RAZAK et al v. BUSH et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01601
Filed: August 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER dismissing this case as moot. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/20/16. (CL)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Petitioner's Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/29/16. (CL)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER that Petitioners shall, from this date forward, file with this Court two copies of all classified submissions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: pursuant to Docket Number 234, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/27/09. (lcgk2, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER, that on or before July 10, 2009, Respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to each Petitioner (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/09. (CL, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER to help narrow issues in this case and, hopefully, narrow any discovery disputes which may arise; the Government shall submit by June 15, 2009, a numbered statement of material facts upon which it intends to rely in making its case-in-chief (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/11/09. (CL, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER setting out how this habeas corpus litigation will proceed (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/4/09. (CL, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on March 1, 2009 describing how the case is proceeding. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/15/09. (CL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAZAK et al v. BUSH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?