UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872 Featured Case
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872
Claimant: LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv01346
Filed: July 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on November 24, 2008. (cdw)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is hereby ORDERED that potential claimant(s) shall show cause in writing, no later than November 21, 2008, why the Court should not grant Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Entry of Judgment and Judgment of Forfeiture. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/23/08. (lcrmc1)
October 16, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Publication Affidavits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cowden, William)
October 16, 2008 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872 (tg, )
October 16, 2008 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proof of Publication))(Cowden, William)
October 15, 2008 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Claim by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC re #6 Claim (McGrath, William)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. In light of #14 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court, dated August 2, 2008, it is hereby ORDERED that #7 Claimant Legisi Holdings, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 08/04/08. (lcrmc1)
August 2, 2008 Filing 14 NOTICE to Court by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cowden, William)
June 20, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of service upon in rem defendant by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cowden, William)
May 19, 2008 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer of Evidentiary Hearing proceedings held on April 4, 2008; For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.(tg, )
April 4, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Oral Argument held on 4/4/2008. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. This matter is hereby scheduled for oral argument on Claimant Legisi Holdings, LLC's motion to dismiss the complaint. Oral argument is scheduled for April 4, 2008, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/26/08. (lcrmc1)
November 26, 2007 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC. (McGrath, William)
November 20, 2007 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC (McGrath, William)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting #10 Claimant Legisi Holdings LLC's Motion for an Extension of Time to File its Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Claimant Legisi Holdings LLC shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss no later than November 26, 2007. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/20/07. (lcrmc1)
November 13, 2007 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (tg, )
November 8, 2007 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cowden, William)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Claimant's Motion to Dismiss no later than November 13, 2007. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/8/07. (lcrmc1)
November 8, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to #7 due by 11/13/2007. (cdw)
October 1, 2007 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC (McGrath, William)
September 11, 2007 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified Claim by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC. (McGrath, William)
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Claimant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard A. Roth is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent claimant Legisi Holdings, LLC in this case. It is unclear to the Court how Ms. Silverstine currently practices law from New York State while only being admitted to the Florida Bar. Ms. Betsy Silverstine's application for admission pro hac vice is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/07/07. (lcrmc1)
September 5, 2007 Filing 5 VERIFIED STATEMENT by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC (nmw, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard Allen Roth; Betsy Kim Silverstine, :Firm- The Roth Law Firm, PLLC, :Address- 545 Fifth Avenue, Suite 960, NY, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 542-8882. by LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Roth#2 Declaration of Betsy K. Silverstine)(nmw, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. McGrath, Jr on behalf of LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC (nmw, )
July 24, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 07-0109 and 05-2497. (lc, )
July 24, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
July 24, 2007 WARRANT (1) For Arrest In Rem issued (lc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: LEGISI HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: William Peter McGrath, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Allen Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL PROPERTY IN/UNDERLYING E-GOLD ACCOUNT NUMBERS: 2636005, 2825136 AND 2828872
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: William R. Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?