FARAJ v. BUSH et al
Case Number: |
1:2005cv01490 |
Filed: |
July 28, 2005 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul L. Friedman |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2015 |
Filing
330
MEMORANDUM OPINION dismissing case as moot. An order consistent with this memorandum opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 24, 2015. (MA)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing
242
ORDER granting 241 Joint Scheduling Motion. Ordered that the following schedule be, and it hereby is, established in this matter: (1) Respondents shall file their motion for summary judgment on the record, together with any supplement to their Mot ion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity that was originally filed on September 25, 2009 (Dkt. No. 219), on or before September 13, 2010; (2) Petitioner shall file his motion for judgment on the record and opposit ion to Respondents' motion for judgment on the record, together with his response to Respondents' Motion to Admit Hearsay Evidence with a Presumption of Accuracy and Authenticity and notification regarding whether Petitioner intends to prov ide oral testimony during the merits hearing, on or before October 8, 2010; (3) Respondents shall file any reply in support of their motion for judgment on the record and opposition to Petitioner's motion for judgment on the record on or before October 22, 2010; (4) The parties shall file a joint statement of material issues in dispute and a joint notebook of exhibits on or before October 29, 2010; (5) Respondents and Petitioner shall separately file their respective lists of non-English wo rds upon which they intend to refer at the merits hearing, together with a pronunciation guide, on or before November 5, 2010; (6) A pre-hearing conference shall be held on November 2, 2010 @ 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/25/2010. (zmm, )
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing
216
ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report submitted by the Parties, is is hereby ordered that Respondents shall file their motion for judgment on the record by 10/2/2009. Petitioner shall file his motion for judgment on the record and/or opposition to Respondents' motion by 10/27/2009. Respondents shall file their reply to the motion for judgment on the record and/or opposition to Petitioner's motion by 11/12/2009. Respondents shall complete their production of responsive Task Force materials by 9/28/2009. Respondents shall file a status report concerning the materials at issue in their 9/8/2009 classified status report by 10/8/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/15/2009. (mm)
|
June 9, 2009 |
Filing
194
Public Version of Order described in May 26, 2009 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/26/09. (lcplf1).
|
May 11, 2009 |
Filing
178
ORDER granting 176 Joint Motion to Suspend Briefing of Motions for Judgment on the Record. Ordered that the 5/13/2009 filing deadline for the parties' cross-motions for judgment on the record be suspended until further guidance from the Court during the 5/13/2009 status conference. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/11/2009. (mm)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing
167
ORDER granting 162 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Further Enlargement of Time to File Traverse to Respondents' Amended Factual Return. Ordered that the time for filing Petitioner's traverse is enlarged from 3/16/2009, to and including 4/30/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/19/2009. (mm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?