MASSIE et al v. GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA Featured Case
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN and ROSE BUCHER
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA
Case Number: 1:2006cv00749
Filed: April 24, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Henry H. Kennedy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2010 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (1) Issued. (dr) Modified on 3/3/2010 (ks).
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion on Behalf of Office of Foreign Assets Control for Protective Order Authorizing Disclosure in Response to Rule 45 Subpoena. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 7, 2009. (NP)
October 5, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
April 30, 2009 Leave to File Denied.Interested Parties Motion for Reconsideration " Leave to file DENIED" Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. (tr) Modified on 4/30/2009 to correct docket text (tr).
December 30, 2008 Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 30, 2008. (NP)
December 30, 2008 Filing 14 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 30, 2008. (NP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2008: # 1 memorandum) (ztj, ).
June 16, 2008 Filing 13 Proposed Findings of Fact by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN. (Streeter, Richard)
April 22, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Damages Hearing held on 4/22/2008. Evidence entered and hearing concluded. Proposed finding of facts due by 6/16/2008. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj )
April 22, 2008 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA (ks, )
April 21, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Damages Hearing held on 4/21/2008. Evidence entered and damages hearing continued to 4/22/2008 @ 9:45 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy.). (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tj )
April 21, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Sweeney, II on behalf of ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN (Sweeney, James)
April 21, 2008 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by plaintiffs ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN. (tj )
April 9, 2008 Filing 9 Proposed Findings of Fact by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN. (Streeter, Richard)
March 21, 2008 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA filed by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN.(nmw, )
March 7, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 3/7/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2008; Proposed Findings of Fact and conclusions of law due by 4/10/2008; Damages Hearing set for 4/21/2008 and 4/22/08 @ 9:45am in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy) (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones.) (tj )
March 2, 2008 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Hearing (Kennedy, Henry)
February 14, 2008 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/7/2008 @ 11:15 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
August 17, 2007 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order Setting Status Conference)(Streeter, Richard)
August 17, 2007 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 5 Order to Show Cause filed by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Streeter, Richard)
August 15, 2007 Reset Deadlines: Show Cause response due by 9/5/2007. (tj )
August 15, 2007 Filing 5 Order to Show Cause: Show cause response due by September 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 15, 2007. (FL, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 8/31/2006, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (zlc, )
August 31, 2006 Filing 3 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (zlc, )
August 31, 2006 SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA (zlc, )
May 24, 2006 Filing 2 REQUEST from Plaintiff's for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (lc, )
April 24, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA (Filing fee $ 350) filed by ROSE BUCHER, WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE, DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK, DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN.(lc, ) Modified on 4/26/2006 (tg, ).
April 24, 2006 Summons (1) Issued as to GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA. (lc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MASSIE et al v. GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THOMAS MASSIE
Represented By: James R. Sweeney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUNNIE RICHARD TUCK
Represented By: James R. Sweeney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD RAYMOND MCCLARREN
Represented By: James R. Sweeney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE BUCHER
Represented By: James R. Sweeney, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?