AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE v. GOOGLE INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that Google's aggregation of AFP's photographs, headlines and story leads in Google News infringes on Plaintiff's copyrights.

Plaintiff: AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Counter Claimant: GOOGLE INC.
Counter Defendant: AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE
Case Number: 1:2005cv00546
Filed: March 17, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2007 Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Google and by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
March 7, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/27/2007. (CS, )
March 7, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 63 the Joint Motion for Extension of Time; the discovery deadline is extended until April 27, 2007; the March 19, 2007 conference is hereby cancelled; counsel are authorized to contact chambers by telephone to schedule a short and informal telephonic status report during the next week . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/7/07. (CS, )
March 7, 2007 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Conduct Telephonic Status Report by GOOGLE INC.. (Elgin, Jennifer)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference now set for Thursday, March 8, 2007, at 10:15 a.m. is hereby rescheduled for Monday, March 19, 2007 at 10:00 a.m.; if counsel find that this date and time are inconvenient for them, they are encouraged to file a Motion to Continue . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/6/07. (CS, )
February 2, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/8/2007 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 62 the Consent/Joint Motion for Extension of Time; all currently scheduled dates in this matter shall be extended for 30 days; the February 20, 2007 Status Conference is continued until March 8, 2007 at 10:15 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/2/07. (CS, )
February 2, 2007 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadline by GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirby, Thomas)
February 1, 2007 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by Heather H. Ramirez (Ramirez, Heather)
January 29, 2007 Filing 60 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part 2# 2 Supplement Part 3)(Elgin, Jennifer)
January 29, 2007 Filing 59 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Elgin, Jennifer)
January 29, 2007 Filing 58 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Elgin, Jennifer)
January 29, 2007 Filing 57 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Elgin, Jennifer)
December 22, 2006 Filing 56 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Waite, Barbara)
December 22, 2006 Filing 55 RULE 26b4 STATEMENT. (Waite, Barbara)
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 54 the Unopposed Motion for Leave of Jennifer L. Elgin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/8/06. (CS, )
December 7, 2006 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer L. Elgin. :Address- WIley Rein & Fielding LLP, 1776 K Street N.W. Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 719-7453. Fax No. - (202) 719-7049 by GOOGLE INC.. (Kirby, Thomas)
September 29, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Rule 26 Statement is due December 27, 2006; Defendant's Rule 26 Statement is due January 27, 2007; discovery closes on February 27, 2007; dispositive motions are due April 1, 2007; a status hearing is scheduled for February 20, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. (CS, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that, pursuant to Defendant's praecipe, its pending Motion to Dismiss is withdrawn as to specific works and copyright registrations Plaintiff has identified to date; all deadlines set forth in previous orders of the Court are hereby vacated; the following dates shall apply: Plaintiff's Rule 26 Statements are due December 27, 2006; Defendant's Rule 26 Statements are due January 27, 2007; discovery closes February 27, 2007; and dispositive motions are due April 1, 2007; the parties shall file their witness reports with the Court as soon as such reports become available; the next status conference shall be held on February 27, 2007 at 10:00 a.m.; the November 21, 2006 status conference is hereby cancelled unless counsel believe it will be useful . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/29/06. (CS, )
September 25, 2006 Filing 52 STATUS REPORT REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND SCHEDULING by GOOGLE INC.. (Kirby, Thomas)
September 25, 2006 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT Praecipe by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
July 21, 2006 Filing 50 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. Attorney Jason Andrew Aquilino terminated. (Waite, Barbara)
July 21, 2006 Filing 49 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. Attorney Mary Jane Saunders terminated. (Waite, Barbara)
July 21, 2006 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Lorraine Waite on behalf of AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE (Waite, Barbara)
July 18, 2006 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Plaintiff's Rule 26 Statement due October 25, 2006; Defendant's Rule 26 Statement due November 25, 2006; discovery closes on December 25, 2006 and dispositive motions are due January 25, 2007; the next status conference will be held November 21, 2006 (CS, )
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER on matters discussed in the Status Conference held on July 18, 2006, including the following changes in deadlines: Plaintiff's Rule 26 Statement is due October 25, 2006; Defendant's Rule 26 Statement is due November 25, 2006; discovery closes December 25, 2006; dispositive motions are due January 25, 2006; the next Status Conference will be held on November 21, 2006 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/18/06. (CS, )
July 18, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 7/18/2006. Scheduling Order will be entered. Further Status Conference set for 11/21/2006 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT for Conference by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
July 14, 2006 Filing 45 STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Kirby, Thomas)
June 15, 2006 Filing 44 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GOOGLE INC.. Attorney Scott E. Bain terminated. (Bain, Scott)
June 13, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/18/2006 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby scheduled for a Status Conference on July 18, 2006 at 10:15 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/13/06. (CS, )
June 10, 2006 Filing 43 RESPONSE re 42 Stipulation filed by GOOGLE INC.. (Bain, Scott)
June 7, 2006 Filing 42 STIPULATION Corrected Version of Stipulation for Extension of Dates Set in Court's January 24, 2006 Stipulated Order by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
June 7, 2006 Filing 41 STIPULATION For Extension of Dates Set in Court's January 24 2006 Stipulated Order by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Status Conference set for March 21, 2006 is hereby CANCELLED . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/20/06. (CS, )
March 16, 2006 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, GOOGLE INC.. (Bain, Scott)
February 17, 2006 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/11/06 Motions Hearing before Judge Gladys Kessler. Court Reporter: Susan P. Tyner. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
February 15, 2006 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Field v Google (D. Nev.))(Bain, Scott)
January 24, 2006 Filing 37 STIPULATION regarding determining liability for injunctive copyright relief. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/24/06. (tth, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 36 NOTICE - Joint Praecipe re Sampling by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, GOOGLE INC. re Motion Hearing,, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(Bain, Scott)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER setting deadlines and setting the next Status Conference for March 21, 2006 at 9:30 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/17/06. (CS, )
January 11, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2006 re 23 MOTION to Dismiss AFP's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by GOOGLE INC.; heard and taken under advisement. 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE; heard and taken under advisement. 24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Count II For Lack of Protectable Subject Matter filed by GOOGLE INC.; heard and taken underadvisement. 34 Joint MOTION for Discovery Modification of Scheduling Order filed by GOOGLE INC.; heard and granted. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Discovery -- Modification of Scheduling by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE, GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bain, Scott)
December 6, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth, )
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER setting Motions Hearing for January 11, 2006 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/5/05. (lcgk2)
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2) Statements are due January 16, 2006; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2) Statements are due March 16, 2006 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/28/05. (CS, )
November 21, 2005 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Saunders, Mary)
November 14, 2005 Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 partial summary judgment dismissing count II for lack of protectable subject matter filed by GOOGLE INC.. (Bain, Scott)
November 4, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 11/14/2005. (CS, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 30 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including November 14, 2005 in which to file its reply to the Opposition to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/4/05. (CS, )
November 4, 2005 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by GOOGLE INC.. (Bain, Scott)
November 4, 2005 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 dismissal for failure to state a claim filed by GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Bain, Scott)
October 26, 2005 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 24 Partial Summary Judgment, Count II filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gilles Tarot# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Saunders, Mary)
October 25, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/26/2005 (CS, )
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 26, 2005 in which to file its response to Google's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/25/05. (CS, )
October 24, 2005 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Google's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Kaufman, Joshua)
October 24, 2005 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 23 Google's Motion to Dismiss filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Saunders, Mary)
October 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER cancelling Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss [#13] scheduled for October 18, 2005 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/14/05. (lcgk2, )
October 12, 2005 Filing 24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Count II For Lack of Protectable Subject Matter by GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Bain, Scott)
October 12, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss AFP's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Bain, Scott)
October 6, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2005 09:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
October 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Tenth Additional Defense and First and Third Counterclaims will be held on October 18, 2005 at 9:45 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/5/05. (CS, )
August 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER 20 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/3/05. (mpt, )
August 3, 2005 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Bain, Scott)
June 28, 2005 Filing 19 REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 Counterclaims and Affirmative Defense filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Saunders, Mary)
June 22, 2005 Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 13 dismissal of counterclaims filed by GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirby, Thomas)
June 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2006. Expert Witness List due by 9/1/2005. Status Conference set for 3/21/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/20/05. (CS, )
June 20, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Meet and Confer Hearing held. Scheduling Order entered. Status Conference set for 3/21/2006 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth, )
June 15, 2005 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Bain on behalf of GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC. (Bain, Scott)
June 15, 2005 Filing 15 Civil Statement from Plaintiff Agence France Presse. (Saunders, Mary)
June 15, 2005 Filing 14 Civil Statement from Google: Statement of Case. (Attachments: # 1)(Kirby, Thomas)
June 13, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2005 01:45 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
June 13, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY: Because the Court has some commitments it must addressed the morning of June 20, 2005, it is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference now scheduled for June 20, 2005 at 10:30 a.m. is rescheduled for June 20, 2005 at 1:45 p.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/13/05. (CS, )
June 8, 2005 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Aquilino, Jason)
June 8, 2005 Filing 12 ANSWER to Counterclaim by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE.(Aquilino, Jason)
June 8, 2005 NOTICE OF HEARING: Initial Sceduling Conference previously set for 6/20/05 at 10:30 AM is now set for 6/20/2005 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth, )
June 6, 2005 Filing 11 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Saunders, Mary)
June 6, 2005 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Gary Joseph on behalf of GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC. (Joseph, Bruce)
June 6, 2005 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gerald McBride on behalf of GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC. (McBride, Andrew)
May 25, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/20/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
May 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference on June 20, 2005 at 10:30 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/25/05. (CS, )
May 19, 2005 Filing 7 LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE INC., GOOGLE INC. (Kirby, Thomas)
May 19, 2005 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE by GOOGLE INC..(Kirby, Thomas)
May 5, 2005 Filing 5 NOTICE of Revised Certificate of Service by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE re 4 Amended Complaint (Aquilino, Jason)
April 29, 2005 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOOGLE INC.filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(nmw, )
April 6, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/9/2005. (tth, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 3 the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Google shall file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than May 9, 2005. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/6/05. (CS, )
April 6, 2005 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aquilino, Jason)
March 17, 2005 Summons (1) Issued as to GOOGLE INC.. (rje, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE (rje, )
March 17, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE INC. (Filing fee $ 250) filed by AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1# 2 Exhibit A2# 3 Exhibit A3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit B)(rje, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE v. GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE
Represented By: Barbara Lorraine Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Andrew Gerald McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Andrew Gerald McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AGENCE FRANCE PRESSE
Represented By: Barbara Lorraine Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?