MOHAMMED et al v. RUMSFELD Featured Case

Petitioner: GHULAM MOHAMMED, RAZ MOHAMMAD, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIH, MUHAMMED DAWOOD, AMINULLAH, HAMID ULLAH, HAJI QIBULLAH, ZAFIR KHAN, GHANUM GUL, ABDUL SALAAM, RAHEEM ULLAH, GUL REHMAN and FAZAL AHMAD
Respondent: DONALD RUMSFELD
Case Number: 1:2006cv01680
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIH, MUHAMMED DAWOOD, AMINULLAH, HAMID ULLAH, HAJI QIBULLAH, ZAFIR KHAN, GHULAM MOHAMMED, GHANUM GUL, ABDUL SALAAM, RAHEEM ULLAH, GUL REHMAN, FAZAL AHMAD, RAZ MOHAMMAD (Goodman, William)
January 9, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Petitioners shallResponse to Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2007. (whb)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners have until 2/28/07 to file their Response. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/9/07. (lcrjl2, )
January 3, 2007 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause by HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIH, MUHAMMED DAWOOD, AMINULLAH, HAMID ULLAH, HAJI QIBULLAH, ZAFIR KHAN, GHULAM MOHAMMED, GHANUM GUL, ABDUL SALAAM, RAHEEM ULLAH, GUL REHMAN, FAZAL AHMAD, RAZ MOHAMMAD. (Goodman, William)
December 22, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Respondents' Response to Order to Show Cause by DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Colonel James W. Gray (Ex. A)# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Colonel James W. Gray (Ex. B))(Lin, Jean)
December 11, 2006 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S> Attorney GeneraL AND DONALD RUMSFELD pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 (lc, )
November 30, 2006 SHOW CAUSE (2) Issued as to DONALD RUMSFELD and non-party U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 (jf, )
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Responsents, by counsel, shall, within 20 days of service of a copy of this Order and the Petition, file with the Court and serve on the petitioner a statement showing why the writ of Habeas Corpus should not issue. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/24/06. (whb)
September 29, 2006 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIH, MUHAMMED DAWOOD, AMINULLAH, HAMID ULLAH, HAJI QIBULLAH, ZAFIR KHAN, GHULAM MOHAMMED, GHANUM GUL, ABDUL SALAAM, RAHEEM ULLAH, GUL REHMAN, FAZAL AHMAD, RAZ MOHAMMAD.(jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2006 (jf, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2006 (jf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMMED et al v. RUMSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GHULAM MOHAMMED
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAZ MOHAMMAD
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HASAN BALGAID
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OMAR DEGHAYES
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SALIH
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MUHAMMED DAWOOD
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMINULLAH
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAMID ULLAH
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HAJI QIBULLAH
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ZAFIR KHAN
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GHANUM GUL
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABDUL SALAAM
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAHEEM ULLAH
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GUL REHMAN
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FAZAL AHMAD
Represented By: William Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DONALD RUMSFELD
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?