CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION Featured Case

Freedom of Information Act claim

Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Defendant: NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2007cv00048
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Reggie B. Walton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing and In Camera Submission by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION re 19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Gary M. Stern)(Simpson, W.)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. This revised memorandum and opinion corresponds with the Court's October 28, 2008 revised order 19 . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/28/08. (lcrbw2)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Correction of Court Order and Deferral of Compliance Date. The corrected order states as follows: The defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The defendant shall provide a supplemental submission with a more detailed explanation in support of its withholding of document 3 pursuant to Exemption 5 of the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552 (2000). Documents 5 and 7 were properly withheld pursuant to Exemption 5 of the FOIA. The defendant shall submit documents 12-15, 16-18, 18a, 24, 26-27, and 29-30 to the Court for its in camera review. Document 31 was properly withheld pursuant to Exemption 5 of the FOIA. Documents 34-46, 48-49, 51 and 53-60 were properly withheld pursuant to Exemption 5 of the FOIA. The defendant's search pursuant to the FOIA was adequate. The defendant shall comply with what is required pursuant to this Order within thirty days from the date this Order was issued. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/28/08. (lcrbw2)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Correction of Court Order and Deferral of Compliance Date re 16 Order,, 17 Memorandum & Opinion by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Simpson, W.)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. In accordance with the Court's accompanying Amended Order of September 29, 2008, the parties' motions are denied in part and granted in part. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/29/08. (lcrbw2)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER. The defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Within thirty days from the date this Order was issued, the defendant shall provide a supplemental submission with a more detailed explanation in support of its withholding of document 3 pursuant to Exemption 5 of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 (2000). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/29/08. (lcrbw2)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by W. Scott Simpson on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Michael P. Abate (Simpson, W.)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/28/08. (lcrbw2)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Perkins, Kimberly)
July 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to memorandum of points and authority due by 7/6/2007. (mpt, )
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The plaintiff shall reply to the defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of defendant's Opposition to plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary by July 6, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/2/07. (lcrbw2)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perkins, Kimberly)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Gary M. Stern# 2 Declaration of Steven G. Bradbury# 3 Declaration of Latita M. Huff)(Abate, Michael)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Gary M. Stern# 2 Declaration of Steven G. Bradbury# 3 Declaration of Latita M. Huff)(Abate, Michael)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Amend/Correct. The plaintiff's amended proposed order filed contemporaneously with its Motion to Amend/Correct is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/13/07. (lcrbw2)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Memorandum in Opposition,, Proposed Order by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Perkins, Kimberly)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (See Docket Entry 7 to view documents). (nmw, )
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Supplement Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Material Facts# 3 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Rule 7(H) Statement of Material Facts# 4 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Perkins, Kimberly)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Perkins on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Perkins, Kimberly)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary M. Stern# 2 Decl. Tabs A - F# 3 Decl. Tab G (Vaughn Index)# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Abate, Michael)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 5/7/2007.,Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/6/2007.,Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/21/2007. (mpt, )
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/11/07. (lcrbw2)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Establish a Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Abate, Michael)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON,.(Abate, Michael)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Ricardo M. Urbina no longer assigned to the case. (Case related to CA-06-1912). (jf, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616001444.)filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Michael P. Abate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?