KLAYMAN et al v. JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00670
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2018 526 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Counter-Plaintiffs' Proposed Introduction at Trial of Exhibits Through Deposition Testimony of Maureen Otis. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2018. (lcckk1)
March 8, 2018 516 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Counter-Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibits for Use at Trial on March 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 8, 2018. (lcckk1)
March 7, 2018 513 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Counter-Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibits for Use at Trial on March 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 7, 2018. (lcckk1)
March 5, 2018 508 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Counter-Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibits for Use at Trial on March 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 5, 2018. (lcckk1 )
February 20, 2018 464 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 20, 2018. (lcckk1)
January 19, 2018 434 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 19, 2018. (lcckk1)
October 5, 2017 425 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's 414 Motion to Recuse/Disqualify Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/5/2017. (lcckk1)
June 15, 2017 401 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants' 386 Motion Pursuant to the Courts January 13, 2017 Minute Order is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's 384 Motion to Consolidate is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/15/2017. (lcckk1)
August 10, 2011 362 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 10, 2011. (lcckk3)
October 13, 2010 356 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 13, 2010. (lcckk3)
October 14, 2009 327 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 14, 2009. (lcckk2)
June 25, 2009 319 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 25, 2009. (lcckk2 )
March 24, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/24/09. (lcak1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLAYMAN et al v. JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?