court's Notice of Filing docketed on May 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 19, 2010. (NP)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 851 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Response to Respondents' "Notice of Clarification Regarding Statement Made at Merits Hearing of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681)" by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Foster, Brian)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 850 NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Elliott, Stephen)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 849 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 848 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 847 NOTICE of Filing Motion for Judgment on the Record (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER directing the parties to submit a status report in the case of Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37) no later than June 2, 2010 and denying as moot #752 Petitioner's Motion for Order Setting Deadlines. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 17, 2010. (NP)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Motion terminated: #760 Consent Motion for Extension of Time in the case of Petitioner Mukhtar Yahya Najee al Warafi (ISN 117). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 14, 2010. (NP)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER that Respondents inform the Court of the status of Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27) by no later than June 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 13, 2010. (NP)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER granting Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return of ISN156 to Include Additional Evidence in the case of Petitioner Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 13, 2010. (NP)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 843 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Factual Return of ISN 156 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Nash, Ann)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 842 NOTICE of filing the Court's memorandum opinion and order denying #790 respondents' motion for reconsideration of the Court's ruling that granted the habeas corpus petition of Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 12, 2010. (NP)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 5/11/2010. (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 841 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return of ISN 156 to Include Additional Evidence by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Smith, James)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 840 NOTICE of Appearance by James McCall Smith on behalf of ALL PETITIONERS, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID (Smith, James)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 5/10/2010. (Court Reporters: Annie Shaw/Lisa Griffith.) (tj)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Closed Hearing set for 5/11/2010 @ 9:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #833 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary L. McKinney. Accordingly, Ms. McKinney is admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Petitioner. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 7, 2010. (NP)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER of USCA as to (99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO ; USCA Case Number 08-5233, 08-5234, 08-5235, 08-5236, 08-5260, 08-5261, 08-5237, 08-5238, 08-5239, 08-5240, 08-5241, 08-5242, 08-5243, 08-5244, 08-5245, 08-5246, 08-5247, 08-5248, 08-5249, 08-5250, 08-5251, 08-5252, 08-5262, 08-5253, 08-5254, 08-5263, 08-5255, 08-5264, 08-5256, 08-5265, 08-5266, 08-5257, 08-5267, 08-5258, 08-5259, 08-5268, 08-5276, 08-5269, 08-5277, 08-5278, 08-5270, 08-5280, 08-5281, 08-5271, 08-5272, 08-5282, 08-5273, 08-5274, 08-5283, 08-5275, 08-5284, 08-5285, 08-5286, 08-5291, 08-5292, 08-5293, 08-5294, 08-5302, 08-5295, 08-5303, 08-5304, 08-5296, 08-5305, 08-5297, 08-5306, 08-5299, 08-5300, 08-5301, 08-5308, 08-5309, 08-5317, 08-5310, 08-5318, 08-5319, 08-5311, 08-5320, 08-5312, 08-5313, 08-5314, 08-5321, 08-5315, 08-5331, 08-5322, 08-5332, 08-5333, 08-5334, 08-5335, 08-5336, 08-5288, 08-5338, 08-5339, 08-5323, 08-5340, 08-5325, 08-5326, 08-5341, 08-5327, 08-5342, 08-5289, 08-5328, 08-5343, 08-5329, 08-5330, 08-5345, 08-5346, 08-5347, 08-5348 ORDERED that Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 be dismissed as moot, FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 with Nos. 08-5233, et al., be terminated, FURTHER ORDERED to terminate party Atag Ali Abdoh in 08-5235, Jamal Mar'i, Nabil Mohamed Mar'i and Farouk Ali Ahmed Saif in 08-5236, Waffa El-Arabie and Sherif El-Mashad in 08-5244, Mohammad Karim and Mohammad Rahim in 08-5314, Riad Nargeri in 08-5321 and Adel Lnu and Saif Ullah in 08-5322; dismissing as moot motion to hold case in abeyance [1177160-3]; FURTHER ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that the remaining appellees in these consolidated cases show cause, within 30 days of the date of this order why the district courts orders requiring advance notice of transfer should not be vacated and the cases remanded. Response to Order due 06/01/2010. Response may not exceed 10 pages [See Order for further details]The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith to the district court a certified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate in Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348. The Clerk is further directed to withhold issuance of the mandate in Nos. 08-5235, 08-5236, 08-5244, 08-5314, 08-5321, and 08-5322 until resolution of the remainder of those appeals. (mmh, )
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 838 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 8, 2010 Order Denying the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 837 NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Elliott, Stephen)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER granting #835 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Redaction of Additional Information in the Public Version of the Court's Memorandum Opinion Denying His Petition. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 6, 2010. (NP)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 5/6/2010. (Court Reporter: Catalina Kerr.) (tj)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 835 NOTICE of Filing of Emergency Motion for Redaction of Additional Information by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 834 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners List of Non-English Words to which Petitioner Will Refer at the May 10, 2010 Merits Hearing by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Livingston, Schuyler)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mary McKinney, :Firm- Covington & Burling LLP, :Address- 1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202.662.5842. Fax No. - 202.778.5842 by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Pemberton, Alan)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 832 NOTICE of Resubmission of Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Livingston, Schuyler)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER denying #819 , #820 the parties' Motions for Judgment on the Record in the case of Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 5, 2010. (NP)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 830 NOTICE of Classified Submission of Joint Exhibits by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Elliott, Stephen)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 829 NOTICE of (Corrected) Joint Statement of Material Issues in Dispute by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Vetter, Mark)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #826 Notice (Other); emailed to mark.a.vetter2@usdoj.gov, cc'd 49 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; refile with signature(s) and attorney information. (znmw, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 828 NOTICE of Classified Filing and Agreement on Expedited Briefing Schedule by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Nash, Ann)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 827 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E. Nash on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Nash, Ann)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Statement of Material Issues in Dispute by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Vetter, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2010 (znmw, ).
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 825 Pursuant to #800 the Court's Notice of Filing docketed on April 8, 2010, unclassified version of the MEMORANDUM OPINION denying the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 4, 2010. (NP) (Main Document 825 replaced on 5/6/2010) (jeb, ).
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER This court adopts and the parties shall be bound by the expedited briefing schedule they propose in respondents' most recent filing regarding the motion to amend the factual return of ISN 156. So ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Respone to the Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. Accordingly, the petitioners response shall be due to be filed on or before June 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 4, 2010. (lctfh2, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MEMORANDUM by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Factual return narrative, #2 Exhibit Exhibits part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibits part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibits part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibits part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibits part 5)(Bladuell, Hector)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Conference currently scheduled for Thursday, May 6, 2010 @ 4:45pm before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. is hereby RESCHEDULED for 2:00pm on the same day. (tj )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 823 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 822 NOTICE of filing Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini's Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI re #820 Notice (Other) (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #821 Unopposed Motion for Extension Of Time to Comply with the Court's April 15, 2010 Order with Respect to Petitioner Mahmoud Al Mujahid (ISN 31). Accordingly, respondents shall file the unclassified factual return on or before May 3, 2010, and must complete I.D.1 and I.E.1 discovery by June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 27, 2010. (NP)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (ISN 31) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 820 NOTICE of Classified Filing of Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 819 NOTICE of Filing Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini's Motion for Judgment on the Record by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 818 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER in the case of Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN681), granting #806 Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return; and denying #809 Second Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 22, 2010. (NP)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 815 UNCLASSIFIED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION; Granting the petitioner for a Writ of Habeas Corpus of Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 4/21/2010. (ztr)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #814 Unoppoed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's April 15, 2010 Order with respect to Mahmoud Al Mujahid (ISN 31). Accordingly, respondents shall file the unclassified return as to Petitioner Mahmoud Al Mujahid (ISN 31) no later than April 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 20, 2010. (NP)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 814 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Unclassified Factual Return (ISN 31) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 813 RESPONSE re #809 Notice (Other) Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Second Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return filed by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI. (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 812 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER dismissing as moot the petition of Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 19, 2010. (NP)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER dismissing as moot the petition of Faruq Ali Ahmed (ISN 32). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 19, 2010. (NP)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Monday, May 3, 2010, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns [Dkt. No. 1942, 08-mc-442]. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 809 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Johnson, Timothy)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 808 RESPONSE re #806 Notice (Other) Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Notice Correcting Characterizations Made in the Factual Return and Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return filed by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. This Court adopts and the parties shall be bound by the schedule they propose and that is set forth in #799 their joint proposed scheduling order regarding Petitioner Mahmoud Al Mujahid (ISN 31). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 15, 2010. (NP)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER for expedited briefing on #806 Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return in the case of Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 14, 2010. (NP)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 806 NOTICE of Classified Filings by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Elliott, Stephen)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 805 NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD re #790 Notice (Other) (Foster, Brian)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 804 NOTICE of Appearance (Murley, Nicole)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 803 NOTICE OF CLASSIFIED TRANSCRIPT before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth of proceedings held on 1/12/10, Submitted to CSO: 4/9/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.This Transcript is Unavailable for public viewing.(Gels, Patty)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 802 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 1/12/10; Date of Issuance:4/9/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 801 JUDGMENT denying petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail. (Kennedy, Henry)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Notice of Opinion (Kennedy, Henry)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 799 NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by MAHMOAD ABDAH, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Foster, Brian)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 798 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 797 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 796 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons)Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 3/31/2010.(tj)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER dismissing as moot habeas petitions of former detainees. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/1/10. (lctfh1)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court adopts and the parties shall be bound by the deadlines and briefing schedule that is set forth in #793 their joint proposed scheduling order regarding Petitioner Salman Yahya Hassan Mohammed Rabeii (ISN 508). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 29, 2010. (NP)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 793 NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD (Foster, Brian)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 792 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 3/26/10.(gdf)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 791 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 3/25/2010.(ztj )
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 790 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #787 Petitioner Salman Yahya Hassan Mohammed Rabeii's (ISN 508) Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 25, 2010. (NP)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 788 STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 787 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay by SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 3/22/2010. (Court Reporter :Lisa Hand.) (tj)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 786 PREHEARING ORDER regarding Petitioner Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini (ISN 681).Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 22, 2010. (NP)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 785 PREHEARING ORDER regarding Petitioner Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif (ISN 156). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 22, 2010. (NP)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/22/2010 @ 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 784 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons. (Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 3/18/02010).(tj )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Elliott, Stephen)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 782 DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR ERRONEOUSLY.
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 3/11/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 3/10/2010. (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 3/9/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 781 NOTICE of Appearance (Wiltsie, Ronald)
March 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE RECORD (Kennedy, Henry)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 779 NOTICE of Filing Non-English Word List for Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail, ISN 522 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD (Alberty, Linda)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's List of Non-English Words by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 777 NOTICE of Resubmission of Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 776 NOTICE of Appearance (Vetter, Mark)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 775 NOTICE OF FILING JOINT STATEMENT OF MATERIAL ISSUES ISN 522 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Alberty, Linda)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 774 NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Cross, Anna)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 773 NOTICE Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Judgment on the Record with Respect to Petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Prince, Robert)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 772 JUDGMENT granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Uthman Abdul RahimMohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 24, 2010. (NP)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 771 NOTICE of filing the Court's opinion granting the petition for a writ of habeas corpus of Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 24, 2010. (NP)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 770 NOTICE of Filing of Erin Feehan-Nelson of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS (Livingston, Schuyler)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 769 NOTICE of Filing Motion for Judgment on the Record with Respect to Petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Prince, Robert)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 768 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER granting #766 Joint Motion for Extensions of Time. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 17, 2010. (NP)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Judgment on the Record, Statement of Material Issues in Dispute, and Joint Exhibits by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 765 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Foster, Brian)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER directing the parties to produce a list of all non-English words to the court reporter in advance of each merit hearing. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 16, 2010. (NP)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER granting #754 Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return to Include Additional Evidence in the case of Petitioner Yassein Khasem Mohammed Esmail (ISN 522). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 16, 2010. (NP)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Memorandum in opposition to re #752 MOTION for Order Setting Deadlines (Petitioner al Wahab - ISN 37) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Dean, Paul)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE of Filing Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Motion to Amend Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Alberty, Linda)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 760 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respondents' post-hearing brief by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Philip)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #759 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Accordingly, respondents shall submit any reply by 6:00 pm on the day on which the Clerk's Office and Court Security Office reopen. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 9, 2010. (NP)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return to Include Additional Evidence by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 758 RESPONSE re #754 Notice (Other) Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend Factual Return filed by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 757 AMENDED ORDER #756 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 3, 2010. (NP)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 2/3/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER (Kennedy, Henry)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Supplemental Brief by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maloney, Sarah)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Alberty, Linda)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 2/2/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 2/1/2010. (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Beth Alberty on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Alberty, Linda)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 1/28/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Hearing held on 1/27/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 752 MOTION for Order Setting Deadlines by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pemberton, Alan)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER denying #732 , #733 the parties' Motions for Judgment on the Record in the case of Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 22, 2010. (NP)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Close Hearing held on 1/21/2010. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Phillips on behalf of MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD (znmw, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' #748 Joint Proposed Prehearing Order. A prehearing conference shall be held on March 4, 2010, at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 20, 2010. (NP)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2010. (Court Reporter No Reporter.) (tj )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 749 STIPULATION Joint Statement of Material Issues in Dispute (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Bladuell, Hector)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Pre-hearing Order (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #746 the emergency motion of Petitioner Abd Al Malik Abd Al Wahab (ISN 37) for an indefinite stay of the hearing scheduled for February 16, 2010; scheduling hearings on the parties' cross-motions for judgment on the record and merits hearings for ISNs 522, 681, and 156. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 19, 2010. (NP)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Emergency MOTION for Order Indefinite Postponement of Hearing and Briefing Dates by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pemberton, Alan)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 745 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Uthman Abdel Rahim Mohammed Uthman's Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Livingston, Schuyler)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 744 NOTICE of Filing Classified Opposition to Petitioner Uthman (ISN 27)'s Motion for Judgment on the Record by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 743 SEALED ORDER re #728 SEALED MOTION filed by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy) (tj )
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Merit Hearing held on 1/12/2010. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith.) (rje)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting [#724] Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return to Include Additional Evidence as to Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman (ISN 27). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 12, 2010. (NP)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER granting #740 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 12, 2010. (NP)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed Conference held on 1/11/2010. (Court Reporter: Annie Shaw.) (tj)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay by MAHMOAD ABDAH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Classified Filing (Status Report ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD (Safavi, Nancy)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Classified Filing (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Finn, Stephen)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER directing the government to file any reply in support of its Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return to Include Additional Evidence by 6:00pm on Friday, January 8, 2010; scheduling a hearing on this motion for January 11, 2010, at 1:30 pm, and staying the parties' obligations to file oppositions to the Cross-Motions for Judgment on the Record in this case until the Court has ruled on this motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 6, 2010. (NP)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 735 RESPONSE re #724 Notice (Other) Memorandum in Opposition to Respondents' Classified Motion to Amend the Factual Return filed by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 734 SEALED ORDER re #725 SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (tj )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' #727 Joint Proposed Prehearing Order. A prehearing conference shall be held on February 11, 2010, at 11:00 am in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 5, 2010. (NP)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE of Filing Classified Motion for Jugment on the Record (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Uthman Abdel Rahim Mohammed Uthman's Motion for Judgment on the Record by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Livingston, Schuyler)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Scarborough, Philip)
January 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 730 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement (Samuel Hecht Dorison) by ALL PETITIONERS (Remes, David)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 729 NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 728 SEALED MOTION re #726 Notice (Other) filed by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(zdr)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 727 NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Prehearing Order (ISN 37) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 726 NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Motion by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Foster, Brian)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 724 NOTICE of Filing Classified Motion to Amend Factual Return and Supplement (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Bladuell, Hector)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 725 SEALED MOTION for Extension of Time for filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 723 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD (Mason, Kathryn)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 722 NOTICE of Transfer of Petitioners by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Merits Hearing reset for 1/12/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 12/16/2009. Merits Hearing set for 12/21/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (rje)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order SET HEARINGS: In accordance with #717 the Court's Order, a prehearing conference shall be held on January 19, 2010, at 4:45 pm; merits hearing shall commence on January 25, 2010, at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 14, 2009. (NP)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER that petitioner MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (ISN 117) is transferred by consent of the judges from Judge Kennedy to the undersigned member of this Court; further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall create a new civil action comprised of the captioned petitioner, CA 09-2368; and that any filing made by the petitioner in ABDAH, ET AL v. OBAMA, ET AL., CA 04-1254 (HHK); shall be deemed a part of the record in the new civil action created by the Court.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/09. (ks)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE of Resubmission of Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Scarborough, Philip)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER denying the parties' Motions [685, 686] for Judgment on the Record. There are genuine issues of material fact in dispute. Accordingly, the Prehearing Conference and Merits Hearing will take place as previously scheduled. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/2009. (lcrcl2, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER denying petitioner's (ISN 117) Motion #706 to Strike. Petitioner will not suffer prejudice because this matter is not before a jury, and the Court will not consider or rely on respondents' proposed amendments to petitioner's factual return. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/2009. (lcrcl2, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 717 PREHEARING ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 14, 2009. (NP)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE of Joint Statement of Material Issue in Dispute (ISN 117) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maloney, Sarah)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 715 SEALED ORDER re ISN 577 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tJ)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 714 SEALED ORDER re ISN 32. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj )
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ERRATA regarding JOINT STATUS REPORT filed 11/9/09. (jeb, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 713 SEALED ORDER re #709 Notice of Filing a Joint Proposed Order filed by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zdr)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 710 NOTICE of Filing Classified Opposition to Petitioner Al Warafi's Emergency Motion to Strike (ISN 117) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maloney, Sarah)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 709 NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Order by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF (Foster, Brian)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje) Modified on 12/10/2009 (zrje, ).
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Please disregard the previous notice. (rje)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #708 NOTICE of Filing Stipulation and Proposed Order re ISN 577 filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 708 NOTICE of Filing Stipulation and Proposed Order re ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 707 NOTICE of Filing of Classified Supplement by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE re #706 Emergency MOTION to Strike Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record (Foster, Brian)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Emergency MOTION to Strike Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record and Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Record by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Philip)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 12/7/2009. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw) (tth)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 705 NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE re #685 Notice (Other) (Foster, Brian)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 704 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Stay filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: respondents' Motion #684 for Leave to Amend Petitioner's (ISN 117) Factual Return. A separate order shall issue this date. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/4/2009. (lcrcl2, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER denying respondents' Motion #684 for Leave to Amend Petitioner's (ISN 117) Factual Return. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/4/2009. (lcrcl2, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 701 NOTICE of Motion under Seal re ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 700 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Judge Leon order)(jeb)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 699 SEALED ORDER re #698 SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (tj)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 698 SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 697 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re Petitioner ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER granting #695 Consent Motion by Respondents for Enlargement of Time to File Appropriate Papers re Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577). Accordingly, respondents shall file the papers they deem appropriate regarding petitioner Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577) no later than December 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 1, 2009. (NP)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appropriate Papers re ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 694 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Mukhtar Yahya Najee al Warafi by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Scarborough, Philip)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Memorandum in opposition to re #684 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Factual Return for Petitioner Al Warafi (ISN 117) to Include Additional Evidence filed by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Brian)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #691 The terms of the stipulation regarding an order for petitioner's counsel to protect the exparte in camera memoranda submitted in connection with respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a factual return for ISN 577 is SO ORDERED. (Kennedy, Henry)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 692 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #690 Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Consent MOTION for Order re ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(White, David)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 690 NOTICE of Sealed Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Mason, Kathryn)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 689 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #688 Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, #619 Sealed Order. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 688 NOTICE of Sealed Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (Finn, Stephen)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 687 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR) Order, Set Deadlines (Petitioners Consolidated Supplemental Reply Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantanamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Foster, Brian)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 685 NOTICE of Filing with the Court Security Office by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Maloney, Sarah)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Factual Return for Petitioner Al Warafi (ISN 117) to Include Additional Evidence by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Sarah)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 683 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Reply to Petitioners' Supplemental Memorandum (08-cv-444, dkt. 112) Regarding Mootness filed by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Lin, Jean)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER regarding #670 Motion by Respondents for Enlargement of Time to File Factual Return Re Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577) and Notice of Ex Parte, In Camera Submission in Support of Motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 20, 2009. (NP)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 681 RESPONSE re #680 Notice (Other) of Respondents' Ex Parte, In Camera Filing filed by JAMAL MAR'I. (Foster, Brian)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 680 NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing re ISN 577 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (White, David)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER regarding ex parte filings in support of #670 respondents' motion for an extension of time by which to file a factual return in response to the Petition of Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 16, 2009. (NP)
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 677 RESPONSE re #674 Notice (Other), #670 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return [ISN 577] filed by JAMAL MAR'I. (Foster, Brian)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 678 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. re 674 Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 676 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 176 in 1:05-cv-00765-EGS, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 135 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 90 in 1:05-cv-00888-CKK, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01667-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 32 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 263 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 138 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 200 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 176 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 68 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 96 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 104 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 588 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 46 in 1:05-cv-01635-PLF, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 143 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 632 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 112 in 1:05-cv-01009-UNA, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 48 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 64 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 53 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 67 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 221 in 1:05-cv-01487-TFH, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 37 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 248 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 252 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 234 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 84 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 229 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 283 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 238 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 58 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 153 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR) Order, Set Deadlines (Petitioners Consolidated Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantanamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABDUL RAHMAN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ALLADEEN, OMAR DEGHAYES, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, CHAMAN, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ABDULLAH AL SALI AL ASORIYA, FAYIZ AL KANDARI, OMAR RAJIB AMIN, SALEH ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, ALI ABDULLAH AL SALAMI, HANI SAEED MOHAMMED BANA AL-KALF AL-GAMDI, HANNAN SAEED MOHAMMED BANAN AL-GAMDI, FAHD UMAR ABDULMAJID AL SHAREEF, ANWAR KHAN, HAIDER KHAN, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIDAH, SAIF, MASO
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 675 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Respondents' Mootness Briefs Regarding Transferred Petitioners filed by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Lin, Jean)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 674 NOTICE of Ex Parte In Camera Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Patton, Rodney)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 673 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Patton on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Patton, Rodney)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 672 STATUS REPORT With Current Information Regarding Petitioners Previously Detained At Guantanamo Bay by BARACK OBAMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart)(Warden, Andrew)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 671 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Maloney on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Maloney, Sarah)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return [ISN 577] by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 669 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Foster on behalf of ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI (Foster, Brian)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 668 PREHEARING ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on November 3, 2009. (NP)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Alan Keller on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Keller, Roger)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Sherry Denise Soanes terminated. (Soanes, Sherry)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 665 SEALED ORDER re #663 . This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 664 NOTICE of Proposed Order (Joint) by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Scarborough, Philip)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 663 SEALED NOTICE filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 662 RESPONSE re #633 Notice (Other) to Respondents' "In the Alternative" Motion to Supplement the Record filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 661 SEALED ORDER re [doc #657] Sealed Document.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 660 NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 32) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #634 Respondents' Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order With Respect to Petitiober Uthman (ISN 027). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 27, 2009. (NP)
October 24, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #653 Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record (Kennedy, Henry)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 659 SEALED STATUS REPORT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 658 SEALED STATUS REPORT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 657 SEALED STIPULATION AND ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 656 SEALED ORDER re [#638] Sealed Motion filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 655 NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 32) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 654 NOTICE of filing under seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Safavi, Nancy)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 653 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 652 SEALED ORDER re #639 sealed motion filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE of Sealed Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED ORDER re [#639] sealed motion filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj) Modified on 10/26/2009 (znmw, ).
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 649 AFFIDAVIT pursuant to the Court's July 6, 2009 Order regarding ISN 37 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Dean, Paul) Modified to add link on 10/23/2009 (znmw, ).
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Closed status conference held on 10/21/2009. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 650 SEALED REPLY filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 648 NOTICE Regarding Testimony of Petitioner Faruq Ali Ahmed by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF (Scarborough, Philip)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MINUTE ORDER granting #626 Respondents' Third Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 21, 2009. (NP)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 646 NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 32) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 642 NOTICE of Filing of Sealed Memorandum in Opposition by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF re #639 Sealed Motion (Livingston, Schuyler)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 645 SEALED SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO STAY filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. re #639 Sealed Motion filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 644 SEALED NOTICE filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. re #638 Sealed Motion filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 643 SEALED Petitioner's OPPOSITION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztr)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 641 NOTICE of Declaration of Compliance with Discovery Order (ISN 27) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 32) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 639 SEALED MOTION to Stay filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 638 SEALED MOTION to Confirm filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 637 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Faruq Ali Ahmed's Motion for Judgment on the Record by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF (Scarborough, Philip)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE of filing under seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #635 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Under Section 3(a) of this Court's October 8, 2009 Order. Accordingly, the parties' briefs in support of the motions for judgment on the record are due on October 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 16, 2009. (NP)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief in support of the motion for judgment due by 10/19/2009 (gdf)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Under Section 3(a) of this Court's October 8, 2009 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Kathryn)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bladuell, Hector)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 633 NOTICE of classified filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER requiring additional briefing on transferred or released petitioners. (Supplemental Briefs due by 11/10/2009. Replies due by 11/20/2009). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/9/09. (lctfh1)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER directing the parties to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/8/09. (lctfh1)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 630 PREHEARING ORDER (Kennedy, Henry)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. Attorney Robert J. Branman terminated. (Branman, Robert)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Memorandum in opposition to re #626 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for ISNs 27 and 37 filed by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD. (Scarborough, Philip)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 627 NOTICE of Proposed Order (Joint) by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Livingston, Schuyler)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Petitioners Uthman (ISN 27) and Wahab (ISN 37) shall file any written opposition they may have to #626 Respondents' Third Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order no later than October 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 2, 2009. (NP)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for ISNs 27 and 37 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Paul)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE of Declaration of Compliance with Discovery Order (ISN 32) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Mason, Kathryn)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 624 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration Regarding Compliance with Discovery Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Lohrer, John)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 623 SEALED ORDER re #560 and #561 This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER scheduling hearings on the parties' cross-motions for judgment on the record. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 28, 2009. (NP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2009: #1 scheduling order) (ztj, ).
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2009. The court will issue a scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Wendy Ricard) (tj)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 621 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Rachelle C. Williams terminated. (Williams, Rachelle)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 620 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector G. Bladuell on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 619 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(tj)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 618 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for the case of Petitioner Jamal Muhammad 'Alawi Mar'i (ISN 577). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 23, 2009. (NP)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #610 Respondents' Second Motion for Extension of Time toComply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 22, 2009. (NP)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #376 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverses by ALL PETITIONERS. (Kennedy, Henry)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #351 MOTION for Order for a Status Conference by ALL PETITIONERS. (Kennedy, Henry)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #412 MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) (Kennedy, Henry)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 9/16/2009. The conference call to set dates for further proceedings, originally set for Thursday, September 24 @1pm, will instead take place on Friday, September 25 at 1pm. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting #611 Petitioner Mar'i's Motion to Lift Stay and to Set a Schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 16, 2009. (NP) Modified on 9/16/2009 (NP).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 616 NOTICE of Appearance by David Hugh White on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (White, David)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 615 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Paul Edward Ahern terminated. (Ahern, Paul)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector G. Bladuell on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Bladuell, Hector)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #480 Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery under Section I.E.2 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on July 6, 2009. (NP)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 612 NOTICE of Declaration of Compliance with Discovery Order (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Unopposed MOTION to Lift Stay with respect to Petitioner Mar'i, MOTION for Order to Set a Schedule by JAMAL MAR'I (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #607 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no. #609 . (td, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Kathryn)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE of Declaration of compliance with discovery order (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR re 547 Order, (Branman, Robert)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 608 NOTICE Declaration of Compliance with Discovery Order (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Prince, Robert)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Declaration of compliance with discovery order (681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR re 547 Order, (Branman, Robert) Modified on 9/11/2009 (td, ).
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Improper Respondents (Dkt. No. 723, 08-mc-0442). In light of subsequent rulings by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and pending matters before this Court that are related to the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/9/09. (lctfh1)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #519 Motion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 26, 2009. (lchhk1)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 605 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. re #604 Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE of Ex Parte and Under Seal Filing Regarding Task Force Review by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Mason, Kathryn)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting #601 Petitioners' Emergency Motion for Clarification of the Court's August 10, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 12, 2009. (lchhk1)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #562 Respondents' Motion for an Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order. Accordingly, respondents shall produce the items that are the subject of the Order, and file a declaration that they have done so, by no later than September 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on August 11, 2009. (lchhk1)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 602 REPLY to opposition to motion re #562 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Mason, Kathryn)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Emergency MOTION For Clarification Of The Court's August 10, 2009 Order re #600 Order by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER requiring Guantanamo Review Task Force status report. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 10, 2009. (lchhk2.)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for ISN 32 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Appendix One, #2 Appendix Two, #3 Appendix Three, #4 Appendix Four, #5 Appendix Five, #6 Appendix Six, #7 Appendix Seven)(Soanes, Sherry)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 598 SEALED REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 597 SEALED REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 596 RESPONSE re #572 Notice (Other) Response to "Notice of Potential Conflicts" filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Pemberton, Alan)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NOTICE of Sealed Filing of Reply Memoranda by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Paul Cirino terminated. (Cirino, Paul)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ERRATA to Notice of Public Filing of Factual Return (ISN 037) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON #587 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Missing Exhibit)(Dean, Paul)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #588 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Declassified Factual Return for ISN 32. Accordingly, respondents shall file the declassified factual return on or before August 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 31, 2009. (lchhk1)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SEALED REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 591 NOTICE of sealed filing of reply memorandum (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR re #561 Sealed Motion (Branman, Robert)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 590 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 589 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ztr)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Factual Return for ISN 32 Suitable for Public Release by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Soanes, Sherry)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return (ISN 037) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Appendix Narrative, #2 Appendix Exhibits Part 1, #3 Appendix Exhibits Part 2, #4 Appendix Exhibits Part 3, #5 Appendix Exhibits Part 4)(Dean, Paul)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 586 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Memoranda in Opposition by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF re #567 Sealed Motion, #566 Sealed Motion (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Memorandum in opposition to re #562 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE of Filing -- Declassified Factual Return (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 ISN 156 declassified factual return)(Finn, Stephen)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 583 NOTICE of Filing -- Declassified Factual Return (ISN 117) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 ISN 117 declassified factual return)(Finn, Stephen)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE of public filing of factual return (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Branman, Robert)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 581 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for Petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail (ISN 522) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Attachments: #1 Factual Return)(Prince, Robert)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for Petitioner Uthman (ISN 027) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Narrative, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Exhibit Part 4, #6 Exhibit Part 5, #7 Exhibit Part 6)(Ahern, Paul)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for Majid Ahmed (ISN 041) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Narrative), #2 Appendix (Exhibits Part 1), #3 Appendix (Exhibits Part 2), #4 Appendix (Exhibits Part 3), #5 Appendix (Exhibits Part 4))(Johnson, Timothy)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Appendix Narrative, #2 Appendix Exhibits - Declarations, #3 Appendix Exhibits - Documents)(Williams, Rachelle)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 578 SEALED REPLY filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE of sealed filing of reply memorandum by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR re #555 Notice (Other) (Branman, Robert)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 575 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Traverse by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE of Filing under Seal by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI re #561 Sealed Motion (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 7/20/2009. Next status conference will be held on 9/16/2009 @ 4:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (Court Reporter Annie SHaw.) (tj)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 572 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Potential Conflicts Pursuant to D.C. Rule of Professional Responsibility 1.7 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 571 SEALED Opposition filed by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(ztr)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Filing under Seal by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI re #560 Sealed Motion (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE of Filing of Mohamed Mohamed Hassan Odaini's Traverse by MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI (Scarborough, Philip)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE of Filing of Abdalmalik Abdal Wahab's Traverse by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI (Scarborough, Philip)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 567 SEALED MOTION for Stay of Proceedings filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 566 SEALED MOTION filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse by YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarborough, Philip)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 564 NOTICE of Filing Sealed Motion by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #565 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Traverse of Petitioner Yasein Khasem Mohammed Esmail (ISN 522). Accordingly, ISN 522's traverse shall be filed on or before July 24, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 16, 2009. (lchhk1)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of Filing of Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif's Traverse by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Scarborough, Philip)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 562 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's July 6, 2009 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 561 SEALED MOTION to Confirm filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 560 SEALED MOTION for Stay filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE of one business day delay in filing two sealed motions by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR re #555 Notice (Other) (Branman, Robert)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #534 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Declarations Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Orders; granting #548 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Certain Answers with respect to ISNs 037, 522, 156 and 681, and denying #548 as moot with respect to ISN 041. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 13, 2009. (lchhk1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Mukhtar Yahya Najee al Warafi's Traverse by MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE (Scarborough, Philip)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Uthman Abdul Rahim Mohammed Uthman's Traverse by OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 556 STATUS REPORT (Joint Schedule of Pending Motions) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Cirino, Paul)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 555 NOTICE of sealed filing of two motions by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Branman, Robert)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner Faruq Ali Ahmed's Traverse by FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER staying petition of ISN 041 for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 9, 2009. (lchhk1)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE of Proposed Order To Stay Petition by MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED re #549 Stipulation (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION To Stay Petition by MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED. (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverses by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED (Livingston, Schuyler)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #480 Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery under Section I.E.2 of the Case Management Order. This classified order has been filed with the Court Security Office. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 6, 2009. (lchhk1)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/20/2009 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A status conference in this action is HEREBY scheduled for 7/20/09 @ 10:00. (So Ordered Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 7/1/09). (tj)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE of Filing Declaration in ISN 032 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sherry D. Soanes)(Soanes, Sherry)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 545 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration (ISN 037) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dean, Paul)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 544 NOTICE of Filing Declaration (ISN 156) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER concerning the filing of Classified or Under Seal Motions and concerning Outstanding Motions. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 29, 2009. (lchhk2.)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER staying petition of ISN 165 for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 29, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE Order: It is hereby ORDERED that the status hearing in this case scheduled for June 30, 2009, is cancelled and shall be rescheduled by the clerk. (Kennedy, Henry)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE of Filing Declaration by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lohrer, John)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration (ISN 027) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ahern, Paul)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration (ISN 041) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Johnson, Timothy)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE of filing declaration (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Branman, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 537 NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Prince, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 536 NOTICE of Proposed Order to Stay Petition by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID re #535 Stipulation (Livingston, Schuyler)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 535 STIPULATION STIPULATION TO STAY PETITION by ADIL EL HAJ OBAID. (Livingston, Schuyler)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declarations Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Orders by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Finn, Stephen)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part #532 , the Emergency Petition of ISN 156 to Pray and Use the Toilet Without Wearing Shackles. (Kennedy, Henry)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Emergency MOTION To Pray And Use The Toilet Without Wearing Shackles by ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of David H. Remes), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #531 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Declaration Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Orders. Accordingly, respondents shall have until June 29, 2009, to file a declaration with respect to their compliance with the court's discovery orders for ISN 37. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 22, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Declaration pursuant to the Court's Discovery Orders by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Paul)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER clarifying #524 court's June 4, 2009 order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 18, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #529 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip A. Scarborough. Attorney Scarborough is admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of petitioners. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 18, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Status Conference currently scheduled for 6/22/09 @ 2:00pm is hereby RESCHEDULED for 6/30/2009 @ 4:30 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip A. Scarborough, :Firm- Covington & Burling LLP, :Address- 1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20004-2401. Phone No. - 202-662-5286. Fax No. - 202-778-5286 by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip A. Scarborough, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pemberton, Alan)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverses by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pemberton, Alan)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #527 Petitioners' Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Traverses. Accordingly, petitioners must file their traverses on or before July 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 10, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 526 REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 525 RESPONSE re #519 Notice (Other) Opposition to Government's "Motion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity" filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Livingston, Schuyler)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting #489 Respondents' Motion for Partial Reconsideration and for an Extension of Time with respect to the Court's April 8, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 4, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #523 Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Traverses. Petitioners shall file their traverses on or before June 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 3, 2009. (lchhk1)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverses by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 521 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #514 Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Reply. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on June 1, 2009.(lchhk1)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHI
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Motion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners' Consolidated Reply to the Government's Oppositions to the Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery by ALL PETITIONERS (Livingston, Schuyler)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part Petitioners' Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines (Dkt. No. 1772, 08-mc-0442). Petitioners may file one consolidated opposition to the government's Motion for Reconsideration by Friday, May 29, 2009. The government may file a reply brief by Friday, June 5, 2009. The hearing date is reset from June 8, 2009 to June 9, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/26/09. (lctfh1)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Oppositions to Petitioners Motion for Additional Discovery Under Section I.E.2 by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 513 REPLY to opposition to motion re #489 MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Cirino, Paul)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, May 27, 2009, petitioners shall file one consolidated opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force (Dkt No. 1755, 08-mc-0442). The government's reply is due by Wednesday, June 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/20/09. (lctfh1)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Government's Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures (Dkt. No. 1762, 08-mc-0442). The government is ordered to file its reply on or before Friday, May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 05/18/09. (lctfh1)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of CSO Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Al Wahab's (ISN 037) Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dean, Paul)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #475 Respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend Factual Returns for ISNs 032, 037, and 041. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 11, 2009. (lchhk1)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Uthman's (ISN 027) Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Ahern, Paul)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 505 RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE,
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Faruq Ali Ahmed (ISN 32)'s Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re #480 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Soanes, Sherry)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Additional Discovery with respect to the discovery requests as to Yasein Khasem Mohammad Esmail by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Prince, Robert)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 502 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Al-Warafi's (ISN 117) Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re #480 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Lohrer, John)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Majid Mahmoud Ahmed's (ISN 041) Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Johnson, Timothy)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 500 NOTICE of Filing Respondents Opposition to Petitioner Adnan Farhan Abdul Latif's (ISN 156) Motion for Additional Discovery (Dkt. 480) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner Al-Busayss' (ISN 165) Motion for Additional Discovery (Docket # 480) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE of filing of oppposition to motion for additional discovery (Dk. No. 480) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Branman, Robert)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #496 Respondents' Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Filing Regarding Guantanamo Review Task Force Discovery. Respondents' filing is due on or before May 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 11, 2009. (lchhk1)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Memorandum in opposition to re #489 MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Livingston, Schuyler)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Filing Regarding Guantanamo Review Task Force Discovery by DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #495 Respondents' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion for Additional Discovery of Petitioner Abdal Wahab (ISN 037). Respondents' response must be filed on or before May 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 8, 2009. (lchhk1)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Additional Discovery of Petitioner Abdal Wahab (ISN 037) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #493 Respondent's Second Motion for an Extension of Time to Provide a Proposal or Seek Reconsideration of the April 8, 2009 Order re: Discovery of Guantanamo Review Task Force Materials. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 4, 2009. (lchhk1)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 494 STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide a Proposal or Seek Reconsideration of the April 8, 2009 Order re: Discovery of Guantanamo Review Task Force Materials by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 492 REPLY to opposition to motion re #475 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns for ISNs 032, 037, and 041 to Include Additional Declarations and Newly Discovered Inculpatory Evidence filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Johnson, Timothy)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #479 Petitioners' Motion Seeking Leave of Court to File Consolidated Discovery Motion in Excess of 45 Pages; and granting #482 Respondents' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery Under Section 1.E.2 of the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 28, 2009. (NP)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Declaration of Christian Bonat by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON re #489 MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Cirino, Paul) Modified on 4/27/2009 (tr).(FILED UNDER SEAL)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MOTION for Reconsideration re #477 Order on Motion for Discovery,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James H. Robertson, #2 Declaration of David M. Thomas, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Memorandum in opposition to re #475 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns for ISNs 032, 037, and 041 to Include Additional Declarations and Newly Discovered Inculpatory Evidence filed by ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED. (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Blanche L. Bruce terminated. (Bruce, Blanche)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 486 REPLY to opposition to motion re #482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery (Docket # 480) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Cirino, Paul)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Memorandum in opposition to re #482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery (Docket # 480) filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachelle C. Williams on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Williams, Rachelle)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioners' Consolidated Motion for Additional Discovery (Docket # 480) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Cirino, Paul)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Memorandum in opposition to re #479 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Petitioners' Motion for Additional Discovery filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Cirino, Paul)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners Consolidated Motion For Additional Discovery Under Section I.E.2 Of The Case Management Order by ALL PETITIONERS re #479 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Petitioners' Motion for Additional Discovery (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Petitioners' Motion for Additional Discovery by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #339 , #391 petitioners' motions for additional discovery and #446 petitioners' motion "to compel compliance with sections I.D.1 and I.E.1 of the Case Management Order." Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 8, 2009. (NP)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Johnson, Timothy)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns for ISNs 032, 037, and 041 to Include Additional Declarations and Newly Discovered Inculpatory Evidence by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1526, 08-mc-0442). For the reasons set forth during the hearing on March 26, 2009, Press Applicants are permitted to intervene only to oppose the government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1416, 08-mc-0442) before this Court. This order does not permit Press Applicants to intervene in any case before the Merits Judges. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/2/09. (lctfh1)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 474 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. Attorney Corey Jason Smith terminated. (Smith, Corey)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 473 RESPONSE re #462 Memorandum,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Livingston, Schuyler)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 471 RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #470 Petitioners' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response. Petitioners' response is due April 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 31, 2009. (NP)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by ALL PETITIONERS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Livingston, Schuyler)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Finn on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Finn, Stephen)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry Denise Soanes on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Soanes, Sherry)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. Attorney Brent I. Anderson terminated. (Anderson, Brent)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHME
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Assertion and Exhibit in Factual Return for ISN 156 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Anderson, Brent)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REPLY to opposition to motion re #446 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Sections I.D.1 and I.E.1 of the Case Management Order filed by ALL PETITIONERS. (Livingston, Schuyler)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Filing of Amie Draves of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment of Terms of Protective Order by ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI (Livingston, Schuyler)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE of Classified Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Johnson, Timothy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Memorandum in opposition to re #446 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Sections I.D.1 and I.E.1 of the Case Management Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (England Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Mueller Declaration), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Timothy)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 456 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 6, 2009. (NP)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order A status conference shall be held on June 22, 2009, at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 6, 2009. (NP)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 454 NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to Exculpatory Information (ISN 37) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Dean, Paul)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 453 NOTICE of Supplemental Certification Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information (ISN 681) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Branman, Robert)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 2/27/2009. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (tj )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On Thursday, March 26, 2009, at 2:00 pm, the parties shall appear for a hearing on Respondents' Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1416, 08-mc-0442) AND Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1526, 08-mc-0442) in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Each party (Petitioners, Respondents, and Press Applicants) shall designate one counsel to speak on their behalf. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 452 NOTICE /Certification Pertaining to Produciton of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON (Lohrer, John)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 451 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 46 in 1:05-cv-01008-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 54 in 1:05-cv-01237-ESH, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 97 in 1:05-cv-00345-JDB, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 38 in 1:05-cv-01311-RCL, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 136 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-00586-RWR, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 30 in 1:05-cv-01242-RCL, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01246-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-00887-RWR, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 79 in 1:08-mc-00444-TFH, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 39 in 1:05-cv-00621-PLF, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 38 in 1:05-cv-00891-RBW, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 42 in 1:05-cv-01001-ESH, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 57 in 1:05-cv-00714-RBW, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 25 in 1:05-cv-01243-RCL, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 59 in 1:05-cv-00640-EGS, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 128 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 47 in 1:05-cv-00878-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 46 in 1:05-cv-00584-CKK, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-01009-JDB, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 40 in 1:05-cv-00665-RWR, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 193 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 77 in 1:05-cv-00723-RWR, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 57 in 1:05-cv-00490-PLF, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 221 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW, 47 in 1:05-cv-01493-RBW) Order,, Set Deadlines, (Petitioners' Consolidated Reply Brief Regarding Jurisdiction over Habeas Petitions of Petitioners Transferred from Guantnamo Bay) filed by MURAT KURNAZ, RABIYE KURNAZ, MARTIN MUBANGA, KATHLEEN MUBANGA, JAMIL EL-BANNA, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, BISHER AL-RAWI, JAHIDA SAYYADI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, NAIEF FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, OBAID FAHAD MUTLAQ AL-OTAIBI, ABDULAZIZ SA'AD OSHAN, MOHAMMED SA'AD OSHAN, IBRAHIM SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDUL AZIZ SULEIMAN AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLA THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, METAB THANI FARIS AL-ANAZI, ADEL EGLA HUSSAN AL-NUSSAIRI, ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SATUM, ABDUL-SALAM GAITHAN MUREEF AL-SHIHRY, AWADH AMER FARHAN AL-SHIHRY, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, JOHN DOES, MURTADHA ALI MAGRAM, RIYADH ALI MAGRAM, ABDULLAH IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, ABDULLATIF IBRAHIM ABDULLAH AL RASHAIDAN, WAHIDOF ABDUL MOKIT, AHMED ERRACHIDI, ABDELJABBAR ERRACHIDI, HAZI AHMED, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ELHAM BATTAYAV, SALIM MUHOOD ADEM, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, CHAMAN, NAZUL GUL, NASRULLAH, RAHMATTULLAH, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ABDULLA MOHAMMED KAHN, ADEL HASSAN HAMAD, HABIBULLAH MANGUT, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, AMINULLAH, ABDUL MAJID MOHAMMADI, AHSANULLAH PIRZAI, IHSAN ULLAH PEERZAI, EHSAN ULLAH, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, MOHAMMED AMON, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMAD AKHTIAR, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, RASHID AWAD AL AWEDA, RASHID AWADH RASHID AL-UWAIDAH, THAMIR AL-UWAIDAH, THAMER AL AWEDA, YOUSIF ABDULLAH AL-RUBAISH, ABDULLAH SALEH AL-RUBAISH, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, MUHAMMED QASIM, ABDANNOUR SAMEUR, ABU ABDUL AZIZ, ISA ALI AL-MURBATI, FAWAZ NAMAN HAMOUD, BENDER AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, AYED HAMOUD HEZAM AL-OTEIBI AL-SHABANY, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, MOHAMMED AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, HAFIZULLAH AHMED ALI AL-ASADI, MOHAMMED BIN JAIED BIN ALADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, JAIED BIN HADI AL MOHAMMED AL SUBAIE, BIJAD DEFALLA OTEIBI, SULTAN DEFALLA OTEIBI, ALGHAMDI ABDULRAHMAN OTHMAN A, ALGHAMDI AHMED OTHMAN A, MOHAMMED AL AMIN, SHAKER AAMER, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH GERAB ALSAAEI, ALI SALEH BIN GERAB AL-ABDULLAH OWN SAARI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SH