BARNES et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: |
1:2006cv00315 |
Filed: |
February 23, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Royce C. Lamberth |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
491
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 1, 2014. (lcrcl4)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
423
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 400 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/19/2013. The Court STAYS its decertification of the special damages class, as reflected in its Memorandum and Orde r (Trial Plan) 328 at 14, nunc pro tunc as of 12/04/2012. The Court ORDERS the defendant to bear the costs of notice. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer on the wording and mechanics of distribution of class notice. The Court ORDERS the defendant to present to the Court draft notice, at defendant's option, either: (1) within thirty (30) days after the Court's Order resolving the issues related to the upcoming liability trial; or (2) within thirty (30) days after the Court's Order resolving all class matters, including general damages. (lcrcl4)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
422
MEMORANDUM OPINION explaining the Court's reasoning as to 421 , its Order resolving the parties' motions in limine 409 & 410 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/14/2013. (lcrcl4)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
397
MEMORANDUM OPINION (MODIFIED). Per the Court's Order in 396 , the Court issues this Modified Memorandum Opinion to replace the Court's previous Memorandum Opinion filed at 391 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/28/2012. (lcrcl4)
|
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
391
MEMORANDUM OPINION explaining the Court's reasoning as to its disposition of 351 , 365 , and 362 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/19/2012. (lcrcl4)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
336
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion 331 to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; defendant's Second Motion 333 to Compel is DENIED; and plaintiffs' Motion 335 for a Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 3, 2012. (lcrcl4)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
328
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (TRIAL PLAN). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on December 7, 2011. (lcrcl4)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
307
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 24, 2011. (lcrcl4)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
290
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 260 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Karen Albert's Preparation Time; granting in part and reserving judgment in part on 225 defendant� 39;s Motion to Compel Payment of Expert Karen Albert's Preparation Time; denying 249 Simon Banks's Applicant 2nd Motion to Intervene and to Modify Protective Order; granting 263 defendant's Motion to Preclude Further Motions by App licant Banks Absent Prior Leave of Court; denying 268 Simon Banks's motion for leave to file his Motion to Stay Decision(s) on All Dispositive Motions Until After the Court Issues Decision Upon Applicant's Application for Intervention and Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 269 and 272 Simon Banks's motion for leave to file his Motion for Declaratory Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 6, 2011. (lcrcl4)
|
January 6, 2011 |
Filing
195
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 188 Defendant's Emergency Motion to Extend Deadlines or, in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witness and granting in part, denying as moot in part, and deferring judgm ent in part 191 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Protective Order Requiring Defendant to Pay Dr. Kriegler's Actual Deposition Preparation Time, Prohibiting Defendant from Deposing Dr. Kriegler, or, in the Alternative, to Preclude Defendant from Using the Fruits of Dr. Kriegler's Deposition. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 6, 2011. (lcrcl4)
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing
157
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 134 Motion for Extension of Time. FURTHER ORDERED denying 136 Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED granting 141 Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 142 Motion for Discovery. FURTHER ORDERED denying AS MOOT 143 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/22/10. (rje, ) Modified on 9/23/2010 (rje, ).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?