STEINBUCH v. CUTLER Featured Case
Plaintiff: ROBERT STEINBUCH
Defendant: JESSICA CUTLER
Case Number: 1:2005cv00970
Filed: May 16, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John M. Facciola
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Change of Address by John R. Ates (Ates, John)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The clerk is directed to file the defendant's Motion to Enforce Subpoena and Incorporated Memorandum in a new miscellaneous matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/24/08. (lcjmf1)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 107 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/22/08. (lcjmf1)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Let the defendant's motion to enforce subpoena and incorporated memorandum of law be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 9/22/08. (lcjmf1)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Strike 106 Reply to Document by ROBERT STEINBUCH (Rosen, Jonathan)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY re Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ates, John)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY re 102 Response to Order of the Court re: Defendant's Discovery Notwithstanding This Court's Stay filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan S. Rosen; (See Docket Entry No. 103 to view document) (td, )
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause by ROBERT STEINBUCH (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File is granted. Plaintiff shall file his response within ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/27/08. (lcjmf1)
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order to Show Cause, Requesting Miscellaneous Subpoena Enforcement Action be Opened filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Ates, John)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of a Motion to Enforce Subpoena from defendant Jessica Cutler. This case was stayed on 6/1/2007 pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362. The defendant is therefore ordered to show cause in writing within 10 days why her Motion to Enforce Subpoena should be accepted by this Court. In the interim, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to maintain her entire submission under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/25/08. (lcjmf1)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/16/07 before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Court Reporter: Linda L. Russo. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/16/07 before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Court Reporter: Linda L. Russo. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, )
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In view of Defendant Jessica Cutler's notice of her Chapter 7 bankruptcy petition filing in the United States Bankruptcy Court in the Northern District of New York, this case is automatically STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/1/2007. (mm)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by JESSICA CUTLER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Billips, Matthew)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUBPOENA UNDER SEAL by JESSICA CUTLER (see docket entry 98 to view document). (lc, )
May 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Protective Order by ROBERT STEINBUCHMotions referred to John M. Facciola. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Jonathan)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 84 defendant Ana Marie Cox's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim under Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 21, 2007. (MA)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/1/2007. (mm)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER, denying as moot 85 Consent Motion for Stay of Discovery. The Court is cognizant of the pending motions to compel and hereby ORDERS parties to meet and confer, in person or via telephone, within ten days to attempt resolution of the outstanding motions. The Court further ORDERS parties to file a BRIEF joint status report, indicating whether resolution was reached or what remains outstanding for the Court to resolve, within ten days of the conference. It is further ORDERED that discovery in this case shall close July 1, 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 5/17/07. (lcjf1, )
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/1/2007. (ldc, )
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2007 regarding 84 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ana Marie Cox. Motion heard and granted for the reasons stated on the record in open court. Defendant Ana Marie Cox dismissed as a party in this case. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 @ 03:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman re: Defendant Cox's Motion to Dismiss (mm)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that the oral argument on defendant Ana Marie Cox's motion to dismiss currently scheduled for May 16, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED for May 16, 2007 a.m. at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/3/07. (lcplf2)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that oral argument on defendant Ana Marie Cox's motion to dismiss 84 is scheduled for May 16, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/2/07. (lcplf2)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to opposition to motion re 84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANA MARIE COX. (Handman, Laura)
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 94 plaintiff's consented to motion for extension of time of 52 minutes within which to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 6, 2007. (MA)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Cox's Motion to Dismiss by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 REPLY in support re 69 MOTION for Sanctions And MOTION for Protective Order And Memorandum Of Law In Support filed by JESSICA CUTLER; (SEALED) (td, )
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE notice of filing reply brief pursuant to 12/28/06 minute order by JESSICA CUTLER re 69 MOTION for Sanctions And MOTION for Protective Order And Memorandum Of Law In Support (Ates, John)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Memorandum in opposition to re 84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Memorandum in opposition to re 69 MOTION for Sanctions And MOTION for Protective Order And Memorandum Of Law In Support filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 89 plaintiff's consented to motion for extension of time up to and including February 20, 2007 to respond to the motion to dismiss; defendant's reply is due on or before March 6, 2007. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 2, 2007. (MA)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion to dismiss due by 2/20/2007. Reply due by 3/6/2007. (mm)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 84 MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by ROBERT STEINBUCH re 87 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH,. (Rosen, Jonathan)
February 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 84 MOTION to Dismiss by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
January 29, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 83 motion for admission pro hac vice of James Rosenfeld on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 29, 2007. (MA)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Both on behalf of ANA MARIE COX (Both, Charles)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by ANA MARIE COX. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handman, Laura)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss by ANA MARIE COX. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handman, Laura)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James Rosenfeld. :Address- 1633 Broadway, 27th Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 489-8230. Fax No. - (212) 489-8340 by ANA MARIE COX. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Rosenfeld# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Handman, Laura)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber L. Husbands on behalf of ANA MARIE COX (Husbands, Amber)
January 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Rose Handman on behalf of ANA MARIE COX (Handman, Laura)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of filing document under seal pursuant to 1/19/07 Minute Order by JESSICA CUTLER re 69 MOTION for Sanctions And MOTION for Protective Order And Memorandum Of Law In Support (Ates, John)
January 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 28, 2006 Status/Scheduling Conference before Judge John M. Facciola. Court Reporter: Pro-Typists, Inc. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re 78 Memorandum filed by JESSICA CUTLER, granting defendant's request to submit plaintiff's supplemental discovery responses UNDER SEAL as an exhibit to document #69, Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and for Protective Order. Defendant may file the exhibit under seal in paper form, with a disk of the pdf file attached, with the clerk's office. Defendant is asked to provide a paper courtesy copy of the exhibit to chambers. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/19/07. (lcjf1, )
January 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM re 77 Memorandum filed by JESSICA CUTLER, by JESSICA CUTLER. (Ates, John)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM re 76 Memorandum filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH, by JESSICA CUTLER. (Ates, John)
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER for service by mail and stay of discovery. See text of order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/9/07. (lcjf1, )
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order ORDER VACATING 73 Order to Show Cause. An examination of the submission made by plaintiff's counsel indicates that the order of January 8, 2007, directing him to show cause why he should not be held in contempt, was issued in error since the quotations in the document are from the amended complaint and answer and not from discovery documents. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the order of January 8, 2007, is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 1/9/07. (lcjf1, )
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 73 Order to Show Cause filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 VACATED PER 1/9/2007 ORDER.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and ORDER STRIKING FROM THE RECORD DOCUMENT #72, Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 01/08/07. (lcjf1, ) Modified on 1/10/2007 (mm).
January 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION to Compel filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan) Modified on 1/9/2007 (mm). Modified on 1/19/2007 (tg, ).
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that plaintiff's motion to disqualify defense counsel Matthew Billips and revoke his pro hac vice status is denied. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 4, 2007. (MA)
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Sanctions And, MOTION for Protective Order And Memorandum Of Law In Support by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Billips, Matthew)
December 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel or Deem Admitted Defendant Cutler's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Document Requests and Motion to Strike and for Sanctions filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Billips, Matthew)
December 28, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #67 Motion to Place #66 Motion to Compel Under Seal. Pursuant to this Court's Order of December 8, 2006, no document produced during discovery, and no interrogatory or request for production of documents or response thereto, shall be filed as an attachment to any document to be filed in this case without prior explicit permission of this Court. Such request for permission must be made in writing, and permission will be granted or denied through the Court's electronic filing system. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any motions or other pleadings which quote any document produced during discovery, including interrogatories or requests for production of documents, or any response thereto, must be filed in two formats. The motion or pleading must be filed with the quotation expurgated in paper form, with a disk of the pdf file attached, with the clerk's office. A second complete version thereof without the expurgation shall also be filed under seal in paper form, with a disk of the pdf file attached, with the clerk's office. The Court will then determine whether the complete version or the expurgated version will be filed in the public, electronic docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties and counsel shall make no additional telephone contact with chambers. Any request, objection, complaint, point of confusion, or other comment parties or counsel may wish to express must be made in writing and filed through this Court's electronic filing system. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel review court orders of May 19, 2006, where, for any filing related to discovery in this case, the parties shall include both the initials of Judge Paul L. Friedman and Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola following the case number in the caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/28/06. (lcjf1, ) Modified on 12/28/2006 (lcjf1, ).
December 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Remark. Motion to Compel (docket number 66) placed under seal per Minute Order entered 12/28/06. (tg, )
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons (1) Issued as to ANA MARIE COX. (td, )
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #66, Motion to Compel filed 12/15/06 by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Compel by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan) (Placed UNDER SEAL pursuant to Minute Order entered 12/28/06) Modified on 12/28/2006 (tg, ).
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION to accompany ORDER of 12/08/06. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/08/06. (lcjf1, )
December 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, denying as moot 49 Defendant's Motion to Extend Discovery, granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence, and recommending denial of plaintiff's request to revoke pro hac vice admission of defense counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 12/08/06. (lcjf1, )
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM re Status Conference, Set Deadlines by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Billips, Matthew)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola : Status/Schedule Conference held on 11/28/2006. Discovery due by 1/29/2007. (Court Reporter ProTypist.) (ldc, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to deem Rule 36 requests admitted and alternative to preclude evidence, MOTION to Compel by JESSICA CUTLER. (td, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant's Motion to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law is deemed filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/21/06. (lcjf1, )
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Defendant Jessica Cutler's ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by JESSICA CUTLER. Related document: 58 Amended Complaint filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH,.(Billips, Matthew)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY to opposition to motion re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Leave to File Forty Nine Page Motion to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Billips, Matthew)
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Memorandum in opposition to re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Leave to File Forty Nine Page Motion to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER limiting the lift of the stay of discovery in this case to specifically permit additional briefing for motions already filed with this court. The stay remains in place for any new discovery pending the scheduling conference to be held 11/28/06. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/07/06. (lcjf1, )
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER CORRECTION, clarifying that, in light of this Court's Order of 10/31/06 lifting the stay of discovery, discovery may resume in this case until the scheduling conference of 11/28/06 at 11:30 AM, not 11/17/06 as previously noted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/06/06. (lcjf1, )
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER clarifying that, in light of this Court's Order of 10/31/06 lifting the stay of discovery, discovery may resume in this case until the scheduling conference of 11/17/06. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 11/06/06. (lcjf1, )
October 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference for discovery set for 11/28/2006 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. It is further ORDERED the stay on all discovery proceedings in this case is hereby lifted. (lcjf1, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANA MARIE COX, JESSICA CUTLER filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH.(td, )
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff?s motion for leave to file a first amended complaint and to add a party 37 is GRANTED. The first amended complaint shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 30, 2006. (MA)
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Paperless ORDER staying all discovery pending further notice from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 10/13/06. (SP, )
October 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola : Telephone Status Conference held on 10/13/2006. (Court Reporter Pro Typist.) (ldc, )
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/13/2006 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 VIA TELEPHONE before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjf1, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Leave to File Forty Nine Page Motion to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A-1# 3 Exhibit A-2# 4 Exhibit A-3# 5 Exhibit A-4# 6 Exhibit A-5# 7 Exhibit A-6# 8 Exhibit A-7# 9 Exhibit A-8)(Billips, Matthew)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Correction of Docket Nos. 51, 52, and 53 by JESSICA CUTLER re 52 MOTION to Compel to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Discovery, 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 53 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Billips, Matthew)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION to preclude evidence by JESSICA CUTLER. (SEE DOCUMENT NO. 52 FOR IMAGE) (td, ) Modified on 10/11/2006 (td, ).
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 55 MOTION to preclude evidence, 52 MOTION to Compel to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Discovery, 51 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings. Documents 52 and 55 should be attachments to document no. 51 until granted by the judge. (td, )
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10)(Billips, Matthew)
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION to Compel to Deem Rule 36 Requests Admitted, Motion to Compel Discovery, and Alternative Motion to Preclude Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, MOTION for Discovery by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Billips, Matthew) Modified on 10/11/2006 (td, ).
October 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JESSICA CUTLER. (Billips, Matthew) Modified on 10/11/2006 (td, ).
October 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Memorandum in opposition to re 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery & Opposition to Defendant's MOTION for New Scheduling Order filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Billips, Matthew)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Memorandum in opposition to re 47 First MOTION to Compel filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Billips, Matthew)
September 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 47 First MOTION to Compel by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Jonathan)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ROBERT STEINBUCH re 45 MOTION to Quash Third-Party Subpoena of Plaintiff's Employer (Rosen, Jonathan)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Quash Third-Party Subpoena of Plaintiff's Employer by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that defendant's motion for leave to supplement her motion to dismiss 43 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for leave from the Court's stay to file a reply brief to plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint and to supplement plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss 44 is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to dismiss 29 is DENIED. Because counsel has entered an appearance on behalf of the defendant, the stay on discovery and the stay on the proceedings in this case is lifted. Counsel for both parties are reminded to abide by this Court's April 14, 2006 Memorandum Opinion and Order and to conduct themselves in a civil and professional manner, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Civil Rules of this Court, and Appendix B of those Local Rules - the D.C. Bar Voluntary Standards for Civility in Professional Conduct. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/22/06.(lcplf2)
August 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief# 2 Affidavit Eidelberg Rosen# 3 Affidavit Steinbuch)(Rosen, Jonathan)
August 15, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 41 consent motion for leave for Matthew C. Billips to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 15, 2006. (MA)
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to supplement plaintiff's motion to dismiss by JESSICA CUTLER; ( See document no. 42 for image) (td, )
August 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Memorandum in opposition to re 37 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT and Defendant's Request for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 29 filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Errata B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ates, John)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew C. Billips. :Address- Miller & Billips, P.C., 730 Peachtree Street, Suite 750, Atlanta, GA 30328. Phone No. - 404-969-4101. Fax No. - 404-969-4141 by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mathew C. Billips in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ates, John)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Ates on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER (Ates, John)
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Letter from Jessica Cutler to Judge Paul L. Friedman (fiat) (jf, )
July 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 28 John Umana's motion to withdraw as plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on jULY 11, 2006. (MA)
July 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 First MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Attachments: # 1 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Rosen, Jonathan)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Protective Order staying discovery pending determination of motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/29/2006. (bm)
June 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION for Protective Order staying discovery pending determination of motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Umana, John)
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that on or before July 7, 2006, defendant Jessica Cutler must personally respond in writing to her counsel's motion to withdraw and/or advise the Court of her retention of new counsel or her intention to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 23, 2006. (MA)
June 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Protective Order staying discovery pending determination of motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order staying discovery pending determination of motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Umana, John)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Failure to meet amount in controversy requirement under 28 USC 1332 filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Umana, John)
June 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Failure to meet amount in controversy requirement under 28 USC 1332 filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Failure to meet amount in controversy requirement under 28 USC 1332 by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Umana, John)
May 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John Umana on behalf of defendant by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Umana, John)
May 19, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for Discovery Disputes. (jsc)
May 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER referring matter to Magistrate Judge Facciola for the management of discovery in this case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 19, 2006. (MA)
May 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 19, 2006. (MA)
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Rule LCvR 16.3 Conference Report by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 05, 2006 before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (jf, )
April 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER striking 20 defendant's notice of deposition, striking 21 motion to quash, striking 22 motion for protective order, granting 18 motion for extension of time to file joint report pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before May 8, 2006, and staying case pending the receipt of the Rule 16.3 joint report and the entry by the Court of a scheduling order and an order referring discovery disputes to a magistrate judge. The parties may not file any motions or notices except as related to the Local Civil Rule 16.3 joint report until such time as the Court's stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/14/06.(lcplf2)
April 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 4/14/2006 ..... MOTION for Protective Order by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan) Modified on 4/18/2006 (bm).
April 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 4/14/2006 ..... MOTION to Quash Defendant's Notice of Depositon by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan) Modified on 4/18/2006 (bm).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 4/14/2006 ..... NOTICE of Deposition of Plaintiff Steinbuch by JESSICA CUTLER (Umana, John) Modified on 4/18/2006 (bm).
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JESSICA CUTLER. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH,.(Umana, John)
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that, upon consideration of the arguments of counsel as set forth in their briefs and at oral argument, and for the reasons stated in open court, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 5 for failure to state a claim under Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 5, 2006. (MA)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman : Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2006 re 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by JESSICA CUTLER, heard and DENIED for the reasons stated on the record in open Court. The parties shall meet, confer and file a joint report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 within two weeks. The case will be referred to a Magistrate Judge for all discovery disputes.(Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (Counsel: Plaintiff Jonathan S. Rosen; Defendant John Umana) (bm)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order AMENDED MINUTE ORDER denying the motion to disqualify 16 as moot since a new defendant's counsel has filed a notice of substitution. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/4/2006. (bm)
April 4, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/4/2006. (bm)
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Umana on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER Substituting for attorney William H. Bode (Umana, John)
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel William H. Bode & Eric D. Mitchell by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 10 motion of Thomas E. Wilson, Esq., Alexander C. Vincent, Esq., Jason A. McClurg, Esq., and the law firm of Berliner, Corcoran & Rowe, LLP, to withdraw as counsel for defendant Jessica Cutler, pusuant to D.D.C. Civ. R. 83.6(c) and D.C.R. Prof. Conduct 1.16(a)(3, and there being no opposition to the motion, and new counsel now having formally entered appearances, and the Court hving found that the motion will not unduly delay trial of the case and is otherwise in the interests of justice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 31, 2006. (MA)
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Herbert Bode on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER (Bode, William)
March 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William Herbert Bode on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER (Bode, William)
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that the motions hearing formerly scheduled for April 4, 2006 is now rescheduled to April 5 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 27, 2006. (MA)
March 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that if the Court has not granted the motion to withdraw before April 4, 2006, subject to conditions, plaintiff's current counsel of record is expected to appear for the hearing on April 4, 2006. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 23, 2006. (MA)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to 11 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Vincent, Alexander)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to 10 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan) Modified on 3/16/2006 (td, ).
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Jessica Cutler by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw)(Vincent, Alexander)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 9 motion to reschedule oral argument. Oral argument for defendant's motion to dismiss is rescheduled to April 4, 2006 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 15, 2006. (MA)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Oral Argument by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
March 7, 2006 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29 in the Annex before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (bm)
September 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 to Dismiss the Complaint filed by JESSICA CUTLER. (Vincent, Alexander)
September 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to motion re 5 / Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's "Motion to Dismiss", filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 4, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 6 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including September 15, 2005 to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 4, 2005. (MA)
July 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Jonathan)
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint# 2 Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint# 3 Exhibit 2 to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Vincent, Alexander)
July 1, 2005 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 4 defendant's consent motion for enlargement of time up to and including July 26, 2005 to answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 30, 2005. (MA)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by JESSICA CUTLER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint)(Vincent, Alexander)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Craig Vincent on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER (Vincent, Alexander)
June 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Wilson on behalf of JESSICA CUTLER (Wilson, Thomas)
May 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JESSICA CUTLER (Filing fee $ 250) filed by ROBERT STEINBUCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(td, )
May 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Summons (1) Issued as to JESSICA CUTLER. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEINBUCH v. CUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STEINBUCH
Represented By: Jonathan S. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA CUTLER
Represented By: Matthew C. Billips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?