FENWICK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: |
CHERYL FENWICK |
Defendant: |
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ANDREW PUDIMOTT, JEREMY FISCHER and JOHN MICKLE |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv02330 |
Filed: |
December 28, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
County: |
11001 |
Presiding Judge: |
Paul L. Friedman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 28, 2018 |
Filing
125
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Counsel shall continue to attempt to resolve their remaining discovery disputes between now and July 23, 2018; and that counsel shall be prepared to identify and discuss any matters still at issue at the status conference on July 23, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 28, 2018. (MA)
|
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendants Pudimott and Fischer's Motion for Entry of Judgment; judgment is entered for Deputy Pudimott on Count I of Fenwick's complaint; and judgment is entered for Deputy Fischer on Count I of Fenwick's complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 24, 2016. (MA)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 89 Fenwick's motion for leave to withdraw and replace his motion for reconsideration. Fenwick shall have up to and including March 11, 2016 to file his opposition, if any, to defendants Pudimott and Fischer's motion for entry of judgment 86 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 29, 2016. (MA)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
87
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 69 Fenwick's motion for reconsideration; and denying 79 Fenwick's motion to stay. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 3, 2016. (MA)
|
August 7, 2015 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiff shall submit any opposition to the United States' motion 75 for leave to file a motion for entry of judgment in favor of Deputy Marshals Pudimott and Fischer on or before August 14, 2015; plaintiff s hall also file on or before August 14, 2015 a separate notice that provides an update regarding his efforts to place video evidence before DC Superior Court; and the United States shall file any reply to plaintiff's opposition to its motion for leave on or before August 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 7, 2015. (MA)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
55
OPINION granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 1, 2013. (MA)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing
42
OPINION granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion to dismiss, and denying plaintiff's motion to strike. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 8, 2010. (MA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?