TULTY et al v. SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al Featured Case

Case Number: 1:2004cv01780
Filed: October 15, 2004
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: John D. Bates
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2005 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 defendants' motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/6/2005. (lcjdb2)
August 29, 2005 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 to dismiss filed by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, MUAMMAR QADHAFI. (Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
August 15, 2005 8 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by MOHAMED ELJAHMI, MOHAMMED BUISER, ASHRAF TULTY, ABDELRAHIM S. ABDUSSALAM, MOHAMED BUGHEGHIS, MOHAMMAD ABDELRAHIM, JABALLA HASAN. (Corish, Robert)
July 14, 2005 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, MUAMMAR QADHAFI. (Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
June 14, 2005 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, MUAMMAR QADHAFI, JOHN DOESfiled by ABDELRAHIM S. ABDUSSALAM, MOHAMED ELJAHMI, MOHAMMED BUISER, ASHRAF TULTY, MOHAMED BUGHEGHIS, JABALLA HASAN.(nmw, )
June 3, 2005 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arman Dabiri Abkenari on behalf of SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, MUAMMAR QADHAFI (Dabiri Abkenari, Arman)
May 16, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/7/2005 09:00 AM before Judge John D. Bates. (lcjdb2)
October 15, 2004 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOHN DOES, MUAMMAR QADHAFI, SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA (lc, )
October 15, 2004 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES, MUAMMAR QADHAFI, SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA (Filing fee $ 150) filed by MOHAMMAD ABDELRAHIM, MOHAMED BUGHEGHIS, MOHAMMED BUISER, MOHAMED ELJAHMI, JABALLA HASAN, ASHRAF TULTY.(lc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TULTY et al v. SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?