REPUBLIC OF PERU v. YALE UNIVERSITY Featured Case

Plaintiff Republic of Peru alleged that Defendant Yale University wrongfully, improperly, and fraudulently detained a collection of artifacts, objects, antiquities, and related items that belonged to Peru and its people and are central the history and heritage of the Peruvian nation. The property in question includes centuries-old Incan materials--mummies, skulls, bones and other human remains, pottery, utensils, ceramics, objects of art and other items--which were allegedly excavated from Cuzco, Machu Picchu and the surrounding areas by agents of the University.

Plaintiff: REPUBLIC OF PERU
Defendant: YALE UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2008cv02109
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Henry H. Kennedy
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 26 Sealed Document, was entered in error and refiled in the correct case number.(ztd, )
October 9, 2009 Filing 26 ENTERED IN ERROR.....WRONG CASE.....SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ztd, ).
August 21, 2009 Filing 25 Receipt on 08/11/2009 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number 3:09-cv-01332 sent by USDC for the District of Connecticut. (rdj)
August 11, 2009 Case transferred out to the USDC for the District of Connecticut, pursuant to Court Order entered 7/30/2009. Sent to Court Extraction. (tr)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Transfer the Case to Connecticut. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 30, 2009. (lchhk2.)
July 24, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION for Hearing by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
July 24, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
July 9, 2009 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by YALE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tahlia Townsend, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Townsend Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Townsend Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Townsend Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Townsend Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Townsend Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Townsend Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Townsend Declaration)(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 15, 2009 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue RESPONSE filed by REPUBLIC OF PERU. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A, Ponig Declaration and Exhibits 1 to 14, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 15 to 30 to Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 31 to 45 to Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 46 to 60 to Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 61 to 75 to Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 76 to 96 to Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 97 to 114 to Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 115 to Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 116 to 121 to Exhibit A, # 10 Declaration Garcia Declaration, # 11 Declaration Cook Declaration, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Defendant to File its Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 29, 2009. (lchhk2.)
May 27, 2009 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Defendant to File its Reply Brief by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheideman, Edward)
May 21, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support)(Freiman, Jonathan)
April 29, 2009 Filing 17 RESPONSE re 16 First MOTION to Withdraw 12 MOTION For Improper Venue, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue without PrejudiceFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 15 Amended Complaint,First MOTION to Withdraw 12 MOTION For Improper Venue, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue without PrejudiceFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 15 Amended Complaint, filed by REPUBLIC OF PERU. (Scheideman, Edward)
April 28, 2009 Motion terminated: 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 28, 2009. (NP)
April 28, 2009 Filing 16 First MOTION to Withdraw 12 MOTION For Improper Venue, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue without Prejudice, First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 15 Amended Complaint, by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freiman, Jonathan)
April 20, 2009 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against YALE UNIVERSITY filed by REPUBLIC OF PERU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(nmw, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Consented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, defendant's reply is due May 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 2, 2009. (NP)
April 1, 2009 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION For Improper Venue, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freiman, Jonathan)
March 11, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/20/2009 (tj)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff, Republic of Peru's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Accordingly, plaintiff's response is due April 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 9, 2009. (NP)
March 6, 2009 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheideman, Edward)
March 5, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 11 Status Report was entered in error and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading in the correct case number: 08-cv-2019 RBW. (tr)
March 4, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION For Improper Venue by YALE UNIVERSITY (tr)(See Docket Entry 10 to view document)
March 4, 2009 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT Relating to Petitioners Previously Approved For Transfer by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO. (Hardee, Norman) Modified on 3/5/2009 (tr).
March 4, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbin, Jeffrey)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney R. Scott Greathead is admitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 17, 2009. (NP)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, defendant's Answer is due March 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 27, 2009. (NP)
January 22, 2009 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbin, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Freiman. Attorney Freiman is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 22, 2009. (NP)
January 21, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- R. Scott Greathead, :Firm- Wiggin and Dana LLP, :Address- 450 Lexington Avenue, Suite 3800, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - 212-490-1700. Fax No. - 212-490-0536 by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of R. Scott Greathead, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbin, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan M. Freiman, :Firm- Wiggin and Dana LLP, :Address- One Century Tower, P.O. Box 1832, New Haven, CT 06508-1832. Phone No. - 203-498-4400. Fax No. - 203-782-2889 by YALE UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan M. Freiman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbin, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2009 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by YALE UNIVERSITY (Babbin, Jeffrey)
January 20, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Richard Babbin on behalf of YALE UNIVERSITY (Babbin, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cristina E. Antelo; granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ileana M. Blanco; and granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina E. Ponig. Attorneys Cristina E. Antelo, Ileana M. Blanco, and Christina E. Ponig are admitted pro hac vice to appear in this case on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on December 18, 2008. (NP)
December 17, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christina E. Ponig, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 600 Travis Avenue, Suite 1700, Houston, TX 77002. Phone No. - (713) 425-8400. Fax No. - (713) 425-8401 by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Ponig Certification, # 2 Ponig Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
December 17, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ileana M. Blanco, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 600 Travis Street, Suite 1700, Houston, TX 77002. Phone No. - (713) 425-8400. Fax No. - (713) 425-8401 by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Blanco Certification, # 2 Blanco Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
December 17, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cristina E. Antelo, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 500 Eighth Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - (202) 799-4000. Fax No. - (202) 799-5000 by REPUBLIC OF PERU (Attachments: # 1 Antelo Certification, # 2 Antelo Proposed Order)(Cook, William)
December 5, 2008 Summons Issued(1) as to YALE UNIVERSITY. (tr)
December 5, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YALE UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616016845) filed by REPUBLIC OF PERU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Civil Cover Sheet)(tr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPUBLIC OF PERU v. YALE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC OF PERU
Represented By: William Phillip Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YALE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?