September 14, 2009 |
Filing 67
ORDER denying 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/14/09. (lcrmc2)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 66
REPLY to opposition to motion re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, filed by DAN NOLT, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Cox, David)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing 64
Memorandum in opposition to re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, filed by ED SCHAFER. (Wechsler, Peter)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing 63
Memorandum in opposition to re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Riley, James)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing 62
MOTION for Reconsideration re 61 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, by DAN NOLT, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Cox, David)
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing 61
ORDER granting 29 USDA's Motion to Dismiss; granting 31 MDA's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 50 USDA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Niewendorp's Claims; denying as moot 3 and 49 Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/23/09. (lcrmc2)
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing 60
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/23/09. (lcrmc2)
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing 65
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (bj, )
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing 59
NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Administrative Record by DAN NOLT, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER (Cox, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2009: # 1 Exhibits Certification of Supplemental Record and Index to Supplemental Record) (rdj).
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing 58
NOTICE of Deficiencies and Omissions in Supplemental Record by DAN NOLT, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT re 57 Notice (Other) (Cox, David)
|
June 15, 2009 |
Filing 57
NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record re 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ED SCHAFER (Wechsler, Peter) Modified to add linkage on 6/15/2009 (jf, ).
|
June 2, 2009 |
Filing 56
REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Niewendorp's Claims Against the USDA filed by ED SCHAFER. (Wechsler, Peter)
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing 55
NOTICE of USDA's Intent to File Supplemental Record by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT re Order on Motion for Leave to File, (Cox, David)
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing 54
RESPONSE re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Niewendorp's Claims Against the USDA filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Cox, David)
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing 53
REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Niewendorp's Claims Against MDA filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Cox, David)
|
May 22, 2009 |
Filing 52
NOTICE of Proposed Order by ED SCHAFER re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Niewendorp's Claims Against the USDA (Wechsler, Peter)
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing 51
RESPONSE re 49 MOTION for Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Diane Talicska)(Riley, James)
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing 50
MOTION to Dismiss Niewendorp's Claims Against the USDA by ED SCHAFER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Wechsler, Peter)
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 49
MOTION for Leave to File Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by GREG NIEWENDORP (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Cox, David)
|
May 18, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record. Plaintiffs are granted leave to supplement the administrative record with documents 1 through 119 identified in Exhibit A to their motion. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/18/09. (lcrmc2)
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing 48
SURREPLY to re 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Riley, James)
|
May 13, 2009 |
Filing 47
SURREPLY to re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by ED SCHAFER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wechsler, Peter)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing 46
Memorandum in opposition to re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Riley, James)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing 45
REPLY to opposition to motion re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Cox, David)
|
May 7, 2009 |
Filing 44
Memorandum in opposition to re 42 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record filed by ED SCHAFER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (NAIS Record), # 2 Exhibit B (TB Record))(Wechsler, Peter)
|
May 6, 2009 |
Filing 43
SURREPLY to re 38 Reply to opposition to Motion of USDA to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Cox, David)
|
May 4, 2009 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 41 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Adminstrative Record was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as document 42 . (rdj)
|
May 2, 2009 |
Filing 42
Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Administrative Record by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - List of Proposed Supplemental Record Items, # 3 Exhibit B - Collagenex Pharmaceuticals v Thompson)(Cox, David)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 41
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Adminstrative Record by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Supplemental Record Items, # 2 Exhibit B - Collagenex Pharmaceuticals v Thompson)(Cox, David) Modified on 5/4/2009 (rdj).
|
April 29, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Surreply due by 5/6/2009. Response due by 5/13/2009. (cdw)
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing 40
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to MDA's Reply to MDA's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Doe v. Von Eschenbach, # 3 Exhibit B - Barfield v US DOJ)(Cox, David)
|
April 29, 2009 |
Filing 39
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to USDA's Reply to USDA's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Doe v. Von Eschenbach, # 3 Exhibit B - Barfield v US DOJ)(Cox, David)
|
April 29, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to USDA's Reply; denying 40 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to MDA's Reply. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file a ten (10) page sur-reply only on whether the issuance of a PIN is a USDA or state requirement. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs leave to brief any other issue. Plaintiffs shall file their sur-reply no later than May 6, 2009; Defendants may each file a ten (10) page response no later than May 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/29/09. (lcrmc2)
|
April 22, 2009 |
Filing 38
REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by ED SCHAFER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wechsler, Peter)
|
April 22, 2009 |
Filing 37
REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Supplemental appendix)(Riley, James)
|
March 26, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2009. (tth)
|
March 25, 2009 |
Filing 36
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry and Order)(Riley, James)
|
March 25, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their replies no later than April 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/25/09. (lcrmc2)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 35
Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment with Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts in Opposition filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USDA's Cattle Industry Working Group Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Business Plan, # 3 Exhibit C - Bergener Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit D - MDA Slide Presentation August 2007, # 5 Exhibit E - MDA Commitments, # 6 Exhibit F - VS Memo September 2008, # 7 Exhibit G - VS Memo December 2008, # 8 Exhibit Nolt Affidavit, # 9 Exhibit I - Niewendorp Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit J - Alexander Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit K - Golimbieski Affidavit First, # 12 Exhibit L - Golimbieski Affidavit Second, # 13 Exhibit M - Keyworth Affidavit First, # 14 Exhibit N - Keyworth Affidavit Second, # 15 Exhibit O - Mast Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit P - Schneider Affidavit, # 17 Exhibit Q - Wyant Affidavit, # 18 Exhibit R - MDA RFID Extension Bulletin, # 19 Exhibit S - Kansas State Univ. Cost Study, # 20 Exhibit T - Massey Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit U - Dupree Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit V - McLeod Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit W - Thornsberry Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit X - Masin Letter of 5 31 06, # 25 Exhibit Y - FARFA Analysis, # 26 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Opposition to MDA's Statement of Facts)(Cox, David)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 34
Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - USDA 4/6/06 press release, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Business Plan, # 3 Exhibit C - McGeary affidavit, # 4 Exhibit D - 7 16 07 USDA press release, # 5 Exhibit E - USDA stakeholder's announcement, # 6 Exhibit F - USDA premises registration report, # 7 Exhibit G - Affidavit Nolt, # 8 Exhibit H - Niewendorp Affidavit, # 9 Exhibit I - Alexander Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit J - Golimbieski Affidavit First, # 11 Exhibit K - Golimbieski Affidavit Second, # 12 Exhibit L - Keyworth Affidavit First, # 13 Exhibit M - Keyworth Affidavit Second, # 14 Exhibit N - Mast Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit O - Schneider Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit P - Wyant Affidavit, # 17 Exhibit Q - Michigan Extension RFID Newsletter, # 18 Exhibit R - Kansas State Univ. cost study, # 19 Exhibit S - MDA 2006/2007 Grant Proposal, # 20 Exhibit T - Thornsberry Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit U - MDA Commitments, # 22 Exhibit V - VS Memo September 2008, # 23 Exhibit W - VS Memo December 2008, # 24 Exhibit X - 7 28 06 Fed. Reg. Notice, # 25 Exhibit Y - 2 28 07 Fed. Reg. Notice, # 26 Exhibit Z - 4 30 08 Fed. Reg. Notice, # 27 Exhibit AA - 9 18 08 Fed. Reg. Notice, # 28 Exhibit BB - Massey Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit CC - Dupree Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit DD - McLeod Affidavit)(Cox, David)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion 31 due by 3/23/2009. (tth)
|
March 2, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to 31 Defendant's motion to dismiss no later than March 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/2/09. (lcrmc2)
|
February 28, 2009 |
Filing 33
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, Second by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Cox, David)
|
February 27, 2009 |
Filing 32
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint MOTION for Summary Judgment by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Cox, David)
|
February 27, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER denying for failure to show good cause 32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/27/09. (lcrmc2)
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing 31
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DON KOIVISTO (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Appendix)(Riley, James)
|
February 12, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 29 due by 3/23/2009. (cdw)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing 30
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Cox, David)
|
February 11, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting as unopposed 30 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to 29 Defendant's motion to dismiss no later than March 23, 2009. No other extensions will be granted without good cause shown. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/11/09. (lcrmc2)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 29
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by ED SCHAFER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Second Declaration of John Clifford, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Wechsler, Peter)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to amended complaint due by 2/19/2009. (cdw)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing 28
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Establish a Date for Responding to First Amended Complaint by ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry and Order)(Riley, James)
|
February 3, 2009 |
MINUTE ORDER granting as conceded 28 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint no later than February 19, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/3/09. (lcrmc2)
|
January 26, 2009 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 26 Amended Complaint, was entered in error and a corrected copy has been refiled as Docket Entry 27 . (nmw, )
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 27
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT.(nmw, )
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 26
ENTERED IN ERROR.....FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO filed by DAN NOLT, GREG NIEWENDORP, FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT.(nmw, ) Modified on 1/26/2009 (nmw, ).
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 25
ORDER denying as moot 12 and 13 Defendants' motions to dismiss and/or for summary judgment; granting 20 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file First Amended Complaint. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/22/09. (lcrmc2)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 24
REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint In Reply to Defendant MDA filed by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Foremost-McKesson, Inc. v. The Isamic Republic of Iran)(Cox, David)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 23
Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by DON KOIVISTO. (Riley, James)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 22
REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Copy of First Amended Complaint)(Cox, David)
|
January 13, 2009 |
Filing 21
Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by ED SCHAFER. (Wechsler, Peter)
|
January 10, 2009 |
Filing 20
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion for Leave - First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Motion for Leave - Proposed Order, # 3 Memorandum in Support to Motion for Leave, # 4 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, # 5 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support, # 6 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support, # 7 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support)(Cox, David)
|
January 8, 2009 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, and 19 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion For Leave to File First Amended Complaint were entered in error and counsel was instructed to properly refile his motion and its accompanying memorandum under ONE entry. (tg, )
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing 19
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion For Leave to File First Amended Complaint by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Cox, David) Modified on 1/8/2009 (tg, ).
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing 18
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - (Proposed) Entry and Order)(Cox, David) Modified on 1/8/2009 (tg, ).
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Intent to File Supplement to Administrative Record by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT re 16 Administrative Record (Cox, David)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 16
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ED SCHAFER. (Wechsler, Peter)
|
December 15, 2008 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 15 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper ECF event to docket an Administrative Record. (tg, )
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing 15
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record by ED SCHAFER (Wechsler, Peter) Modified on 12/15/2008 (tg, ).
|
November 21, 2008 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Responses to 12 , 13 due by 1/2/2009. (cdw)
|
November 21, 2008 |
MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant United States Department of Agriculture's motion to dismiss and Defendant Michigan Department of Agriculture's motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment no later than January 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/21/08. (lcrmc2)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 14
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (proposed Entry and Order attached to motion to extend) by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (Cox, David)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 13
MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DON KOIVISTO (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix)(Allison-Yokom, Danielle)
|
November 13, 2008 |
Filing 12
MOTION to Dismiss by ED SCHAFER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Dr. John Clifford, # 3 Affidavit Reed Macarty, # 4 Exhibit A to Macarty Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Macarty Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Macarty Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Macarty Declaration)(Wechsler, Peter)
|
November 10, 2008 |
Filing 11
NOTICE of Change of Address by David G. Cox (Cox, David)
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing 10
WAIVER OF SERVICE by DON KOIVISTO. DON KOIVISTO waiver sent on 9/16/2008, answer due 11/17/2008. (Riley, James)
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Allison-Yokom on behalf of DON KOIVISTO (Allison-Yokom, Danielle)
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Riley on behalf of DON KOIVISTO (Riley, James)
|
September 23, 2008 |
Filing 7
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 9/17/2008. (Cox, David)
|
September 22, 2008 |
Filing 6
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ED SCHAFER served 9/18/2008, answer due 11/17/2008 (Cox, David) Modified to correct entry and dates of return of service on 9/23/2008 (tg, ).
|
September 22, 2008 |
Filing 5
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 9/18/2008, answer due 11/17/2008 (Cox, David) Modified to correct party served on 9/23/2008 (tg, ).
|
September 12, 2008 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of ED SCHAFER (Wechsler, Peter)
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 3
MOTION to Accept Filing of Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT (tg, )
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 2
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (tg, )
|
September 8, 2008 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616014856) filed by FARM-TO-CONSUMER LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ROBERT ALEXANDER, JOE GOLIMBIESKI, ROBERT KEYWORTH, GLEN MAST, ANDREW SCHNEIDER, ROSEANNE WYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
|
September 8, 2008 |
Summons (4) Issued as to ED SCHAFER, DON KOIVISTO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
|