July 26, 2018 |
Filing 173
NOTICE of Supplemental Information by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing 172
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiff Chabad by The Simon Wiesenthal Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendelsohn, Martin)
|
June 6, 2018 |
Filing 171
MOTION Requesting that Previously Filed Motions at Docket Entries 167 and 168 be Granted re #168 MOTION for Sanctions to be Increased MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Protective Order Regarding Post-Judgment Discovery, #167 MOTION for Judgment Additional Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration McCallum Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to McCallum Declaration)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
May 11, 2018 |
Filing 170
NOTICE of Related Filing by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lieberman, Steven)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing 169
NOTICE of Related Filing by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lieberman, Steven)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing 168
MOTION for Sanctions to be Increased, MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Protective Order Regarding Post-Judgment Discovery by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel McCallum, #2 Exhibit 1 to McCallum Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to McCallum Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to McCallum Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing 167
MOTION for Judgment Additional Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing 166
ORDER granting #165 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/29/17. (lsj)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing 165
Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for International Judicial Assistance, #2 Declaration of S. D. Levine, #3 Declaration of J. I. Aronov, #4 Exhibit A - Nov. 22, 2017 Letter)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing 164
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 10/24/17; Page Numbers: 1 - 28. Date of Issuance:October 27, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard D. Ehrlich, Telephone number (202) 354-3269, Tape Number: NA. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2018.(Ehrlich, Richard)
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing 163
NOTICE by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re 161 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Lieberman, Steven)
|
October 27, 2017 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #162 Notice (Other); emailed to slieberman@rfem.com, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect format (Letter); Please refile in proper pleading format in accordance with Local Rules. (znmw, )
|
October 26, 2017 |
Filing 162
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Letter to Judge Lamberth by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re 161 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Lieberman, Steven) Modified on 10/27/2017 (znmw).
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing 161
ORAL ORDER granting #158 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (see Minute Entry of 10/24/2017) Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/24/17. (nbn)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing 160
AFFIDAVIT re #158 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Supplemental Declaration of Rabbi Shalom Dovber Levine) by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Lieberman, Steven)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2017 re #158 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Oral arguments heard and MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory GRANTED on the record. Signed Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Rich Erlich) (nbn)
|
October 23, 2017 |
Filing 159
Letter from Steven Lieberman, Esq. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/23/2017 (jf)
|
October 23, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: A Merits Hearing on #158 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, is hereby set for 10/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. So ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/23/17. (nbn)
|
October 19, 2017 |
Filing 158
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for International Judicial Assistance, #2 Exhibit B - Levine Declaration)(Parker, Robert)
|
April 14, 2016 |
Filing 157
REPLY to opposition to motion re #152 MOTION to Strike #151 Notice (Other),, filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Parker, Robert)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing 156
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Reply In Support of Its Motion to Strike the Government's Statement of Interest by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Parker, Robert)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing 155
NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Swinton, Nathan)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing 154
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 8-20-15; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 4/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016.(Foradori, Lisa)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing 153
MOTION to Alter Judgment by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Parker, Robert)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing 152
MOTION to Strike #151 Notice (Other),, by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration McCallum Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - McCallum Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - McCallum Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - McCallum Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - McCallum Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - McCallum Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing 151
NOTICE of filing of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - subpoenas issued to financial institutions, #2 Exhibit B - letter from Department of State to Department of Justice, #3 Exhibit C - transcript of motions hearing, #4 Exhibit D - May 2014 Russian court decision, #5 Exhibit E - Russian law on jurisdictional immunities of foreign states, #6 Exhibit F - May 2014 Montasa-Montajes decision, #7 Exhibit G - January 2015 Montasa-Montajes decision)(Swinton, Nathan)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing 150
MOTION for Protective Order and Response to the Government's "Statement of Interest" by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing 149
NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Swinton, Nathan)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 148
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McCallum on behalf of AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (McCallum, Daniel)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing 147
NOTICE of Potential Participation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Swinton, Nathan)
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing 146
Proposed MOTION for Protective Order by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lieberman, Steven)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing 145
ORDER; directing plaintiff to give notice to the United States Department of Justice, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/2015. (hs)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing 144
ORDER; granting #127 Motion for Order For Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/2015. (hs)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing 143
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/2015. (hs)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing 142
NOTICE of Filing in USDC/SD NY re #140 Notice of Service of Subpoena (zrdj)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing 141
NOTICE of Proposed Order by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re Motion Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order and Interim Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Notice to the United States)(Parker, Robert)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2015 re #127 MOTION for Order for Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Oral arguments heard. Motion #127 held in Abeyance pending the submissions of proposed orders. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori) (hs)
|
August 7, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER; Setting Hearing on Motion #127 MOTION for Order for Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 AT 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (hs)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing 140
NOTICE of Service of Subpoena by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lieberman, Steven)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing 139
NOTICE of Subpoena by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lieberman, Steven)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 138
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Attorney Seth M. Gerber terminated. (Lewin, Nathan)
|
August 22, 2014 |
Filing 137
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lieberman, Steven)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing 136
Letter to the Court from William P. Fritzlen, Attorney Adviser, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison re #127 (rdj)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing 135
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Response to the Statement of Interest of the United States by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #134 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gerber Affirmation)(Parker, Robert)
|
February 21, 2014 |
Filing 134
NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Swinton, Nathan)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing 133
TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 8/20/2013; Page Numbers: 1-3. Date of Issuance: 2/4/2014. Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Court Reporter Email Address: vickieastvold@yahoo.com. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014.(Eastvold, Vicki)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 132
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Attorney Marshall B. Grossman terminated. (Lewin, Nathan)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 131
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #127 MOTION for Order for Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions . (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing 130
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nathan Michael Swinton on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Swinton, Nathan)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing 129
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Parker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Parker, Robert)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing 128
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lieberman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lieberman, Steven)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing 127
MOTION for Order for Interim Judgment of Accrued Sanctions by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rabbi Yosef Cunin, #2 Proposed Order and Interim Judgment)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 10/21/2013. Counsel for the defendant failed to appear for this hearing. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (tg, )
|
August 20, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 8/20/2013. Oral Motion by the plaintiff for a further continuance of this matter, heard and granted. A further Status Conference set for 10/21/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter: Vickie Eastvold) (cdw)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 8/20/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ad)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 126
MINUTE ORDER that a Status Conference shall be held on August 20, 2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 20, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 6/20/2013. (Court Reporter: Theresa Sorensen) (cdw)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 6/20/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (mpt, )
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing 125
ORDER that the Status Conference #123 shall be rescheduled to June 20, 2013 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 7, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing 124
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement to the Court by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re Set/Reset Hearings (Lewin, Alyza)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing 123
ORDER granting #122 Motion to Reschedule the Status Conference. The Status Conference shall be rescheduled to June 10, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 21, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing 122
MOTION Reschedule Status Conference re #121 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Set/Reset Hearings by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 6/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing 121
ORDER granting #120 Motion to Reschedule Status Conference. Status Conference shall be rescheduled for May 21, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 17, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing 120
MOTION to Amend/Correct Status Conference, Set Hearings by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 5/21/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing 119
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/18/13; Date of Issuance:3/27/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Artrip Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov. <
< < Redaction Request due 4/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2013.(Gels, Patty)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 3/18/2013. Status Conference set for 4/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (rje)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 3/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing 118
ORDER granting #117 Motion to reschedule the status conference previously set for February 15, 2013. The status conference shall be rescheduled for March 18, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 13, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing 117
MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Hearings Reschedule Status Conference by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
January 17, 2013 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing 116
MEMORANDUM OPINION on contempt sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 16, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing 115
ORDER granting #92 Motion for Sanctions and setting status conference for February 15, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 16, 2013. (lcrcl5)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Contempt Hearing held on 1/9/2013. The matter has been submitted to the court. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing 114
ORDER granting #113 Motion Reschedule Status Conference re Notice of Hearing. Status Conference set for 1/9/2013 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/12. (rje, )
|
December 10, 2012 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/9/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje, )
|
December 6, 2012 |
Filing 113
MOTION Reschedule Status Conference re Notice of Hearing by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
November 30, 2012 |
NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 12/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing 112
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Response to Statement of Interest of the United States by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re Order, #111 Notice (Other) (Lewin, Nathan)
|
August 30, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall file its response to the Government's Statement of Interest #111 no later than September 28, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/30/2012. (lcrcl5)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing 111
NOTICE Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #107 Order (McElvain, Joel)
|
August 8, 2012 |
Filing 110
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McElvain, Joel)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing 109
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McElvain, Joel)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing 108
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joel L. McElvain on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney James D. Nelson (McElvain, Joel)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing 107
ORDER SOLICITING VIEWS OF THE UNITED STATES. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/23/2012. (lcrcl5)
|
March 5, 2012 |
Filing 106
NOTICE of Statement Regarding the Expiration of the Stay of Enforcement of the Judgment and Request for Issuance of Contempt Sanctions by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #101 Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Order on Motion for Sanctions, #102 Order to Show Cause (Lewin, Alyza)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing 105
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST TO TEMPORARILY HOLD IN ABEYANCE CONTEMPT SANCTIONS AND ENFORCEMENT OF THE JUDGMENT by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #104 Notice (Other) (Lewin, Nathan)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 104
NOTICE of Request to Temporarily Hold In Abeyance Contempt Sanctions and Enforcement of the Judgment by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #102 Order to Show Cause (Lewin, Nathan)
|
August 19, 2011 |
Filing 103
AFFIDAVIT re #102 Order to Show Cause mailing and confirmation of delivery by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Seth Gerber Affidavit)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing 102
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 26, 2011. (lcrcl5)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing 101
ORDER granting #91 Motion to Enforce Judgment; and holding in abeyance #92 Motion for Sanctions pending defendants' response to Order to Show Cause issued this date. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 26, 2011. (lcrcl5)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing 100
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 26, 2011. (lcrcl5)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing 99
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Attorney William Bradford Reynolds terminated. (Lewin, Alyza)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing 98
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Response to Statement of Interest of United States by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #97 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing 97
NOTICE of Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nelson, James)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 96
NOTICE of Stipulation Prohibiting Attachment of Certain Cultural Objects by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #94 Notice (Other) (Lewin, Nathan)
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing 95
NOTICE of Potential Participation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nelson, James)
|
May 13, 2011 |
Filing 94
NOTICE of Statement by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #93 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing 93
NOTICE of Potential Participation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #91 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Permit Attachment (znmw, )
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing 92
MOTION for Sanctions by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing 91
MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Permit Attachment by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing 90
STATUS REPORT by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Certified Translation)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing 89
STATUS ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 28, 2011. (lcrcl5)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 88
NOTICE: Letter to the Court. (This letter is not translated) (rdj)
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing 87
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by U.S. Department of State upon defendants under diplomatic notes, numbers CON 2010-097, CON 2010-098, CON 2010-099 and 2010-100 dated December 16, 2010 and delivered on December 17, 2010 re #81 Memorandum & Opinion, #80 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Diplomatic Notes *Originals mailed to Nathan Lewin*)(rdj)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 86
Letter from William P. Fritzlen, Attorney Adviser, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison (Enclosures mailed to Counsel, Nathan Lewin)(rdj)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 85
NOTICE of Service to US Department of State, Office of the Legal Advisor by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Nathan)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 84
STATUS REPORT by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing 83
REPORT by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. "Let this be filed" by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/2010 (rdj)
|
August 20, 2010 |
Filing 82
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (rdj)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 81
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/30/2010. (tr)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 80
ORDER granting #79 Motion for Entry of Default Against All Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/30/2010. (tr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2010: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 1b, #3 Attachment 1c, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 4) (rje, ).
|
June 25, 2010 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 24, 2010. (lcrcl3)
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 79
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Motion for Entry of Default by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #3 Affidavit of Nathan Lewin, #4 Affidavit Exhibit A, #5 Affidavit Exhibit B, #6 Affidavit Exhibit C, #7 Affidavit Exhibit D, #8 Affidavit Exhibit E, #9 Affidavit Exhibit F, #10 Affidavif Exhibit G 1 of 3, #11 Affidavit Exhibt G 2 of 3, #12 Affidavit Exhibit G 3 of 3, #13 Affidavit Exhibits H - J, #14 Affidavit Exhibit K, #15 Affidavit Exhibit L, #16 Affidavit of Krinsky, #17 Affidavit of Levine, #18 Affidavit of Levine Exhibits, #19 Proposed Order for Entry of Default, #20 Order Attachment I 1 of 3, #21 Order Attachement I 2 of 3, #22 Order Attachment I 3 of 3, #23 Order Attachment II, #24 Order Attachment III, #25 Order Attachment IV, #26 Certificate of Service)(Lewin, Nathan).
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing 78
ORDER directing plaintiff to file an appropriate motion for entry of judgment on the default within 30 days of this date or the case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/7/2010. (lcrcl4, )
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 77
ORDER granting #73 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/09. (rje)
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing 76
ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Donald Thomas Bucklin; Jeremy William Dutra; James Paul Murphy; Don A. Proudfoot, Jr; Lan T. Quach; Alan Leonard Briggs and James Henry Broderick, Jr terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/22/2009. (lcrcl4, )
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing 75
REPLY to opposition to motion re #72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dutra, Jeremy)
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing 74
Memorandum in opposition to re #72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw As Counsel)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 73
MOTION for Entry of Default Against All Named Defendants by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathan Lewin and Exhibits)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 72
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutra, Jeremy)
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing 71
NOTICE With Respect to Further Participation by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dutra, Jeremy)
|
April 22, 2009 |
Filing 70
NOTICE by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #68 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #67 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Supplemental Declaration of Rabbi Shalom Dovber Levine in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Plan to Secure, Protect, and Preserve the "Collection" and of Plaintiff's Request for Hearing)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
April 8, 2009 |
Filing 69
NOTICE of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Proposed Plan to Secure, Protect, and Preserve the Collection and of Plaintiff's Request for Hearing, and Supplemental Declaration of Rabbi Shalom Dovber Levine by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, L, M, #2 Exhibit N (part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit N (part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit N (part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit O and P)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing 68
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Request for a Hearing on Defendants' Report on Security Procedures and Plaintiff's Proposed Plan to Secure, Protect, and Preserve the "Collection" by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Alyza)
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing 67
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Proposed Plan to Secure, Protect, and Preserve the "Collection" Until Entry of Final Judgment in This Case by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth M. Gerber, #2 Declaration of Rabbi Shalom Dovber Levine, #3 Exhibit A-J, Part 1, #4 Exhibit A-J, Part 2, #5 Exhibit A-J, Part 3, #6 Exhibit A-J, Part 4, #7 Exhibit A-J, Part 5)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing 66
NOTICE of Report on Security Procedures in Effect to Maintain the Intergrity and Security of the Materials Covered by the Preliminary Injunction Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE re #54 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dutra, Jeremy)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 65
DEPOSIT of Security in the amount of $ 1.00, Receipt Number 4616019170, by the Plaintiff, pursuant to #54 ORDER entered on 1/27/2009. (tg, )
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing 64
NOTICE of Compliance With Court's February 6, 2009 Order #57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Timeby RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Dutra, Jeremy) Modified on 3/16/2009 to add correct linkage (rdj).
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing 63
Amended ANSWER to Complaint by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. Related document: #1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES.(Dutra, Jeremy)
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing 62
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE re #42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE, RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION. (Dutra, Jeremy)
|
February 13, 2009 |
Filing 61
NOTICE of Report to Court Pursuant to Order of February 11, 2009 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE re #60 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Murphy, James)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing 60
ORDER granting #58 Motion to require service on all defendants ; denying 59 Motion to reduce extension of time. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/11/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
February 11, 2009 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #58 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; emailed to nat@lewinlewin.com, cc'd 17 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Attorney Lewin is reminded to pick each relief separately when filing 2 motions under 1 pleading. (tg, )
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing 59
MOTION to Reduce Extension of Time by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number #58 to view document).
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing 58
MOTION (1) to require service on all Defendants and (2) to reduce extension of time by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
February 9, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 3/13/2009. (rje)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing 57
ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/5/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 56
MOTION for Extension of Time to Defer Certain Dates by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, James)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 55
ORDER re: defendant counsel's motion to withdraw. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/27/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 54
ORDER granting #38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/27/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing 53
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 27, 2009 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #50 Supplemental Memorandum; emailed to nat@lewinlewin.com, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Reminded for Attoreny Lewin: Documents related to motions need to be linked to the related motion. (tg, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to motion for preliminary injunction. The Court heard argument and issued a ruling on the preliminary injunction on January 27, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/27/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
January 27, 2009 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2009. Order forecoming. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 52
NOTICE of Proposed Order to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 51
NOTICE of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 50
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to SUPPORT #38 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Lewin, Nathan) Modified to add linkage on 1/27/2009 (tg, ).
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 49
NOTICE by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE re #42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, Alan)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 48
Memorandum in opposition to re #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (Briggs, Alan)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 47
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Request for Additional Time for Defendants to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Broderick, James)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 46
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/22/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 45
NOTICE of Proposed Order by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES re #38 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 1/22/2009. Preliminary Injunctin Hearing set for 1/27/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
|
January 22, 2009 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper ECF event to docket a Motion for Extension of Time. (tg, )
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing 44
Memorandum in opposition to re #42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing 43
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Request for Additional Time for Defendants to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Broderick, James) Modified on 1/22/2009 (tg, ).
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 42
WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 3/6/2009..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dutra, Jeremy) Modified on 3/9/2009 (znmw, ).
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 41
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Lewin, Alyza)
|
January 9, 2009 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: #40 Order on Motion for Order was entered in error because of a corrupted document. A Minute Order was entered to replace the corrupted order.(tg, )
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing 40
ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER granting #39 Motion for revised schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/8/2009. (lcrcl1, ) Modified on 1/9/2009 (tg, ).
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing 39
Joint MOTION for Order for Revised Status Conference Date and for Filing Meet-and-Confer Report by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
January 8, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting motion #39 for a revised schedule. (1) The meet and confer report is now due January 16, 2009; (2) The status conference currently scheduled to be held on January 15, 2009, at 2 P.M. is moved to January 22, 2009, at 10 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/8/2009. (lcrcl1, )
|
January 8, 2009 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/22/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing 38
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
December 12, 2008 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #37 Answer to Complaint; emailed to jdutra@ssd.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney Dutra is going to file a document through ECF he must also sign ALL the documents himself. (tg, )
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing 37
ANSWER to Complaint by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. Related document: #1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES.(Dutra, Jeremy)
|
December 8, 2008 |
Filing 36
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy William Dutra on behalf of RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Dutra, Jeremy)
|
December 3, 2008 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Answer due by 12/11/2008. Meet & Confer Report due by 1/13/2009. Status Conference set for 1/15/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 35
ORDER granting #34 joint motion for revised scheduling order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/2/2008. (lcrcl1, )
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 34
Joint MOTION for Order Revised Scheduling Order by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Alyza)
|
November 19, 2008 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #33 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) was entered in error. The notice of appearance for Attorney Carey was filed by Attorney Dutra, Mr. Dutra is not an attorney of record in this case. Attorney Carey was instructed to refile said pleading using her own login and password. (tg, )
|
November 18, 2008 |
Filing 33
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C. Carey on behalf of by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE (Dutra, Jeremy) Modified on 11/19/2008 (tg, ).
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 32
ORDER setting deadlines and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/17/2008. (lcrcl1, )
|
November 17, 2008 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 11/17/2008. Status Conference set for 12/19/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 31
MOTION for Supplemental Initial Disclosures and Discovery Responses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e)(1) by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/17/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
October 30, 2008 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/6/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (rje)
|
October 30, 2008 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/17/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Any hearing dated scheduled prior to this date is hereby VACATED. (rje)
|
October 28, 2008 |
Filing 30
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #24 Notice of Appeal, filed by RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE, RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION ; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby affirmed in part, reversed in part, and vacated in part. (USCA No. 07-7002) (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(mmh, )
|
February 23, 2007 |
USCA Case Number 07-7006 for #29 Notice of Appeal, filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (tg, )
|
February 9, 2007 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #29 Notice of Appeal, (tg, )
|
February 8, 2007 |
Filing 29
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Order on Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1113589. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lewin, Nathan)
|
February 8, 2007 |
Filing 28
ORDER granting #22 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, denying 25 Motion to certify interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/7/2007. (lcrcl1, )
|
February 1, 2007 |
USCA Case Number 07-7006 for #27 Notice of Appeal filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (tg, )
|
January 18, 2007 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #27 Notice of Appeal (tg, )
|
January 17, 2007 |
USCA Case Number 07-7002 for #24 Notice of Appeal, filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION,, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (tg, )
|
January 17, 2007 |
Filing 27
NOTICE OF APPEAL by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1094113. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 16, 2007 |
Filing 26
Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION, #22 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment statement of points and authorities in non-opposition and opposition to rule 54(b) filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Quach, Lan)
|
January 4, 2007 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #24 Notice of Appeal, (tg, )
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 25
MOTION for certification of an immediate appeal by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (tg, ) (See docket number 22 for scanned document)
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 24
NOTICE OF APPEAL by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1084149. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Broderick, James)
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 23
NOTICE of Name Change of Law Firm by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Nathan)
|
January 3, 2007 |
Filing 22
MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Points and Authorities#2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
December 4, 2006 |
Filing 21
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/04/2006. (lcrcl1, )
|
December 4, 2006 |
Filing 20
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' Motion [Cal. 13] to dismiss. The motion to dismiss is granted as to allegations related to the "Library," and is denied as to allegations related to the "Archive." Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/04/2006. (lcrcl1, )
|
September 15, 2006 |
Filing 19
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 29, 2006 Motions Hearing before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Court Reporter: Rebecca Stonestreet. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, )
|
August 30, 2006 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth : Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2006 MOTION to dismiss, heard and held in abeyance. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) (rje)
|
August 1, 2006 |
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing reset for 8/30/2006 04:00 PM before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (lin, )
|
June 19, 2006 |
Filing 18
ORDER granting #16 parties' Consent Motion #16 Re Taking Depositions of Elderly Witnesses; Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the parties shall not submit supplemental briefing on Defendants? motion to dismiss regarding the deposition testimony of Rabbi Yehuda Krinsky, Rabbi Avraham Hecht, or Rabbi Joseph Wineberg. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/19/06. (lcrcl1, )
|
June 19, 2006 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #17 Consent MOTION for Order Proposed Order was entered in error as the document is a proposed order and not a motion. The clerk attached the proposed order to the related motion as an attachment. (tg, )
|
June 16, 2006 |
Filing 17
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Order Proposed Order by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (Broderick, James) Modified on 6/19/2006 (tg, ).
|
June 16, 2006 |
Filing 16
Consent MOTION to Take Deposition from Elderly Witnesses submitted by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (Broderick, James)#1 Proposed Order Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tg, ).
|
January 23, 2006 |
Filing 15
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Supplemental Memorandum#2 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice#3 Supplemental Declaration of M. Grossman#4 Continuation of Supplemental Declaration of M. Grossman)(Lewin, Nathan)
|
December 24, 2005 |
Filing 14
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Motion to Dismiss filed by RUSSIAN FEDERATION, RUSSIAN MINISTRY OF CULTURE AND MASS COMMUNICATION, RUSSIAN STATE LIBRARY, RUSSIAN STATE MILITARY ARCHIVE. (Broderick, James)
|
December 13, 2005 |
Filing 13
ORDER granting #10 Motion to admit James H. Broderick, Jr., Don A. Proudfoot, Jr., and Lan T. Quach Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/13/2005. (lcrcl1, )
|
December 13, 2005 |
Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance by William Bradford Reynolds on behalf of AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Reynolds, William)
|
December 6, 2005 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Memorandum due by 12/23/2005. (mon, )
|
December 6, 2005 |
Filing 11
ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. The supplemental briefs requested in this Court's November 23, 2005 Order shall be filed as follows: defendants shall file their brief by December 23, 2005; and plaintiff shall file its brief by January 23, 2006.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/6/05. (lcrcl2, )
|
December 5, 2005 |
Filing 10
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Donald T. Bucklin. :Address- Squie Sanders & Dempsey, 1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. #500, Washington, DC. Phone No. - (202) 626-6816. Fax No. - (202) 626-6780 by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Bucklin, Donald)
|
December 2, 2005 |
Filing 9
ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/2/05. (lcrcl2, )
|
December 2, 2005 |
Filing 8
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct by RUSSIAN FEDERATION. (Bucklin, Donald)
|
December 2, 2005 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Thomas Bucklin on behalf of all defendants (Bucklin, Donald)
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyza Doba Lewin on behalf of AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Alyza)
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Lewin on behalf of AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Nathan)
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 4
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nathan Lewin. :Address- 1828 L Street. NW Suite 901, Washington DC 20036. Phone No. - 202-828-1000. Fax No. - 202-828-0909 by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marshall Bruce Grossman#2 Affidavit J. Stern#3 Affidavit Seth Gerber#4 Text of Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service)(Lewin, Nathan) Modified on 12/28/2005 (jeb, ).
|
December 1, 2005 |
Filing 3
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Lewin on behalf of AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES (Lewin, Nathan)
|
November 23, 2005 |
Filing 2
ORDER requesting supplemental briefs.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/23/05. (lcrcl2, )
|
July 29, 2005 |
Filing 1
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California (Western Division-Los Angeles). Case Number 2:04cv9233filed by AGUDAS CHASIDEI CHABAD OF UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Central District Courts Papers)(rje, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2011: #2 Exhibit Central District Documents) (smm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/13/2011) (smm, ).
|