SIMPSON et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: VICTOR SIMPSON, DANIELLA SIMPSON, MICHAEL SIMPSON, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III, CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, SAEID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE and MUHAMMED AL KHULI
Case Number: 1:2008cv00529
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1602 Foreign Sovreign Immunities Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola held on 2/25/11; Page Numbers: 1-91. Date of Issuance:1/9/12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 1/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2012.(Kerr, Catalina)
December 19, 2011 Filing 38 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC (rdj)
December 19, 2011 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT against Defendants, Syrian Arab Republic and the Syrian Air Force Intelligence by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Kalik, Tracy)
October 19, 2011 Filing 36 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed by the U.S. Department of State, under diplomatic notes No. 519 and 520 as to SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE served on 9/21/2011, answer due 11/20/2011; SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC served on 9/21/2011, answer due 11/20/2011. Diplomatic Notes #517 and 518 are incorrectly stated in the letter to the Clerk. *Original Diplomatic Notes mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel*(rdj)
July 20, 2011 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 7/20/2011, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Edward Betancourt, Director, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison Overseas Citizens Services, 2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, 4th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (dr)
July 18, 2011 Filing 34 REQUEST from the Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the U. S. Department of State, Director of Overseas Citizens Services, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (See Docket Entry 33 to view Letter). (dr)
July 15, 2011 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING under 28 USC sec. 1608(a)(4) by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Perles, Steven)
May 25, 2011 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 5/25/2011, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: # 1 Waybill) (dr) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2011) (dr)
May 25, 2011 Filing 31 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (dr)
May 16, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Explanatory Letter)(MacAllister, Edward) (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/17/2011) (znmw, ).
March 8, 2011 Filing 29 Case Directly Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Judge Gladys Kessler no longer assigned to the case. (ls, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 28 Exhibit List by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (ldc, )
February 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held and concluded on 2/25/2011. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (ldc, )
February 24, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 2/25/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (ldc, )
February 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/24/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (ldc, )
February 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/23/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (ldc, )
February 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Bench Trial held on 2/22/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam - AM; Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller - PM.) (ldc, )
February 15, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Apfel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Apfel, Matthew)
January 18, 2011 Summons (3) Issued as to MUHAMMED AL KHULI, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC. (dr)
January 11, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2011. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services,.) (ldc, )
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 8/2/10. (SP, )
July 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola: Status Conference held on 7/30/2010. Bench Trial set for 2/22/2011 - 02/25/11 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services,.) (ldc, )
July 27, 2010 Filing 25 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for evidentiary hearing. (kb)
July 27, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. (lcjmf1)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Facciola because of his extensive knowledge of the facts at issue in this case. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/27/10. (CL, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT regarding Status of Further Proceedings Before this Court by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
April 2, 2010 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MUHAMMED AL KHULI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC filed by JULIET SWEIS. (Filed Nunc pro tunc to 3/27/08 pursuant to Order filed 4/2/10)(dr) Modified on 4/6/2010 to change Nunc pro tunc date. (ks). (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/18/2011) (dr)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/2/2010. (lcgk3, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints, Nunc Pro Tunc, Limited to the Allegations of Juliet Sweis Only by JULIET SWEIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
January 15, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 1/15/2009. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth)
December 30, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/15/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion to Continue the Status Conference currently set for 1/12/09 at 10:30 a.m. The Status Conference in this matter shall be continued to 1/15/09 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/30/08. (tth,)
December 30, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
December 29, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (tth)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference shall be held in this case on January 12, 2009 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 26A. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Libyan Defendants' Supplemental Motions to Dismiss and dismissing with prejudice the Buonocore Complaint and the Simpson Complaint in their entirety only as against the Libyan Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/24/08. (lcgk1, )
December 3, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Proposed Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS re 16 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due 12/3/2008 (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Plaintiffs are to submit, no later than December 3, 2008, another set of Proposed Orders which they believe will appropriately and accurately embody the agreement of the parties and accurately indicate whether any claims are remaining and, if so, against which Defendants. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (CL, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Supplemental Motion to Dismiss; the Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/25/08. (lcgk1, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
November 20, 2008 Filing 13 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 11/4/2008, at 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/03/08. (DM)
October 31, 2008 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Johnston, Mark)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 the Joint Motion to Stay (see Order for details); this case is hereby stayed for 60 days; after 60 days, if the case, is not closed, the parties are to file a status report. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, ). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/1/08. (CL, )
August 27, 2008 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings as to the Libyan Defendants by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
August 14, 2008 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perles, Steven)
August 12, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Whalen, Thomas)
July 25, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Duplicative Complaint by GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Mark)
July 25, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
July 24, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference set for 7/28/08 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for an Amended Briefing Schedule (in related case 06-727) (see Order for Details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/15/08. (CL, )
July 14, 2008 Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2008, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (DM)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER cancelling mediation set for July 14, 2008, and rescheduling the mediation for July 18, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/14/08. (DM)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER- mediation on this case will reconvene on July 14, 2008, at 4 pm, in room 23333- chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/08/08. (DM)
June 27, 2008 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement. (kb, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/26/08. (CL, )
March 27, 2008 Summons (9) Issued as to GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Case related to Case No. 06-727, 03-749. (tg, )
March 27, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA, LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY, LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY, MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI, ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI, IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI, SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC, SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE, MUHAMMED AL KHULI ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616011277) filed by CECIL BUONOCORE, JOHN BUONOCORE, II, TODD BUONOCORE, SALVATORE FERRIGNO, NANCY GAGE, VICTOR SIMPSON, ESTATE OF DON MALAND, ELLEN MALAND, JANE MALAND, MARK MALAND, ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND, ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND, TIM MALAND, ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN, ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN, JEANETTE SWEIS, DANIELLA SIMPSON, ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS, ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS, SAYEL SWEIS, SAEID SWEIS, JULIET SWEIS, ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO, ARMANDO PEPENELLA, BRUNO PEPENELLA, FRANCESCO ZERILLI, MICHAEL SIMPSON, ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON, ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMPSON et al v. GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR SIMPSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLA SIMPSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SIMPSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF NATASHA SIMPSON
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JOHN BUONOCORE III
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECIL BUONOCORE
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BUONOCORE, II
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD BUONOCORE
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVATORE FERRIGNO
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY GAGE
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DON MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLEN MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF EINAR MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF GRACE MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM MALAND
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHARLES SHINN
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JEANNE SHINN
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF MICHAEL SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF AIDA SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAYEL SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAEID SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIET SWEIS
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ELENA TOMMARELLO
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO PEPENELLA
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNO PEPENELLA
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCESCO ZERILLI
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT SOCIALIST PEOPLE'S LIBYAN ARAB JAMAHIRIYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBYAN INTERNAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBYAN EXTERNAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MU'AMMAR AL-QADHDHAFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDALLAH AL-SANUSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBRAHAIM AL-BISHARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYRIAN AIR FORCE INTELLIGENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUHAMMED AL KHULI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?