IN RE: PAPST LICENSING DIGITAL CAMERA PATENT LITIGATION - MDL 1880
Plaintiff: CASIO INC, FUJIFILM CORPORATION and PAPST LICENSING GMBH & CO. KG
Defendant: OLYMPUS CORP., FUJIFILM CORPORATION, SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO. and PAPST LICENSING GMBH & CO. KG
Case Number: 1:2007mc00493
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M. Collyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Camera Manufacturers' request for a stay, 686 , is GRANTED. The Court will STAY these proceedings with respect to all four patents-in-suit pending the completion of the Federal Circuit appeals of the '399, '746, and '144 patents or further order of the Court. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/15/2018. (lcrdm1, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 677 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Camera Manufacturers' motion for leave to amend their invalidity contentions, Dkt. 662 , is hereby GRANTED. The Camera Manufacturers are hereby ORDERED to file their amended contentions on or before September 1, 2017. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/24/2017. (lcrdm1, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding final judgment and Rule 54(b) certification of First Wave Cases. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/14/2013. (KD)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding second connecting device. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/23/2013. (KD)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding HP's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/8/2013. (KD)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding 452 motion for summary judgment with respect to "simulating a virtual file system" claim limitation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/4/2013. (KD)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding Table 15 Devices. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/1/2013. (KD)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 528 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding Camera Manufacturers' motion for summary judgment regarding the data transmit/receive device claim limitation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/8/2013. (KD)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding 446 motion for summary judgment re memory cards. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/19/2013. (KD)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding Samsung's motion for summary judgment of noninfringement as to wrongfully accused products 448 by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/20/2012. (KD)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding 433 Papst's motion for reconsideration and 437 HP's motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/15/2011. (KD)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on Camera Manufacturers' motion for sanctions 388 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/8/2011. (KD)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on HP's motion to strike 389 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/2/2011. (KD)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying Papst motion to amend Samsung complaint. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/1/2011. (KD)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/24/09. (KD)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying Sanyo parties' motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/6/09. (KD)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding claims construction. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/12/09. (KD)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION dismissing Konica Minolta Business Solutions USA. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/26/09. (KD)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 258 Papst's motion to reconsider. See accompanying Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/5/09. (KD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PAPST LICENSING DIGITAL CAMERA PATENT LITIGATION - MDL 1880
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASIO INC
Represented By: Scott D. Stimpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUJIFILM CORPORATION
Represented By: Sten Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAPST LICENSING GMBH & CO. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUJIFILM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG TECHWIN CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPST LICENSING GMBH & CO. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?