PARACHA v. BUSH et al
Defendant: BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II
Petitioner: SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY and USA TODAY
Respondent: GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD and JAY HOOD
Interested Party: PRIVILEGE TEAM
Case Number: 1:2004cv02022
Filed: November 17, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Classified Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD (Heiman, Julia)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 RESPONSE to Petitioner's Supplement to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Heiman, Julia)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD (Heiman, Julia)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the unopposed #565 motion of Catherine A. Shusky, Edward Bryan, and Claire R. Cahoon to withdraw as counsel, and in view of the governments #567 Response to Motion to Withdraw by Petitioners Counsel, the #565 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED. Attorneys Catherine Adinaro Shusky, Edward Gerard Bryan and Claire Roxanne Cahoon are terminated. (So Ordered Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/14/22). (tj)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 RESPONSE re #565 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD HENRY RUMSFELD. (Lynch, Jason)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER consolidating 04-cv-2022 with 21-cv-2567 for all purposes and setting deadlines to govern future proceedings. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 30, 2021. (lcaa)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 565 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Shusky, Catherine)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Respondents are directed to file a response to #565 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel on or before January 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 29, 2021. (lcaa)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 564 DECLARATION of Clive A. Stafford Smith by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #563 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Cahoon, Claire)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Supplemental MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Based on Newly Available Grounds for Relief by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Cahoon, Claire)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Jason)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #560 MOTION to Lift Stay addressed to DC Circuit ; USCA Case Number 20-5039. (znmw)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MOTION to Lift Stay addressed to DC Circuit by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. Attorney Kathryn Celia Davis terminated. (Davis, Kathryn)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MAHMOAD ABDAH, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, MAHMOUD AHMED, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ALL PETITIONERS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI. Attorney Marc D. Falkoff terminated. (Falkoff, Marc)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. Attorney Robert J. Prince terminated. (Prince, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER denying #552 motion to modify protective order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/27/2020. (Ginsburg, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 REDACTED OPINION. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/23/2020. This is the public version of the Opinion referenced in the Court's Order #549 . (zcal)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 REPLY to opposition to motion re #552 MOTION to Modify Protective Order filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Cahoon, Claire)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Memorandum in opposition to re #552 MOTION to Modify Protective Order filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MOTION to Modify Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Shusky, Catherine)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 20-5039 for #550 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (zrdj)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #550 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztd)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #549 Memorandum & Opinion, Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Shusky, Catherine)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER denying #11 petitioner's amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 23, 2020. (MA)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 548 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting respondents' classified ex parte motion for exception from disclosure, notice of which appears at #547 . This is the public version of the memorandum opinion and order referenced in the Court's November 6, 2019 Notice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 4, 2019. (lcplf1)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of EX PARTE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has signed a Memorandum Opinion and Order that resolves respondents' third classified ex parte motion, notice of which appears at #547 . The Court has submitted its Memorandum Opinion and Order to the Classified Information Security Officer for classification review and for ex parte delivery to counsel for respondents. Upon completion of the classification review, the Court will file a public version of its Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 4, 2019. (lcplf1)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Closing Arguments set for 11/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Classified closing arguments in this case will take place on Tuesday, November 19, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Each party shall have 2-1/2 hours for argument. The government may apportion its time as it sees fit between its opening argument and rebuttal. Pre-argument exchanges of relevant case law shall take place between the parties as promptly as possible. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 30, 2019. (MA)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/21/2019. Evidentiary Hearing continued to 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (tj)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE OF FILING OF MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING ACCESS TO CLASSIFIED NATIONAL SECURITY INFORMATION (Matthew Griechen) by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 M. Griechen MOU, #2 M. Griechen MOU Acknowledgment)(Maher, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #530 respondents' evidentiary motion. The Court will admit hearsay evidence in this matter and will accord it a rebuttable presumption of regularity. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 18, 2019. (lcplf1)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 544 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting respondents' classified ex parte motion for exception from disclosure, notice of which appears at #522 . This memorandum opinion and order is the public version of the memorandum opinion and order referenced in the Courts October 10, 2019 Notice 541 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 10, 2019. (MA)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE Of Respondents' Position Concerning The Burden Of Proof To Overcome The Presumption Of Regularity For Official Government Documents by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE of Filing of the Joint Exhibits by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE of EX PARTE MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has signed a Memorandum Opinion and Order that resolves respondents' classified ex parte motion, notice of which appears at #522 . The Court has submitted its Memorandum Opinion and Order to the Classified Information Security Officer for classification review and for ex parte delivery to counsel for respondents. Upon completion of the classification review, the Court will file a public version of its Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 10, 2019. (lcplf1).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE of Filing of the Joint Statement of Material Issues in Dispute by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Pre-Hearing Conference held on 10/8/2019. Evidentiary hearing remains scheduled for 10/21/19 at 10:00am. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman.) (tj)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hendry Baer on behalf of JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Baer, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE of Filing with the Classified Information Security Officer by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER The pre-hearing conference scheduled for 10:00 AM on October 8, 2019 is hereby rescheduled for 11:00 AM on October 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2019. (lcplf1)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Hearing conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 536 RESPONSE re #530 MOTION for Order to Admit Hearsay and for Presumption of Regularity filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Cahoon, Claire)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 535 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Opposition Merits Brief by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Cahoon, Claire)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #533 respondents' unopposed motion for expansion of page limit not to exceed 45 pages for the opposition merits briefs due on October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 1, 2019. (MA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Opposition Merits Briefs by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting #531 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including October 11, 2019 within which to file joint exhibits and the joint statement of the material issues in dispute. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 24, 2019. (MA)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Joint Exhibits and the Joint Statement of the Material Issues in Dispute by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MOTION for Order to Admit Hearsay and for Presumption of Regularity by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 529 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Pre-Hearing Brief by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Cahoon, Claire)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting #526 respondents' unopposed motion for expansion of page limit, not to exceed 60 pages, for pretrial merits briefs due on September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 5, 2019. (MA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Pretrial Merits briefs due by 9/20/2019. (zgdf)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Pretrial Merits Briefs by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting respondents' June 29, 2018 ex parte motion for exception from disclosure. The motion granted is the object of #494 respondents' notice to the Court. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 16, 2019. (lcplf1).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, before Judge Paul L. Friedman, held on 5-15-2019. Page Numbers: 1 - 58. Date of Issuance: 8-15-2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Elizabeth SaintLoth; Telephone number: 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental productions due by 8/23/2019. (tj)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #521 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time. On or before August 23, 2019, respondents shall make any supplemental productions pursuant to their ongoing discovery obligations under Section I.D.2 of the Amended Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 15, 2019. (lcplf1)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 522 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Deadline for Production Under Section I.D.2 of the Amended CMO by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE of Filing with the Classified Information Security Officer by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the remaining discovery requests set out in petitioner's motion for supplemental discovery #426 and motion for additional discovery #429 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 12, 2019. (MA)
June 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Shelby Sullivan-Bennis on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information)(Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019 Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (hs)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 515 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND SCHEDULING ORDER defining deadlines, procedures, and the parties' obligations for briefing and discovery in connection with the October 2019 evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 30, 2019. (lcplf1)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER In consideration of the joint status report #512 and the representations of the parties at the status conference on May 15, 2019, petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing #506 is granted. The evidentiary hearing is scheduled to commence at 10:00 AM on Monday, October 21, 2019. The hearing will continue day-to-day until concluded; the Court has allotted up to two weeks for the proceedings, if necessary. A separate order will follow with deadlines and details concerning briefing, discovery, and other items. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 21, 2019. (lcplf1)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 5/15/2019. Parties discuss the status of this action. Court will issue an scheduling order at a later date. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint Loth.) (tj)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the petitioner's unopposed motion #514 to reschedule status conference. The status conference, currently scheduled for May 13, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to May 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (So Ordered Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 8, 2019). (MA)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Unopposed MOTION to to Continue Reschedule Status Hearing re #513 Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Cahoon, Claire) Modified event title on 4/8/2019 (znmw).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The status conference scheduled for April 15, 2019 at 2:30 PM is hereby VACATED. The status conference will be held on the date announced in the Court's most recent Order #513 : May 13, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 5, 2019. (lcplf1)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER that a status conference is scheduled for May 13, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the contents of the Joint Status Report #512 and related matters. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 4, 2019. (MA)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference currently scheduled for 4/15/2019 @ 10:30am, is hereby RESCHEDULED for 2:30 PM on the same day in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Maher on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information)(Maher, Mark)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Attorney Shelby Sullivan-Bennis terminated. (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report on or before April 1, 2019. A status conference is scheduled for April 15, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 12, 2019. (MA)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 508 REPLY to opposition to motion re #506 MOTION for Hearing filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 507 RESPONSE re #506 MOTION for Hearing filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MOTION for Hearing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Cahoon, Claire)
December 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Amended Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Mark Barish (Barish, Daniel)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald James Wiltsie (Wiltsie, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 502 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Marcus Henry (Henry, Terry)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew I. Warden (Warden, Andrew)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Paracha's unopposed motion #500 to extend the deadline to file a supplemental traverse from October 1, 2018 to November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 27, 2018. (MA)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Traverse due by 10/1/2018. (tj)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Cahoon, Claire)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER clarifying the Court's May 24, 2018 Memorandum Opinion and Order #492 , in which the Court granted petitioner's motion to compel #485 in part and denied it in part without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 6, 2018. (MA)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Response to Petitioner's Classified Supplement to the July 23, 2018 Joint Status Report by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations in their joint status report #496 , Mr. Paracha's motion for additional discovery #437 and motion for permission to interview detainees #427 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE of Filing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #496 Status Report (Cahoon, Claire)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Joint STATUS REPORT by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Cahoon, Claire)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/23/2018 Supplemental Memorandum due by 10/1/2018. (tj)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Mr. Paracha's unopposed motion #495 for an extension of time to file a joint status report with respect to Mr. Paracha's three pending discovery motions. The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 23, 2018. Separately, in view of the parties' representations in their joint status report #493 regarding Mr. Paracha's additional discovery requests, Mr. Paracha's unopposed request to extend the deadline to file a supplemental traverse from July 31, 2018 to October 1, 2018 is granted. Mr. Paracha shall file a supplemental traverse on or before October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 2, 2018. (lcplf1)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Barish, Daniel)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice #485 petitioner's motion to compel. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 24, 2018. (MA)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building (refiled due to linkage issue) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD J. TRUMP, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Regarding Camp II, Building 8 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified on 4/24/2018 to enter in error due to linkage issues; counsel will refile.(ztnr)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' representations in their joint status report #488 regarding Mr. Paracha's motion #482 to allow review of the classified amended factual return, or in the alternative, to compel production of the unclassified amended factual return, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 30, 2018 stating: (1) whether the United States has provided "a version of the Amended Factual Return that can be shared" with Mr. Paracha; and (2) if so, whether Mr. Paracha still seeks resolution of his motion #482 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 23, 2018. (MA)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Barish, Daniel)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2018. (gdf)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Mr. Paracha has filed a motion #482 to allow review of the classified amended factual return, or in the alternative, to compel production of the unclassified amended factual return. The United States expects to produce "a version of the Amended Factual Return that can be shared" with Mr. Paracha by mid-April. In view of the parties' representations, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 20, 2018 notifying the Court: (1) whether the United States has provided "a version of the Amended Factual Return that can be shared" with Mr. Paracha; and (2) if so, whether Mr. Paracha still seeks resolution of his motion #482 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 9, 2018. (MA)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 RESPONSE Notice of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel Government to File I.F. Documents and for Court to Set Discovery Deadlines by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD re #485 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel) Modified event title on 4/4/2018 (znmw).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #486 petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental traverse from April 2, 2018 to on or before July 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 29, 2018. (MA)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Supplemental Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE of filing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2018 (tj)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the joint status report #484 dated March 15, 2018, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 16, 2018.(lcplf1)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Joint STATUS REPORT by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Memorandum in opposition to re #482 MOTION to Allow Review of Classified Amended Factual Return or MOTION to Compel Production of Unclassified Amended Factual Return filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barish, Daniel)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION to Allow Review of Classified Amended Factual Return or, MOTION to Compel Production of Unclassified Amended Factual Return by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Curtis, Claire)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/16/2018 (tj)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the joint status report #481 dated January 31, 2018, the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 21, 2018. (MA)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Joint STATUS REPORT by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Adinaro, Catherine)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE Regarding Camp Four by ALL RESPONDENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rear Admiral Cashman)(Warden, Andrew)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 NOTICE MOU of Ashraf Michael by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Remes, David)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #478 petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental traverse on or before April 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 20, 2017. (MA)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #476 , 477 joint motion to continue the October 17, 2017 joint status report. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 31, 2018. In light of the joint status report dated October 11, 2017, the Court denies as moot #101 Parachas Motion for Return of Papers or Submission to Special Master for Privilege Review. (So Ordered Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/13/17). (tj) Modified on 10/13/2017 (ztj).
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Joint MOTION to Continue by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (See Docket Entry #476 to view document). (znmw)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion to Continue the October 17, 2017 Joint Status Report by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Adinaro, Catherine)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 NOTICE Regarding Camp Five Echo Block by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD J. TRUMP, ROBERT GATES, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, JAY HOOD, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, EDWARD B. CASHMAN, DAVID CULPEPPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, HARVEY RISHIKOF, DONALD J. TRUMP, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD J. TRUMP, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #473 petitioner's motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental traverse on or before December 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 25, 2017. (MA)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE re #473 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Traverse filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer regarding #472 Paracha's status report on the pending motion for return of papers and submit a joint status report on or before October 12, 2017, informing the Court if #101 Paracha's Motion for Return of Papers or Submission to Special Master for Privilege Review has been overtaken by events and if he still seeks resolution of this motion or if Paracha intends to file a new motion regarding papers seized this year. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 21, 2017. (MA)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 STATUS REPORT on Pending Motion for Return of Papers by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Adinaro, Catherine)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER that petitioner shall file a status report on or before September 19, 2017, informing the Court if #101 his Motion for Return of Papers or Submission to Special Master for Privilege Review has been overtaken by events and if he still seeks resolution of this motion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 29, 2017. (lcplf1)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting #428 petitioner's motion to file a supplemental traverse. Petitioner shall file his supplemental traverse on or before October 2, 2017. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 1, 2017. (MA)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MANDATE of USCA as to #446 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA ; USCA Case Number 16-5248. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(ztd)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE Regarding Camp Iguana by ALL RESPONDENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cashman Declaration)(Warden, Andrew)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/16/2017 (tj)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall file a status report on or before June 16, 2017, detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. In that report, the government shall include an estimate of when it intends to amend its factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 24, 2017. (MA)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #463 Notice of Appearance (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Sullivan-Bennis on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Sullivan-Bennis, Shelby) (Main Document 463 replaced on 4/8/2017) (znmw).
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall file a status report on or before April 21, 2017, detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. In that report, the government shall include an estimate of when it intends to amend its factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 2, 2017. (MA)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of filing of Reply to Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Interview Detainees by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/1/2017 (tj)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall file a status report on or before March 1, 2017, detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. In that report, the government shall include an estimate of when it intends to amend its factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 15, 2016. (lcplf1)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Filing of Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Combined Opposition to Petitioner's Discovery Motions by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Curtis, Claire)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Petitioner's Motion for Permission to Interview Detainees by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Curtis, Claire)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioner's motion for leave for file a supplemental traverse #428 is held in abeyance pending the government's production of responsive documents and decision to amend its factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 7, 2016. (MA)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall file a status report on or before December 5, 2016, detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 7, 2016. (MA)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE of Filing with the Classified Information Security Officer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Barish, Daniel)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #449 petitioner's unopposed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner shall be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 7, 2016. (MA)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall file a status report on or before October 31, 2016, detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. In that report, the government shall include an estimate of when it intends to amend its factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 7, 2016. (MA)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/31/2016 (tj)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER of USCA ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that this case be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of Appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis as to #446 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. USCA Case Number 16-5248. (zrdj)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ERRATA to Notice to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, ROBERT M. GATES, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO (239 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 1876 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 264 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 452 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 101 in 1:09-cv-00031-UNA, 360 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 277 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 287 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 234 in 1:05-cv-01983-UNA, 413 in 1:08-cv-01360-UNA, 673 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 279 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 175 in 1:05-cv-01623-UNA, 171 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 126 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 2005 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 422 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 410 in 1:05-cv-01048-UNA, 301 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 351 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 149 in 1:07-cv-02337-UNA, 241 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 22 in 1:08-cv-01645-RJL, 222 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 1088 in 1:04-cv-01194-UNA, 403 in 1:05-cv-02479-UNA, 481 in 1:05-cv-00569-UNA, 184 in 1:08-cv-01238-UNA, 255 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 152 in 1:06-cv-01725-EGS, 155 in 1:05-cv-02223-RJL, 255 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 2053 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 122 in 1:05-cv-02348-EGS, 356 in 1:05-cv-01607-RCL, 450 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 258 in 1:08-cv-01207-RCL, 1063 in 1:04-cv-01254-RCL, 185 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 127 in 1:05-cv-01312-RJL, 321 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 309 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 328 in 1:05-cv-00023-UNA) Notice (Other),,,,,,,, filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DAVID HEATH, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, PETER J. CLARKE, JEFFREY HABERSON, TOM COPERMAN, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JOHN DOE, ROBERT GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DONNIE THOMAS, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, KYLE J. COZAD, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID E. HEATH, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID THOMAS, JR., COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TOM COPEMAN, STEVEN BLAISDELL, WADE F. DAVIS, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., MARK H. BUZBY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GORDON R. ENGLAND. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice to Court, #2 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE to the Court by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, DONNIE THOMAS, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ASHTON B. CARTER, JOHN DOE, DAVID E. HEATH, JOSE R. MONTEAGUDO, NELSON J. CANNON, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, JAY HOOD, RICHARD B. CHENEY, JOHN DOE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDOLEEZZA RICE, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, KYLE J. COZAD, DAVID HEATH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rear Admiral Peter J. Clarke)(Wolfe, Kristina)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/14/2016 Replies due by 10/28/2016. Status Report due by 9/30/2016 (tj)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Document Production by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #448 the government's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. The government shall file a status report on or before September 30, 2016 detailing its progress with the production and an estimate of the time necessary to complete its production. The government shall respond to petitioner's now-four outstanding document requests on or before October 14, 2016, and petitioner shall file reply briefs, if any, on or before October 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 31, 2016. (lcplf2)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 16-5248 for #446 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (zrdj)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re #446 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (td)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting petitioner's motion for judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b). A separate Order will be issued this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 29, 2016. (MA)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #440 plaintiff's motion for judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court's June 16, 2016 Order #439 represents its Final Judgment regarding petitioner's bill of attainders claim. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 29, 2016. (MA)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 REPLY to opposition to motion re #440 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 RESPONSE re #440 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Per the representations of counsel at the June 14, 2016 motions hearing, petitioner's motion for an order granting access to publicly available WikiLeaks documents #363 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 11, 2016. (MA)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SHAKER AAMER, JIHAD DHIAB, FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI. Attorney Cori Crider terminated. (Crider, Cori)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #401 petitioner's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2016. (MA)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #438 respondents' motion for extension of time. The government's obligation to respond to petitioner's motion for additional discovery #437 is held in abeyance, and the parties shall report to the Court no later than September 30, 2016 whether a response to the motion remains necessary. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 14, 2016. (MA)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's Motion for Additional Discovery by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE Of Filing a Motion for Additional Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2016 re #401 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Pat Kaneshiro-Miller.) (zmm)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Barish on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA (Barish, Daniel)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 5/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (zmm)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Joint STATUS REPORT by JAY HOOD, BARACK H. OBAMA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/5/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmm)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION for Hearing re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #432 petitioner's unopposed motion to continue May 3 status hearing and for leave to appear via telephone. The status conference currently scheduled for May 3, 2016 is continued to May 5, 2016 at 2:30 p.m.; and petitioner's counsel is granted leave to participate by telephone at the status hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 21, 2016. (MA)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Unopposed MOTION to Continue May 3rd Status Hearing And For Leave To Appear VIA Telephone by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2016. Status Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmm)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Government's unopposed motion for a status conference #430 is GRANTED. Government's obligation to respond to petitioner's motion for supplemental discovery #426 , motion for permission to interview detainees #427 , and motion for leave to file a supplemental traverse #428 is held in abeyance. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report with their proposals for completing discovery in this matter on or before April 29, 2016. A status conference in this matter will be held on May 3, 2016 at 9:30 am. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 18, 2016. (MA)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Unopposed MOTION for Scheduling Order or, in the alternative, Motion for an Extension of Time by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MOTION For Additional Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Traverse by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE of Filing a Motion for Permission to Interview Detainees by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE of Filing a Motion for Supplemental Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #185 Order (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Jean Adinaro on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Adinaro, Catherine)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner's motion to lift the stay in this case #423 is GRANTED. The parties' obligations under this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order, as amended on December 16, 2008, are no longer suspended with respect to Petitioner. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 18, 2016. (MA)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MOTION to Lift Stay re #367 Order on Motion to Stay by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REPLY to opposition to motion re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on bills of attainder, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 RESPONSE re #418 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment declaring restrictions invalid as bills of attainder, filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit Table, #3 Exhibit Table, #4 Exhibit Table)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental responses due by 3/4/2016. Supplemental reply due by 3/11/2016. (zmm)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner's unopposed motion for a partial lifting of the stay #417 and the government's unopposed motion for a briefing schedule #420 are GRANTED. The stay in this case is lifted only as to petitioner's motion for summary judgment #401 . The government shall file its supplemental opposition on or before March 4, 2016. Petitioner shall file his reply to the supplemental opposition, if any, on or before March 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 1, 2016. (MA)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 RESPONSE re #417 MOTION for Order to lift the stay partially filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiltsie, Ronald)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Second Supplemental Memorandum to #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment declaring restrictions invalid as bills of attainder, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Gaillard) Modified on 1/19/2016 to add linkage and correct text (td).
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MOTION for Order to lift the stay partially by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 RESPONSE to #413 Supplement to Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment to Include the 2016 National Defense Authorization Act filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Wiltsie, Ronald) Modified to add linkage on 12/23/2015 (td).
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Wiltsie on behalf of JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Wiltsie, Ronald)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 NOTICE of Withdrawl of Appearance by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Overmyer, Wendi)
December 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Supplemental Memorandum to re: #401 Motion for Summary Judgment by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard) Modified on 1/19/2016 (td).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by Rhonda Huczel by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #185 Order (Bryan, Edward)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #185 Order (Curtis, Claire)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Cahoon Curtis on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Curtis, Claire)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the stay entered in this case on May 4, 2011, that neither party seeks to lift according to the #398 joint status report filed on March 13, 2015 and #407 petitioner's reply in support of his motion for summary judgment, the Court will take no action on #401 petitioner's motion for summary judgment until the stay in this case is lifted. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 4, 2015. (MA)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #185 Order (Bryan, Edward)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bryan on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Bryan, Edward)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 REPLY to opposition to motion re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on bills of attainder, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Memorandum in opposition to re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Folio, Joseph)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/12/2015. (zmm)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #405 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including June 12, 2015 to file a response to petitioner's motion for summary judgment #401 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 8, 2015. (MA)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/8/2015. (zmm, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #404 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including June 8, 2015 to file a response to petitioner's motion for summary judgment #401 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 14, 2015. (MA)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE of Acknoweldgment of the Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 NOTICE of Memorandum of Understanding by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Appendix, #4 Statement of Facts, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Gaillard) (Main Document 401 replaced on 5/1/2015) (td, ). Modified to delete blank page per counsel on 5/1/2015 (td, ).
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by Gaillard T. Hunt on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, RICHARD B. MYERS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the stay entered in this case on May 4, 2011, that neither party seeks to lift according to the #398 joint status report filed on March 13, 2015, the Court will take no action on #363 petitioner's motion for access to publicly available classified WikiLeaks documents relevant to petitioner until the stay in this case is lifted. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 17, 2015. (lcplf3)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report in compliance with Courts Order of February 18, 2015 by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Remes, David)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report, under seal if necessary, on or before March 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 18, 2015. (lcplf3)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2015. (zmm, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Narrative, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3)(Wolfe, Kristina)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE of Classified Filing by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD re Order, (Folio, Joseph)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Brief due by 11/7/2014. (zmm, )
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the government to file a supplemental brief of no more than five pages on or before November 7, 2014, under seal or classified as necessary, addressing the current classification status of the documents at issue in #363 petitioner's application. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 24, 2014. (lcplf3)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting #383 respondents' consent motion to deem protected information highlighted in the accompanying proposed public factual return for ISN 1094; denying #385 petitioner's unopposed motion to seal the factual return in its entirety. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 6, 2014. (MA)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, #2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Board Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Warden, Andrew)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. Attorney Stephen McCoy Elliott terminated. (Elliott, Stephen)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Trish Maskew on behalf of All Defendants (Maskew, Trish)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Unopposed MOTION for Order Sealing Factual Return by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #384 Unopposed MOTION Seal Public Factual Return and RESPONSE to MOTION Seal Public Factual Return was entered in error and refiled by counsel.(See Docket Entry #385 to view document) (jf, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION Seal Public Factual Return and RESPONSE to MOTION Seal Public Factual Return by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Remes, David) Modified on 10/3/2011 (jf, ).
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 SEALED MOTION filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 Narrative, #6 Exhibit 4)(ztd, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE of Filing Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 1094 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Koenig on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Koenig, Michael)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #379 Reply to opposition to Motion, was entered in error and counsel refiled as docket entry no. #380 (td, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REPLY to opposition to motion re #363 MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner (substitute reply) filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Remes, David)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #363 MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Remes, David) Modified on 7/6/2011 (td, ).
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to respondents' memorandum in opposition to emergency application for access to certain Wikileaks documents due by 7/1/2011. (zmm, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #378 petitioner's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time up to and including July 1, 2011 to reply to respondents' memorandum in opposition to his emergency application for access to certain Wikileaks documents. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 28, 2011. (MA)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #363 MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ERRATA by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD #376 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Memorandum in opposition to re #363 MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolfe, Kristina)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/15/2011. (tb, )
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Respondents' unopposed fourth motion #375 for an extension of time is granted. Respondents shall file their response to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available WikiLeaks documents relevant to petitioner's case by June 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 13, 2011. (lcplf1)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION for Expedited consideration by SAIFULLAH PARACHA; (See docket entry no. #373 to view document) (td, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available Wikileaks documents relevant to petitioner's case due by 6/10/2011. (zmm, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Memorandum in opposition to re #370 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case (substitute) filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Remes, David)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE of withdrawal and substitution of fiing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA re #371 Memorandum in Opposition, (Remes, David)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that, having considered respondents' third motion for extension of time to respond to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available Wikileaks documents relevant to petitioner's case, and the opposition thereto, the government shall file their response on or before June 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 6, 2011. (MA)
June 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 371 WITHDWRAWN PURSUANT TO COUNSEL'S NOTICE FILED 6/6/11. . . . .Memorandum in opposition to re #370 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Remes, David) Modified on 6/6/2011 (td, ).
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available WikiLeaks documents relevant to petitioner's case due by 6/3/2011. (zmm, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Respondents' unopposed second motion #369 for an extension of time to respond to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available WikiLeaks documents relevant to petitioner's case is granted. Respondents shall file their response by June 3, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 31, 2011. (lcplf1)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case (Unopposed) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available Wikileaks documents relevant to petitioner's case due by 5/25/2011. (zmm, )
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #368 respondents' Motion for Extension of Time up to and including May 25, 2011 to respond to petitioner's application for immediate access to all publicly available Wikileaks documents relevant to petitioner's case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2011. (MA)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Application for Immediate Access to All Publicly Available Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner's Case by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elliott, Stephen)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting 366 Petitioner's Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/4/2011. (zmm, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MOTION to Stay case by SAIFULLAH PARACHA; (td, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STATUS REPORT and Unopposed Motion to Stay Case by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Stay Case)(Remes, David)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to emergency application for immediate access to all publicly available WikiLeaks documents relevant to case due by 5/11/2011. Reply due by 5/18/2011. Mr. Paracha to file past-due status report by 5/2/2011. (zmm, )
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Mr. Paracha shall file the past-due report by May 2, 2011; government's opposition to the emergency application is due by May 11, 2011; and reply is due by May 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 29, 2011. (MA)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #362 Motion for Order; emailed to remesdh@gmail.com, cc'd 19 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document (ztnr, )
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Emergency MOTION for Order Granting Emergency Application for Access to Publicly Available Classified Wikileaks Documents Relevant to Petitioner by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David) Modified on 4/28/2011 (tnr, ).
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) discharging the order to show cause, granting the motion to exceed the page limit, ordering the Clerk to file the lodged joint response, and vacating the District Court's order requiring advance notice of transfer as to (42 in 1:05-cv-00833-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 83 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 47 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 63 in 1:05-cv-02199-UNA, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-UNA, 49 in 1:06-cv-01684-UNA, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 75 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-UNA, 43 in 1:06-cv-01766-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-ESH, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 28 in 1:05-cv-01725-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 40 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 72 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 50 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-UNA, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH -AK, 13 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 44 in 1:05-cv-01189-UNA, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 109 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 21 in 1:05-cv-00995-UNA, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 39 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01353-UNA, 39 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-UNA, 204 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 39 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 102 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 100 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 87 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 56 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK -AK, 39 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 96 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 114 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 521 in 1:10-cv-01020-RJL, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 62 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 26 in 1:06-cv-01668-UNA, 58 in 1:05-cv-01497-UNA, 46 in 1:06-cv-01765-UNA, 52 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 25 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 521 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-UNA, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 102 in 1:05-cv-00569-EGS, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 83 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 19 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 83 in 1:05-cv-01601-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 85 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 34 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 77 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 24 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 143 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Notices of Appeal filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, and TERRY CARRICO; USCA Case Number: 08-5233 (consolidated with 08-5234-08-5262, 08-5264-08-5270, 08-5272-08-5278, 08-5280-08-5286, 08-5288, 08-5289, 08-5291-08-5297, 08-5299-08-5306, 08-5308-08-5315, 08-5317-08-5323, 08-5325-08-5330, 08-5332-08-5336, 08-5338-08-5343, and 08-5345-08-5347.) (tnr, )
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) USCA Case Number 05-5334. ORDERED that the district court's order entered June 16, 2005, requiring advance notice of transfer be vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be dismissed as moot. (zsmm) Modified on 5/12/2011 (smm).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's Status Report due by 4/1/2011. (zmm, )
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of petitioner's status report #358 filed on January 3, 2011, it is hereby ordered, with the agreement of the parties, that this case is continued pending petitioner's filing of a status report by April 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 10, 2011. (MA)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 358 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE of Filing of Status Report by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Remes, David)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Attorney Gaillard T. Hunt terminated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Hunt, Gaillard)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Petitioner's statement withdrawing authorization of Gaiillard T. Hunt by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's statement withdrawing authorization of Gaillard T. Hunt)(Remes, David)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK H. OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER staying the Court's July 27, 2010 Order pending the hearing scheduled to take place on October 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 15, 2010. (lctfh2)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of petitioner's status report #352 filed on August 31, 2010, it is hereby ordered that petitioner's counsel shall file a status report on or before December 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2010. (MA)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/31/2010. (zmm, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE of filing of status report (under seal) by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Remes, David)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's Status Report due by 8/31/2010. (zmm, )
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report #350 filed on August 13, 2010, where petitioner's counsel proposed to submit to the Court, at its direction, a further status report on recent developments, it is hereby ordered that petitioner's counsel shall file a status report on or before August 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 23, 2010. (MA)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER scheduling a hearing regarding the pending Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. The hearing shall take place on October 7, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on August 19, 2010. (lctfh2) Modified on 8/19/2010 (lctfh2, ).
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE of Filing Joint Status Report under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD re Order, (Folio, Joseph)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier M. Guzman on behalf of BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, JR (Guzman, Javier)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein.
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Proposed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 7, 2010. (lctfh2)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply brief in support of motion to amend and for clarification of 1/14/2010 Order due by 7/1/2010. (zmm, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting (310) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (264) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01164-RBW; granting (776) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01194-TFH; granting (878) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01254-HHK; granting (163) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-01937-PLF; granting (343) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-02022-PLF; granting (183) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-02215-RMC. Reply due by 7/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/2010. (lctfh2, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Report due by 8/13/2010. (zmm, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report of June 14, 2010, the parties are hereby ordered to file a joint report informing the Court how they wish to proceed in this case on or before August 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2010. (MA)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Folio, Joseph)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Consolidated Reply Brief due by 6/24/2010. (zmm, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents' Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors. Accordingly, the respondents' consolidated reply brief shall be due to be filed on or before June 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 13, 2010 nunc pro tunc. (lctfh2)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors re (254 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER of USCA as to (99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO ; USCA Case Number 08-5233, 08-5234, 08-5235, 08-5236, 08-5260, 08-5261, 08-5237, 08-5238, 08-5239, 08-5240, 08-5241, 08-5242, 08-5243, 08-5244, 08-5245, 08-5246, 08-5247, 08-5248, 08-5249, 08-5250, 08-5251, 08-5252, 08-5262, 08-5253, 08-5254, 08-5263, 08-5255, 08-5264, 08-5256, 08-5265, 08-5266, 08-5257, 08-5267, 08-5258, 08-5259, 08-5268, 08-5276, 08-5269, 08-5277, 08-5278, 08-5270, 08-5280, 08-5281, 08-5271, 08-5272, 08-5282, 08-5273, 08-5274, 08-5283, 08-5275, 08-5284, 08-5285, 08-5286, 08-5291, 08-5292, 08-5293, 08-5294, 08-5302, 08-5295, 08-5303, 08-5304, 08-5296, 08-5305, 08-5297, 08-5306, 08-5299, 08-5300, 08-5301, 08-5308, 08-5309, 08-5317, 08-5310, 08-5318, 08-5319, 08-5311, 08-5320, 08-5312, 08-5313, 08-5314, 08-5321, 08-5315, 08-5331, 08-5322, 08-5332, 08-5333, 08-5334, 08-5335, 08-5336, 08-5288, 08-5338, 08-5339, 08-5323, 08-5340, 08-5325, 08-5326, 08-5341, 08-5327, 08-5342, 08-5289, 08-5328, 08-5343, 08-5329, 08-5330, 08-5345, 08-5346, 08-5347, 08-5348 ORDERED that Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 be dismissed as moot, FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidation of Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348 with Nos. 08-5233, et al., be terminated, FURTHER ORDERED to terminate party Atag Ali Abdoh in 08-5235, Jamal Mar'i, Nabil Mohamed Mar'i and Farouk Ali Ahmed Saif in 08-5236, Waffa El-Arabie and Sherif El-Mashad in 08-5244, Mohammad Karim and Mohammad Rahim in 08-5314, Riad Nargeri in 08-5321 and Adel Lnu and Saif Ullah in 08-5322; dismissing as moot motion to hold case in abeyance [1177160-3]; FURTHER ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that the remaining appellees in these consolidated cases show cause, within 30 days of the date of this order why the district courts orders requiring advance notice of transfer should not be vacated and the cases remanded. Response to Order due 06/01/2010. Response may not exceed 10 pages [See Order for further details]The Clerk is directed to issue forthwith to the district court a certified copy of this order in lieu of formal mandate in Nos. 08-5271, 08-5331, and 08-5348. The Clerk is further directed to withhold issuance of the mandate in Nos. 08-5235, 08-5236, 08-5244, 08-5314, 08-5321, and 08-5322 until resolution of the remainder of those appeals. (mmh, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Consolidated response due by 6/2/2010. (zmm, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Respone to the Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns. Accordingly, the petitioners response shall be due to be filed on or before June 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 4, 2010. (lctfh2, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by FATMAH ELSAMNAH, OMAR KHADR, FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, AHCENE ZEMIRI, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, FALEN GHEREBI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioners' Consolidated Response due by 5/3/2010. (mm, )
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Monday, May 3, 2010, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the Respondents' Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns [Dkt. No. 1942, 08-mc-442]. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/19/10. (lctfh1)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2010. (zmm, )
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report filed on April 15, 2010, it is hereby ordered that the parties file another joint status report on or before June 14, 2010 to update the Court about the status of the government's review and processing of discovery documents. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 16, 2010. (MA)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Folio, Joseph)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents' Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Court's January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Report due by 4/15/2010. (mm, )
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to file a joint report informing the Court of the status of this case on or before April 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 1, 2010. (MA)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on 10/30/09; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance:2/1/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.
January 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgement (Samuel Hecht Dorison) by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Remes, David)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Pursuant to Protective Order by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Murray, Tara)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Murray on behalf of FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Murray, Tara)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Murray on behalf of OMAR DEGHAYES, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID (Murray, Tara)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 STATUS REPORT by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD. (Folio, Joseph)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2009 re #319 MOTION for Order Releasing Petitioner on Bail, filed by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Motion heard and denied for reasons stated on the record. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2009. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ad, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 REPLY to opposition to motion re #319 MOTION for Order Releasing Petitioner on Bail, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hunt, Gaillard)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Memorandum in opposition to re #319 MOTION for Order Releasing Petitioner on Bail, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Folio, Joseph)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER. Attorney Jean Lin terminated. (Lin, Jean)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SAIFULLAH PARACHA. Attorney Zachary Katznelson terminated. (Katznelson, Zachary)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Filing Response to Petitioner's Request for Admissions by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD re #320 Notice (Other) (Folio, Joseph)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Improper Respondents (Dkt. No. 723, 08-mc-0442). In light of subsequent rulings by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and pending matters before this Court that are related to the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/9/09. (lctfh1)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to motion for release on bail due by 10/20/2009. Reply due by 10/27/2009. Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 10/30/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmm, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 299 Motion for Discovery; denying 314 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 315 Motion; denying 315 Motion to Strike; denying #306 motion to unseal. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 28, 2009. (MA)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #306 Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 28, 2009. (MA) Modified on 8/31/2009 (zmm, ).
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #299 Motion for Discovery; denying #314 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying 315 Motion; denying 315 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 28, 2009. (MA) Modified on 8/31/2009 (zmm, ).
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRIES 321 AND 322 ENTERED IN ERROR -- PLEASE DISREGARD. (MA)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 8/26/2009. Response to #319 Motion for Order Releasing Petitioner on Bail due 10/20/2009. Reply due by 10/27/2009. Hearing on #319 Motion set for 10/30/2009 @ 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of filing of classified request for admissions under seal, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that the Court will hear oral argument on petitioner's motion for release on bail #319 on August 26, 2009 during the already scheduled status conference. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 21, 2009. (MA)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MOTION for Order Releasing Petitioner on Bail, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying respondents' motion for a continuance of the status conference scheduled for August 26, 2009 #316 in the interest of resolving this matter as expeditiously as possible. If Mr. Folio is unable to appear, co-counsel may appear in his stead. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/20/09. (lcplf1).
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Memorandum in opposition to re 315 MOTION for immediate relief MOTION to Strike, #314 MOTION for More Definite Statement , or to require proper return, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Elliott, Stephen)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/26/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Memorandum in opposition to re #316 MOTION to Continue the Status Conference Scheduled for August 26, 2009 , opposition filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION to Continue the Status Conference Scheduled for August 26, 2009 by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that a status conference is scheduled for August 26, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 18, 2009. (MA)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION for immediate relief, MOTION to Strike Amended Return by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA; (See Docket Entry No. #314 to view document) (td, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION for More Definite Statement , or to require proper return, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Paul Edward Ahern terminated. (Ahern, Paul)
August 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 REPLY to opposition to motion re #299 MOTION for Discovery filed on or about July 10, 2009, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Folio, Joseph)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Memorandum in opposition to re #306 MOTION to Unseal Document #305 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, #302 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD , in camera ex parte progress report filed by respondents Jul MOTION to Unseal Document #305 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, #302 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD , in camera ex parte progress report filed by respondents Jul filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Third Olsen Declaration)(Folio, Joseph)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD re #304 Notice (Other) (Folio, Joseph)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER amending the definitions and procedures set forth in the Case Management Order issued by Judge Hogan in In re Guantanamo Bay Detainee Litig., Misc. No. 08-0442, Dkt. No. 940 (Nov. 6, 2008), amended by Misc. No. 08-0442, Docket No. 1315 (Dec. 16, 2008), for the above captioned cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 16, 2009. (MA)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED DOCUMENT re #298 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION to Unseal Document #305 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, #302 Notice (Other) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD , in camera ex parte progress report filed by respondents July 10, 2009; this motion filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE - Supplemental Notice of Filing of Ex Parte Submission Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Elliott, Stephen)
July 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE of filing under seal of classified discovery demands, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #299 MOTION for Discovery filed (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #298 Order, Notice of Task Force Recommendation filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Folio, Joseph)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Folio, Joseph)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for Discovery filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Chart of discovery orders, #2 Affidavit of intelligence expert, #3 NY Times on SWIFT connection)(Hunt, Gaillard)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER that on or before July 10, 2009, for each of the above-captioned cases, respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to petitioner, and that respondents shall be under an affirmative and ongoing obligation to immediately notify the court of any changes to petitioner's status. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 2, 2009. (MA)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On June 10, 2009, in the consolidated case, Judge Hogan denied without prejudice the government's motion for reconsideration of orders regarding discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. The concerns raised by petitioner in his pending cross-motion for discovery, which petitioner framed as a direct response to the government's motion for reconsideration and filed before Judge Hogan ordered that the petitioners file a consolidated opposition to the government's motion for reconsideration, are either moot or are not fully briefed in light of Judge Hogan's ruling. Petitioner's cross motion for discovery #286 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2009. (MA)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 REPLY to opposition to motion re #286 Cross MOTION for Discovery filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #295 Reply to opposition to Motion; emailed to terry.henry@usdoj.gov, cc'd 21 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. File motion in all cases. (td, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents' reply in support of their motion for consolidated order regarding task force discovery and their opposition to petitioner's cross-motion due 6/5/2009. (mm)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #291 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including June 5, 2009 to file a reply in support of their motion for consolidated order regarding task force discovery and to file an opposition to petitioner's cross-motion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 1, 2009. (MA)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHI
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (286 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF) Cross MOTION for Discovery by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Consolidated response to government's motion for reconsideration due by 5/29/2009. Reply due by 6/5/2009. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2009 04:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (mm)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part Petitioners' Consent Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines (Dkt. No. 1772, 08-mc-0442). Petitioners may file one consolidated opposition to the government's Motion for Reconsideration by Friday, May 29, 2009. The government may file a reply brief by Friday, June 5, 2009. The hearing date is reset from June 8, 2009 to June 9, 2009, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/26/09. (lctfh1)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioners' consolidated opposition due by 5/27/2009. Reply due by 6/3/2009. (mm)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, May 27, 2009, petitioners shall file one consolidated opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force (Dkt No. 1755, 08-mc-0442). The government's reply is due by Wednesday, June 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/20/09. (lctfh1)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's reply in support of Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures due by 5/22/2009. (mm)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Cross MOTION for Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Memorandum in opposition to re #281 MOTION for Reconsideration, #282 MOTION for Order , and Cross-Motion for Discovery, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Government's Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Counsel Access Procedures (Dkt. No. 1762, 08-mc-0442). The government is ordered to file its reply on or before Friday, May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 05/18/09. (lctfh1)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Elliott, Stephen)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order 2, #4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, #5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, #7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, #8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE , Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment filed by Consultant Frank Anderson, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE,
May 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying without prejudice #263 Motion to Suppress. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/4/09. (lcplf1).
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 REPLY to opposition to motion re #263 MOTION to Suppress the Amended Return, filed April 24, 2009, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Memorandum in opposition to re #263 MOTION to Suppress the Amended Return, filed filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Folio, Joseph)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman of proceedings held on 3-25-09; Page Numbers: 1-48. Date of Issuance:4-1-09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Court Reporter Email Address : swallace.reporter@gmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2009.(Wallace, Scott)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1526, 08-mc-0442). For the reasons set forth during the hearing on March 26, 2009, Press Applicants are permitted to intervene only to oppose the government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (Dkt. No. 1416, 08-mc-0442) before this Court. This order does not permit Press Applicants to intervene in any case before the Merits Judges. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/2/09. (lctfh1)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to petitioner's motion to suppress amended factual return due by 4/20/2009. (mm)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #269 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time on or before April 20, 2009 to file their opposition to petitioner's motion to suppress the amended factual return. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 3, 2009. (MA)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #263 MOTION to Suppress the Amended Return, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying petitioner's motion for summary judgment #28 and his renewed motion for summary judgment #224 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/25/2009. (mm)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2009 re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA and Petitioners' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (mm)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHME
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY Regarding Government's #259 Memorandum of March 13, 2009 (same filing as #264 with corrected signature) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Lin, Jean) Modified on 3/24/2009 adding linkage (td, ).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REPLY Regarding the Government's #259 Memorandum of March 13, 2009 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Lin, Jean) Modified on 3/24/2009 adding linkage(td, ).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Suppress the Amended Return, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Memorandum in opposition to re #257 MOTION to Amend/Correct protective order, opposition filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On Thursday, March 26, 2009, at 2:00 pm, the parties shall appear for a hearing on Respondents' Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1416, 08-mc-0442) AND Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket #1526, 08-mc-0442) in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Each party (Petitioners, Respondents, and Press Applicants) shall designate one counsel to speak on their behalf. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #251 respondents' motion for extension of time to file a supplemental opposition to petitioner's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 23, 2009. (MA)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 3/13/2009. Responses due by 3/20/2009 Replies due by 3/22/2009. Oral Arguments on definition of "enemy combatant" set for 3/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
February 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Memorandum in opposition to re #251 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE or Petitioner's Amended Traverse filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The date for motions hearing currently scheduled for February 23, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/13/09. (lcplf1).
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents' Brief due by 2/13/2009. Response due by 2/27/2009. Reply due by 3/4/2009. (mm)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #242 respondents' motion for extension of time to file their brief regarding the definition of enemy combatant. The respondents' brief is now due on or before February 13, 2009; petitioner's opposition is due on or before February 27, 2009; and a reply, if any, is due on or before March 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/12/09. (lcplf1).
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 REPLY to opposition to motion re #236 MOTION to Intervene filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY. (Bead, Jeanette)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Certification Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Folio, Joseph)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE -- Respondents' Global Notice Regarding Production of Exculpatory Information by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (Henry, Terry)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Memorandum in opposition to re #242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief Regarding the Definition of Enemy Combatant, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Executive Order of January 22, 2009)(Hunt, Gaillard)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Folio, Joseph)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Folio, Joseph)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Scott Michael Marconda terminated. (Marconda, Scott)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. Attorney David Farnham terminated. (Farnham, David)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 1/15/2009. Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 1/30/2009. Response due by 2/13/2009. Reply due by 2/18/2009. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2009 @ 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 4:00 p.m. on Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall reply to Press Applicants' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" (docket # 1526, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/21/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION to Intervene by ASSOCIATED PRESS, NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, USA TODAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(nmw, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference, currently set for 1/15/2009 @ 2:00 p.m., is hereby reset to 10:15 a.m. the same day in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/14/2009. (mm)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY to opposition to motion re (150 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 226 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 40 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 378 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 92 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 134 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 425 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 55 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 105 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 828 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 42 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 87 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 14 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 183 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 86 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 111 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 94 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 124 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 60 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 157 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 76 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 159 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 118 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 78 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 105 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 174 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 31 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 113 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 155 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 105 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 101 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 316 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 153 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 137 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 101 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 138 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 127 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 61 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 179 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 95 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 73 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 107 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 95 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 120 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 44 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 94 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 12 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 157 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 77 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 137 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 223 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 133 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 176 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 130 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 118 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 128 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 166 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 135 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 69 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 112 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 120 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 58 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 22 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 75 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 120 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 100 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 117 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 78 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 7 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 31 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 154 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 68 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 132 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 46 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 185 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 112 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 131 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 60 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB) MOTION for Order, (166 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) MOTION for Order to Designate Unclassified Returns as "Protected" Information filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 1/15/2009 @ 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/12/2009. (mm)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that all filings related to the November 6, 2008, Case Management Order, as amended by the Court's December 16, 2008, order ("Amended Case Management Order"), shall only be filed in the individual civil case(s) to which they apply. For example, filings related to discovery, presumptions, use of hearsay, and extensions of time to comply with the Amended Case Management Order need not be filed in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/8/09. (lctfh1)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Lin, Jean)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Folio, III on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Folio, Joseph)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Memorandum in opposition to re (1416 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information filed by FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, PRIVILEGE TEAM, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, JABBAROV OYBECK JAMOLOVICH, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the discovery provisions of the Case Management Order entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, the Court ORDERS that Petitioner's Motion to Compel Answers to Third Set of Interrogatories (docket # 179, 04-cv-2022) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's order of July 29, 2008, lifting the stay entered in this matter, and in light of the Case Management Order of November 6, 2008, as amended by the Court's Order of December 16, 2008, the Court DENIES as moot Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Orders Staying Action and Denying Petitioner's Motion for Discovery, and for an Order Requiring Respondents to Comply with Petitioner's Discovery Requests (docket # 161, 04-cv-2022; docket # 4, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/5/09. (lctfh1)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by Friday, January 30, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners approved for transfer or release for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. The Court further ORDERS that, by Friday, February 27, 2009, the government shall file factual returns for petitioners charged with violations of the laws of war under the Military Commission Act of 2006 for whom the government has yet to file factual returns. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/2/09. (lctfh1)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #55 Notice of Appeal filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA; ORDERED that No.'s 05-5194, 05-5211, and 05-5333, and the motion for immediate relief be dismissed as moot in light of the district court's lifting of the stay disposition of appellants' stay motion, and ongoing proceedings in the habeas action, Civ. Action 04-2022; and in light of the representations of appellants' counsel that the claims presented in No. 05-5333 pertaining to conditions of confinement are moot. (USCA No. 05-5194) (mmh, )
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Exception from Sequencing Regarding Factual Returns (also filed as dkt. no. 1443 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns for December 2008 by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Because the government's Notice of Prior Disclosure of Exculpatory Evidence and Motion for Extension of Time (docket # 1431, 08-mc-442) and Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Discovery Pursuant to Amended Case Management Order Section I.E.1(3) (docket # 1432, 08-mc-442) are motions to amend the Case Management Order this Court entered on November 6, 2008, and amended on December 16, 2008, as well as case management orders entered by many of the Merits Judges, pursuant to this Court's order of December 16, 2008, the Merits Judges will address the motions in their individual cases. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the motions are DENIED in 08-mc-442. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/31/08. (lctfh1, )
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #226 Motion for Extension of Time to; emailed to jonathan.needle@usdoj.gov, cc'd 18 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Please file the first part of the document which is a Notice in all cases. (td, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of filing of reply in support of petitioners' renewal and updating of petitioner's motion for summary judgment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of filing of petitioners' renewal and updating of petitioner's motion for summary judgment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, January 7, 2009, the petitioners shall file one consolidated response to the government's Motion To Confirm Designation Of Unclassified Factual Returns As Protected (docket # 1416, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/30/08. (lctfh1)
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Order to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as Protected Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Justification for Detention by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Farnham, David)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Filing Classified Response to Petitioner's Renewal and Updating of Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Farnham, David)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration of this Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order andSupplemental Amended Orders or, in the Alternative, Motion for Certification for Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and to Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution of the Motion and any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/16/08. (lctfh1)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE of Service of Unclassified, Protected Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR (Farnham, David)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's Nov. 20, 2008 Renewal and Updating of Petitioners Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 REPLY to opposition to motion re (1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE PRIVILEGE TEAM, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boumediene Case Mgmt. Order)(Prince, Robert)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER setting hearing for December 10, 2008. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/2/08. (lctfh1)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Exception from Sequencing (same document as dkt. no. 1156 in No. 08-mc-0442) by JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STATUS REPORT Regarding Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, RICHARD B. MYERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
November 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By Wednesday, December 3, 2008, the government shall file one consolidated reply to the petitioners' oppositions to the Government's Motion For Clarification And Reconsideration Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order And Supplemental Amended Orders Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Certification For Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) And To Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution Of The Motion And Any Appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/28/2008. (lctfh1)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Memorandum in opposition to re (1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 1004 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 207 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 207 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 207 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF) MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order ; Cross-motion to meet and confer, and Opposition to Respondents' motion to reconsider Case Management Order, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, attached emails)(Hunt, Gaillard)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER attached staying due dates pending resolution of the Government's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration 1004 . Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on November 21, 2008. (lctfh2)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE Pertaining to Production of Exculpatory Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Ahern, Paul)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioners shall respond by Wednesday, November 26, 2008, to the government's Motion For Clarification And Reconsideration Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order And Supplemental Amended Orders Or, In the Alternative, Motion For Certification For Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) And To Stay Certain Obligations Pending Resolution Of The Motion And Any Appeal (docket # 1004, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/20/08. (lctfh1)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (150 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 92 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 112 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 397 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 204 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 50 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 71 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 107 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 86 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 93 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 73 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 113 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 98 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 102 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 94 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 115 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 108 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 85 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 195 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 99 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 112 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 98 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 89 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 149 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 96 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 940 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 79 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 99 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 130 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 91 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 130 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 142 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 142 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 90 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 86 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 92 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 136 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 84 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 115 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 285 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 68 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 91 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 114 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 158 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 329 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 140 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 53 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 80 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 78 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 125 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 83 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 119 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 85 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU) Order of November 6, 2008 filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (White, David)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE Of Filing Of Classified Declarations by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay Of This Court's November 6, 2008 Case Management Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit England Declaration, #2 Exhibit Mueller Declaration, #3 Exhibit Request Letter #1, #4 Exhibit Request Letter #2, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's entry of the Case Management Order (docket # 940, 08-mc-442), the Court denies as moot the government's motion to enter a case management order (docket # 205, 08-mc-442). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/12/08. (lctfh1)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Filing by Clive Stafford Smith of Documents Required Pursuant to Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, SALAH BELBACHA, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI (Katznelson, Zachary)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting government's motions to amend factual returns and amending the Court's July 11, 2008, order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/7/08. (lctfh1)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 204 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/6/08. (lctfh1)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STATUS REPORT of Oct.31, 2008 Regarding Filing of Factual Returns by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REPLY to opposition to motion re (628 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 88 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 84 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 391 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 135 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 28 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 80 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 26 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 198 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 70 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 723 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 82 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 27 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 26 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 108 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 110 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF) MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Mason, Kathryn)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Mason on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Mason, Kathryn)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs counsel in these consolidated cases to the Court's Minute Order of October 2, 2008, which directed counsel to the Court's previous orders that require all filings, with the exception of notices of appearance, be filed in the applicable civil case and in 08-mc-442 and directed counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(c), which reads: "Each motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Further, the Court directs counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(m), which reads: "Before filing any nondispositive motion in a civil action, counsel shall discuss the anticipated motion with opposing counsel, either in person or by telephone, in a good faith effort to determine whether there is any opposition to the relief sought and, if there is opposition, to narrow the areas of disagreement.... A party shall include in its motion a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Finally, the Court cautions counsel that failure to follow the Court's orders and local rules may result in the Court denying motions and striking filings. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/28/08. (lctfh1)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRYCE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE DIRECTOR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, PORTER J. GOSS, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Subar, Judry)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Memorandum in opposition to re #198 MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION to Dismiss Improper Respondents by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marconda, Scott)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Marconda on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, HARRY B. HARRIS, MIKE BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Marconda, Scott)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by David Farnham on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Farnham, David)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #183 Covington & Burling LLP's Motion For Withdrawal Of Appearance. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/8/08. (lctfh1)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs counsel in these consolidated cases to its order of July 2, 2008, and its minute order of July 3, 2008, which require that, with the exception of notices of appearance, all filings be filed in the applicable civil case and in 08-mc-442. For instructions on how to file in multiple cases, see http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/public-docs/files/filing_instructions.pdf. Additionally, the Court directs counsel to Local Civil Rule 7(c), which reads, "Each motion and opposition shall be accompanied by a proposed order." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/2/08. (lctfh1)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STATUS REPORT Regarding the Filing of Factual Returns and Request for Exception from Sequencing by JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DENNIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henry, Terry)
September 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Required Pursuant to Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Ghappour, Ahmed)
September 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmed Ghappour on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, AYMEN SAEED BATARFI, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, HISHAM SLITI, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, AHMED ABU IMRAN, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, JIHAD DHIAB, NABIL, SALAH BELBACHA, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH (Ghappour, Ahmed)
September 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Authorization to Pursue this Action by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION re (175 in 1:04-cv-02022-UNA, 210 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Signed Authorization)(Katznelson, Zachary)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE regarding Court's Website. Please be advised that the Court has on its external website information regarding the Guantanamo Bay Cases. The information gives instructions for filing in these cases. The website is http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/public-docs/gitmo (jeb, )
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Filing of Government's Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Amend Factual Return by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD re (187 in 1:04-cv-02022-UNA) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Ahern, Paul)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OPINION re government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/08 (lctfh1)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting (204) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01136-UNA; granting (129) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01164-UNA; granting (227) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01194-UNA; granting (273) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01254-UNA; granting (41) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-01937-UNA; granting (181) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02022-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02035-GK; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02046-UNA; granting (93) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02215-UNA; granting (122) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00023-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00247-UNA; granting (119) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00270-UNA; granting (152) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00280-UNA; granting (104) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00329-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00359-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00392-UNA; granting (91) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00492-UNA; granting (138) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00520-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00526-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00569-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00634-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00748-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00763-UNA; granting (75) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00877-UNA; granting (62) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00889-UNA; granting (69) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00892-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00883-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00993-UNA; granting (56) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00998-UNA; granting (78) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00999-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-00994-UNA; granting (135) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01048-UNA; granting (52) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01189-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01244-UNA; granting (112) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01220-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01347-UNA; granting (101) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01353-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01429-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01458-UNA-AK; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01457-UNA; granting (87) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01487-UNA; granting (157) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01509-UNA; granting (66) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01497-UNA; granting (98) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01490-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01504-UNA; granting (85) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01506-UNA; granting (84) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01505-UNA; granting (94) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01555-UNA; granting (106) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01592-UNA; granting (97) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01601-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01602-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01607-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01623-UNA; granting (61) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01645-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01646-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01638-UNA; granting (55) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01639-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01678-UNA; granting (114) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01704-UNA; granting (60) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01971-UNA; granting (72) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-01983-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02010-UNA; granting (59) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02088-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02104-UNA; granting (83) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02185-UNA; granting (76) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02186-UNA; granting (71) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02199-UNA; granting (89) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02249-UNA; granting (65) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02349-UNA; granting (116) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02367-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02371-UNA; granting (115) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02378-UNA; granting (74) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02379-UNA; granting (37) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02381-UNA; granting (121) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02384-UNA; granting (81) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02398-UNA; granting (43) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02387-UNA; granting (80) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02380-UNA; granting (549) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02386-UNA; granting (33) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02444-UNA; granting (58) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02385-UNA; granting (110) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:05-cv-02479-UNA; granting (68) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-00618-UNA; granting (57) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01684-UNA; granting (34) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01668-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01690-RBW; granting (48) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01758-UNA; granting (70) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01767-UNA; granting (30) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01759-JDB; granting (51) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01766-UNA; granting (46) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01761-UNA; granting (54) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:06-cv-01765-UNA; granting (39) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-01710-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02337-UNA; granting (47) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-02338-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-00987-UNA; granting (29) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01085-UNA; granting (20) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01104-UNA; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01101-UNA; granting (317) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-mc-00442-TFH; granting (26) Motion Relief From Court's July 11, 2008, Scheduling Order in case 1:08-cv-01153-UNA; gran
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPLY to opposition to motion re (317 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT GATES. (Prince, Robert)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of filing of opposition to respondents' motion for leave to file amended return, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re (340 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 182 in 1:04-cv-02022-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns, (410 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns (Hunt, Gaillard)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Filing of MOU and Acknowledgment Required Pursuant to Protective Order Dated September 11, 2008 by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, SALAH BELBACHA, AHMED OMAR, SHARAF AL SANANI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI re (57 in 1:05-cv-01457-UNA, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 94 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 26 in 1:08-cv-01185-UNA, 96 in 1:04-cv-02215-UNA, 85 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 123 in 1:05-cv-00270-UNA, 107 in 1:05-cv-00329-UNA, 69 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 9 in 1:08-cv-01440-UNA, 62 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 79 in 1:05-cv-01607-UNA, 65 in 1:05-cv-00748-UNA, 93 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 185 in 1:04-cv-02022-UNA, 79 in 1:05-cv-00764-UNA-AK, 573 in 1:05-cv-02386-UNA) Order (Katznelson, Zachary)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The government shall reply by Monday, September 15, 2008, to petitioners' oppositions to the government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/12/08. (lctfh1)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/11/08. (lctfh1)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE AND SUMMARY OF FILING by MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION (Pemberton, Alan)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Withdraw Covington & Burling LLP by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Livingston, Schuyler)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Factual Returns by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahern, Paul)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By September 19, 2008, petitioners Al Swidhi (ISN 578), 04-cv-1194, Al Haj (ISN 256), 04-cv-1194, Amer (ISN 564), 04-cv-1194, Al Baidhani (ISN 553), 04-cv-1194, Al Wrafie (ISN 117), 04-cv-1254, Al-Mohammed (ISN 537), 05-cv-247, Bawazir (ISN 440), 05-cv-280, and Tumani (ISN 312), 05-cv-526, shall respond to the government's Motion For Leave To File Amended Factual Return. Additionally, hereafter, in all cases in which the government moves for leave to file amended factual returns, petitioners shall respond to the government's motions within 10 days of the date of filing. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/5/08. (lctfh1)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioner's response due by 9/8/2008. (mm)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioners shall respond by Monday, September 8, 2008, to the government's Motion For Partial And Temporary Relief From The Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order (08-mc-0442, docket number 317). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/08. (lctfh1)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION Partial and Temporary Relief from Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order re (53 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Scheduling Order, by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Henry, Terry)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, of Aug. 20, 2008 filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, RICHARD B. CHENEY, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By August 26, 2008, the government shall file a response to petitioners' request that the Court amend the Standard Protective Order to require the government to do the following: "provide to [petitioners'] counsel and the Court a version of each court filing containing classified or protected information that is suitable for filing on the public record within two weeks of the original filing date." Joint Report In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order 3 n.1 (08-mc-442, docket # 170). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/20/08. (lctfh1)
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Court's order of July 29, 2008, the Court denies as moot #161 Petitioner's motion to vacate orders staying action. Additionally, in light of the Court's order of July 11, 2008, setting a schedule for determination of procedural framework issues, including discovery, the Court denies #161 Petitioner's motion for discovery and for an order requiring the government to comply with Petitioner's discovery requests. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/13/08. (lctfh1)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 08-5238 for #172 Notice of Appeal,, filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, TERRY CARRICO. (td, )
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Pursuant to transfer order of this Court, this case is administratively assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management.(ds)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Compel Answers to Third Set of Interrogatories by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Remes, David)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Memorandum in opposition to re (110 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 52 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01602-RMU, 86 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 41 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 21 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 48 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 17 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 18 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 69 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 62 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 39 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 61 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 18 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 45 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 144 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 63 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 78 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 35 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 94 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 49 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 30 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 77 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 82 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 25 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 74 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 20 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 55 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 97 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 112 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 47 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 27 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 37 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 40 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 173 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 18 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 93 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 84 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 63 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 33 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 61 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 67 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 195 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 122 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 136 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 10 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 7 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 67 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 57 in 1:05-cv-02349-RMC, 88 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 49 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB, 71 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 40 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 44 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 62 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 115 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 22 in 1:05-cv-00995-JR, 18 in 1:05-cv-01590-JDB, 51 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 84 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 45 in 1:05-cv-02112-RBW, 43 in 1:05-cv-00833-JR, 59 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 40 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 61 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 100 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 14 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 47 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 112 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 78 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 53 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 15 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 67 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 26 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 49 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 72 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 40 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 217 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 131 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 55 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 108 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 256 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 75 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 51 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH-AK, 67 in 1:05-cv-02398-RMU, 64 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 104 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 39 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 50 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 65 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 32 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 84 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 55 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 522 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 103 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 73 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 76 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 29 in 1:05-cv-01725-JR, 23 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 84 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 69 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 59 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 34 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 80 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC) MOTION for Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (jeb, )
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, NELSON J. CANNON, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Henry, Terry)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPLY ADDRESSING PROCEDURAL FRAMEWORK ISSUES filed by BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, ATAG ALI ABDOH, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, SHAKER AAMER, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SHAKER AAMER, ALLADEEN, ISMAIL AL-MASHAD, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABDULZAHER, BISHER AL-RAWI, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, AHMED "DOE", SHAKER AAMER, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, FOUZIA AHMMED, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, HUSSEIN SALEM MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH EL-MARQODI, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABDUALQADER HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, SALEH HOSSIN ALI AL-MOTHAFRI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, FARID AHMED, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, BANDAR AL JAABIR, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, SAIF ULLAH, SHARAF AL SANANI, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, ADEL LNU, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, SAD AL MATERI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ADEL AL TUNISI, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED AL-DELEBANY, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDULLA, ADEL, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (MacLean, Matthew)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER lifting stays, vacating dismissals, entering protective order, requiring authorizations, and holding motions in abeyance. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/29/08. (lctfh1)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (17 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 107 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 355 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 44 in 1:05-cv-02112-RBW, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 17 in 1:05-cv-01590-JDB, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) Notice of Appeal, (ks)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 JOINT MEMORANDUM by ALL PETITIONERS of Law Addressing Procedural Framwork issues.. (Kadidal, Shayana) Modified on 7/28/2008 to add text and to edit out parties. (ks).
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Order Regarding Procedural Framework Issues by ALL RESPONDENTS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haas, Alexander) Modified on 7/28/2008 to edit out parties (ks).
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (52 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 52 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 52 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 52 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH) Order by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, J. HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DENNIS, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, TERRY CARRICO. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Subar, Judry)
July 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ERRATA -- Corrections To Exhibts To Joint Status Report by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 -- Corrected)(Warden, Andrew)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STATUS REPORT Submitted Jointly By Petitioners and Respondents In Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Scheduling Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioners' Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Respondents Exhibits)(Warden, Andrew)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Memorandum in opposition to re (4 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 4 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 161 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 161 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF) MOTION to Enforce MOTION for Discovery filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Dean, Paul)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Dean on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Dean, Paul)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STATUS REPORT And Response To Court's July 11, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 -- Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 -- Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 -- Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 -- Part 5, #6 Exhibit 1 -- Part 6, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3)(Warden, Andrew)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STATUS REPORT as of July 18, 2008, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SCHEDULING ORDER: setting forth deadlines: Parties' Status Report due by 7/18/2008; Joint Report due 7/21/08; Simultaneous Briefing on procedural framework issues due 7/25/08, and counsel for government and petitioners to file Responses by 8/1/08; Factual Returns and Motions to Amend Factual Returns due 8/29/08. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/11/08. (jeb, )
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 VACATED PURSUANT TO USCA MANDATE FILED ON 3/15/2011.....ORDER; Regarding Representative Counsel's request for 30 days advance notice,Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 07/10/08. (hs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2008: #1 Order) (zhs, ). Modified on 3/15/2011 (dr).
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE Regarding Status Conference by MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Subar, Judry)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #161 Motion to Enforce; emailed to gthunt@mdo.net, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. This document must also be filed in Miscellaneous Case No. 08-442 pursuant to the Judge's order. (td, )
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/7/08. (lctfh1)
July 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION to Enforce Discovery and to Vacate Stay, MOTION for Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that, in the interest of convenience and judicial economy, notices of appearance need not be refiled under this Miscellaneous Case Number (08-MC-4422) if such a notice already has been filed in the docket for the corresponding Civil Action Number. New notices of appearance likewise should be filed exclusively in the docket for the applicable Civil Action Number. Accordingly, no notices of appearance need be filed in the docket for this Miscellaneous Case Number. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION: Hearing set for July 8, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom. (ds)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER transferring this case to Judge Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/2/08. (lcplf1)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents Motion for Designation of Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby as Protected Information Under the Protective Orders. The Court notes that no Petitioner has opposed this Motion and that several Petitioners have filed Notices of Non-Opposition. Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby, and any other documents repeating or incorporating its contents or otherwise establishing its protected nature, shall be accorded the status of protected information and subject to the applicable provisions of the protective orders entered in the Guantanamo Bay detainee litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 4/2/08. (jeb)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF FILING of Motion for designation of Paragraph 9 of the 2/8/08 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby (filed 2/13/08) as protected information under the protective orders by GEORGE W. BUSH,et al. (jeb, )
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Cori Crider on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (nmw, )
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Further Activity in Guantanamo Cases by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #140 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Al Odah Order#2 Exhibit 2 - Boumediene Order)(Remes, David)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying #139 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice pending the Supreme Court's decision in Boumediene v. Bush (No. 06-1195) and Al-Odah v. Bush (No. 06-1196). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/27/07. (lcplf1)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE and Summary of Filing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #140 Memorandum in Opposition (Remes, David)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF ACTIVITY IN GUANTANAMO CASES by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #140 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Motion to Recall Mandate)(Remes, David)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE and Summary of Filing by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #140 Memorandum in Opposition (Remes, David)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by Robert Knowles by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Remes, David)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by Jason M. Knott by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Remes, David)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by Brent T. Starks by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Remes, David)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by David H. Remes by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Remes, David)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by Marc D. Falkoff by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Falkoff, Marc)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Filing of Memorandum of Understanding Executed by Enrique Armijo by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Falkoff, Marc)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc D. Falkoff on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Falkoff, Marc)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Remes, David)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY to opposition to motion re #139 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P1)(Henry, Terry)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Memorandum in opposition to re #139 MOTION to Dismiss from Respondents, this opposition filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# 2 Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# 3 Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# 4 Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# 5 Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# 6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# 7 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #55 Notice of Appeal filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA; It is hereby ordered that the motion of petitioner appellant to consider and grant his dispositive motion in all of his cases be denied without prejudice to any claims raised by petitioner in 06-1038; It is further ordered that #05-5197 & 05-5333 be remanded to the District Court with instructions and that #05-5211 be dismissed as moot without prejudice to any claims raised by petitioner in #06-1038; It is further ordered that petitioners motions relating to conditions of his confinement be dismissed and that #06-1117 be dismissed;It is further ordered that #06-1038 be scheduled for oral argument on September 17, 2007 at 9:30am before Chief Judge Ginsburg; USCA#05-5194 (jsc)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Petitioner and Respondents have filed a #138 Joint Status Report Regarding Petitioner's Motions To Compel Release Of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence. In this status report, the parties explicitly agree that #88 Petitioner's Motion For Release Of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence and #95 Petitioner's Motion To Review And Release Confidential Attorney-Detainee Correspondence are now moot. In light of this representation, the two aforementioned motions are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/30/2007.(lcak1, )
March 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STATUS REPORT Regarding Petitioner's Motions To Compel Release Of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Warden, Andrew)
March 14, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Alan Kay : Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2007; re #88 MOTION Petitioner's Motion for Release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence and re #95 MOTION to Compel; Court ruling to be taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Pro-Typists.) (lm ) Modified on 3/16/2007 (kk).
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 137 RESPONSE to petitioner's motion for release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence filed by PRIVILEGE TEAM. (td, ) Modified on 3/16/2007 (td, ).
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines : Response to Petitioner's motions by the Special Litigation Team, on behalf of the Privilege Review Team, due by 3/9/07. (kk)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to #88 motion for release of attorney-detainee correspondence and #95 motion to review and release confidential attorney-detainee correspondence due by 3/9/2007. Motion Hearing regarding these motions set for 3/14/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (mm)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER assigning Speccial Litigation Team to represent Privilege Review Team in its response to #88 Petitioner's Motion for Release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence and #95 Petitioner's Motion to Review and Release Confidential Attorney-Detainee Correspondence. The Special Litigation Team shall respond to Petitioner's Motions on behalf of the Privilege Review Team by March 9, 2007. A hearing on these Motions is scheduled for March 14, 2007 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 2/28/2007. (lcak1, )
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy)It is hereby ordered that the District Court's order filed November 20, 2006 be summarily affirmed; It is further ordered that the emergency motion be dismissed as moot; USCA#06-1038 (jsc)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Preeya M. Noronha terminated.
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #132 Notice of Appeal, (td, )
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Minute Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, #127 Order on Motion for TRO, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td, )
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA; (SEE DOCUMENT NO. #130 FOR IMAGE) (td, )
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for proper medical treatment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katznelson affidavit of 11/18/2006 phone conversation with petitioner;#2 Exhibit Petitioner's letters to DoD;)(Hunt, Gaillard)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Required Pursuant to Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Katznelson, Zachary)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Clive Stafford Smith by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA (Katznelson, Zachary)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2006 re: Petitioner's #124 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Preventing Cardiac Catheterization at Guantanamo and Petitioner's subsequent Motion for Preliminary Injunction submitted 11/20/2006. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court denies as moot Petitioner's #124 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and denies Petitioner's subsequent Motion for Preliminary Injunction submitted 11/20/2006. (Court Reporter Linda L. Russo.) (mm)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying as moot #124 petitioner's initial motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, and denying petitioner's subsequent motion for a preliminary injunction submitted November 20, 2006 requiring proper medical treatment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 20, 2006. (MA)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that in light of the Order #49 staying this matter entered on March 23, 2005, the following motions are denied, without prejudice to their being refiled after the Court has lifted the stay: #23 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus; #28 Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment; #69 Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Relief from Punitive Conditions of Confinement; #72 Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Allowing Petitioner Access to a Bible and Other Books; #83 Petitioner's Motion to Amend Petition and Add Attorney General as Respondent; and #115 Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Requiring Appointment or Acceptance of Islamic Chaplains. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 20, 2006. (MA)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Memorandum in opposition to re #124 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction preventing cardiac catheterization at Guantanamo, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)(White, Edward)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Reply brief in connection with #124 motion for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction to be filed Sunday, 11/19/2006 before 6:00 p.m. via the Court's electronic filing system. (mm)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Set Deadline/Hearing: Response to #124 motion for a temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction due by 11/17/2006; Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2006 @ 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that the United States shall file a response to the motion #124 for a temporary restraining order and for a preliminary injunction before the close of business on Friday, November 17, 2006, and there will be a hearing on the matter on Monday, November 20, 2006 at 9:15 a.m., unless the petitioner?s counsel withdraws the motion after consultation with his client over the weekend regarding the representations of the respondents in their forthcoming opposition papers with respect to the conditions at the medical facilities in Guant?namo Bay. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 15, 2006. (MA)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that if petitioner's counsel would like to file a reply brief in connection with the motion #124 for a temporary restraining order and for a preliminary injunction, such a brief must be filed before 6:00 p.m. on Sunday, November 19, 2006 via the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/15/06. (lcplf1)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order -- Text of proposed TRO, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Hunt, Gaillard) Modified on 11/15/2006 (td, ).
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction preventing cardiac catheterization at Guantanamo, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh B Email from Mr. Warden#2 Exhibit Exh C Dr Chomsky cardiologist affidavit#3 Exhibit Exh A Katznelson affidavit#4 Exhibit Exh D Imran Ahmad cardiologist affidavit)(Hunt, Gaillard) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2006 (td, ).
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of the Unconstitutionality of the Attempted Suspension of Habeas Corpus in the Military Commissions Act of 2006, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #120 Notice (Other) (Hunt, Gaillard)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for determination of motions #88 & #95 for release of attorney detainee correspondence. (jsc)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Filing of Documents Required Pursuant to Protective Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Katznelson, Zachary)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Katznelson on behalf of SAIFULLAH PARACHA (Katznelson, Zachary)
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER transferring to Magistrate Judge Kay: petitioners' motion for release of attorney-detainee correspondence #88 and petitioners' motion to review and release confidential attorney-detainee correspondence #95 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 23, 2006. (MA)
October 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: #1 Military Commision Act of 2006)
October 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Supplemental re: #118 Minute Order filed granting petitioner's application to appeal IFP transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #117 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (td, )
October 17, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #118 petitioner's unopposed application to appeal in forma pauperis from the Order dated August 4, 2006. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 17, 2006. (MA)
October 16, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER transferring back to Judge Friedman for potential transfer to Magistrate Judge Kay: petitioners' motion for release of attorney-detainee correspondence #88 and petitioners' motion to review and release confidential attorney-detainee correspondence #95 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on October 16, 2006. (MT)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Memorandum in opposition to re #115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Requiring Appointment or Acceptance of Islamic Chaplains, Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Religious Freedom Restoration Act filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Patterson, Nicholas)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis from Order of August 4, 2006; by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hunt, Gaillard)
October 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #117 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (td, )
October 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to Minute Order filed 8/4/06 on Motion to Vacate, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #116 respondents' unopposed Motion for extension of time up to and including October 13, 2006 to respond to petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction under Religious Freedom Restoration Act. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 29, 2006. (MA)
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction under Religious Freedom Restoration Act due by 10/13/2006. (mm)
September 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner Saifullah Paracha's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Under Religious Freedom Restoration Act by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Nicholas)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Requiring Appointment or Acceptance of Islamic Chaplains, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit from available imams#2 Affidavit Exhaustion of remedies#3 Affidavit Offering support)(Hunt, Gaillard)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying motion to stay #113 and denying motion to amend/correct #114 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 22, 2006. (MT)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Amend/Correct #112 Memorandum & Opinion, #111 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief --Motion to Modify Order of September 15, 2006, allowing a Filter Team by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Stay re #112 Memorandum & Opinion, #111 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief --Motion to stray Order of September 15, 2006, allowing Filter Team by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06.
September 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/15/06.
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER transferring to Judge Robertson: petitioner's motion for release of attorney-detainee correspondence #88 ; petitioner's motion to review and release confidential attorney-detainee correspondence #95 ; and petitioner's motion for return of papers or submission to special master for privilege review #101 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/24/06. (lcplf1)
August 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Memorandum in opposition to re #101 MOTION for Return of Property , Petitioner's Motion for Return of Papers or Submission to Special Master for Privilege Review, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Henry, Terry)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE to Order of Court #206 directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE Responding to request whether petitioner had attorney-client communications prior to June 18, 2006, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA re #102 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER transferring the government's motion for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and request for expedited briefing to Judge James Robertson for coordinated handling and decision. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 10, 2006. (MA)
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #104 petitioner's unopposed motion to modify order to allow release to Pakistan. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 10, 2006. (MA)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION Petitioner's motion to Modify June 16, 2005, Order to Allow Release to Pakistan by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. Attorney Lisa Ann Olson terminated. (Olson, Lisa)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER directing counsel for petitioners to file a notice by 8/15/06 identifying any petitioner as to whom counsel lacks a good-faith belief that any attorney-client communications occurred prior to 6/18/06; directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel (either through written correspondence or in-person conversation) prior to 6/18/06. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/06. (jeb)
August 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Return of Property , Petitioner's Motion for Return of Papers or Submission to Special Master for Privilege Review, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #90 petitioner's motion to vacate the stay and to grant petitioner?s motion for summary judgment. The case shall remain stayed pending resolution of all appeals in In re Guantanamo Detainee Cases, Civil No. 02-0299, et al., 2005 WL 195356 (D.D.C. Jan. 31, 2005), and Khalid et al. v. Bush, Civil No. 04-1142, 2005 WL 100924 (D.D.C. Jan. 19, 2005).Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 4, 2006. (MA)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Memorandum in opposition to re #88 MOTION Petitioner's Motion for Release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Warden, Andrew)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE to Petitioner's July 13, 2006 Motion for More Information (also filed as dkt. no. 98) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Henry, Terry)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY to opposition to motion re #91 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Henry, Terry)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #97 respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including July 28, 2006 to submit a response to petitioner's July 13,2006 cross-motion for more information. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 28, 2006. (MA)
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's July 13, 2006 Cross-Motion for More Information by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Terry)
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Memorandum in opposition to re #90 MOTION to Vacate Stay and to grant petitioner's motion for summary judgment, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (td, )
July 25, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #94 respondents' unopposed motion for leave to file out of time by one day respondents' opposition to petitioner's motion to vacate the stay and to grant petitioner's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 25, 2006. (MA)
July 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Compel Preivilege Team to review and release confidential attorney-detainee correspondence, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate the Stay and to Grant Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Vacate the Stay and to Grant Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment)#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Nicholas)
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting settlement conference regarding Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related to Review of Certain Detainee Materials. The mediation will take place in chambers on Wednesday, July 19, 2006 at 2:30 p.m. Certain designated representatives will attend on behalf of Habeas Petitioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/17/2006. (lckay1, )
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2006 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay as set forth in the Court's Order this date.
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Memorandum in opposition to re #91 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials ; petitioners' motion for information and for extension of time to respond, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE regarding steps taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (jeb, )
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris#2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt#3 Text of Proposed Order for Briefing#4 Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)Associated Cases: (jeb)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Vacate Stay and to grant petitioner's motion for summary judgment, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Memorandum in opposition to re #84 MOTION To Designate As "Protected Information" Certain Information In February 14, 2006 Declaration of Saifullah Paracha filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2006 (nmw, ). Modified on 7/10/2006 (nmw, ).
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION Petitioner's Motion for Release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
June 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Release of Attorney-Detainee Correspondence (Petitioner's Motion was filed with the CSOs on May 24, 2006) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Patterson, Nicholas)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY re #84 MOTION To Designate As "Protected Information" Certain Information In February 14, 2006 Declaration of Saifullah Paracha And Motion To Designate As "Protected Information" Certain Information In Petitioner's May 23, 2005 Response Memorandum filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response -- Redacted#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
May 19, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #84 respondents' presently unopposed motion to designate as "protected information" certain information in 2/14/06 declaration of Saifullah Paracha. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 19, 2006. (MA)
May 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Memorandum in opposition to re #83 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition and add attorney general as a respondent, filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Henry, Terry)
May 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION To Designate As "Protected Information" Certain Information In February 14, 2006 Declaration of Saifullah Paracha by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
May 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition and add attorney general as a respondent, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's redacted declaration#2 Second Amended Petition)(Hunt, Gaillard)
January 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jeb, )
December 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that #32 petitioner's motion to suppress classified return is denied as moot, #68 petitioner's motion to allow and accelerate discovery is denied, and #75 petitioner's motion for order to show cause why pending motions should not be promptly resolved is denied. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 7, 2005. (MA)
November 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE to the Return -- Petitioner's Factual Traverse, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
November 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #72 Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to be Allowed a Bible and Other Books filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Patterson, Nicholas)
November 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #69 for Preliminary Injunction Ordering Removal from Punitive Conditions of Confinement filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Perez, Marc)
November 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #75 Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Pending Motions Should Not Be Promptly Resolved filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Schwartz, James)
November 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT re #72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Allowing Petitioner Access to a Bible and Other Books,, #69 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Relief from Punitive Conditions of Confnement, Affidavits in Support, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
November 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Pending Motions Should Not Be Promptly Resolved by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
November 9, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #74 Motion for extension of time to 11/15/2005 to file respondents' opposition to petitioner's motion to be allowed a Bible and other books. Signed by Judge James Robertson for Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/9/2005. (bm)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to be Allowed a Bible and Other Books by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Nicholas)
November 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05.
November 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Allowing Petitioner Access to a Bible and Other Books, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
October 18, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #71 Joint motion to hold in abeyance respondents' opposition to petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction. Respondents' opposition shall be due 11 days from the date petitioner either files supplemental factual support for the motion for preliminary injunction, or notifies the Court in writing that petitioner does not intend to file supplemental factual support. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/18/05. (lcplf1)
October 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Joint MOTION to hold in abeyance respondents' opposition to petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Edward)
October 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #68 Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Allow and to Accelerate Discovery filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Patterson, Nicholas)
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Relief from Punitive Conditions of Confnement, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
October 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Discovery by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
September 7, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5334 for #64 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by DONALD H. RUMSFELD,, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD,. (jf, )
September 7, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5333 for #65 Notice of Appeal, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA,, FARHAT PARACHA,. (jf, )
September 2, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #66 petitioner's appliction to appeal in forma pauperis from the order dated June 16, 2005. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 1, 2005. (MA)
August 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Motion filed 2/14/2005 to compel interrogatories and to release papers held at the Secure Facility by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis from the Order of June 16, 2005, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
August 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #65 Notice of Appeal, (jf, )
August 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #64 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, (jf, )
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #58 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis entered on 06/16/05, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. No fee paid. (jf, )
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #58 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis,,, by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (jf, )
August 12, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #60 petitioner's motion for access to counsel for advice on his deposition ordered by the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 12, 2005. (MA)
August 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Submission of Factual Return to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Saifullah Paracha Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Noronha, Preeya)
July 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION For Access to Counsel Before Deposition Ordered by SDNY by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of SDNY allowing deposition)(Hunt, Gaillard)
July 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schwartz, James)
June 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PORTION OF ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO USCA MANDATE FILED 9/30/10..... #359 ORDER denying without prejudice #48 petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis, denying without prejudice #50 petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction ordering his removal from isolation, denying without prejudice #56 petitioner's application to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2005. (MA) Modified on 2/11/2011 (td, ). Modified on 2/11/2011 (tnr, ).
May 31, 2005 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 05-5194 for #55 Notice of Appeal filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA,. (td, )
May 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #55 Notice of Appeal filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA; It is hereby ordered that on the courts own motion that this case be held in abeyance pending resolution by the District Court of the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed on March 17, 2005; USCA#05-5194 (jsc)
May 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
May 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #55 Notice of Appeal (td, )
May 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Fee not paid) (td, )
April 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to opposition to motion re #50 Release from Isolation and Prohibiting Rendition, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
April 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #50 preliminary injunction ordering his removal from isolation and prohibiting his renditiion filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(White, Edward)
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAY HOOD served on 4/1/2005, answer due 5/31/2005. (nmw, )
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #51 respondents' motion for extension of time up to and including April 22, 2005 to file its response to petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction ordering his removal from isolation and prohibiting his rendition. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 19, 2004.(MA)
April 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitoner's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Edward)
April 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to prevent rendition and for release from isolation, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nydell April 4 2005)(Hunt, Gaillard)
March 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying #20 petitioner's motion to vacate order entered December 16, 2004 applying protective order, granting #24 respondents' motion to designate as "protected information" certain information in declaration in support of response to amended petition for habeas corpus and motion to dismiss or for judgment as a matter of law, and granting #26 respondents' motion to stay proceedings pending appeal. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 23, 2005. (MA)
March 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Summons (1) Issued for amended petition as to JAY HOOD. (td, )
March 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, and C)(Hunt, Gaillard)
March 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (nmw, )
March 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GEORGE W. BUSH, JR served on 2/9/2005, answer due 4/11/2005; DONALD H. RUMSFELD served on 12/14/2004, answer due 2/14/2005; JAY HOOD served on 12/14/2004, answer due 2/14/2005. (nmw, )
March 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/14/04. (nmw, )
March 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to opposition to motion re #33 Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Release of Papers and to Compel Discovery filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #33 Opposition to Petitioner's Motion For Release of Papers and To Compel Discovery filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #32 Petitioner's Motion to Suppress the Classified Return (also filed as Docket Nos. 39, 40 and 41) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #28 Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment (also filed as Docket Nos. 39 and 40) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 Respondents' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal (also filed as Docket No. 39) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY to opposition to motion re #23 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus or for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noronha, Preeya)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 to Vacate Protective Order, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Att A Physicians' amicus brief in Hamdan)(Hunt, Gaillard)
February 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 to Designate as "Protected Information" Certain Information in Declaration in Support of Response to Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Patterson, Nicholas)
February 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Patterson on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Patterson, Nicholas)
February 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #20 to Vacate Order Entered December 16, 2004, Applying Protective Order filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Patterson, Nicholas)
February 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #23 AND 22, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Compel Answers t Interrogatories and Release of Envelope Addressed to Counsel by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Motion to compel answers to interrogatoreis#2 Affidavit With Attachments 1-4#3 Exhibit Attachments 5-6 to Hunt Affidavit)(Hunt, Gaillard)
February 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Suppress Factual Return under Seal, submission noticed in docket 21, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #23 respondents' Response to Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #24 to designate protected information filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #26 Respondents' Motion to Stay filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order creating CSRT#2 Exhibit Exh B CSRT procedures)(Hunt, Gaillard)
February 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum in opposition to motion re #23 Petitioner's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exh 1 Farhat affidavit#2 Exhibit Exh 1-A Saifullah Card#3 Exhibit Exh 1-B Farhat Card#4 Affidavit Exh 2 Mahasin Affidavit#5 Affidavit Exh 3 Khan Affidavit#6 Exhibit Exh 4 Tausif Affidavt#7 Exhibit Exh 5 Memorandum of law)(Hunt, Gaillard)
February 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Stay by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew)
February 1, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 joint motion for extension of time up to and including February 15, 2005 for petitioner to respond to respondent's motion to dismiss and for judgment as a matter of law and respondents' time to respond to petitioner's motion on the protective order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 1, 2005. (ma)
January 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to pending motions by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Designate as "Protected Information" Certain Information in Declaration in Support of Response to Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Notice of Submission of Unredacted Declaration Under Seal by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Supporting Memorandum (also filed as Docket No. 22) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Noronha, Preeya)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to #11 Amended Petition for Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Supporting Memorandum filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Noronha, Preeya)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Saifullah Paracha (Factual Return) and Notice of Submission of Factual Return Under Seal filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)#2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)#3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3))(Noronha, Preeya)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Vacate Order entered December 16, 2004, applying protective order, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Preeya M. Noronha on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Noronha, Preeya)
December 29, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD (Henry, Terry)
December 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Extensions of Time. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-21-04. (FEK)
December 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gaillard T. Hunt (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to orders of December 16, 2004, by SAIFULLAH PARACHA. (Hunt, Gaillard)
December 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD. (Olson, Lisa)
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Applying Amended Protective Order and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-16-04. (Attachments: #1 #2)(MD)
December 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-16-04. (MD)
December 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FARHAT PARACHA, SAIFULLAH PARACHA.(nmw, )
December 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #2 petitioner's motion or application for a temporary restraining order and for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 7, 2004. (ma)
December 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 12/7/2004. Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction heard and DENIED, for reasons stated on the record in open Court. (Court Reporter Linda Russo.) (bm)
December 7, 2004 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued (6) as to GEORGE W. BUSH JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD H. RUMSFELD (2), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cp, )
December 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/7/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (bm)
December 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Court will transfer this case to Judge Green for coordination and management as reflected in the September 15, 2004 Resolution of the Executive Session, such transfer to take effect immediately after the Court rules on petitioner's motion for preliminary injunction now scheduled for argument on December 7, 2004. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 3, 2004. (ma)
December 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Court wishes to make clear that the only issue it wishes to consider at oral argument on December 7, 2004 at 10:00 a.m. is whether petitioner is entitled to an injunction preventing his removal from the United States. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 3, 2004. (ma)
December 1, 2004