August 31, 2011 |
Filing
216
ORDER granting 212 Respondents' Motion to Vacate the Court's December 29, 2008, Order Requiring Notice Prior to Transfer. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/31/11. (CL, )
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing
215
ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel Additional Discovery; Petitioner may file an appropriate motion on this issue when the Supreme Court has ruled on a petition for writ of certiorari, or the time for filing such a petition has passed, in Uthman v. Obama, 637 F.3d 400 (D.C. Cir. 2011). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/11. (CL, )
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
209
ORDER: Pursuant to the Court of Appeals' direction to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that further briefing on the Government's request for vacatur of the Order filed December 29, 2008, should be filed by the Government no later than July 18, 2011; any response should be filed by August 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/21/11. (CL, )
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
207
ORDER: This case is hereby stayed until September 15, 2011; the parties shall file a Joint Praecipe on September 15, 2011, by 5:00 p.m., addressing the status of any writ for certiorari filed in Uthman v. Obama; the Petitioner may file a Motion conta ining no more than seven pages identifying issues he believes should be considered while the case is stayed; Respondent may file an opposition to any such motion of no more than seven pages, and Petitioner may file a reply containing no more than three pages. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/10/11. (CL, )
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
204
ORDER: There will be a further conference call with all counsel in this case on June 9, 2011, at 10:00 a.m.; the Court will expect Petitioner's counsel, after consulting with Petitioner, to have made final decisions about how they wish to proceed on ALL aspects of the Complaint filed. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/30/11. (CL, )
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing
193
ORDER: Respondents shall produce all inculpatory evidence in their possession upon which they intend to rely at the Merits Hearing no later than January 31, 2011; Respondents shall file their Motion for Judgment on the Record no later than February 1 5, 2011, with Petitioner's Opposition due no later than March 30, 2011; Petitioner shall file a Cross Motion for Judgment on the Record no later than March 30, 2011, with Respondents Opposition due no later that April 18, 2011; Petitioner shall file a Praecipe regarding participation at the Merits Hearing no later than March 30, 2011; the Parties shall file their Statement of Disputed Issues and trial exhibits no later than April 21, 2011; a Pretrial Conference shall be held on April 25, 2011 at 4:00 p.m.; the Merits Hearing shall begin on May 2, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/10/11. (CL, )
|
December 20, 2010 |
Filing
191
ORDER: The Merits Hearing in this case is rescheduled for May 2-10, 2011; a Pretrial Conference will take place on April 20, 2011, at 3:30 p.m.; the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for their Motions for Judgment on the Record and a deadline for the Government's production of all inculpatory evidence by January 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/20/10. (CL, )
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
186
ORDER: The parties shall set aside March 21-30, 2011, as alternative dates for the Merits Hearing; a telephone conference shall be held on December 16, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/9/10. (CL, )
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing
184
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 181 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Respondents shall have up to and including December 10, 2010, in which to certify compliance with their exculpatory production requ irements; Respondents shall submit additional inculpatory material they intend to use in their motion for judgment on the record and at the merits hearing by December 22, 2010, Responents shall file their Motion for Judgment on the Record on or before January 7, 2010; there will be a telephone status conference call on December 9, 2010, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/7/10. (CL, )
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
179
ORDER granting 174 Respondents' Motion for Order to Amend the Scheduling Order (see Order for details); the Final Pretrial Conference is hereby scheduled for January 20, 2011, at 3:00 p.m.; the Merits Hearing shall be held on February 17-25, 2011. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/6/10. (CL, )
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
172
ORDER: Petitioner shall file any opposition to the Government's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order by 6:00 p.m. on September 30, 2010; the Government Reply is due no later than October 4, 2010, at 6:00 p.m.; the parties shall keep open the weeks of January 24-28, 2011, January 31-February 4, 2011, and February 16-25, 2011, as possible dates for a Merits Hearing. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/23/10. (CL, )
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
151
ENTERED IN ERROR . . . . . ORDER: The Court hereby orders an Administrative Stay in this case until the Emergency Motion to is decided. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/3/10. (CL, ) Modified on 6/3/2010 (lcgk3, ).
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
150
ORDER Please see attached Scheduling Order setting forth deadlines in advance of Merits Hearing. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/2/10. (lcgk3, )
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
136
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/3/09. (CL, )
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing
129
ORDER: Pursuant to Dkt. No. 124, this is the Court's unclassified Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/25/09. (lcgk2, )
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
123
ORDER: Within 48 hours of this Order, Petitioner shall submit any proposed language to be included in the Court's final Order regarding the search procedures to be used by the Guantanamo Review Task Force; the Government shall file any opposition to Petitioner's submission within 48 hours of that filing. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/17/09. (CL, )
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing
121
ORDER: The Government shall submit by August 14, 2009, at 2:00 p.m., a Praecipe indicating where, if at all, it can certify or has certified that it has already conducted the requested search(es) and complied with its obligations under the Court's Management Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/12/09. (CL, )
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
120
ORDER that Petitioners shall, from this date forward, file with this Court two copies of all classified submissions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, )
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Petitioner's Motion to Compel Production of Medical Records (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/9/09. (CL, )
|
June 26, 2009 |
Filing
97
ORDER, that on or before July 10, 2009, Respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to each Petitioner (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/25/09. (CL, )
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing
94
ORDER: The Government shall respond to Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Compel Production of Medical Records by June 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/19/09. (CL, )
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing
91
ORDER upon representations of the parties at the Status Conference held on June 9, 2009 (see Order for details); a Motions Hearing related to discovery is hereby set for August 17, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/10/09. (CL, )
|
May 11, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER helping to narrow issues in this case and, hopefully, narrow any discovery disputes which may arise; the Government shall submit by June 15, 2009, a numbered statement of material facts upon which it intends to rely in making its case-in-chief (see Order for details); a Status Conference is hereby scheduled for June 10, 2009 at 10:30 a.m.; parties shall submit an unclassified Joint Status Report by June 5, 2009 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/11/09. (CL, )
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing
38
ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby scheduled for February 11, 2009 at 10:00 a.m; on February 6, 2009 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/26/09. (CL, )
|