In Re FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION
Plaintiff: INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., BISSETT INSTITUTIONAL BALANCED TRUST, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, ROBERT L. GARBER, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, ANNE E. FLYNN, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, BISSETT CANADIAN EQUITY FUND, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, VINCENT VINCI, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, SASSAN SHAHROKHINIA, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST and FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS
Defendant: DANIEL H. MUDD, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, JAMIE S. GORELICK, DONALD B. MARRON, JOE PICKETT, H. PATRICK SWYGERT, FREDERIC V. MALEK, KPMG, KENNETH M. DUBERSTEIN, ANN KOROLOGOS, LESLIE RAHL, RADIAN GROUP INC, GOLDMAN SACHS, RADIAN GUARANTY INC., WILLIAM R. HARVEY, MOLLY H. BORDONARO, THOMAS P. GERRITY, VICTOR H. ASHE, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER, TAYLOR C. SEGUE, III, ANNE M. MULCAHY, MANUEL J. JUSTIZ, KPMG LLP and STEPHEN B. ASHLEY
Petitioner: COMINVEST ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH, SCHERTLER & ONORATO, STATMAN. HARRIS & EYRICH, LLC, CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, CENTER FOR AUDIT QUALITY, KHADIJA DUMA, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, JEFF PECHAN, RINIS TRAVEL SERVICE, INC. PROFIT SHARING TRUST U.A., PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP and BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD LLP
Interested Party: MCSLARROW CONSULTING LLC, MILLER, HAMILTON, SNIDER & ODOM, OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, RICCHETTI, INC., CLARK, LYTLE & GEDULDIG, OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT, DELOITTE & TOUCHE LLP, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, MARKS PANETH & SHRON LLP, HAROLD FORD GROUP, LLC, RUST CONSULTING, INC., GRAY COMPANY, LLC and JOHNSON, MADIGAN, PECK, BOLAND & STEWART, INC.
Cross Defendant: FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION
Intervenor Defendant: FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2004cv01639
Filed: September 23, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

<
Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in #1145 Lead Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion to Authorize Cy Pres Distribution, and pursuant to this Court's retained jurisdiction of this Consolidated Action for the purpose of the administration and execution of the Settlement, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Court approves the final cy pres distribution of $175,010.67 to the following charity: Ohio Alliance Boys and Girls Clubs of America, Inc. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/12/18. (lcrjl3)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1147 AFFIDAVIT re #1145 MOTION for Order Directing Cy Pres Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support Thereof by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Sommers, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1146 MEMORANDUM re #1145 MOTION for Order Directing Cy Pres Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Amin-Giwner, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1145 MOTION for Order Directing Cy Pres Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Sommers, Daniel)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1144 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Attorney Michael J. Walsh, Jr terminated. (Walsh, Michael)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1143 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Attorney Jeffrey William Kilduff terminated. (Kilduff, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the Court approves payment of fees and expenses incurred by counsel associated with administering the Consolidated Action and Settlement from June 26, 2015 to September 14, 2016. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/08/16. (tb)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1141 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Notification of Final Distribution by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Notification of Final Distribution and Motion to Authorize Fees and Expenses, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of W.B. Markovits, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
November 19, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference is rescheduled for 12/11/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference previously scheduled for November 13, 2015 is RESCHEDULED for December 11, 2015 at 4:00PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/19/2015. (lcrjl2, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for November 13, 2015 at 4:00PM is CONTINUED until a date and time to be determined by the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/12/2015. (lcrjl2, )
October 30, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 11/13/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled for November 13, 2015 at 4:00pm in Courtroom 18 to update the Court on the distribution of the remaining funds. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/29/2015. (lcrjl2, )
September 29, 2015 Filing 1140 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Distribution of Funds To Date by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Sommers, Daniel)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that within 7 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly submit a status report apprising the Court of: (1) the distributions made to date; (2) the remaining distributions to be paid; and (3) the projected timetable for paying any outstanding distributions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/22/2015. (lcrjl2, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 RESERVE DISTRIBUTION ORDER. (See the order for complete details). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/6/2015. (jth)
June 26, 2015 Filing 1138 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs Motion to Authorize Distribution from the Reserve Fund by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Jose C. Fraga with Exhibits (Part 1 of 2, Decl. & Exs. A-1 to D-9), #4 Declaration of Jose C. Fraga with Exhibits (Part 2 of 2, Exs. D-10 to E), #5 Declaration of W.B. Markovits)(Sommers, Daniel)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/10/14. (tb, )
October 30, 2014 Filing 1136 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for a Class Distribution Order and Response to the Court's October 17, 2014 Order by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of W.B. Markovits, #4 Declaration of Daniel S. Sommers, #5 Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami)(Sommers, Daniel)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER : Upon consideration of the Lead Plaintiffs' #1133 MOTION to Allow Additional Expenses filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM; it is hereby ordered that the parties submit a statement to the Court describing in greater particularity the work performed by Garden City Group that warrants a payment of $2.4 million. Such statement shall be due within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/17/14. (tb, )
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1130 Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Disbursement of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/17/2014. (lcrjl1, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 1134 MEMORANDUM re #1133 MOTION to Allow Additional Expenses filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Sommers, Daniel)
July 15, 2014 Filing 1133 MOTION to Allow Additional Expenses by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
July 15, 2014 Filing 1132 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #1123 Notice of Appeal, filed by KHADIJA DUMA ; ORDERED that the order to show cause be discharged; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be granted. USCA Case Number 14-5029. (md, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 1131 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1130 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Allow Disbursement of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sommers, Daniel)
July 10, 2014 Filing 1130 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Allow Disbursement of Attorneys Fees and Expenses by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #1120 Notice of Appeal, filed by RINIS TRAVEL SERVICE, INC. PROFIT SHARING TRUST U.A. 6-1-1989 ; ORDERED that the motion be granted, and this case is hereby dismissed. USCA Case Number 14-7007. (md, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER of USCA as to #1123 Notice of Appeal, filed by KHADIJA DUMA ; USCA Case Number 14-5029. It is ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that this case be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of Appellants motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. The district court is requested to notify this court promptly following its disposition of the motion. (kb)
February 5, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-5029 for #1123 Notice of Appeal, filed by KHADIJA DUMA. (kb)
February 4, 2014 Filing 1127 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ;USCA Case Number 14-5029. (znmw, ) Modified USCA case number on 2/6/2014 (znmw, ).
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1124 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by KHADIJA DUMA. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/4/2014. (lcrjl1, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 1126 RESPONSE re #1124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Sommers, Daniel)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1125 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re #1123 Notice of Appeal. (rdj)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1124 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by KHADIJA DUMA (rdj)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1118 Memorandum & Opinion, #1119 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by KHADIJA DUMA. Filing fee $ 0.00. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. "Leave to file granted". by Judge Richard J. Leon (rdj)
January 28, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-7007 for #1121 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA. (jf, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 1122 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re USCA Appeal Fees re #1120 Notice of Appeal; (jf, )
January 13, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 4616061557 re #1120 Notice of Appeal, filed by RINIS TRAVEL SERVICE, INC. PROFIT SHARING TRUST U.A. 6-1-1989 (jf, )
January 9, 2014 Filing 1121 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #1120 Notice of Appeal. (rdj)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1118 Memorandum & Opinion, #1119 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by RINIS TRAVEL SERVICE, INC. PROFIT SHARING TRUST U.A. 6-1-1989. Filing fee $ 0.00. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (rdj) "Leave to file granted". by Judge Richard J. Leon
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT: Granting #1092 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation by LEAD PLAINTIFFS ; and granting #1093 Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. This Judgment and Order is a Judgment in the Consolidated Action as to all claims asserted. The Courts find, for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), that there is no just reason for delay and expressly directs entry of judgment as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/05/13. (tb, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 1118 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/05/13. (tb, )
October 31, 2013 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 10/31/2013 before Judge Richard J. Leon:. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (tb, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 1117 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Hall Warin on behalf of Marks Paneth & Shron LLP (Warin, Kathleen)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1116 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Spagnoletti on behalf of SCHERTLER & ONORATO (Spagnoletti, Robert) (Main Document 1116 replaced on 11/1/2013) (znmw, ).
October 31, 2013 Filing 1115 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny C. Onorato on behalf of SCHERTLER & ONORATO (Onorato, Danny) (Main Document 1115 replaced on 11/1/2013) (znmw, ).
October 29, 2013 Filing 1114 MOTION to Intervene by KHADIJA DUMA (jf, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 1113 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1110 MOTION to Strike #1108 Supplemental Memorandum of Jeff Pechan and Cafco-Gold Equity Fund, LP's Objection to the Plan of Allocation filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Sommers, Daniel)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1112 Memorandum in opposition to re #1110 MOTION to Strike #1108 Supplemental Memorandum of Jeff Pechan and Cafco-Gold Equity Fund, LP's Objection to the Plan of Allocation filed by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike)(Oddo, Stephen)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1111 MOTION to Strike Undocketed Objection of Rinis Travel Service, Inc. Profit Sharing Trust U.A. 6-1-1989 by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Markovits Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Kilduff Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Warin Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rinis BOA Objection, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1110 MOTION to Strike #1108 Supplemental Memorandum of Jeff Pechan and Cafco-Gold Equity Fund, LP's Objection to the Plan of Allocation by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1109 AFFIDAVIT re #1108 Supplemental Memorandum of Greggory A. Brauer, Ph.D. in Support of Class Members Jeff Pechan and Cafco-Gold Equity Fund, L.P.'s Objection to the Plan of Allocation by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oddo, Stephen)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1108 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Class Members Jeff Pechan and Cafco-Gold Equity Fund, L.P.'s Objection to the Plan of Allocation filed by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN. (Oddo, Stephen)
October 11, 2013 Filing 1107 RESPONSE re #1099 to Objection and Supplemental Memoranda in Further Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W.B. Markovits, #2 Declaration of Kenneth N. Kotz and Frank C. Torchio, #3 Declaration of Jose C. Fraga, #4 Declaration of Daniel S. Sommers)(Sommers, Daniel) Modified to add link on 10/15/2013 (znmw, ).
October 8, 2013 Filing 1106 NOTICE of CAFA Compliance by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Warin, Francis)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1105 NOTICE of CAFA Compliance by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walsh, Michael)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDERED that Stephen J. Oddo is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing and pariticipating as counsel for JEFF PECHAN and CAFCO LARGE CAP FUND L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/26/13. (tb, )
September 24, 2013 Filing 1103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen J. Oddo, :Firm- Robbins Arroyo LLP, :Address- 600 B Street, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA 92101. Phone No. - 619-525-3990. Fax No. - 619-525-3991 by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. Oddo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Patrick)
September 23, 2013 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #1098 Notice of Appearance was entered in error as a duplicate of Docket Entry #1097 Notice of Appearance. In addition, Docket Entry #1097 Notice of Appearance was filed using the wrong event and has been modified to correctly reflect the title of the document being filed. (znmw, )
September 23, 2013 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1100 Large Additional Attachment(s); emailed to psmith@dehay.com, cc'd 129 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attachments small enough to include with memorandum; do not file separately unless larger than 10MB. (znmw, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 1102 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN #1099 Memorandum filed by JEFF PECHAN, CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration & Exhibit A (Brauer), #2 Exhibit B (Brauer), #3 Exhibit C (Brauer), #4 Exhibit D (Brauer), #5 Exhibit E (Brauer), #6 Exhibit F (Brauer))(Smith, Patrick) Modified event title on 9/23/2013 (znmw, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1101 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN #1099 Memorandum filed by JEFF PECHAN, CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration & Exhibit (Cafco))(Smith, Patrick) Modified event title on 9/23/2013 (znmw, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1100 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN #1099 Memorandum filed by JEFF PECHAN, CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration & Exhibit (Pechan))(Smith, Patrick) Modified event title on 9/23/2013 (znmw, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1099 MEMORANDUM by CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P., JEFF PECHAN. (Smith, Patrick)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1098 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Charles Smith on behalf of CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P. (Smith, Patrick) Modified on 9/23/2013 (znmw, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1097 NOTICE of Filing Intent to Appear and Be Heard filed by JEFF PECHAN, CAFCO-LARGE CAP FUNDS, L.P. (Smith, Patrick) Modified event title on 9/23/2013 (znmw, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1096 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1093 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses filed by BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Barry)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1095 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Thomas Inglima on behalf of BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD LLP (Inglima, Philip)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1094 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry E. Cohen on behalf of BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD LLP (Cohen, Barry)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1093 MOTION for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit re Declaration of W.B. Markovits and Joseph T. Deters in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1092 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Plan of Allocation by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W.B. Markovits and Joseph T. Deters in Support, #2 Exhibit 1A Markovits Stock & DeMarco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1B Bernstein Liebhard Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1C Waite Schneider Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1D Berman DeValerio Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1E Cohen Milstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit 1F Statman Harris Declaration, #8 Exhibit 1G Karam Declaration, #9 Exhibit 1H Grant Eisenhofer Declaration, #10 Exhibit 1I WeissLaw Declaration, #11 Exhibit 1J Bernstein Litowitz Declaration, #12 Exhibit 1K Strauss Troy Declaration, #13 Exhibit 1L Spector Roseman Declaration, #14 Exhibit 1M Lockridge Declaration, #15 Exhibit 1N Kohn Swift Declaration, #16 Exhibit 1O Heins Mills Declaration, #17 Exhibit 1P Neuwelt Declaration, #18 Exhibit 1Q Climaco Declaration, #19 Exhibit 1R Frankovitch Declaration, #20 Exhibit 1S DataNav Declaration, #21 Exhibit 1T Cummins Brown Declaration, #22 Exhibit 1U Lowey Declaration, #23 Exhibit 1V Barrett Weber Declaration, #24 Exhibit 1W Federman Sherwood Declaration, #25 Exhibit 2 Jose C. Fraga Declaration, #26 Exhibit 3 SCAS Top 100 Settlements, #27 Exhibit 4 NERA Trends Full Year, #28 Exhibit 5 Brian T. Fitzpatrick Declaration, #29 Exhibit 6 Time and Lodestar Report, #30 Exhibit 7 Hearing Transcript, #31 Exhibit 8 NERA Trends Mid Year, #32 Exhibit 9 Cost and Expense Report, #33 Exhibit 10 Damages Summary, #34 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1091 NOTICE Notice of Supplemental Filing in Connection with Fees and Expenses Application Submiitted by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel by Statman, Harris & Eyrich, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Statman, Alan)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, SETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, AND STAYING NON-SETTLEMENT RELATED PROCEEDINGS. SETTLEMENT FAIRNESS HEARING set for 10/31/2013 AT 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/7/2013. (kc ) (Main Document 1090 replaced on 6/18/2013) (zad, ).
May 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
May 14, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set in error for 4/29/2013 is set for 5/29/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
May 14, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/29/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
May 8, 2013 Filing 1089 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc. by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit 1: Stipulation of Settlement of Securities Action)(Sommers, Daniel). Added MOTION for Hearing, MOTION to Stay on 5/9/2013 (znmw, ).
May 8, 2013 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entries #1087 Notice (Other) (incorrect event) and #1088 Memorandum (separate docket entry) were entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading as a MOTION with the memorandum in support attached to the same docket entry. (znmw, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 1088 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM re #1087 Notice (Other), filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Sommers, Daniel) Modified on 5/8/2013 (znmw, ).
May 7, 2013 Filing 1087 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc. by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Stipulation of Settlement of Securities Action)(Sommers, Daniel) Modified on 5/8/2013 (znmw, ).
April 15, 2013 Filing 1086 SEALED REPLY filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. re #1067 SEALE MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Supplemental Declaration of W.B. Markovits)(zjf, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1082 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the following documents, dated December 6, 2012, are hereby sealed: Lead Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; and Second Supplemental Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/15/13. (lcrjl1, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 1085 NOTICE of Change of Address by James R. Cummins (Cummins, James)
December 7, 2012 Filing 1084 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Leanne G. Spencer. (kc )
December 6, 2012 Filing 1083 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2012: #1 Exhibit Reply (LODGED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit Supplement (LODGED UNDER SEAL)) (jf, ).
December 6, 2012 Filing 1082 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
November 27, 2012 Filing 1081 (Sealed) Memorandum in opposition to re #1067 SEALED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relieffiled by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (jf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2012: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (jf, ).
November 27, 2012 Filing 1080 (Sealed) Memorandum in opposition to re #1067 SEALED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (jf, ) (jf, ).
November 27, 2012 Filing 1079 (Sealed) RESPONSE re #1067 SEALED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by KPMG LLP. (jf, ) (jf, ).
November 27, 2012 Filing 1078 (Sealed) Joint Memorandum in opposition to re #1067 SEALED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (jf, ) (jf, ).
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1076 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/27/12. (lcrjl1)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1073 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/27/12. (lcrjl1)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1072 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/27/12. (lcrjl1)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1070 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/27/12. (lcrjl1)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1077 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY re #1076 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Aronica, Joseph)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1076 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1075 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1074 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FRANKLIN RAINES (Miller, Adam)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1073 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1072 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1071 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by KPMG LLP (Warin, Francis)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1070 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warin, Francis)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) vacating the Minute Order setting a Status Conference for 11/29/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.. Aproved by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/21/12. (jeb, )
November 20, 2012 VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/29/12.....MINUTE ORDER: Setting a Status Conference set for 11/29/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. (tb, ) Modified on 11/29/2012 (tb, ).
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER: For reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered on 11/20/12; it is hereby ordered that defendant LEANNE SPENCER's #942 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED and that judgment is entered for defendant SPENCER on all counts against her and that defendant SPENCER is dismissed from this suit. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/20/12. (tb, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 1068 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/20/12. (tb, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 1067 SEALED MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of W.B. Markovits) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf, ). Modified on 11/19/2012 (zjf, ).
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER granting #1059 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Documents 1, 2, and 4 dated 10/24/2012 and Document 3 dated 10/22/2012 are sealed. (SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/8/2012. (jth)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER: Upon consideration of the lead plaintiff's #1062 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/15/12. (tb, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 1064 LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT re #1062 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 1063 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
November 6, 2012 Filing 1062 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1061 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney Eun Young Choi terminated. (Choi, Eun Young)
October 24, 2012 Filing 1060 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
October 24, 2012 Filing 1059 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1058 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of J. Timothy Howard. (kc )
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this 16th, day of October, 2012, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion for Summary Judgment #938 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that judgment is entered for defendant Howard on all counts against him and that defendant Howard is dismissed from this suit. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/16/2012. (see order) (kc)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1056 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/16/2012. (kc )
October 1, 2012 Filing 1055 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Franklin D. Raines. (kc )
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1052 MOTION to Modify Order Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/20/12. (lcrjl1)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER, For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this 20th, day of September 2012, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant Franklin D. Raine's Motion for Summary Judgment #940 is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that judgment be entered for defendant Raines on all counts against him and that defendant Raines is dismissed from this suit. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/20/2012. (see order) (kc)
September 20, 2012 Filing 1053 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/20/2012. (kc )
September 14, 2012 Filing 1052 MOTION to Modify Order Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1051 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 6/6/12; Date of Issuance:9/4/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Gels, Patty)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1050 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 6/13/12; Date of Issuance:9/4/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Gels, Patty)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1049 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 6/7/12; Date of Issuance:9/4/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Gels, Patty)
September 4, 2012 Filing 1048 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 6/5/12; Date of Issuance:9/4/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/25/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2012.(Gels, Patty)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1047 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #939 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Walsh, Michael)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1046 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Walsh, Michael)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1045 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Clark, Richard)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1044 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1043 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #971 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1042 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #969 Memorandum in Opposition, to J. Timothy Howard's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1041 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #972 Memorandum in Opposition, to KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1040 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #943 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against KPMG LLP filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1039 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #968 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on FAS 133 Accounting Issues filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1038 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #970 Memorandum in Opposition, to Leanne G. Spencer's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1037 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #967 Memorandum in Opposition, to Franklin D. Raines's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1036 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Warin, Francis)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1035 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #943 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against KPMG LLP filed by KPMG LLP. (Warin, Francis)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1034 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 236, #3 Exhibit 237, #4 Exhibit 238, #5 Exhibit 239, #6 Exhibit 240, #7 Exhibit 241, #8 Exhibit 242, #9 Exhibit 243, #10 Exhibit 244)(Miller, Adam)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1033 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FRANKLIN RAINES re #1032 Memorandum (Choi, Eun Young) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2012: #1 Declaration of Franklin D. Raines (SEALED)) (jf, ).
August 3, 2012 Filing 1032 MEMORANDUM re #940 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANKLIN RAINES by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Choi, Eun Young)
July 20, 2012 Filing 1031 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LEAD PLAINTIFFS. Attorney Melanie S. Corwin terminated. (Cummins, James)
July 3, 2012 Filing 1030 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Attorney Craig A. Cowie terminated. (DeBruin, David)
July 2, 2012 Filing 1029 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney Matthew L. Fore terminated. (Choi, Eun Young)
June 21, 2012 Filing 1028 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Warin, Francis) (FILED IN VAULT)
June 21, 2012 Filing 1027 NOTICE of Public Filing of Updated Public Joint Appendix by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Warin, Francis)
June 13, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument Hearing held on 6/13/2012. From the date of release of all transcripts the parties shall have Three (3) weeks to submit Supplemental Pleadings of Fifteen pages or less. The pleadings are due the same day. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
June 12, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument Hearing set for 6/13/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
June 7, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument Hearing Day 3 held before Judge Richard J. Leon in Courtroom 18. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
June 6, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument Hearing Day 2 begun and suspended Oral Argument Hearing continued to 6/13/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
June 5, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument Hearing Day 1 held on 6/5/2012.Oral Argument Hearing Day 2 set for 6/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
June 4, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The Oral Argument Hearing orginally set for 6/5/2012 at 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 6/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. The Oral Argument Hearings set for 6/6/2012 and 6/7/2012 are still set for 10:00 AM. (kc )
May 26, 2012 Filing 1026 NOTICE of Updated Filing by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Clark, Richard)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1025 NOTICE of Updated Filings to Comply with Court Order by LEANNE G. SPENCER re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit C - Reply Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Miller, Adam)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1024 NOTICE of Updated Filings to Comply with Court Order by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FAS 133 Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit FAS 133 Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit FAS 133 Reply, #4 Exhibit FAS 133 Reply Statement of Facts)(Warin, Francis)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1023 NOTICE of Updated Filings to Comply with Court Order by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KPMG Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit KPMG Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit KPMG Opposition to LP Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit KPMG Opposition Statement of Additional Facts, #5 Exhibit KPMG Reply, #6 Exhibit KPMG Reply Statement of Facts, #7 Exhibit KPMG Objections)(Warin, Francis)
May 25, 2012 Filing 1022 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Walsh, Michael)(DOCUMENT FILED IN THE VAULT)
May 23, 2012 Filing 1021 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. Attorney Jean Marie Geoppinger terminated. (Cummins, James)
May 22, 2012 Filing 1020 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. De Marco on behalf of OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (De Marco, Paul)
May 18, 2012 Filing 1019 NOTICE of Public Filing of Joint Appendix by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Walsh, Michael)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1017 Consent Motion to Enter Order Governing Oral Argument on Summary Judgment Motions and the Exchange of Demonstratives. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the proposed order [1017-1] is adopted and entered in full by the Court. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/17/2012. (lcrjl1)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1003 HUD-OIG's Response To February 2, 2012 Order Of The Court and #1006 HUD-OIG's Supplemental Memorandum. To the extent these documents filed by the Office of Inspector General for the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development can be construed as a motion for a protective order, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/14/2012.(kc)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1009 Motion Of The Federal Housing Finance Agency For Leave To File Additional Exhibit Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/14/2012. (lcrjl1)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1005 Motion Of The Federal Housing Finance Agency For Leave To File Exhibits Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/14/2012. (lcrjl1)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1004 Motion Of The Federal Housing Finance Agency For a Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/14/2012. (lcrjl1)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1018 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Paul M. De Marco be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/11/2012. (lcrjl1)
May 9, 2012 Filing 1018 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul M. De Marco, :Firm- Waite, Schneider, Bayless & Chesley Co. LPA, :Address- 1513 Fourth & Vine Tower, One West Fourth Street, Cincinnati, OH 45202. Phone No. - 513-621-0267. Fax No. - 513-621-0262 by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Cummins, James)
May 1, 2012 Filing 1017 Consent MOTION for Order Governing Oral Argument on Summary Judgment Motions and the Exchange of Demonstratives by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
March 30, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument Hearing set for 6/5/2012 at 10:00 AM, 6/6/2012 at 10:00 AM, 6/7/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
March 26, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 3/26/2012. Hearings for Summary Judgment Motions will take place 6/5/2012 through 6/8/2012. (scheduling order forthcoming) (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus) (tg, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #1016 Unopposed MOTION for Order for F. Joseph Warin to Appear by Telephone by KPMG LLP. Directed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/2012. (kc )
March 23, 2012 Filing 1016 Unopposed MOTION for Order for F. Joseph Warin to Appear by Telephone by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warin, Francis)
March 16, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/26/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1015 NOTICE of Objections by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION re #990 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration)(Walsh, Michael)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1014 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1006 MOTION for Protective Order / Supplemental Mem. in Response to February 2, 2012 Order of the Court filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Aronica, Joseph)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1013 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by KPMG LLP re #1012 Notice (Other) (Warin, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2012: #1 Sealed Objections) (jf, ).
March 1, 2012 Filing 1012 NOTICE of Objections by KPMG LLP re #989 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Cover Letter))(Warin, Francis)
February 27, 2012 Filing 1011 Memorandum in opposition to re #1006 MOTION for Protective Order / Supplemental Mem. in Response to February 2, 2012 Order of the Court, #1004 MOTION for Protective Order filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warin, Francis)
February 27, 2012 Filing 1010 Memorandum in opposition to re #1006 MOTION for Protective Order / Supplemental Mem. in Response to February 2, 2012 Order of the Court, #1004 MOTION for Protective Order filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1009 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibit Under Seal by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1008 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1004 MOTION for Protective Order filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Aronica, Joseph)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1007 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #1000 In Response to February 2, 2012 Order of the Court filed by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Lyons, Jane) Modified to add link on 2/15/2012 (znmw, ).
February 14, 2012 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1006 Motion for Protective Order; emailed to jane.lyons@usdoj.gov, cc'd 121 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Refile as a Supplemental Memorandum (under Oppositions and Replies) (znmw, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 1006 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Protective Order / Supplemental Mem. in Response to February 2, 2012 Order of the Court by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Lyons, Jane) Modified on 2/14/2012 (znmw, ).
February 9, 2012 Filing 1005 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
February 9, 2012 Filing 1004 MOTION for Protective Order by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #1001 Consent Motion of the Federal Housing Finance Agency for a Two-Day Extension of Time to File a Motion for Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the Federal Housing Finance Agency shall have up to and including February 9, 2012 to file its motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/9/2012. (lcrjl1)
February 7, 2012 Filing 1003 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #1000 Order, Set Deadlines and Notice of Dispute Regarding Its Material Remaining Under Seal filed by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Lyons, Jane)
February 7, 2012 Filing 1002 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane M. Lyons on behalf of OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Lyons, Jane)
February 7, 2012 Filing 1001 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Protective Order by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER Governing Submission of a Joint Appendix to the Court and the Unsealing of Summary Judgment Exhibits. (SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/24/2012. (jth)
January 30, 2012 Filing 999 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. Attorney Jeremy S. Simon terminated. (Simon, Jeremy)
January 20, 2012 Filing 998 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEAD PLAINTIFFS, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Walsh, Michael)
January 10, 2012 Filing 997 Consent MOTION for Order Governing Submission of a Joint Appendix to the Court and the Unsealing of Summary Judgment Exhibits by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Governing Submission of a Joint Appendix to the Court and the Unsealing of Summary Judgment Exhibits)(Warin, Francis)
January 6, 2012 Filing 996 REPLY to opposition to motion re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #3 Supplemental Declaration of Adam B. Miller, #4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Adam)
January 6, 2012 Filing 995 REPLY to opposition to motion re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Reply to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Eric R. Delinsky, #3 Certificate of Service)(Clark, Richard)
January 6, 2012 Filing 994 REPLY to opposition to motion re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Warin, Francis)
January 6, 2012 Filing 993 REPLY to opposition to motion re #940 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Reply and Additional Statement of Facts in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Eun Young Choi)(Choi, Eun Young)
January 6, 2012 Filing 992 REPLY to opposition to motion re #941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Warin, Francis)
January 6, 2012 Filing 991 REPLY to opposition to motion re #939 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration)(Walsh, Michael)
January 6, 2012 Filing 990 REPLY to opposition to motion re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts in Response to Fannie Mae's Statement of Additional Facts, #2 Declaration)(Cummins, James)
January 6, 2012 Filing 989 REPLY to opposition to motion re #943 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against KPMG LLP filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts in Response to KPMG's Statement of Additional Facts, #2 Declaration)(Cummins, James)
January 4, 2012 Filing 988 REPLY re #939 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 987 REPLY re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 986 REPLY re #940 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 985 REPLY re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 984 REPLY re #941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (jf, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
January 4, 2012 Filing 983 REPLY re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KPMG LLP. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 982 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
January 4, 2012 Filing 981 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Miller, Adam)
January 4, 2012 Filing 980 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD re #969 Memorandum in Opposition, #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Delinsky, Eric)
January 4, 2012 Filing 979 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FRANKLIN RAINES (Choi, Eun Young)
January 4, 2012 Filing 978 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Walsh, Michael)
January 4, 2012 Filing 977 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Warin, Francis)
January 4, 2012 Filing 976 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by KPMG LLP (Warin, Francis)
December 1, 2011 Filing 975 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Stock on behalf of LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Stock, Christopher)
November 30, 2011 Filing 974 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilbert B. Markovits on behalf of LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Markovits, Wilbert)
November 29, 2011 Filing 973 Memorandum in opposition to re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration Ashley, #3 Declaration Walsh, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Michael)
November 29, 2011 Filing 972 Memorandum in opposition to re #943 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against KPMG LLP filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts In Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #2 Statement of Facts In Addition to Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Supplement, #6 Certificate of Service)(Warin, Francis)
November 29, 2011 Filing 971 Memorandum in opposition to re #939 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation by Federal National Mortgage Association, J. Timothy Howard, KPMG, and Leanne G. Spencer filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 29, 2011 Filing 970 Memorandum in opposition to re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Leanne G. Spencer filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandums in Opposition to J. Timothy Howard's and Leanne G. Spencer's Motions for Summary Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 29, 2011 Filing 969 Memorandum in opposition to re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J. Timothy Howard filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandums in Opposition to J. Timothy Howard's and Leanne G. Spencer's Motions for Summary Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 29, 2011 Filing 968 Memorandum in opposition to re #941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues by Federal National Mortgage Association, J. Timothy Howard, KPMG LLP, and Leanne G. Spencer filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on FAS 133 Accounting Issues, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 29, 2011 Filing 967 Memorandum in opposition to re #940 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Franklin Raines filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Franklin D. Raines's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 29, 2011 Filing 966 Memorandum in opposition to re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment by KPMG LLP filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
November 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: In ChambersConference held on 11/23/2011. (jth)
November 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 11/23/2011. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (jth)
November 22, 2011 Filing 965 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
November 22, 2011 Filing 964 NOTICE of FILING UNDER SEAL by KPMG LLP (Warin, Francis)
November 22, 2011 Filing 963 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael) DOCUMENTS FILED IN VAULT (jf).
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 962 REVISED ORDER GOVERNING FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/14/2011. (see order) (kc )
November 15, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #944 Motion of the Federal Housing Finance Agency, as Conservator of Fannie Mae, for a Stay of Proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/14/2011. (lcrjl1)
November 7, 2011 Filing 961 REPLY to opposition to motion re #944 MOTION to Stay filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aronica, Joseph)
November 7, 2011 Filing 960 Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order REVISED ORDER GOVERNING FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choi, Eun Young)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #954 Fannie Mae's Emergency Motion to Extend the Time to File its Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Lead Plaintiffs to File their Reply in Support of Same. It is hereby ORDERED that (i) the time for the parties to file their oppositions to the pending motions for summary judgment is extended by two weeks to November 18, 2011, and (ii) the time for the parties to file their replies in further support of their motions for summary judgment is also extended by two weeks to December 28, 2011. The parties shall file a revised proposed order regarding the procedures that shall govern the filing of summary judgment motions on or before November 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/3/2011. (lcrjl1)
November 2, 2011 Filing 959 REPLY to opposition to motion re #954 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Lead Plaintiffs to File Their Reply In Support of Same filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Walsh, Michael)
November 1, 2011 Filing 958 RESPONSE re #955 Response to Document, Individual Defendants' Response to Lead Plaintiffs' Request to Extend the Entire Briefing Schedule filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Choi, Eun Young)
November 1, 2011 Filing 957 RESPONSE re #954 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Lead Plaintiffs to File Their Reply In Support of Same filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION by KPMG LLP. (Warin, Francis) Modified event title on 11/2/2011 (znmw, ).
November 1, 2011 Filing 956 NOTICE of Proposed Order Extending Summary Judgment Pleading Deadlines by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #955 Response to Document, (Cummins, James)
November 1, 2011 Filing 955 RESPONSE re #954 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Lead Plaintiffs to File Their Reply In Support of Same filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Cummins, James)
November 1, 2011 Filing 954 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Lead Plaintiffs to File Their Reply In Support of Same by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
October 25, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Housing Finance Agency Reply due by 11/7/2011. (kc)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #953 Unopposed Motion of the Federal Housing Finance Agency for One-Week Extension to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the Federal Housing Finance Agency shall have up to and including November 7, 2011 to file its reply brief. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/25/2011. (lcrjl1)
October 25, 2011 Filing 953 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #944 MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
October 24, 2011 Filing 952 Memorandum in opposition to re #944 MOTION to Stay filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warin, Francis)
October 21, 2011 Filing 951 Memorandum in opposition to re #944 MOTION to Stay Individual Defendants' Response to FHFA's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choi, Eun Young)
October 21, 2011 Filing 950 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #949 AFFIDAVIT re 948 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2011: #1 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), #2 Exhibit 2 (SEALED)) (jf, ).
October 21, 2011 Filing 949 AFFIDAVIT re #948 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of W.B. Markovits In Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion of the Federal Housing Finance Agency for a Stay of Proceedings by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Cummins, James)
October 21, 2011 Filing 948 Memorandum in opposition to re #944 MOTION to Stay filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
October 12, 2011 Filing 947 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by KPMG LLP re #946 Errata, (Loseman-Barwind, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2011: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Declaration of M Loseman, #4 Exhibit 16 Attachment D) (jf, ).
October 12, 2011 Filing 946 ERRATA by KPMG LLP #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Revised, #2 Statement of Facts Revised with changes identified, #3 Declaration Amended, #4 Exhibit Corrected)(Loseman-Barwind, Monica)
October 7, 2011 Filing 945 ERRATA by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY #944 MOTION to Stay filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Declaration of Edward DeMarco)(Aronica, Joseph)
October 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: In Chambers Conference held on 10/7/2011. (tg, )
October 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 10/7/2011. (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus.) (tg, )
October 7, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The Set/Reset Hearing entry canceling the hearing scheduled for 10/7/2011 was entered in error by the clerk. The parties shall disregard the entry. (tg, )
October 7, 2011 ENTERED IN ERROR.....et/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference scheduled for 10/7/2011 is hereby VACATED, new date to be determined. (tg, ) (tg, ) Modified on 10/7/2011 (ztg, ).
October 7, 2011 Filing 944 MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Declaration Edward DeMarco, #15 Declaration Jeffrey Spohn, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
August 23, 2011 Filing 943 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against KPMG LLP by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration)(Cummins, James)
August 22, 2011 Filing 942 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Adam)
August 22, 2011 Filing 941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Declaration)(Warin, Francis)
August 22, 2011 Filing 940 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Joseph M. Terry, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Choi, Eun Young)
August 22, 2011 Filing 939 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment for Failure to Prove Loss Causation by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2011: #5 Exhibit 1-10 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 11-30 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 31-61 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 62-103 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 104-111 (Sealed)) (jf, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 938 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Clark, Richard)
August 22, 2011 Filing 937 MOTION for Summary Judgment by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Declaration)(Warin, Francis)
August 22, 2011 Filing 936 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant KPMG LLP by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Jugment Against KPMG)(Cummins, James) Modified event title on 8/23/2011 (znmw, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 935 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Exhibits 30 and 31 to Declaration of W.B. Markovits in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30B, #2 Exhibit 31A, #3 Exhibit 31B)(Cummins, James)
August 22, 2011 Filing 934 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #931 Notice (Other) (Cummins, James)
August 18, 2011 Filing 933 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #942 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Miller, Adam) (FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT) (FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT).
August 18, 2011 Filing 932 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Clark, Richard)(FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT).
August 18, 2011 Filing 931 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 8/22/2011.....NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel) Modified on 8/23/2011 (znmw, ).
August 18, 2011 Filing 930 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
August 18, 2011 Filing 929 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Walsh, Michael)
August 18, 2011 Filing 928 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #941 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On FAS 133 Accounting Issues by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Warin, Francis) (FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT).
August 18, 2011 Filing 927 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment by KPMG (Warin, Francis) (FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT)
August 18, 2011 Filing 926 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re #940 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FRANKLIN RAINES (Choi, Eun Young) (FILED UNDER SEAL & PLACED IN THE VAULT)
August 16, 2011 Filing 925 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28B, #2 Exhibit 28C, #3 Exhibit 28D, #4 Exhibit 29A, #5 Exhibit 29B, #6 Exhibit 29C, #7 Exhibit 29D, #8 Exhibit 29E, #9 Exhibit 29F)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 924 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26A, #5 Exhibit 26B, #6 Exhibit 27A, #7 Exhibit 27B, #8 Exhibit 27C)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 923 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21B, #2 Exhibit 21C, #3 Exhibit 21D, #4 Exhibit 21E, #5 Exhibit 21F, #6 Exhibit 21G, #7 Exhibit 21H, #8 Exhibit 21I)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 922 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 20)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 921 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) to Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO #920 Affidavit, filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7B, #2 Exhibit 7C, #3 Exhibit 7D, #4 Exhibit 7E, #5 Exhibit 7F, #6 Exhibit 7G, #7 Exhibit 7H)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 920 AFFIDAVIT re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae Declaration of W.B. Markovits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 919 NOTICE of Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue to be Tried by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae (Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Filing 918 MEMORANDUM re #916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Cummins, James)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER GOVERNING FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/10/2011. (see order) (kc )
August 16, 2011 Filing 916 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on Count I Against Defendant Fannie Mae by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
August 9, 2011 Filing 915 Consent MOTION for Order Governing Filing Requirments for Motions for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #913 Unopposed Motion to Set Status Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/08/2011. (lcrjl1)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #914 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to File Summary Judgment Motions. It is hereby ORDERED that the MOTION is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/08/2011. (lcrjl1) Modified on 8/8/2011 (kc, ).
August 5, 2011 Filing 914 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 5, 2011 Filing 913 Unopposed MOTION to Set Status Conference by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 4, 2011 Filing 912 Consent MOTION for Order Governing Filing Requirements for Motions for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
July 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 7/27/2011. Oral Joint Motion to exceed the page limit in Summary Judgment motions/responses, heard and granted. Defendants will be allotted 250 total pages to respond to Plaintiffs motion with no single response to exceed 60 pages. The Briefing Schedule is adjusted as follows: Dispositive Motions due by 8/8/2011, Responses thereto due by 10/28/2011, the Reply is due by 12/6/2011. Status Conference set for 10/7/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (jth)
July 11, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/27/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
July 1, 2011 Filing 911 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. Attorney Matthew K. Handley terminated. (Sommers, Daniel)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #908 , #909 and #910 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions for admission pro hac vice of Joseph T. Deters, Christopher D. Stock and W. B. Markovits are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/30/2011. (lcrjl1)
June 24, 2011 Filing 910 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- W.B. Markovits, :Firm- Waite, Schneider, Bayless & Chesley Co., L.P.A., :Address- One West Fourth Street, Cincinnati, Ohio 45202. Phone No. - 513-621-0267. Fax No. - 513-381-2375 by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Cummins, James)
June 24, 2011 Filing 909 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher D. Stock, :Firm- Waite, Schneider, Bayless & Chesley Co., L.P.A., :Address- One West Fourth Street, Cincinnati, Ohio 45202. Phone No. - 513-621-0267. Fax No. - 513-381-2375 by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Cummins, James)
June 15, 2011 Filing 908 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph T. Deters, :Firm- Waite, Schneider, Bayless & Chesley, :Address- One West Fourth Street, Cincinnati, Ohio 45202. Phone No. - (513) 621-0267. Fax No. - (513) 621-0262 by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Cummins, James)
June 13, 2011 Filing 907 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Daniel Smith on behalf of J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Smith, Logan)
June 10, 2011 Terminate Hearings: The Court hereby vacates the 6/13/2011 Status Conference and reschedules Status Conference to a date to be determined. (kc )
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #906 Motion Consent MOTION Reschedule Status Conference on June 13 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO Directed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/10/2011. (kc )
June 9, 2011 Filing 906 Consent MOTION to Continue Reschedule Status Conference on June 13 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Cummins, James) Modified event title on 6/10/2011 (znmw, ).
June 2, 2011 Filing 905 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KPMG. Attorney Bradley Jason Lingo terminated. (Lingo, Bradley)
June 1, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 6/7/2011 is RESCHEDULED for 6/13/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
May 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 5/2/2011. Status Conference set for 6/7/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
April 29, 2011 Filing 904 NOTICE of Proceeding by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Cummins, James)
April 20, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 5/2/2011 at 11:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 5/2/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #902 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for admission pro hac vice of Louise M. Roselle is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/10/2011. (lcrjl1)
March 9, 2011 Filing 902 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louise Malbin Roselle; Firm Name: WAITE SCHNEIDER, BAYLESS & CHESLEY, CO., L.P.A.; Address: 1513 Fourth & Vine Tower, One West Fourth Street, Cincinatti, OH 45202; Phone: (513) 621-0267; Fax: (513) 381-2375 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Certification of Louise Roselle, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel) Modified to add firm/address information on 3/10/2011 (znmw, ).
March 8, 2011 Filing 901 NOTICE of Appearance by Lissa M. Percopo on behalf of KPMG LLP (Percopo, Lissa)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 900 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons) Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/7/2011. (zjth)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 899 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #890 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order; granting #891 Fannie Mae's Motion to Strike Harvey Pitt's Expert Report; granting #892 the Individual Defendants' Motion to Strike Harvey Pitt as an Expert Witness; denying as moot #892 Individual Defendants' alternative Motion to Compel the immediate continuation of Mr. Pitt's deposition. ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs shall not offer Mr. Pitt as an expert on their behalf. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/7/2011. (jth)
March 4, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2011. Joint #892 MOTION to Strike EXPERT WITNESS filed by KPMG LLP, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER - GRANTED. MOTION #890 for Protective Order filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM - DENIED. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
March 3, 2011 Filing 903 SEALED DVD of Harvey L. Pitt re #890 MOTION for Protective Order filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 898 SEALED MEMORANDUM in support of #892 Joint MOTION to Strike EXPERT WITNESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL THE IMMEDIATE CONTINUATION OF HIS DEPOSITION MOTION to Compel filed by KPMG LLP, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(zjf, )
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #894 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that lead plaintiffs' motion to seal their Motion for a Protective Order #890 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/03/2011. (lcrjl1)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #893 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion to file, under seal, an unredacted Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Witness, Or in the Alternative, to Compel Immediate Continuation of his Deposition is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/03/2011. (lcrjl1)
March 2, 2011 Filing 897 Memorandum in opposition to re #892 Joint MOTION to Strike EXPERT WITNESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL THE IMMEDIATE CONTINUATION OF HIS DEPOSITION MOTION to Compel, #891 MOTION to Strike Expert Report and Award Fees and Costs filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
March 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 3/2/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference set for 5/2/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
March 1, 2011 Filing 896 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #890 MOTION for Protective Order (Sommers, Daniel)
March 1, 2011 Filing 895 STATUS REPORT regarding Lead Plaintiffs' Congressional Testimony by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Delinsky, Eric)
February 28, 2011 Filing 894 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Motion and Memorandum with Exhibits Under Seal by LEAD PLAINTIFFS (Cummins, James)
February 28, 2011 Filing 893 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Memorandum with Exhibits Under Seal by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Filing)(Romain, Alex)
February 25, 2011 Filing 892 Joint MOTION to Strike EXPERT WITNESS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL THE IMMEDIATE CONTINUATION OF HIS DEPOSITION by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Choi, Eun Young). Added MOTION to Compel on 2/28/2011 (znmw, ).
February 25, 2011 Filing 891 MOTION to Strike Expert Report and Award Fees and Costs by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
February 25, 2011 Filing 890 MOTION for Protective Order by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cummins, James) Modified on 3/3/2011 to add DOCUMENT LODGED UNDER SEAL (zjf, ).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #889 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Monica K. Loseman shall be admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/03/2011. (lcrjl1)
December 28, 2010 Filing 889 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Monica K. Loseman, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 1801 California Street, Suite 4200, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 298-5700. Fax No. - (303) 298-5907 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
December 3, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 12/3/2010. Status Conference set for 3/2/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (jth)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #878 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Limit Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses. It is hereby ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/03/2010. (lcrjl1)
December 2, 2010 Filing 888 RESPONSE re #885 Supplemental Memorandum,, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
December 2, 2010 Filing 887 NOTICE of Appearance by Eun Young Choi on behalf of FRANKLIN RAINES (Choi, Eun)
November 24, 2010 Filing 886 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #885 Supplemental Memorandum (Sommers, Daniel) (Sealed Documents added to entry #885) Modified on 11/30/2010 (jf, ).
November 24, 2010 Filing 885 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #878 MOTION for Order Limiting Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Sommers, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2010: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) (jf, ).
September 29, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 9/29/2010. Status Conference set for 12/3/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (jth)
August 23, 2010 Filing 884 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney Laura J. Hildner terminated. (Romain, Alex)
August 13, 2010 Filing 883 REPLY to opposition to motion re #878 MOTION for Order Limiting Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (Cummins, James)
August 6, 2010 Filing 882 Memorandum in opposition to re #878 MOTION for Order Limiting Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Delinsky, Eric)
August 6, 2010 Filing 881 Memorandum in opposition to re #878 MOTION for Order Limiting Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 880 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8, Summary Judgment Briefing: Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2011. Opposition papers in response to any dispositive motions due by 10/7/2011. Any reply briefs in support of dispositive motions due by 11/7/2011. Each party reserves the right to seek an adjournment or modification of any of the dates set forth herein for good cause. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/2/10. (see case management order no. 8) (kc)
July 29, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 7/29/2010. Status Conference set for 9/29/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
July 29, 2010 Filing 879 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney John E. Clabby terminated. (Clabby, John)
July 20, 2010 Filing 878 MOTION for Order Limiting Fannie Mae Defendants' Expert Witnesses by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Cummins, James)
July 13, 2010 Filing 877 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher F. Regan (Regan, Christopher)
July 13, 2010 Filing 876 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lauren R. Randell (Randell, Lauren)
July 13, 2010 Filing 875 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam B. Miller (Miller, Adam)
July 13, 2010 Filing 874 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Sidney Krakoff (Krakoff, David)
July 9, 2010 Filing 873 Joint MOTION for Order Entering Defendants' CMO #8 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, KPMG LLP, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tulumello, Andrew)
July 9, 2010 Filing 872 MOTION for Order Entry of CMO No. 8 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Cummins, James)
June 17, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings. Status Conference set for 7/29/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
June 14, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon.Status Conference held on 6/14/2010. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
June 9, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fannie Mae's Expert Disclosures due no later than 6/11/2010. (tg, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #871 Fannie Mae's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Witness Disclosures. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Fannie Mae shall serve its expert disclosures no later than June 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/8/2010. (lcrjl1)
June 4, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/14/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc )
June 1, 2010 Filing 871 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Witness Disclosures by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2), Fannie Mae's Amended complaint in Civil Action No. 1:06-cv-02111 #37 filed Feb. 25, 2008, and the cross-claims filed by KPMG against Fannie Mae in Civil Action Nos. 1:04-cv-01639 and 1:06-cv-00139(RJL) #39 , filed Apr. 16, 2007 are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This Court retains jurisdiction over the Settlement Agreement and Release entered into by Fannie Mae and KPMG. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/12/10. (see order.) (kc )
May 10, 2010 Filing 869 Joint MOTION to Dismiss / Fannie Mae and KPMG's Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice and Proposed Order by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Epstein, Jerome)
April 28, 2010 Filing 867 NOTICE of Errata by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #866 Notice (Other) (Sommers, Daniel)
April 27, 2010 Filing 868 SEALED Declaration of Distinguished Professor of Law GeoffreyC. Hazard, Jr. filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(zjf, )
April 27, 2010 Filing 866 NOTICE Notice Of Filing Under Seal Of Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Fannie Mae's Request For Extension Of Time by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
April 26, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Closed Hearing held on 4/26/2010. (Court Reporter Catherine Jones.) (kc )
April 26, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Closed Hearing set for 4/26/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc ) M
April 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 4/12/2010. Status Conference set for 4/26/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference set for 6/14/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
April 9, 2010 Filing 865 SEALED Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Report and Motion for Protective Relief filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit s, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
April 9, 2010 Filing 864 NOTICE OF Filing Under Seal Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Report and Motion for Protective Relief by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Filing 863 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
April 7, 2010 Filing 862 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lead Plaintiffs' Report on the In-Chambers Inquiry by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 861 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/5/10. (see case management order.) (kc )
April 1, 2010 Filing 860 Consent MOTION for Order Entering Stipulated Case Management Order No. 7 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Corwin, Melanie)
March 23, 2010 Filing 859 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. re #857 SEALED MOTION for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' requests for relief in lead plaintiffs' report on the in-chambers inquiry filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 858 NOTICE Notice Of Filing Under Seal Of Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Fannie Mae's Request For Extension Of Time by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
March 22, 2010 Filing 857 SEALED MOTION for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' requests for relief in lead plaintiffs' report on the in-chambers inquiry filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 856 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Lead Plaintiffs' Requests for Relief in Lead Plaintiffs' Report on the In-Chambers Inquiry #854 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael)
March 9, 2010 Filing 854 SEALED Lead Plaintiffs' Report On The In-Chambers Inquiry And Accompanying Exhibits filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. re #853 Notice filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 - Part 1, #9 Exhibit 7 - Part 2, #10 Exhibit 8 - Part 1, #11 Exhibit 8 - Part 2, #12 Exhibit 8 - Part 3, #13 Exhibit 8 - Part 4, #14 Exhibit 9 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit 9 - Part 2, #16 Exhibit 9 - Part 3, #17 Exhibit 10 - Part 1, #18 Exhibit 10 - Part 2, #19 Exhibit 10 - Part 3, #20 Exhibit 10 - Part 4, #21 Exhibit 10 - Part 5, #22 Exhibit 10 - Part 6, #23 Exhibit 10 - Part 7, #24 Exhibit 11, #25 Exhibit 12)(zjf, )
March 9, 2010 Filing 853 NOTICE Notice of Filing Under Seal Of Lead Plaintiffs' Report On The In-Chambers Inquiry And Accompanying Exhibits by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel) Modified filers on 3/9/2010 (td, ).
March 2, 2010 Filing 851 NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Individual Defendants by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #812 SEALED MOTION filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Cummins, James)
March 1, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon.Status Conference held on 3/1/2010. Status Conference set for 4/12/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #843 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (1) KPMG to Produce Documents Regarding Its Production of a Wells Submission to the SEC, and (2) KPMG Witnesses to Answer Lead Plaintiffs' Questions Regarding KPMG's Receipt of a Wells Notice and Any Subsequent Wells Submission. It is hereby ORDERED that the Lead Plaintiffs' motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/1/2010. (lcrjl1)
February 25, 2010 Filing 850 REPLY to opposition to motion re #843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Cummins, James)
February 16, 2010 Filing 849 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by KPMG LLP. re #843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(zjf, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 848 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of KPMG LLP's Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents and Testimony Regarding Wells Materials by KPMG LLP re #843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 5, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Discovery Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2010. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
February 4, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Motion Hearing originally set for 2/5/2010 at 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED for 2/5/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
February 4, 2010 Filing 847 SEALED TRANSCRIPT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 846 SEALED EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 3 re #843 filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
February 2, 2010 Filing 845 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT # 8 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit # 8)(Sommers, Daniel)
February 2, 2010 Filing 844 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 3 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION (Sommers, Daniel)
February 2, 2010 Filing 843 MOTION to Compel (1) KPMG TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REGARDING ITS PRODUCTION OF A WELLS SUBMISSION TO THE SEC, AND (2) KPMG WITNESSES TO ANSWER LEAD PLAINTIFFS QUESTIONS REGARDING KPMGS RECEIPT OF A WELLS NOTICE AND ANY SUBSEQUENT WELLS SUBMISSION by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit 2 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 3 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(Sommers, Daniel)
February 1, 2010 Filing 855 SEALED REPLY re #838 SEALED Motion To Strike Opinion Deposition Testimony of Donald T. Nicolaisen or, in the Alternative, To Compel Additional Deposition Testimony filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zjf, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #841 Individual Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the Individual Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/30/2010. (lcrjl1)
January 29, 2010 Filing 842 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Reply Memorandum by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER re #838 SEALED MOTION filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Romain, Alex)
January 29, 2010 Filing 841 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Romain, Alex)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 840 SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/20/10.(zkc)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the hearings held on January 12, 14, and 19, are sealed and that transcripts shall be unsealed for the limited purpose of providing copies to counsel who were present. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/10. (kc )
January 19, 2010 Filing 839 SEALED Memorandum in Opposition filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. re #838 SEALED Motion To Strike Opinion Deposition Testimony of Donald T. Nicolaisen or, in the Alternative, To Compel Additional Deposition Testimony filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(zjf, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 838 SEALED Motion To Strike Opinion Deposition Testimony of Donald T. Nicolaisen or, in the Alternative, To Compel Additional Deposition Testimony, filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 836 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE OPINION DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF DONALD T. NICOLAISEN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #826 Individual Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' motion to file under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/2010. (lcrjl1)
January 14, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Discovery Hearing held on 1/14/2010. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the hearings held on December 29, 2009, are sealed and that the transcripts shall be unsealed for the limited purpose of providing copies to counsel who were present. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/12/10. (kc )
January 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Hearing on Protective Order held on 1/12/2010. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc )
January 11, 2010 Filing 834 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF EXHIBIT 1 TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #833 MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Sommers, Daniel)
January 11, 2010 Filing 833 MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (PROPOSED RESPONSE TO MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
January 11, 2010 Filing 831 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Taylor on behalf of J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Taylor, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2010 Filing 832 SEALED MEMORANDUM in support filed by KPMG LLP's re #818 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(zjf, ) Modified on 1/11/2010 (zjf, ).
January 7, 2010 Filing 830 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of KPMG LLP's Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by KPMG LLP re #818 SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Tulumello, Andrew)
January 7, 2010 Filing 829 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER re #818 SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Romain, Alex)
January 7, 2010 Filing 828 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Romain, Alex)
January 7, 2010 Filing 827 NOTICE of Filing by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER re #826 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (Romain, Alex)
January 7, 2010 Filing 826 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Romain, Alex)
January 6, 2010 Filing 825 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. re #818 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(zjf, )
January 6, 2010 Filing 824 SEALED REPLY re #812 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(zjf)
January 6, 2010 Filing 823 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS RAINES, HOWARD, SPENCER, AND FANNIE MAE FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #818 SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SEALED MOTION filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Sommers, Daniel)
January 6, 2010 Filing 822 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS RAINES, HOWARD AND SPENCER by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #819 Sealed Document, (Sommers, Daniel)
January 4, 2010 Filing 821 REPLY to opposition to motion re #781 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (znmw, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 820 REPLY to opposition to motion re #806 MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review (REDACTED) MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review (REDACTED) filed by KPMG LLP. (znmw, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Individual Defendants' Motion #720 to Compel the Federal Housing Agency to Produce Documents After IN CAMERA Reveiw; and granting in part and denying in part KPMG's Motion #722 to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Documents from the Court-Ordered Quick Peek Review; granting Motion #726 for Leave to File Memorandum in Further Support of the Individual Defendants' Motion to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After IN CAMERA Review and granting Motion #730 for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/31/09. (see order.) (kc)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the transcripts of the hearings held on December 16 and 22, 2009, are unsealed for the limited purpose of providing copies to counsel who were present at the hearings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/23/09. (see order.)(kc )
December 31, 2009 Filing 818 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #814 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' motion to file under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/31/2009. (lcrjl1)
December 31, 2009 Filing 815 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER re #814 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Davidoff, Samuel)
December 31, 2009 Filing 814 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidoff, Samuel)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #806 KPMG LLP's Motion to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from Its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that OFHEO shall produce the three documents listed in Exhibit D of KPMG's motion. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/30/2009. (lcrjl1)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #763 KPMG LLP's Motion to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Documents Withheld as Exempt. It is hereby ORDERED that OFHEO shall produce the eleven documents listed in KPMG's Exhibit 2 entitled "KPMG LLP's Challenge Log" [#763-4]. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/30/2009. (lcrjl1)
December 29, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 12/29/2009. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (rje)
December 28, 2009 Filing 819 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER. re #812 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zjf)
December 28, 2009 Filing 813 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Individual Defendants' Opposition To Lead Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Production Of Documents By Individual Defendants Raines, Howard And Spencer by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER re #810 Notice (Other) (Miller, Adam)
December 8, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 12/8/2009. Status Conference set for 1/19/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting KPMG LLP's Motion #787 to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEO's Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/3/09. (see order.) (kc)
December 4, 2009 Filing 812 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL filed by LEAD PLAINTIFFS. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11, #2 Exhibit 12 - 18, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 810 NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS RAINES, HOWARD AND SPENCER by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Sommers, Daniel)
December 2, 2009 Filing 809 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KPMG LLP. Attorney Edward Hallett Maginnis terminated. (Maginnis, Edward)
November 25, 2009 Filing 808 Memorandum in opposition to re #806 MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review (REDACTED) MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review (REDACTED) filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aronica, Joseph)
November 12, 2009 Filing 807 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review filed by KPMG LLP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
November 12, 2009 Filing 806 MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Three Additional Documents from its Recent Supplement to the Quick-Peek Review (REDACTED) by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Tulumello, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/6/09. (see order for details.)(kc)
October 30, 2009 Filing 804 SEALED REPLY to opposition to motion re #787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accountingfiled by KPMG LLP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
October 30, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 10/30/2009. Status Conference set for 12/8/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
October 30, 2009 Filing 803 REPLY to opposition to motion re #787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting (Redacted for Public Filing) filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
October 20, 2009 Filing 802 Memorandum in opposition to re #784 Third Party MOTION to Compel Rust Consultion, Inc. filed by RUST CONSULTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 12-16)(znmw, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #784 KPMG LLP's Motion to Compel Rust Consulting, Inc., to Produce Documents in Response to KPMG LLP's Third-Party Subpoena. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG LLP's motion is GRANTED to the extent agreed upon by the parties in the proposed Stipulation Regarding Production of Documents in Response to Subpoena, which is set forth at Exhibit 15 to Rust Consulting's opposition to KPMG's motion to compel. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/20/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #797 Rust Consulting, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File an Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Response to KPMG's Third-Party Subpoena. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #781 Leanne G. Spencer's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #775 Motion of Securities and Exchange Commission for Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the SEC's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #773 FHFA's Motion to Quash the Deposition Subpoena of August 20, 2009, and for a Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED that FHFA's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #772 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Testimony from Donald Nicolaisen or, Alternatively, to Quash Any Future Deposition Discovery of OFHEO by Defendants. It is hereby ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Donald Nicolaisen shall testify pursuant to Lead Plaintiffs' June 24, 2008 subpoena. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #766 Defendant Franklin D. Raines's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 16, 2009 Filing 801 REPLY to opposition to motion re #784 Third Party MOTION to Compel Rust Consultion, Inc. filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17)(Tulumello, Andrew)
October 16, 2009 Filing 800 Memorandum in opposition to re #787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aronica, Joseph)
October 14, 2009 Filing 799 NOTICE of Intent to Join in Leanne G. Spencer's Reply in Support of her Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from the Federal Housing Finance Agency by KPMG LLP re #798 Reply to opposition to Motion (Tulumello, Andrew)
October 13, 2009 Filing 798 REPLY to opposition to motion re #781 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
October 13, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 10/30/2009 at 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED for 10/30/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #793 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Reschedule ERISA October 8, 2009 Status Conference to October 13, 2009. It is hereby ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs' motion to reschedule is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that an ERISA deposition scheduling conference shall be held with the Court on October 13, 2009, at 10:30 a.m.; and it is further ORDERED that the attendees shall include two attorneys representing Lead Plaintiffs in the securities action, two attorneys representing Fannie Mae, one attorney representing KPMG, one attorney for each individual defendant in the ERISA action, one attorney representing the ERISA Plaintiffs, and one attorney representing OFHEO/FHFA; and it is further ORDERED that any scheduled depositions of the individual defendants shall be postponed pending the outcome of the scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/7/2009. (lcrjl1)
October 6, 2009 Filing 796 Memorandum in opposition to re #793 MOTION to reschedule ERISA October 8, 2009 Status Conference to October 13, 2009 filed by JOE PICKETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, James)
October 6, 2009 Filing 795 Memorandum in opposition to re #793 MOTION to reschedule ERISA October 8, 2009 Status Conference to October 13, 2009 filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
October 6, 2009 Filing 794 RESPONSE Lead Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of ERISA Plaintiffs' Proposed ERISA Discovery Plan by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cummins, James) Modified event title on 10/7/2009 (znmw, ).
October 5, 2009 Filing 797 MOTION for Leave to File an Opposition to Motion to Compel by RUST CONSULTING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibits 12-16, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 793 MOTION to reschedule ERISA October 8, 2009 Status Conference to October 13, 2009 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Cummins, James)
October 2, 2009 Filing 792 Memorandum in opposition to re #781 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Aronica, Joseph)
October 2, 2009 Filing 791 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #772 lead plaintiffs motion to compel filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cody, Kathleen) Modified to add link on 10/5/2009 (znmw, ).
September 29, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon.Status Conference held on 9/29/2009. Status Conference set for 10/30/2009 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
September 29, 2009 Filing 790 SEALED #789 NOTICE of Filing Document Under Seal as to #787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting filed by KPMG LLP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, )
September 29, 2009 Filing 789 NOTICE of Filing Document Under Seal by KPMG LLP re #787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting (Tulumello, Andrew)
September 29, 2009 Filing 788 NOTICE of Intent to Join in Leanne G. Spencer's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from the Federal Housing Finance Agency by KPMG LLP re #781 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency (Tulumello, Andrew)
September 29, 2009 Filing 787 MOTION to Compel OFHEO Chief Accountant and Deposition Witness Wanda DeLeo to Answer Questions Related to OFHEOs Public Statements on Expert Disagreement Over FAS 133 Accounting by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
September 24, 2009 Filing 786 REPLY to opposition to motion re #773 MOTION to Quash and for a Protective Order, 774 MOTION for Protective Order filed by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (Aronica, Joseph)
September 23, 2009 Filing 785 REPLY to opposition to motion re #772 MOTION to Compel TESTIMONY FROM DONALD NICOLAISEN filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Handley, Matthew)
September 21, 2009 Filing 784 Third Party MOTION to Compel Rust Consultion, Inc. by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
September 18, 2009 Filing 783 Memorandum in opposition to re #772 MOTION to Compel TESTIMONY FROM DONALD NICOLAISEN filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cody, Kathleen)
September 16, 2009 Filing 782 REPLY to opposition to motion re #772 MOTION to Compel TESTIMONY FROM DONALD NICOLAISEN filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Handley, Matthew)
September 15, 2009 Filing 781 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by the Federal Housing Finance Agency by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
September 14, 2009 Filing 780 Memorandum in opposition to re #773 MOTION to Quash and for a Protective Order filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Romain, Alex)
September 9, 2009 Filing 779 Memorandum in opposition to re #772 MOTION to Compel TESTIMONY FROM DONALD NICOLAISEN filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
September 2, 2009 Filing 777 Memorandum in opposition to re #775 MOTION to Stay or for extension of time filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Matthew)
September 2, 2009 Filing 776 MOTION for Joinder in FHFA's #773 Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena and For Protective Order by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Corwin, Melanie) Modified to add link on 9/3/2009 (jf, ).
September 1, 2009 Filing 778 MOTION for Extension of Time by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (See Docket Entry #775 to view document. Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of the motion in future). (nmw, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 775 MOTION to Stay or for extension of time by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cody, Kathleen)
September 1, 2009 NOTICE OF ERROR re #773 Motion to Quash; emailed to jjaronica@duanemorris.com, cc'd 117 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NO REFILE-Corrections have been done by the Clerk's Office (jf, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 774 MOTION for Protective Order by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. (See Docket Entry #773 to view document) (jf, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 773 MOTION to Quash and for a Protective Order by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aronica, Joseph)
August 27, 2009 Filing 772 MOTION to Compel TESTIMONY FROM DONALD NICOLAISEN by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit A-6, #9 Exhibit A-7, #10 Exhibit A-8, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Matthew)
August 25, 2009 Filing 771 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam B. Miller (Miller, Adam)
August 24, 2009 Filing 770 REPLY to opposition to motion re #766 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Romain, Alex)
August 17, 2009 Filing 769 Memorandum in opposition to re #766 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Cody, Kathleen)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #768 Individual Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents. It is ORDERED that the motion to withdraw is GRANTED and that the motion to compel #761 is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/17/2009. (lcrjl1)
August 12, 2009 Filing 768 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #761 Joint MOTION to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Romain, Alex)
August 5, 2009 Filing 767 REPLY to opposition to motion re #763 MOTION to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents Withheld as Exempt filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tulumello, Andrew)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #715 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Center for Audit Quality as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Fannie Mae's Motion to Compel KPMG's Production of Documents Related to the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/5/2009. (lcrjl1)
August 4, 2009 Filing 766 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony from the Securities and Exchange Commission by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Romain, Alex)
July 31, 2009 Filing 765 Memorandum in opposition to re #763 MOTION to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents Withheld as Exempt filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Aronica, Joseph)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 764 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/26/09. (kc)
July 24, 2009 Filing 763 MOTION to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents Withheld as Exempt by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Tulumello, Andrew)
July 24, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 7/24/2009. Next Status Conference set for 9/29/2009 @ 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels. (mm)
July 23, 2009 Filing 762 Consent MOTION to Enter Proposed Stipulated Case Management Order No. 6 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
July 16, 2009 Filing 761 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDERED filed 8/17/09.....Joint MOTION to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Romain, Alex) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jf, ).
July 9, 2009 Filing 759 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by KPMG LLP and Fannie Mae (Tulumello, Andrew)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #751 Joint MOTION for Mediation by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, KPMG LLP. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for a court order directing Fannie Mae, KPMG, and Lead Plaintiffs to submit to mediation is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/7/2009. (lcrjl1)
July 7, 2009 Filing 758 NOTICE of filing of Letter to Hon. Richard J. Leon on behalf of ERISA Plaintiffs In Response to the Joint Motion for Court Ordered Mediation filed in 04cv1639 and 06cv2111 on June 24, 2009 by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION (Rosen, Samuel)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 757 STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/30/09. (kc)
June 30, 2009 Filing 760 Seal Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Mediation. re #751 Joint MOTION for Mediation filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(zjf, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #756 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Mediation. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/30/2009. (lcrjl1)
June 30, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #755 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Mediation was entered in error and refiled by counsel with a corrected version. (see entry #756 to view document)(jf, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 756 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Mediation (CORRECTED VERSION) by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 755 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Mediation by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers, Daniel) Modified on 6/30/2009 (jf, ).
June 29, 2009 Filing 754 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Opposition to Motion for Mediation by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #751 Joint MOTION for Mediation (Sommers, Daniel)
June 26, 2009 Filing 753 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 752 STIPULATED ORDER SETTING FORTH PROCEDURES REGARDING APPOINTMENT AND DUTIES OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/25/09. (kc)
June 25, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 6/25/2009. Status Conference set for 7/24/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
June 24, 2009 Filing 751 Joint MOTION for Mediation by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #744 #745 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. Jefferey Dee Bailey and Antony K. Haynes shall be admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/24/2009. (lcrjl1)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #747 Consent MOTION of Fannie Mae and KPMG to Defer Argument on Pending Privilege Motions. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and it is further ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2009 at 11:00 AM is CONTINUED. Counsel should be prepared to discuss rescheduling at the status conference set for 6/25/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/22/2009. (lcrjl1)
June 22, 2009 Filing 750 REPLY to opposition to motion re #747 Consent MOTION Of Fannie Mae And KPMG To Defer Argument On Pending Privilege Motions filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, KPMG LLP. (Walsh, Michael)
June 22, 2009 Filing 749 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Setting Forth Procedures Regarding Appointment and Duties of Special Master by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
June 22, 2009 Filing 748 Memorandum in opposition to re #747 Consent MOTION Of Fannie Mae And KPMG To Defer Argument On Pending Privilege Motions filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Transcript)(Corwin, Melanie)
June 19, 2009 Filing 747 Consent MOTION Of Fannie Mae And KPMG To Defer Argument On Pending Privilege Motions by FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, KPMG LLP, FANNIE MAE (Epstein, Jerome)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 746 STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/16/09. (kc)
June 16, 2009 Filing 745 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jefferey Dee Bailey, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 Twelfth Street, N.W., Washington DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 434-5778. Fax No. - (202) 434-5029 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Terry, Joseph)
June 16, 2009 Filing 744 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Antony K. Haynes, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 12th Street NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 434-5000. Fax No. - (202) 434-5029 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Terry, Joseph)
June 11, 2009 Filing 743 Joint MOTION for Order Concerning Documents Withheld as "Exempt" Pursuant to the September 27, 2007 Stipulated Order by KPMG LLP, OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 742 STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/9/09. (kc)
June 9, 2009 Filing 741 NOTICE of Joinder in Joint Motion of Individual Defendants and OFHEO Concerning Documents Withheld as "Exempt" Pursuant to Sept. 27, 2007 Stipulated Order by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT re #739 Joint MOTION for Order Concerning Documents Withheld as "Exempt" Pursuant to the September 27, 2007 Stipulated Order (Lyons, Jane)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDERED that the Individual Defendants' motion #721 to Compel FHFA to produce documents due to waiver of privilege is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that FHFA shall produce the 134 documents listed in Exhibit 1 of the Individual Defendants' motion forthwith. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/8/09. (see order.) (kc)
June 8, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: In Chambers Conference with Fannie Mae and KPMG re: #738 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Setting Forth Procedures Regarding Appointment and Duties of Special Master set for 6/15/2009 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
June 8, 2009 Filing 739 Joint MOTION for Order Concerning Documents Withheld as "Exempt" Pursuant to the September 27, 2007 Stipulated Order by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER, OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romain, Alex)
June 3, 2009 Filing 738 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Order Setting Forth Procedures Regarding Appointment and Duties of Special Master by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
May 27, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Motion hearing held on 5/27/2009. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
May 27, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 5/27/2009. Status Conference set for 6/25/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon., (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
May 22, 2009 Filing 737 REPLY to opposition to motion re #735 MOTION for Order re "Sneak Peek" of Exempt Documents filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Aronica, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 736 Memorandum in opposition to re #735 MOTION for Order re "Sneak Peek" of Exempt Documents filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Romain, Alex)
May 18, 2009 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines: Response(s), if any, to OFHEO's #735 MOTION for Order re "Sneak Peek" of Exempt Documents due by 5/22/2009; OFHEO's reply, if any, due by 5/26/2009. (lcrjl1)
May 15, 2009 Filing 735 MOTION for Order re "Sneak Peek" of Exempt Documents by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for "Sneak Peek" of Exempt Documents)(Aronica, Joseph)
May 14, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 5/27/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon re: #720 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER; #721 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents Due to Waiver of Privilege by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER; and #722 MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Documents from the Court-Ordered Quick Peek Review by KPMG LLP. (lcrjl1)
May 14, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/27/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
May 11, 2009 Filing 734 Memorandum in opposition to re #730 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents, #726 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Individual Defendants' Motion to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Aronica, Joseph)
May 7, 2009 Filing 733 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Ellsworth on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Ellsworth, Larry)
May 7, 2009 Filing 732 REPLY to opposition to motion re #721 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents Due to Waiver of Privilege filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Romain, Alex)
May 6, 2009 Filing 731 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, FANNIE MAE. Attorney Alex Lipman terminated. (Epstein, Jerome)
May 4, 2009 Filing 730 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel OFHEO to Produce Documents by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Tulumello, Andrew)
May 4, 2009 Filing 729 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, FANNIE MAE. Attorney Ian Heath Gershengorn terminated. (Epstein, Jerome)
May 1, 2009 Filing 728 Memorandum in opposition to re #721 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents Due to Waiver of Privilege filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aronica, Joseph)
May 1, 2009 Filing 727 REPLY to opposition to motion re #715 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO FANNIE MAES MOTION TO COMPEL filed by CENTER FOR AUDIT QUALITY. (Howard, Robert)
May 1, 2009 Filing 726 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Individual Defendants' Motion to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Romain, Alex)
April 29, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document no. re #725 was entered in error and added to entry #724 . Counsel was instructed not to file Proposed Orders as a opposition.(jf, )
April 28, 2009 Filing 725 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re #720 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review, #722 MOTION to Compel PROPOSED ORDER filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Aronica, Joseph) Modified on 4/29/2009 (jf, ).
April 27, 2009 Filing 724 Memorandum in opposition to re #720 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review, #722 MOTION to Compel filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alfred M. Pollard, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Aronica, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2009: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (jf, ).
April 24, 2009 Filing 723 OBJECTIONS to Subpoena filed by MILLER, HAMILTON, SNIDER & ODOM. (nmw, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 722 MOTION to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Documents from the Court-Ordered Quick Peek Review by KPMG LLP. (jf, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 721 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents Due to Waiver of Privilege by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Romain, Alex)
April 17, 2009 Filing 720 Joint MOTION to Compel the Federal Housing Finance Agency to Produce Documents After In Camera Review by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Romain, Alex)
April 17, 2009 Filing 719 Memorandum in opposition to re #715 MOTION for Leave to File Brief As Amicus Curiae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Epstein, Jerome)
April 17, 2009 Filing 718 REPLY to opposition to motion re #707 MOTION to Compel KPMG's Production of Documents Related to the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Epstein, Jerome)
April 17, 2009 Filing 717 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Motion to Compel the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight to Produce Documents from the Court-Ordered Quick Peek Review by KPMG LLP (Tulumello, Andrew)
April 17, 2009 Filing 716 REPLY to opposition to motion re #708 MOTION to Compel Fannie Mae and Paul Weiss to Produce Materials from Paul Weiss's Special Investigation of Fannie Mae filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #4 Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Tulumello, Andrew)
April 3, 2009 Filing 715 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by CENTER FOR AUDIT QUALITY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
April 3, 2009 Filing 714 Memorandum in opposition to re #708 MOTION to Compel Fannie Mae and Paul Weiss to Produce Materials from Paul Weiss's Special Investigation of Fannie Mae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 9)(Walsh, Michael)
April 3, 2009 Filing 713 Memorandum in opposition to re #708 MOTION to Compel Fannie Mae and Paul Weiss to Produce Materials from Paul Weiss's Special Investigation of Fannie Mae filed by PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Young K. Oh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service via CM/ECF, #8 Certificate of Service by Mail)(Oh, Alex)
April 3, 2009 Filing 712 Memorandum in opposition to re #707 MOTION to Compel KPMG's Production of Documents Related to the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
April 3, 2009 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Sher on behalf of LESLIE RAHL (Sher, Lawrence)
April 2, 2009 Filing 710 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LESLIE RAHL. Attorney Lasagne A. Wilhite terminated. (Wilhite, Lasagne)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #709 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Eun Young Choi shall be admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/2009. (lcrjl1)
March 17, 2009 Filing 709 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eun Young Choi, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 Twelfth Street, NW, Washington DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-434-5708. Fax No. - 202-434-5029 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Romain, Alex)
March 13, 2009 Filing 708 MOTION to Compel Fannie Mae and Paul Weiss to Produce Materials from Paul Weiss's Special Investigation of Fannie Mae by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
March 13, 2009 Filing 707 MOTION to Compel KPMG's Production of Documents Related to the Public Company Accounting Oversight Board by FANNIE MAE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Epstein, Jerome)
March 13, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Individual Defendants', KPMG's, Lead Plaintiffs', and Fannie Mae's Motions to Compel(if any) due by 4/17/2009. OFHEO"S Response(s) due by 4/27/2009 (kc)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER granting KPMG LLP's Motion #690 for Order Granting Access to OFHEO Documents made available to other Defendants, granting Lead Plaintiffs' Motion #691 for Order Granting Access to Documents and granting Fannie Mae's Oral request for Access identical to any access granted KPMG and Lead Plaintiffs'. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/11/09. (see order.) (kc)
March 6, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Motion Hearing held 3/6/2009. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #699 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Cory T. Way shall be admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/6/2009. (lcrjl1)
March 5, 2009 Filing 705 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #583 Notice of Appeal filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed. (USCA No. 08-5014) (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(mmh, )
March 5, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 03:30 PM is RESCHEDULED for 3/6/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 4, 2009 Filing 704 Memorandum in opposition to re #700 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James Jordan Decl)(Truong, John)
March 4, 2009 Filing 703 NOTICE of Joining the Individual Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight (Dkt. No. 700) by KPMG LLP re #700 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight (Tulumello, Andrew)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 702 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to compel due by 3/13/2009. Oppositions due by 4/3/2009. Replies due by 4/17/2009. The cutoff date for depositions of fact witness be deposed for the first time in the above - captioned case is 10/2/2009. The cutoff date for fact witness being deposed for additional testimony in the above-captioned actions is 11/6/2009. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/09. (see order.)(kc, )
March 3, 2009 Filing 701 STATUS REPORT Concerning Resolution of Discovery Disputes by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Walsh, Michael)
February 27, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Oral Argument held on 2/27/2009. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
February 27, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: OFHEO's Response to #700 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER due 3/4/2009. (lcrjl1)
February 27, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon re: #700 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (lcrjl1)
February 26, 2009 Filing 700 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Romain, Alex)
February 26, 2009 Filing 699 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cory T. Way, :Firm- Zuckerman Spaeder LLP, :Address- 1800 M Street, NW, Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - (202) 778-1895. Fax No. - (202) 822-8106 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cory T. Way, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Romain, Alex)
February 25, 2009 Filing 698 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Joint Scheduling Order by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
February 23, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 2/27/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon re: #690 #691 MOTIONS for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order. (lcrjl1)
February 17, 2009 Filing 697 REPLY to opposition to motion re #690 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 17, 2009 Filing 696 REPLY to opposition to motion re #691 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sommers, Daniel)
February 17, 2009 Filing 695 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Aronica on behalf of FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Aronica, Joseph)
February 13, 2009 Filing 694 Memorandum in opposition to re #690 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order, #691 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
February 4, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: OFHEO shall file its response(s) to #690 #691 Motions for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order on or before 2/13/2009. Replies, if any, are due on or before 2/17/2009. (lcrjl1)
February 4, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Omnibus Status Conference set for 2/20/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
February 4, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: In Chambers Conference regarding discovery dispute between OFHEO and individual defendants set for 2/17/2009 02:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
February 2, 2009 Filing 693 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Office Address by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Block, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: In Chambers Discovery Conference set for 2/4/2009 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
January 28, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Hearing regarding OFHEO Discovery set for 1/28/2009 04:00 PM is CANCELED as moot. (lcrjl1)
January 26, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Hearing regarding OFHEO Discovery set for 1/28/2009 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
January 23, 2009 Filing 692 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP. Attorney Aaron Futch terminated. (Futch, Aaron)
January 22, 2009 Filing 691 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Sommers, Daniel)
January 21, 2009 Filing 690 MOTION for Order Granting Access To OFHEO Documents Made Available To Other Defendants Under The Court's Contempt Order by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Tulumello, Andrew)
January 16, 2009 Filing 689 STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
January 13, 2009 Filing 688 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by HAROLD FORD GROUP, LLC. (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 687 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by RICCHETTI, INC.. (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 686 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by JOHNSON, MADIGAN, PECK, BOLAND & STEWART, INC. (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 685 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by CLARK, LYTLE & GEDULDIG. (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 684 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by MCSLARROW CONSULTING LLC. (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 683 OBJECTIONS to Document Subpoena by GRAY COMPANY, LLC. (nmw, )
January 9, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 1/9/2009. Status Conference set for 1/23/2009 at 10:00 AM in Chambers for counsel as stated on the record before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
January 9, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference originally set for 1/9/2009 at 2:00PM is RESCHEDULED for 1/9/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
January 8, 2009 Filing 682 NOTICE Regarding OFHEO Appeal by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Romain, Alex)
December 23, 2008 Filing 681 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron Futch (Futch, Aaron)
December 5, 2008 Filing 680 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. Attorney Marcia N. Tiersky terminated. (Tiersky, Marcia)
November 25, 2008 Filing 679 NOTICE of Filing of Proof of Mailing and Publication of Court-Ordered Notice of Pendency of Class Action by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GCG Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1A - Summary Notice, #3 Exhibit 1B - Notice Mailed, #4 Exhibit 1C - Timely Exclusion Requests, #5 Exhibit 1D - Untimely Exclusion Requests)(Corwin, Melanie)
November 20, 2008 Filing 678 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Toll, Steven)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #676 MOTION to Intervene by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Housing Finance Agency shall be permitted to intervene in this matter as conservator for defendant Fannie Mae. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/5/2008. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2008 Filing 677 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Simon, Jeremy)
October 20, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 10/20/2008. Status Conference set for 01/9/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Case stayed until 01/6/2009. Depositions to reconvene 01/21/2009. Court vacates Status Conference date of 11/7/2008. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
October 20, 2008 Filing 675 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane M. Lyons on behalf of OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Lyons, Jane)
October 18, 2008 Filing 674 Memorandum in opposition to re #669 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 4617 Motion for Additional Stay filed by Conservator filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion for Additional Stay, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pollard Declaration)(Corwin, Melanie)
October 17, 2008 Filing 676 MOTION to Intervene by FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Additional Stay of All Proceedings, #3 Pollard Declaration)(nmw, )
October 7, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings. Status Conference originally set for 10/17/2008 is RESCHEDULED for 10/20/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (kc)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER granting Motion #672 for Stay of All Proceedings Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 4617. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/22/08. (kc)
September 19, 2008 Filing 672 Consent MOTION for Order Granting Stay of All Proceedings Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 4617 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
September 16, 2008 Filing 671 NOTICE of Filing - FHFA Request for Stay of all Proceedings Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 4617 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 FHFA Request for Stay)(Walsh, Michael)
September 8, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 9/8/2008. Status Conference set for 10/17/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court grants Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion #669 to stay and stays case until 10/23/08. Status Conference set for 11/7/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #668 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George H. Brown. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/08/2008. (lcrjl1)
September 8, 2008 Filing 670 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Michael)
September 8, 2008 Filing 669 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pursuant to 12 U.S.C. 4617 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
September 4, 2008 Filing 668 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- George H. Brown, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 1881 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto, CA 94304. Phone No. - 650-849-5300. Fax No. - 650-849-5039 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of George Brown)(Osorio, Claudia)
September 4, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 9/4/2008. Status Conference set for 10/21/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
September 4, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines. Fannie Mae and KMPG Motions to compel concerning scope of production due by 9/30/2008. Fannie Mae and KMPG Motions with respect to Privilege logs due by 9/15/2008. (kc)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #667 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel or Motions Regarding Privilege Logs. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Fannie Mae and KPMG shall file any motions to compel concerning the scope of productions in response to their requests or objections to the requests issued by them by September 30, 2008. Fannie Mae and KPMG shall file motions with respect to the privilege logs provided between and among Fannie Mae and KPMG in response to document requests issued by Fannie Mae or KPMG by September 15, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/03/2008. (lcrjl1, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 667 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel or Motions Regarding Privilege Logs by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
July 21, 2008 Filing 666 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KPMG LLP. Attorney Henry Charles Whitaker terminated. (nmw, )
July 21, 2008 Filing 665 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney Daniel N. Marx terminated. (Marx, Daniel)
July 21, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re: OFHEO discovery set for 7/22/2008 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER granting Motion #586 Stipulation and Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/15/08. (Originally filed in 06cv82). (kc)
July 17, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon. Status Conference held on 7/17/2008. Status Conference set for 7/30/2008 at 3:30 PM in Judge Leon's Conference Room. Status Conference set for 9/4/2008 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (kc)
July 17, 2008 Filing 663 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. Attorney Holly Ann Pal terminated. (Pal, Holly)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #550 Motion for Reconsideration based on Tellabs by KPMG LLP. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/17/2008. (lcrjl1)
July 16, 2008 Filing 662 STATUS REPORT on Discovery-Related Issues by KPMG LLP. (Osorio, Claudia)
July 14, 2008 Filing 661 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order granting motion #635 . Mail sent to Darren Check. (kc)
July 14, 2008 Filing 660 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order Granting Motion #635 . Mail sent to Stuart Berman. (kc)
July 14, 2008 Filing 659 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order granting Motion #635 . Mail sent to Richard Schiffrin. (kc)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #658 Motion to Continue Status Hearing on 7/17/08. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/11/2008. (lcrjl1)
July 10, 2008 Filing 658 Consent MOTION to Continue Reschedule Status Hearing on 7/17/08 by KPMG (Tulumello, Andrew)
July 2, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/10/2008 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED to 7/17/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #651 Motion to Enforce Deposition Subpoena on Deborah House and For Permission to Attend June 26 In-Chambers Conference with OFHEO and the Individual Defendants. It is hereby ORDERED that the deposition of Deborah House will go forward on July 14, 2008, subject to being reopened with the agreement of all parties or leave of Court for good cause shown. It is further ORDERED that Lead Plaintiffs' request to attend the July 2 chambers status conference is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/1/2008. (lcrjl1)
June 27, 2008 Filing 657 REPLY to opposition to motion re #651 MOTION to Enforce Deposition Subpoena on Deborah House and For Permission to Attend June 26 In-Chambers Conference with OFHEO and the Individual Defendants filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - January 2008 Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 2008 Transcript)(Cummins, James)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #635 Motion for order directing dissemination of the notice of pendency of class action to the class. ATTACHMENTS (EXHIBITS) (2) Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/24/08. (lin, )
June 26, 2008 Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance of Bradley J. Lingo by KPMG LLP (Herring, Justin)
June 25, 2008 Filing 654 Memorandum in opposition to re #651 MOTION to Enforce Deposition Subpoena on Deborah House and For Permission to Attend June 26 In-Chambers Conference with OFHEO and the Individual Defendants filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
June 24, 2008 Filing 653 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Tycko on behalf of KPMG LLP (Tycko, Jonathan)
June 23, 2008 Filing 652 RESPONSE re #651 MOTION to Enforce Deposition Subpoena on Deborah House and For Permission to Attend June 26 In-Chambers Conference with OFHEO and the Individual Defendants filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
June 23, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re: OFHEO discovery set for 6/26/2008 is RESCHEDULED to 7/2/2008 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
June 23, 2008 Filing 651 MOTION to Enforce Deposition Subpoena on Deborah House and For Permission to Attend June 26 In-Chambers Conference with OFHEO and the Individual Defendants by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
June 20, 2008 Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Hallett Maginnis on behalf of KPMG LLP (Maginnis, Edward)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 649 AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/2/08. (lin, )
May 30, 2008 Filing 648 Consent MOTION to Enter Amended Order Establishing Expert Discovery and Deposition Protocol by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
May 29, 2008 Filing 647 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jane M. Ricci, :Firm- Zuckerman Spaeder LLP, :Address- 1800 M Street NW. Phone No. - 202-778-1800. Fax No. - 202-822-8106 by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jane M. Ricci, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Caroline)
May 28, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 5/28/2008, Further Status Conference set for 7/10/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (mpt, )
May 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #646 Consent Motion to Postpone May 28, 2008 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/28/2008. (lcrjl1)
May 27, 2008 Filing 646 Consent MOTION Postpone May 28, 2008 Status Conference by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
May 23, 2008 Filing 645 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerome Louis Epstein (Epstein, Jerome)
May 23, 2008 Filing 644 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ian Heath Gershengorn (Gershengorn, Ian)
May 23, 2008 Filing 643 NOTICE of Change of Address by David W. DeBruin (DeBruin, David)
May 23, 2008 Filing 642 NOTICE of Change of Address by Craig A. Cowie (Cowie, Craig)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #585 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae; denying #592 KPMG LLP's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae. The Court finds that Fannie Mae's involuntary production of documents to OFHEO did not constitute a waiver of the privileges Fannie Mae has asserted over those documents. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/14/2008. (lcrjl1)
May 13, 2008 Filing 641 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on April 25, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 640 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/2/08. (mpt, )
May 2, 2008 Filing 639 REPLY to OFHEO's Amicus Brief filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(McIntyre, Charles)
May 1, 2008 Filing 638 Consent MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Case Management Order No. 5 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #607 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Bryant Davidoff. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/29/2008. (lcrjl1)
April 28, 2008 Filing 637 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Lasagne A. Wilhite on behalf of LESLIE RAHL Substituting for attorney Rhonda D. Orin (Wilhite, Lasagne)
April 25, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 4/25/2008, (Status Conference set for 5/28/2008. 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon., In Chambers Conference set for 5/28/2008 04:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
April 24, 2008 Filing 636 AMICUS BRIEF by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (jf, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #633 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that OFHEO's motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/24/2008. (lcrjl1)
April 24, 2008 Filing 635 Unopposed MOTION approval of form and manner of notice of class certification by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to Class, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summary Notice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 3)(Cummins, James)
April 22, 2008 Filing 633 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 OFHEO's Amicus Brief)(Truong, John)
April 21, 2008 Filing 634 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 28, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
April 21, 2008 Filing 632 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Cowie on behalf of FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Cowie, Craig)
April 17, 2008 Filing 631 RESPONSE to #630 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (jf, )
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #629 Motion for Leave to File Response to KPMG's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that Fannie Mae's motion for leave to file is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/17/2008. (lcrjl1)
April 11, 2008 Filing 629 MOTION for Leave to File Response to KPMG's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Response)(Walsh, Michael)
April 9, 2008 Filing 630 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing filed by KPMG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf, )
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #627 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG's motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/9/2008. (lcrjl1)
April 2, 2008 Filing 628 ERRATA Exhibit A by KPMG #627 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing filed by KPMG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McIntyre, Charles)
April 2, 2008 Filing 627 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding March 28, 2008 Hearing by KPMG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McIntyre, Charles)
March 28, 2008 Filing 626 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on March 05, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty A. Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf)
March 28, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2008 re #585 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, #592 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae filed by KPMG, #614 MOTION to Stay the Malpractice Case and/or Separate the Malpractice Case filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM--All motions TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT., ( In Chambers Conference set for 4/25/2008 01:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
March 26, 2008 Filing 625 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAMIE S. GORELICK. Attorney Nicholas Aidan Brady terminated. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Brady, Nicholas)
March 19, 2008 Filing 624 REPLY to opposition to motion re #614 MOTION to Stay the Malpractice Case and/or Separate the Malpractice Case filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cummins, James)
March 18, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re: OFHEO discovery set for 3/27/2008 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 18, 2008 Filing 623 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Related document: #622 Crossclaim filed by KPMG LLP.(Epstein, Jerome)
March 17, 2008 Filing 621 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Randell on behalf of LEANNE G. SPENCER (Randell, Lauren)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #618 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file answer or other response to Fannie Mae's Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that KPMG LLP shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Fannie Mae's amended complaint on or before 4/10/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/17/2008. (lcrjl1)
March 14, 2008 Filing 620 Memorandum in opposition to re #614 MOTION to Stay the Malpractice Case and/or Separate the Malpractice Case filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
March 14, 2008 Filing 619 Memorandum in opposition to re #614 MOTION to Stay the Malpractice Case and/or Separate the Malpractice Case filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
March 14, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/18/2008 10:30 AM is rescheduled to 4/25/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 11, 2008 Filing 618 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file answer or other response to Fannie Mae's Amended Complaint by KPMG LLP (Tulumello, Andrew)
March 11, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED TO 3/28/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 10, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re: OFHEO discovery set for 3/18/2008 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 10, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference re: OFHEO discovery set for 3/10/2008 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
March 5, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 3/5/2008, ( Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon., Status Conference set for 4/18/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
March 4, 2008 Filing 617 NOTICE of Production of Privilege Logs by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #608 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Jeffrey Lerner be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/2008. (lcrjl1)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #609 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Tania T. Taveras be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/2008. (lcrjl1)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #610 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Francis P. Karam be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/2008. (lcrjl1)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #611 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that A. Allen Hobbs be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/2008. (lcrjl1)
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #612 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Emily Kern be admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/3/3008. (lcrjl1)
February 29, 2008 Filing 616 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on February 12, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 615 REPLY to opposition to motion re (112 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit V, #3 Exhibit Exhibit W, #4 Exhibit Exhibit X (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #6 Exhibit Exhibit Z)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(McIntyre, Charles)
February 29, 2008 Filing 614 MOTION to Stay the Malpractice Case and/or Separate the Malpractice Case by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cummins, James)
February 29, 2008 Filing 613 REPLY to opposition to motion re #592 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae (Filed under Seal) filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Sommers, Daniel)
February 28, 2008 Filing 612 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Kern, :Firm- Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP, :Address- 10 East 40th Street, New York, NY 10016. Phone No. - 212-779-1414. Fax No. - 212-779-3219 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
February 28, 2008 Filing 611 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- A. Allen Hobbs, :Firm- Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP, :Address- 10 East 40th Street, New York, NY 10016. Phone No. - 212-779-1414. Fax No. - 212-779-3218 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
February 28, 2008 Filing 610 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Francis P. Karam, :Firm- Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP, :Address- 10 East 40th Street, New York, NY 10016. Phone No. - 212-779-1414. Fax No. - 212-779-3219 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
February 28, 2008 Filing 609 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tania T. Taveras, :Firm- Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP, :Address- 10 East 40th Street, 22nd Floor, New York, NY 10016. Phone No. - 212-779-1414. Fax No. - 212-779-3219 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
February 28, 2008 Filing 608 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Lerner, :Firm- Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP, :Address- 10 East 40th Street, 22nd Floor, New York, New York 10016. Phone No. - 212-779-1414. Fax No. - 212-779-3218 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
February 27, 2008 Notice of Rescheduled Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/3/08 is Rescheduled to 3/5/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (whb)
February 26, 2008 Filing 607 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel B. Davidoff, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 Twelfth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-434-5000. Fax No. - 202-434-5029 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Romain, Alex)
February 25, 2008 Filing 622 Amended CROSSCLAIM against FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION filed by KPMG LLP.(td, ) Modified on 3/18/2008 (td, ).
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #602 KPMG LLP's Unopposed Motion for Leave To File Amended Cross-Claims Against Fannie Mae. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the amended cross-claims attached as Exhibit A to KPMG's motion are deemed filed. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #603 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan C. Dickey. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Jonathan C. Dickey be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #604 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Byron Wilder. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that M. Byron Wilder be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #601 Consent Motion To Extend Time To Respond to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Fannie Mae's opposition is due on 2/20/2008 and Lead Plaintiffs' reply is due on 2/29/2008. Replies due by 2/29/2008. Responses due by 2/20/2008.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #605 Consent Motion To Set Briefing Schedule on KPMG's Motion to Compel. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Fannie Mae shall file an omnibus opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae and KPMG LLP's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae on 2/20/2008 and KPMG shall file its reply on 2/29/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 20, 2008 Filing 606 Memorandum in opposition to re #592 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae, #585 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
February 19, 2008 Filing 605 Consent MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on KPMG's Motion to Compel by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
February 15, 2008 Filing 604 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- M. Byron Wilder, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1100, Dallas, TX 75201. Phone No. - 214-698-3231. Fax No. - 214-571-2913 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of M. Byron Wilder, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
February 15, 2008 Filing 603 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan C. Dickey, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 200 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10166. Phone No. - 212-351-2399. Fax No. - 212-351-6399 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan C. Dickey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
February 15, 2008 Filing 602 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claims by KPMG LLP (Tulumello, Andrew)
February 15, 2008 Filing 601 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #585 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
February 12, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2008 re #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs filed by KPMG LLP-TAKEN UNDER ADVISMENT. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Amended Stipulation and ORDER of voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Franklin Managed Trust, et al v Fannie Mae, et al (CV06-139), approved and Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/12/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
February 12, 2008 Filing 599 Unopposed MOTION To Enter Order of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Franklin Managed Trust, et. al. v. Fannie Mae, et. al. (Amended) by FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, BISSETT INSTITUTIONAL BALANCED TRUST, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
February 7, 2008 Status Conference set for 2/8/2008 3:00 PM is rescheduled to 2/8/2008 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/7/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 7, 2008 Filing 598 REPLY re #591 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) concerning Lead Plaintiffs' request for emergency conference filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Cummins, James)
February 7, 2008 Filing 597 NOTICE Re: Privilege Logs by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gov. A)(Truong, John)
February 7, 2008 Filing 596 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit Under Seal by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #595 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Sommers, Daniel)
February 7, 2008 Filing 595 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Sommers, Daniel)
February 7, 2008 Filing 594 Unopposed MOTION To Enter Order of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Franklin Managed Trust, et al. v. Fannie Mae, et al. by FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, BISSETT INSTITUTIONAL BALANCED TRUST, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
February 6, 2008 Filing 593 RESPONSE re #591 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Case Status Report filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Walsh, Michael)
February 6, 2008 Filing 592 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fannie Mae by KPMG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Errata Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(McIntyre, Charles)
February 6, 2008 Status Conference re: #591 set for 2/8/2008 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/6/2008. (lcrjl1)
February 6, 2008 Filing 591 NOTICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Request for Emergency Conference With Court by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Fannie Mae Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Stanley Chesley)(Corwin, Melanie)
February 5, 2008 Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on January 25, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
February 5, 2008 Filing 589 TRANSCRIPT of Ruling held on January 22, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
February 5, 2008 Filing 588 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on January 16, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
February 5, 2008 Filing 587 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on February 01, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
February 1, 2008 USCA Case Number 08-5014 for #583 Notice of Appeal filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (jf)
February 1, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 2/1/2008, ( In Chambers Conference set for 2/12/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard J. Leon., Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon., Status Conference set for 3/5/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). (Court Reporter PattyGels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 31, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #583 Notice of Appeal (tg, )
January 31, 2008 Filing 586 Unopposed MOTION To Enter Order of Voluntary Dismissal of Evergreen Equity Trust, et al. v. Fannie Mae, et al. by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
January 31, 2008 Filing 585 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Corwin, Melanie)
January 30, 2008 Filing 584 MOTION to Stay the Court's Jan. 22, 2008 Order Pending Appeal by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Truong, John)
January 30, 2008 Filing 583 NOTICE OF APPEAL by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Truong, John)
January 25, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 1/25/2008. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 25, 2008 Notice of Rescheduled Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/25/08 is Rescheduled to 2/1/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Scheduling Minute Order: Status Conference set for 1/25/2008 at 2:30 PM is RESCHEDULED to 1/25/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 24, 2008 Filing 582 REPLY to opposition to motion re #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs filed by KPMG LLP. (Tulumello, Andrew)
January 24, 2008 Filing 581 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Concerning KPMG's Violation of Discovery Deadlines, and Request for Expedited Briefing by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Epstein, Jerome)
January 22, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 1/22/2008. Oral ruling rendered in open court. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER: re #500 MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER, #561 Status Report filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT, #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, #558 MOTION for Sanctions Against the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, FRANKLIN RAINES, LEANNE G. SPENCER, ( Status Conference set for 3/3/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/22/08. (whb)
January 21, 2008 Status Conference set for 1/22/2008 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon is RESCHEDULED to 1/22/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #578 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG's motion is GRANTED and that KPMG shall have up to and including 1/25/2008 to file its reply memorandum in support of its motion for reconsideration of KPMG's motions to dismiss second amended class action complaint and second amended Franklin-Templeton complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/18/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 17, 2008 Filing 579 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 3, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(td, )
January 16, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Evidentiary Hearing held on 1/16/2008, ( Status Conference set for 1/22/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon, for ruling.). (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 15, 2008 Notice of Rescheduled Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/15/08 is Rescheduled to 1/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 15, 2008 Filing 578 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support Of Motion For Reconsideration Of KPMG's Motions To Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint And Second Amended Franklin-Templeton Complaint by KPMG LLP (Tulumello, Andrew)
January 14, 2008 Filing 577 RESPONSE re: #575 To Individual Defendants' Proposal Re Discovery (Dkt. No. 575) filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Truong, John) Modified on 1/15/2008 (nmw, ).
January 11, 2008 Filing 576 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re: #558 #575 OFHEO's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Sanctions and In Support of OFHEO's Motion for Forebearance filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit)(Truong, John) Modified on 1/14/2008 (nmw, ).
January 11, 2008 Filing 575 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #558 MOTION for Sanctions Against the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight and Proposal re OFHEO's Discovery filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2)(Marx, Daniel)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #574 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Alex Lipman shall be admitted pro hac vice to represent plaintiff Fannie Mae in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/11/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 9, 2008 Filing 574 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alex Lipman, :Firm- Jenner & Block LLP, :Address- 919 Third Avenue, 37th Floor, New York, New York 10022-3908. Phone No. - (212) 891-1605. Fax No. - (212) 891-1699 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Lipman#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Epstein, Jerome)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #569 KPMG's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Nonparty Deloitte & Touche LLP. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to withdraw is GRANTED and that #563 KPMG's motion to compel nonparty Deloitte & Touche to respond to KPMG's subpoena duces tecum is WITHDRAWN without prejudice to KPMG's right to re-file on a later date. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/9/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 8, 2008 Filing 573 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re 570 Memorandum in Opposition (Sommers, Daniel)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #564 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaints. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendant Fannie Mae shall have up to and including 3/3/2008 to answer plaintiffs' complaints and defendants Raines, Howard and Spencer shall have up to and including 3/17/2008 to answer plaintiffs' complaints. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/7/2008. (lcrjl1)
January 7, 2008 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 1/7/2008.Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/15/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER GRANTING in part: re (163 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION to Certify Class filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/7/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 7, 2008 Filing 571 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/7/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
January 7, 2008 Filing 569 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw (214 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From NonParty DeLoitte & Touche LLP by KPMG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(McIntyre, Charles)
January 7, 2008 Filing 568 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/7/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb) Modified on 1/7/2008 (whb). Modified on 1/8/2008 (nmw, ).
January 4, 2008 Filing 570 Memorandum in opposition to #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL)
January 4, 2008 Filing 567 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal of Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion of Defendant KPMG for Reconsideration of KPMG's Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO re #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs (Sommers, Daniel)
January 4, 2008 Filing 566 Memorandum in opposition to re #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs (FILED BY THE FRANKLIN PLAINTIFFS) filed by FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Stuart)
January 3, 2008 Filing 565 Memorandum in opposition to re #558 MOTION for Sanctions Against the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Truong, John)
January 3, 2008 Filing 564 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Franklin and Evergreen Plaintiffs' Complaints by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
January 3, 2008 Filing 563 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 1/9/2008..... MOTION to Compel Production From Nonparty Deloitte & Touche LLP by KPMG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R#19 Exhibit S#20 Exhibit T#21 Exhibit U#22 Exhibit V#23 Exhibit W#24 Exhibit X#25 Exhibit Y#26 Exhibit Z#27 Exhibit AA#28 Exhibit BB#29 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(McIntyre, Charles) Modified on 1/10/2008 (nmw, ).
December 21, 2007 Filing 562 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on October 3, 2007 before Judge Leon. Court Reporter: Lisa M. Hand. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
December 20, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2007 re (514 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION to Quash filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT-GRANTED, (531 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to His Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on the Executive Office of the President and Office of Management and Budget filed by FRANKLIN RAINES-DENIED. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
December 19, 2007 Filing 561 STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
December 19, 2007 Filing 560 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FRANKLIN RAINES. Attorney Ilana T. Buschkin terminated. (Buschkin, Ilana)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #559 Consent Motion to Reschedule December 20, 2007 Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/19/2007. (lcrjl1)
December 18, 2007 Filing 559 Consent MOTION to Reschedule December 20, 2007 Oral Argument by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Kelleher, Diane)
December 18, 2007 Status Conference set for 12/20/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon to address document production issues raised in motions #499, #500 and #558.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/18/2007. (lcrjl1)
December 18, 2007 Filing 558 MOTION for Sanctions Against the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES, J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Marx, Daniel)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #557 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaints. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendants Franklin D. Raines, J. Timothy Howard and Leanne G. Spencer shall file their answers to the complaints in the Franklin (06-139) and Evergreen (06-82) actions no later than 1/16/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
December 12, 2007 Filing 557 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Franklin and Evergreen Plaintiffs' Complaints by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Adam)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 556 THIRD AMENDED STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/8/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
December 7, 2007 Filing 555 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Nichols by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Tiersky, Marcia)
December 6, 2007 Filing 554 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 12/6/2007 (lc, ).
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #552 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Breifing with Respect to Defendant KPMG's Motion for Reconsideration. It is hereby ORDERED that the consent motion for extension of time for the opposition and reply briefs in connection with #550 Defendant KPMG's Motion for Reconsideration of KPMG's Motion ot Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Second Amended Franklin-Templeton Complaint is GRANTED and that plaintiffs' briefs in opposition will be due on or before 1/4/2008 and KPMG's reply brief will be due on or before 1/18/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/6/2007. (lcrjl1)
December 5, 2007 Filing 553 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Third Amended) by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
December 4, 2007 Filing 552 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
December 3, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 12/3/2007.Status Conference set for 1/7/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
December 3, 2007 Filing 551 RESPONSE re #549 Status Report filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Marx, Daniel)
November 30, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 11/30/2007.Status Conference set for 1/25/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
November 30, 2007 Filing 550 MOTION for Reconsideration based on Tellabs by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
November 29, 2007 Filing 549 STATUS REPORT of OFHEO's Production and Request For Forbearance of Interim Deadline by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Truong, John)
November 27, 2007 Filing 548 REPLY re #531 Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to His Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on the Executive Office of the President and Office of Management and Budget and in Opposition to Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Executive Office of the Presidents and Office of Management and Budgets Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and in Opposition to Defendant Franklin Rainess Cross-Motion to Compel the Production of Documents (Dkt. Nos. 541 & 543) filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9)(Clabby, John)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #542 Defendant Franklin D. Raines's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Mr. Raines's time to file a reply memorandum in support of his Cross-Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Response to His Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on the Executive Office of the President and Office of Management and Budget #531 is extended to 11/27/2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/21/2007. (lcrjl1)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 547 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/21/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
November 21, 2007 Filing 546 STATUS REPORT Lead Plaintiffs' Suggestion for Status Conference Scheduling by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Cummins, James)
November 20, 2007 STATUS CONFERENCE: The status conference scheduled for 12/3/2007 at 4:00 pm will be limited to an update regarding document production issues raised in docket numbers 499 and 500.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/20/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER denying (413) MOTION Clarification, Or, In The Alternative, Reconsideration, Of Order Granting Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents re Order on Motion to Compel, by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION in case 1:04-cv-01639-RJL. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/7/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
November 8, 2007 Filing 544 Memorandum in opposition to re #538 MOTION for Reconsideration of KPMG LLP's Motion To Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint filed by FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Stuart)
November 8, 2007 Filing 542 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Reply Memorandum in Further Support of the Executive Office of the President's and Office of Management and Budget's Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and in Opposition to Defendant Franklin D. Raines's Cross-Motion to Compel the Production of Documents (Dkt. No. 541) by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1)(Clabby, John)
November 7, 2007 Filing 543 Memorandum in opposition to re #531 Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to His Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on the Executive Office of the President and Office of Management and Budget filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (See Docket Entry #541 to view document). (nmw, )
November 7, 2007 Filing 541 REPLY to opposition to motion re #514 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One#2 Exhibit Two#3 Exhibit Three)(Tiersky, Marcia)
November 5, 2007 Notice of Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/3/2007 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #540 Motion to Withdraw as Of Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2007. (lcrjl1)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying (496) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (497) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:04-cv-01639-RJL; denying (99) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (100) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:05-cv-01198-RJL; denying (153) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (154) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:06-cv-00082-RJL; denying (194) Motion for Reconsideration; denying (195) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:06-cv-00139-RJL. It is hereby ORDERED that Franklin Plaintiffs' and Evergreen Plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #421 Non-Party OFHEO'S Motion to Quash Raines' and Howards' Subpoenas, or for a Protective Order or, Alternatively, to Stay Compliance with Those Subpoenas. Is is hereby ORDERED that OFHEO's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2007. (lcrjl1)
October 30, 2007 Filing 540 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs by Statman Harris by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
October 26, 2007 Filing 539 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cristen E. Sikes Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Sikes, Cristen)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #532 Executive Office of the President's and Office of Management and Budget's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the Executive Office of the President and the Office of Management and Budget shall file their reply in support of their motion to quash subpoena duces tecum and their opposition to Mr. Raines's cross-motion to compel on or before 11/7/2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/24/07. (lcrjl1)
October 24, 2007 Filing 538 MOTION for Reconsideration of KPMG LLP's Motion To Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
October 24, 2007 Filing 537 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Francis Flanagan on behalf of KPMG LLP (Flanagan, Michael)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 536 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 4. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1017/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL(whb)
October 18, 2007 Filing 535 MEMORANDUM re #533 Joint MOTION Entry of Case Management Order No. 4 filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Reid, Caroline)
October 18, 2007 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance of Heather H. Martin by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Miller, Adam)
October 17, 2007 Filing 533 Joint MOTION Entry of Case Management Order No. 4 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
October 16, 2007 Filing 532 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Franklin Raines's Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Cross-Motion to Compel by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Diane)
October 10, 2007 Filing 531 Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to His Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on the Executive Office of the President and Office of Management and Budget by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clabby, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 530 Memorandum in opposition to re #514 MOTION to Quash and in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9#10 Exhibit 10#11 Exhibit 11#12 Exhibit 12#13 Exhibit 13#14 Exhibit 14#15 Exhibit 15#16 Exhibit 16#17 Exhibit 17#18 Exhibit 18#19 Exhibit 19#20 Exhibit 20#21 Exhibit 21#22 Exhibit 22#23 Exhibit 23)(Clabby, John)
October 10, 2007 Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on September 27, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
October 10, 2007 Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on September 26, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
October 3, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 10/3/2007.Status Conference set for 11/30/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #513 Motion for Protective Order. As per the hearing on September 19, 2007, the motion was DENIED in open court. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/3/07. (lcrjl1)
October 2, 2007 Filing 527 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia N. Tiersky on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Tiersky, Marcia)
October 2, 2007 Filing 526 Joint MOTION Entry of Case Management Order No. 4 by Fannie Mae and by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting (523) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Laura E. Neish may appear pro hac vice on behalf of J. Timothy Howard in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/28/07. (lcrjl1)
September 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 525 STIPULATED ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/27/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
September 27, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Case called for Evidentiary hearing, Status Conference held on 9/27/2007. Stipulated Order to be filed. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
September 27, 2007 Notice of Rescheduled Status Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/28/07 is Rescheduled to 10/3/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
September 26, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/26/2007. Witnesses: Kennis Thaxton, Kelly Kuchta.Evidentiary Hearing continued to 9/27/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
September 25, 2007 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on September 19, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting (486) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is hereby ORDERED that C. Francis Barrett's and Barrett & Weber L.P.A.'s motion to withdraw as of counsel for Lead Plaintiffs in this action is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/24/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
September 24, 2007 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura E. Neish, :Firm- Zuckerman Spaeder LLP, :Address- 1540 Broadway, Suite #1604, New York, NY 10036-4039. Phone No. - 212-704-9600. Fax No. - 212-704-4256 by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura E. Neish#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pal, Holly)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #522 Defendant Franklin D. Raines's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Mr. Raines's time to file an opposition to #514 the Executive Office of the President's and Office of Management and Budget's Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum is extended to October 10, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/24/07. (lcrjl1)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #509 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaints. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendants Fannie Mae, Franklin D. Raines, J. Timothy Howard and Leanne G. Spencer shall answer plaintiffs' complaints on or before 45 days following the date of this Court's resolution of plaintiffs' pending motions for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/24/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
September 21, 2007 Filing 522 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #514 MOTION to Quash by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clabby, John)
September 19, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status/Motion hearing held on 9/19/2007.Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #519 OFHEO'S Motion to Reschedule the September 19, 2007 Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that OFHEO's motion to reschedule the 9/19/2007 hearing is DENIED, and that the parties shall appear for the hearing on 9/19/2007 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 18 as scheduled.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/19/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(lcrjl1)
September 18, 2007 Filing 521 Memorandum in opposition to re #519 MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Sept. 19, 2007 Hearing filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Caroline)
September 18, 2007 Filing 520 Memorandum in opposition to re #519 MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Sept. 19, 2007 Hearing filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marx, Daniel)
September 18, 2007 Filing 519 MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Sept. 19, 2007 Hearing by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Truong, John)
September 17, 2007 Filing 518 REPLY to opposition to motion re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7)(Marx, Daniel)
September 17, 2007 Filing 517 REPLY to opposition to motion re #500 MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Oyer, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2007 Filing 516 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura E. Neish, :Firm- Zuckerman Spaeder LLP, :Address- 1540 Broadway, Suite #1604, New York, NY 10036-4039. Phone No. - 212-704-9600. Fax No. - 212-704-4256 by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura E. Neish#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pal, Holly)
September 14, 2007 Filing 515 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS P. GERRITY. Attorney Carolyn Marie Welshhans terminated. (Welshhans, Carolyn)
September 12, 2007 Filing 514 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Index to Exhibits#3 Exhibit A#4 Exhibit B#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D#7 Exhibit E#8 Exhibit F#9 Exhibit G)(nmw, )
September 11, 2007 Filing 513 MOTION for Protective Order by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Truong, John)
September 11, 2007 Filing 512 Memorandum in opposition to re #500 MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt, #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit)(Truong, John)
September 7, 2007 Filing 511 REPLY to opposition to motion re (194 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Reconsideration /Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of Their Motion For Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard and Spencer filed by FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, BISSETT CANADIAN EQUITY FUND, BISSETT INSTITUTIONAL BALANCED TRUST, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
September 7, 2007 Filing 510 REPLY to opposition to motion re (195 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Reconsideration /Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of The Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry Of A Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) On The Dismissal Of Their State Law Claims filed by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #508 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that the Evergreen Plaintiffs shall file their reply to Radian Guaranty Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) on or before September 7, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/4/07. (lcrjl1)
August 31, 2007 Filing 509 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Franklin and Evergreen Plaintiffs' Complaints by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 30, 2007 Filing 508 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (195 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL, 497 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 100 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 154 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL) MOTION for Reconsideration by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #503 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to continue the August 30, 2007 hearing is granted in part and denied in part; the hearing originally scheduled for August 30, 2007 at 3:30 pm is continued to September 19, 2007 at 3:00 pm. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion to extend the deadline for OFHEO to respond to Defendants Motion to Hold OFHEO in Contempt is granted in part and denied in part; OFHEOs response is now due on or before September 11, 2007 and defendants replies are now due on or before September 17, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/29/07. (lcrjl1)
August 29, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: OFHEO shall file a response to Defendants' Motion to Hold OFHEO in Contempt on or before September 11, 2007. Reply memoranda are due on or before September 17, 2007. (lcrjl1)
August 29, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion hearing set for 8/30/2007 is rescheduled to 9/19/2007 at 3:00 pm in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
August 28, 2007 Filing 507 NOTICE of Name Change by LEANNE G. SPENCER (Miller, Adam)
August 28, 2007 Filing 506 Memorandum in opposition to re (195 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL, 497 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 100 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 154 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, THOMAS P. GERRITY, ANNE M. MULCAHY, FREDERIC V. MALEK, TAYLOR C. SEGUE, III, WILLIAM R. HARVEY, JOE PICKETT, STEPHEN B. ASHLEY, KENNETH M. DUBERSTEIN, JAMIE S. GORELICK, MANUEL J. JUSTIZ, ANN KOROLOGOS, DONALD B. MARRON, DANIEL H. MUDD, H. PATRICK SWYGERT, LESLIE RAHL. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Brady, Nicholas)
August 28, 2007 Filing 505 Memorandum in opposition to re #496 MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer, #497 MOTION for Reconsideration re (482 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Order, /Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for (I) Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard, And Spencer, and (II) Modification MOTION for Reconsideration re (482 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Order, /Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for (I) Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard, And Spencer, and (II) Modification MOTION for Reconsideration re (482 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Order, /Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for (I) Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard, And Spencer, and (II) Modification MOTION for Reconsideration re (482 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Order, /Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for (I) Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard, And Spencer, and (II) Modification filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 28, 2007 Filing 504 Memorandum in opposition to re #503 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Motions and Reschedule Aug. 30, 2007 Hearing filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Caroline)
August 27, 2007 Filing 503 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Motions and Reschedule Aug. 30, 2007 Hearing by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Truong, John)
August 23, 2007 Filing 502 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. Attorney Tammy Gershoni terminated. (Gershoni, Tammy)
August 22, 2007 Filing 501 Memorandum in opposition to re (195 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Reconsideration and Rule 54(b) Certification requested by Evergreen Plaintiffs filed by RADIAN GROUP INC, RADIAN GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Stern, Jonathan)
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #498 Motion to Withdraw #495 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Sherman. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice as to the admission of James A. Sherman is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/22/07. (lcrjl1)
August 21, 2007 Filing 500 MOTION Joinder in re #499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD, LEANNE G. SPENCER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9#11 Exhibit 10#12 Exhibit 11#13 Exhibit 12#14 Exhibit 13#15 Exhibit 14#16 Exhibit 15#17 Exhibit 16)(Oyer, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2007 Filing 499 MOTION To Hold The Office Of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight In Contempt by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9)(Romain, Alex)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #495 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that J. William Boland, Brian E. Pumphrey, Christine D. Mehfoud, and James A. Sherman are admitted to the Bar of this Court, pro hac vice, for the purpose of representing defendant KPMG LLP. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/17/07. (lcrjl1)
August 15, 2007 Filing 498 MOTION to Withdraw (495 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 152 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 193 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL, 98 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Darren W. Stanhouse, :Firm- McGuireWoods LLP, :Address- 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 1200, Washington, D.C. 20036. Phone No. - 202-857-1704. Fax No. - 202-828-2995 by KPMG LLP Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Stanhouse, Darren)
August 14, 2007 Filing 497 MOTION for Reconsideration re (482 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Order, /Evergreen Plaintiffs' Motion for (I) Reconsideration Of The Dismissal Of Their Section 18 Claim Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard, And Spencer, and (II) Modification of the Court's Order Dated July 31, 2007 To Include The Entry Of Final Judgment Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure Rule 54(b) On The Evergreen Plaintiffs' State Law Claims by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (#1)#2 Text of Proposed Order (#2)#3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
August 14, 2007 Filing 496 MOTION for Reconsideration re (481 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Memorandum & Opinion Of The Franklin Plaintiffs' Section 18 Claim As Against Defendants Fannie Mae, Raines, Howard And Spencer by FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
August 10, 2007 Filing 495 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 8/22/2007..... MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Darren W. Stanhouse, :Firm- McGuireWoods LLP, :Address- 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 1200, Washington, D.C. 20036. Phone No. - 202-857-1704. Fax No. - 202-828-2995 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. William Boland#2 Affidavit Declaration of Brian E. Pumphrey#3 Affidavit Declaration of Christine D. Mehfoud#4 Affidavit Declaration of James Anthony Sherman#5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Stanhouse, Darren) Modified on 8/23/2007 (nmw, ).
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 494 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/8/2007. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(alr)
August 7, 2007 Filing 493 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 27, 2007 Status Hearing before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty A. Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 06-82, 06-139. (tg, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren William Stanhouse on behalf of KPMG LLP Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Stanhouse, Darren)
August 6, 2007 Filing 491 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Simon Davidson on behalf of KPMG LLP Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Davidson, Charles)
August 6, 2007 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles William McIntyre on behalf of KPMG LLP Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(McIntyre, Charles)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #485 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend January 13, 2005 Order Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the January 13, 2005 Order approving Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is amended to substitute William A.K. Titelman and the law firm of Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel to Lead PLaintiffs in this securities class action, to replace Berman DeValerio Pease Tabacco Burt & Pucillo as Co-Lead Counsel. Stanley M. Chesley and Waite, Schneider, Bayless & Chesley Co., L.P.A. shall remain as Lead Counsel to Lead Plaintiffs in this securities class action. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/6/07. (lcrjl1)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #483 Defendant Raines's Consent Motion to Withdraw His Motion to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight. It is hereby ORDERED that the #445 Defendant Raines's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight is withdrawn without prejudice to Mr. Raines's right to re-file at a later date. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/6/07. (lcrjl1)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 489 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/05/07. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(tb, )
August 3, 2007 Filing 488 ERRATA to Add Exhibit to Motion of Lead Plaintiffs to Amend January 13, 2005 Order Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Memorandum & Opinion Approving Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Professional Profile of Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP)(Cummins, James)
August 3, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: #487 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with an Errata as the main document, electronically attaching the Exhibit to the Errata and linking the filing to [485}. (lc, )
August 3, 2007 Filing 487 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Memorandum & Opinion Approving Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs [485}- Exhibit A by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Cummins, James) Modified on 8/3/2007 (lc, ).
August 3, 2007 Filing 486 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Lead Plaintiffs by Barrett & Weber filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
August 3, 2007 Filing 485 MOTION to Amend/Correct #52 Memorandum & Opinion Approving Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cummins, James)
August 2, 2007 Filing 484 Consent MOTION to Enter Second Amended Stipulated Pretrial Protective Order by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
August 1, 2007 Filing 483 Consent MOTION to Withdraw #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clabby, John)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDERED that defendants' motions to dismiss (#208, 209, 212, 213, and 227) are granted. Defendant Howard's motion to dismiss (#216) is Granted in part and Denied in part, Defendants' joint request for Judicial Notice is Granted. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/31/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
July 31, 2007 Filing 481 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/31/07. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
July 30, 2007 Filing 480 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (In re Worldcom Opinion)#2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
July 30, 2007 Filing 479 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by RADIAN GUARANTY INC., RADIAN GUARANTY INC. (Attachments: #1 Second Supplemental Memorandum#2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Stern, Jonathan)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #459 MOTION Challenging OFHEO's Improper Confidentiality Designations. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/19/07. (lcrjl1)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #417 MOTION to Compel Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Third-Party Deloitte & Touche USA LLP. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/30/07. (lcrjl1)
July 27, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 7/27/2007.Motion Hearing (Discovery Dispute) set for 8/30/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon., Status Conference set for 9/28/2007 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
July 23, 2007 Filing 478 ANSWER to Crossclaim by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Related document: #391 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by KPMG LLP.(Epstein, Jerome)
July 23, 2007 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 19, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
July 19, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2007 re (421 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT, (459 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION Challenging OFHEO's Improper Confidentiality Designations filed by FRANKLIN RAINES, (445 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by FRANKLIN RAINES --All motions taken under advisment. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
July 18, 2007 Filing 476 NOTICE of Individual Defendants' Proposed Agenda for the July 19, 2007 Hearing Regarding OFHEO's Discovery by FRANKLIN RAINES (Marx, Daniel)
July 16, 2007 Filing 475 Memorandum in opposition to re #459 MOTION Challenging OFHEO's Improper Confidentiality Designations filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Truong, John)
July 13, 2007 Filing 474 REPLY to opposition to motion re #421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Truong, John)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #467 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/13/07. (lcrjl1)
July 13, 2007 Filing 473 REPLY to opposition to motion re (123 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL) MOTION to Compel filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey C. Block#2 Exhibit A & B#3 Affidavit Declaration of Autumn Smith#4 Text of Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #472 Reply to Document, was entered in error at the request of counsel. Counsel will refile said pleading. (tg, )
July 13, 2007 Filing 472 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY re (173 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) Memorandum in Opposition,, Lead Plaintiffs' Reply to Third-Party Deloitte & Touche LLP USA's Response in Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/13/2007 (tg, ).
July 11, 2007 Filing 471 Memorandum in opposition to re #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit #11 Exhibit #12 Exhibit)(Truong, John)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #465 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald L. Marmer. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/11/07. (lcrjl1)
July 11, 2007 Filing 470 RESPONSE re (171 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Leave to File, (170 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Leave to File /JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO THE DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS THE EVERGREEN AND FRANKLIN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS filed by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
July 11, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re (136 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 176 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL, 88 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 466 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) Supplemental Memorandum, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading under the correct category. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
July 10, 2007 Filing 467 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions to Compel by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Truong, John)
July 10, 2007 Filing 466 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re (171 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION for Leave to File /Joint Memorandum of Law in Response to the Director Defendants' Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss The Evergreen and Franklin Second Amended Complaints filed by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, LYXOR/TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG SHORT FUND LIMITED, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST, INSTITUTIONAL FIDUCIARY TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart) Modified on 7/11/2007 (jf, ).
July 9, 2007 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 21, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
July 9, 2007 Filing 468 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on June 13, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
July 9, 2007 Filing 465 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ronald L. Marmer, :Firm- Jenner and Block LLP, :Address- 330 N. Wabash Ave. Suite 4400 Chicago, Illinois 60611-7603. Phone No. - (312) 923-2688. Fax No. - (312) 840-7688 by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald L. Marmer#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Epstein, Jerome)
July 9, 2007 Filing 464 ERRATA by DELOITTE & TOUCHE LLP (173 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by DELOITTE & TOUCHE LLP, FANNIE MAE SECURITIES LITIGATION. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Schreiber, Scott)
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #462 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file its answer to KPMGs Cross-Claims Against Fannie Mae. It is hereby ORDERED that Fannie Mae shall file its answer to KPMGs Cross-Claims by July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/9/07. (lcrjl1)
July 6, 2007 Filing 463 Memorandum in opposition to re ( #77 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 417 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, #123 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, #158 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION to Compel : Non-Party Deloitte & Touche LLP's Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by DELOITTE & TOUCHE LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Woodlock Decl.#2 Exhibit Ex B- Puri Decl#3 Exhibit Ex. C: 6/14/07 letter#4 Exhibit Ex D: 4-03-07 letter#5 Exhibit Ex. E- 4/9/07 letter#6 Exhibit Ex. F: 4/18/07 letter#7 Exhibit certificate of service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Schreiber, Scott) Modified on 7/9/2007 (jf, ).
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #461 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight. It is hereby ORDERED that OFHEO shall file its Opposition to Raines' Motion to Compel by July 10, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/5/07. (lcrjl1)
July 5, 2007 Filing 462 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file its answer to KPMGs Cross-Claims Against Fannie Mae by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Epstein, Jerome)
July 3, 2007 Filing 461 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Truong, John)
July 3, 2007 Filing 460 Memorandum in opposition to re #421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Corwin, Melanie)
July 3, 2007 Filing 459 MOTION Challenging OFHEO's Improper Confidentiality Designations by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing under Seal)(Marx, Daniel)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #457 MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Evergreen and Franklin Second Amended Complaints; and granting #458 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Response To The Director Defendants' Proposed Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of Their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/2/07. (lcrjl1)
June 29, 2007 Filing 458 Consent MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Response To The Director Defendants' Proposed Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of Their Motion to Dismiss by EVERGREEN INTERNATIONAL TRUST, EVERGREEN EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN SELECT EQUITY TRUST, EVERGREEN VARIABLE ANNUITY TRUST, FRANKLIN INVESTORS SECURITIES TRUST, FRANKLIN VALUE INVESTORS TRUST, FRANKLIN STRATEGIC SERIES, FRANKLIN CAPITAL GROWTH FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN VARIABLE INSURANCE PRODUCTS TRUST, FRANKLIN CUSTODIAN FUNDS, INC., FRANKLIN TEMPLETON INTERNATIONAL TRUST, TEMPLETON MPF INVESTMENT FUNDS, FRANKLIN FLEX CAP GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON FUNDS, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON GLOBAL FUND, FRANKLIN TEMPLETON U.S. RISING DIVIDENDS FUND, FRANKLIN WORLD GROWTH CORPORATE CLASS, FRANKLIN GLOBAL TRUST, FRANKLIN MPF U.S. EQUITY FUND, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT FUND PLC, TEMPLETON GLOBAL LONG-SHORT LTD., UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND, UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG STAFF PROVIDENT FUND, FRANKLIN MANAGED TRUST (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Grant, Stuart)
June 29, 2007 Filing 457 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Evergreen and Franklin Second Amended Complaints by JOE PICKETT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Director Defendants' Second Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Evergreen and Franklin Second Amended Complaints#2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order On Motion For Leave To File Second Supplemental Brief)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Hamilton, James)
June 28, 2007 Filing 456 REPLY to opposition to motion re #421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Truong, John)
June 27, 2007 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED MOTION HEARING: The Motions Hearing set for 7/3/07 is RESCHEDULED for 7/19/07 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #453 MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/27/07. (lcrjl1)
June 27, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. #452 MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT, was entered in error and refiled as #453 with corrected document.(jf, )
June 27, 2007 Filing 455 Memorandum in opposition to re #453 MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing (Corrected Version) filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Richard)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #408 Motion to Dismiss Defendant KPMG's Cross-Claims. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/26/07. (lcrjl1)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #450 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura J. Hildner. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/27/07. (lcrjl1)
June 27, 2007 Filing 454 Memorandum in opposition to re #453 MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing (Corrected Version) filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marx, Daniel)
June 26, 2007 Filing 453 MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing (Corrected Version) by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 1-2)(Truong, John)
June 26, 2007 Filing 452 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Continue July 3, 2007 Hearing by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 1-2)(Truong, John) Modified on 6/27/2007 (jf, ).
June 26, 2007 Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Fannie Mae Complaint and Jury Demand in 1:06cv02111 by KPMG LLP (Tulumello, Andrew)
June 25, 2007 Filing 450 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura J. Hildner, :Firm- Williams & Connolly LLP, :Address- 725 Twelfth St., NW, Washington DC, 20005. Phone No. - (202) 434-5242. Fax No. - (202) 434-5029 by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B)(Marx, Daniel)
June 25, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #449 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with a Motion to Intervene. (jf, ) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 449 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Phan on behalf of all parties Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Phan, Susan) Modified on 6/25/2007 (jf, ).
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #416 Motion to Intervene; denying as moot #416 Motion for Protective Order; and granting #448 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/25/07. (lcrjl1)
June 25, 2007 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Without Prejudice Its Pending Motions to Intervene and for a Protective Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cody, Kathleen)
June 21, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 re (166 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL) MOTION to Certify Class filed by STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO, OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM -Taken Under Advisment. (Court Reporter Patty Gel.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
June 20, 2007 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM re #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by FRANKLIN RAINES by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Adam)
June 20, 2007 Filing 446 MEMORANDUM re #445 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight filed by FRANKLIN RAINES by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Clark, Richard)
June 20, 2007 Filing 445 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 8/6/2007..... MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Office of Federal Housing Enterprise Oversight by FRANKLIN RAINES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Ex. 1#3 Exhibit Ex. 2#4 Exhibit Ex. 3#5 Exhibit Ex. 4#6 Exhibit Ex. 5#7 Exhibit Ex. 6#8 Exhibit Ex. 7#9 Exhibit Ex. 8#10 Exhibit Ex. 9#11 Exhibit Ex. 10#12 Exhibit Ex. 11#13 Exhibit Ex. 12#14 Exhibit Ex. 13#15 Exhibit Ex. 14)(Buschkin, Ilana) Modified on 8/7/2007 (nmw, ).
June 20, 2007 Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Oyer on behalf of LEANNE G. SPENCER (Oyer, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2007 Filing 443 Consent MOTION Allocate Time for Class Certification Argument by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
June 19, 2007 Filing 442 REPLY re #418 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Walsh, Michael)
June 19, 2007 MINUTE ORDER granting #435 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #416 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the Securities and Exchange Commission shall file its reply by June 22, 2007. Signed by Richard J. Leon on 6/18/07. (lcrjl1)
June 19, 2007 MINUTE ORDER granting #434 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Fink. Signed by Richard J. Leon on 6/18/07. (lcrjl1)
June 18, 2007 Filing 441 Memorandum in opposition to re #421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Richard)
June 18, 2007 Filing 440 Memorandum in opposition to re #421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5#7 Exhibit 6#8 Exhibit 7#9 Exhibit 8#10 Exhibit 9)(Marx, Daniel)
June 15, 2007 Filing 439 RESPONSE re #418 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey) .
June 15, 2007 Filing 438 RESPONSE #418 to Defendant Fannie Mae's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey) .
June 15, 2007 Filing 437 AFFIDAVIT re #436 Reply to opposition to Motion for Class Certification by KPMG by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration#2 Exhibit B to Declaration#3 Exhibit C to Declaration#4 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Corwin, Melanie)
June 15, 2007 Filing 436 REPLY to opposition to motion re #166 MOTION to Certify Class by KPMG filed by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Corwin, Melanie)
June 15, 2007 Filing 435 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene and For a Protective Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Cody, Kathleen)
June 14, 2007 Filing 434 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott A. Fink, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- One Montgomery St., Suite 3100, San Francisco, CA 94104-4505. Phone No. - (415) 393-8200. Fax No. - (415) 986-5309 by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #432 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that third-party Deloitte & Touche USA shall respond to lead plaintiff' motion to compel the production of documents by July 6, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/14/07. (lcrjl1)
June 14, 2007 Filing 433 REPLY to opposition to motion re #408 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (DeBruin, David)
June 14, 2007 Filing 432 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (77 in 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 417 in 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 123 in 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 158 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents from Third-Party Deloitte & Touche USA LLP by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2007 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. DeBruin on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(DeBruin, David)
June 13, 2007 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 6/13/2007.Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon.,Status Conference/Motion hearing set for 7/27/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
June 11, 2007 Filing 430 REPLY re #413 In Support of Non-OFHEO's Memorandum Supporting Fannie Mae's Motion for Clarification/Reconsideration filed by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Truong, John) Modified on 6/12/2007 (nmw, ).
June 11, 2007 Filing 429 Memorandum in opposition to re #416 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order filed by LEANNE G. SPENCER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Adam)
June 11, 2007 Filing 428 Memorandum in opposition to re #416 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order by the Securities and Exchange Commission filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Pal, Holly)
June 8, 2007 Filing 427 REPLY to opposition to motion re #413 MOTION Clarification, Or, In The Alternative, Reconsideration, Of Order Granting Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents re Order on Motion to Compel, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Walsh, Michael)
June 8, 2007 Filing 426 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to LEANNE G. SPENCER. Attorney Eldad Zvi Malamuth terminated. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Miller, Adam)
June 8, 2007 Filing 425 Memorandum in opposition to re #416 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Protective Order filed by FRANKLIN RAINES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clabby, John)
June 7, 2007 Filing 424 STIPULATION re (158 in 1:06-cv-00139-RJL) MOTION to Compel Stipulation Extending Time for Third-Party Witness Deloitte & Touche USA LLP to Respond to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2007 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline E. Reid on behalf of J.TIMOTHY HOWARD (Reid, Caroline)
June 4, 2007 Filing 422 Memorandum in opposition to re #408 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
June 4, 2007 Filing 421 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, to Stay Subpoenas by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits#3 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 2#4 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 1#5 Exhibit Gov Ex. 3#6 Exhibit Gov Ex. 4#7 Exhibit Gov Ex. 5#8 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 6#9 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 7#10 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 8#11 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 9#12 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 10#13 Exhibit Gov. Ex 11#14 Exhibit Gov. Ex. 12)(Truong, John)
June 1, 2007 Filing 420 Memorandum in opposition to re #413 MOTION Clarification, Or, In The Alternative, Reconsideration, Of Order Granting Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents re Order on Motion to Compel, filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Richard)
May 31, 2007 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: The Status Conference set for 6/5/07 has been RESCHEDULED for 6/13/07 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1)
May 29, 2007 Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on April 26, 2007 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Court Reporter: Patty Artrip Gels. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(jf, )
May 29, 2007 Filing 418 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Michael)
May 29, 2007 Filing 417 MOTION to Compel Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Third-Party Deloitte & Touche USA LLP by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law#2 Block Declaration#3 Exhibit A-D to Block Decl#4 Exhibit E-N to Block Decl#5 ASmith Declaration#6 Exhibit A-B to Smith Decl#7 Text of Proposed Order #8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Block, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2007 Filing 416 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION for Protective Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service#2 Text of Proposed Order #3 Declaration of Charles E. Cain#4 Exhibit Subpoena to OFHEO#5 Subpoena to James B. Lockhart III#6 Subpeona to OFHEO#7 Subpeona to OFHEO#8 Declaration of Nancy M. Morris)(jf, )
May 25, 2007 Filing 415 Memorandum in opposition to re #163 MOTION to Certify Class filed by KPMG LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit A)(Tulumello, Andrew)
May 25, 2007 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM re: #413 MOTION Clarification, Or, In The Alternative, Reconsideration, Of Order Granting Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents re Order on Motion to Compel, by OFFICE OF FEDERAL HOUSING ENTERPRISE OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(Truong, John) Modified on 5/29/2007 (jf, ).
May 25, 2007 Filing 413 MOTION Clarification, Or, In The Alternative, Reconsideration, Of Order Granting Defendant J. Timothy Howard's Motion To Compel Production Of Documents re Order on Motion to Compel, by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Walsh, Michael)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #411 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Phyllis E. Brown. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/22/07. (lcrjl1)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #412 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG LLP shall file its opposition to Fannie Mae's Motion to Dismiss KPMG's Cross-Claims by June 4, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/22/07. (lcrjl1)
May 21, 2007 Filing 412 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by KPMG LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #392 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae. It is hereby ORDERED that Fannie Mae shall produce the documents specified in Howard's January 9, 2007 subpoena by May 28, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/18/07. (lcrjl1)
May 18, 2007 Notice of Rescheduled Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/8/07 is Rescheduled to 6/5/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(whb)
May 18, 2007 Filing 411 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Phyllis E. Brown, :Firm- Law Offices of Phyllis Brown, :Address- 119 East Court Street, Cincinnati, OH 45202. Phone No. - 513-241-0061. Fax No. - 513-621-7086 by OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM (Attachments: #1 #2 #3)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:05-cv-01198-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Sommers, Daniel)
May 17, 2007 Filing 410 REPLY to opposition to motion re #392 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae filed by J.TIMOTHY HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Pal, Holly)
May 15, 2007 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #409 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading.Document not in accordance with LCvR 83.2. (jf, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 409 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Cummins on behalf of OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, STATE TEACHERS RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF OHIO (Cummins, James) Modified on 5/15/2007 (jf, ).
May 10, 2007 Filing 408 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claims by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Gershengorn, Ian)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #399 Consent MOTION for Order Setting a Briefing Schedule for KPMG LLP's Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. It is hereby ORDERED that KPMG's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall be filed by May 25, 2007, and lead plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by June 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/9/07. (lcrjl1)
May 9, 2007 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Heath Gershengorn on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Gershengorn, Ian)
May 9, 2007 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Louis Epstein on behalf of FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Epstein, Jerome)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting #289 MOTION to Dismiss by GOLDMAN SACHS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/8/07. (whb)
May 8, 2007 Filing 404 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/8/07. (whb)
May 7, 2007 Filing 403 Memorandum in opposition to re #392 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Fannie Mae filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5)(Walsh, Michael)
May 7, 2007 Filing 402 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS P. GERRITY. Attorney Robert Michael Romano terminated. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-01639-RJL, 1:06-cv-00082-RJL, 1:06-cv-00139-RJL(Conner, Patrick)