NEWDOW et al v. ROBERTS et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: MICHAEL NEWDOW, ELLERY SCHEMPP, MEL LIPMAN, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR, ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA and EMMETT BELIVEAU
Defendant: JOHN ROBERTS, JR., PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE, RICK WARREN and JOE LOWERY
Case Number: 1:2008cv02248
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Reggie B. Walton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-5126 for 75 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL NEWDOW. (td, )
April 13, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 75 Notice of Appeal (td, )
April 9, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 74 Order, by MICHAEL NEWDOW. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616019646. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER TO DISMISS. The Court finds that Plaintiff Newdow is precluded from challenging the issue of whether he has standing to contest the utterance of prayer at the Presidential Inaugural ceremony based on prior judicial determinations that he lacks standing. In addition, the Court finds that none of the plaintiffs have standing to pursue any of the relief they are requesting, and therefore this case must be dismissed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/12/09. (lcrbw2)
March 11, 2009 Filing 73 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT 42 , 51 (Response to Plaintiffs' Response to Show-Cause Order #1) filed by JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE. (Rosenberg, Brad) Modified on 3/12/2009 adding linkage(td, ).
March 11, 2009 Filing 72 RESPONSE 42 , 51 opposition to plaintiffs' response TO ORDER OF THE COURT filed by JOE LOWERY. (Snider, Kevin) Modified on 3/12/2009 adding text and linkage(td, ).
March 11, 2009 Filing 71 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT 42 , 51 (Response to Plaintiffs' Response to Show-Cause Order #1) filed by PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE. (Hogan, E.) Modified on 3/12/2009 adding linkage(td, ).
March 10, 2009 Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Protective Order to Submit Child-Related Addresses (in First Amended Complaint) Under Seal by MICHAEL NEWDOW (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Plantiffs' Assented-To Motion to Submit Child-Related Addersses (in First Amended Complaint) Under Seal)(Ritter, Robert)
March 10, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint - Redacted Appendix G by MICHAEL NEWDOW (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #1 of 8 - Table of Contents, # 2 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #2 of 8 - A-C, # 3 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #3 of 8 - D-I, # 4 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #4 of 8 - J-L, # 5 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #5 of 8 - M-Q, # 6 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #6 of 8 - R-S, # 7 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #7 of 8, # 8 Appendix Plaintiffs' FAC - Appx G - Redacted #8 of 8 - List of Addresses)(Ritter, Robert)
March 10, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Additional Appendixes to First Amended Complaint by MICHAEL NEWDOW re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix A - Pie Charts, # 2 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix B - Inaugural Clergy 1937 - 2009, # 3 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix C - Anti-Catholicism, # 4 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix D - US Sup Ct Citations to Madison's Memorial & Remonstrance, # 5 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix E - Congressional Record January 20, 2009, # 6 Appendix Doc 66-3 First Amend Complaint - Appendix F - Declarations of Remaining Original Individual Plaintiffs)(Ritter, Robert)
March 10, 2009 Filing 67 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MICHAEL NEWDOW re 50 Order, Plantiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause #2. (Ritter, Robert)
March 10, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint,,,, by MICHAEL NEWDOW (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A to Motion for Leave to File, # 2 Appendix First Amended Complaint)(NEWDOW, MICHAEL)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 64 Motion to Consolidate Briefing Schedule; granting 65 Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint. Given that the Court could dismiss this case based solely on the issues of the plaintiffs' standing and issue preclusion, it is not in the interests of justice and judicial economy to consolidate the briefing schedule to allow the parties to address all the issues pending in one filing. As the Court indicated in its February 24, 2009 Minute Order, the defendants shall have until March 11, 2009, to file any response to the plaintiffs' response to the Court's January 16, 2009 order to show cause on the issues of standing and issue preclusion. Although, by the same token, given the potential dismissal of this case, it is not prudent to require the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' complaint until after these preliminary issues have been resolved. Therefore, the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 30 days of the Court's discharge of the pending show cause orders 42 and 50 . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/10/09. (lcrbw2)
March 6, 2009 Filing 65 (Joint) MOTION to Stay by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, JOHN ROBERTS, JR, PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU, RICK WARREN, JOE LOWERY, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR; (See Docket Entry no. 64 to view document) (td, )
March 6, 2009 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Briefing Schedule and to Stay Defendants' Obligation to Respond to Complaint by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, JOHN ROBERTS, JR, PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE, RICK WARREN, JOE LOWERY, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
March 3, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Snider on behalf of JOE LOWERY (Snider, Kevin)
February 27, 2009 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to OSC #2 (Dkt No. 50) by MICHAEL NEWDOW (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NEWDOW, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2009 Filing 61 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOE LOWERY served on 1/12/2009, answer due 2/2/2009 (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 60 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RICK WARREN served on 1/10/2009, answer due 1/30/2009 (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 59 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN ROBERTS, JR served on 1/4/2009, answer due 3/9/2009 (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 58 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to RICHARD J. ROWE served on 1/7/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 57 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE served on 1/7/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 56 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DIANNE FEINSTEIN served on 1/6/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 55 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES served on 1/6/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 54 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JOHN ROBERTS, JR served on 1/6/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 53 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. MICHAEL NEWDOW served on 1/6/2009, answer due 3/9/2009 (Ritter, Robert)
February 26, 2009 Filing 52 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 01/06/2009. (Ritter, Robert)
February 25, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/11/2009 (mpt, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The defendants shall file any response to the plaintiffs' response to the Court's order to show cause 51 by March 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/24/09. (lcrbw2)
February 23, 2009 Filing 51 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MICHAEL NEWDOW re 42 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix JCCIC 12-17-08 Announcement, # 2 Appendix Hon. R.B. Walton Case Listing, # 3 Appendix Fed Reply in 2001 case, # 4 Appendix Declaration of Michael Newdow, # 5 Appendix Notice of 2005 Inauguration ticket, # 6 Appendix 2003 Library of Congress Query, # 7 Appendix C. Bickford Communication, # 8 Appendix SHMG Myth Perpetuators)(NEWDOW, MICHAEL)
February 10, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The plaintiffs shall show cause by February 27, 2009, why this case should not be dismissed on the ground that the event about which the plaintiffs sought redress has been completed, and therefore the plaintiffs' claims have become moot.(jwd )
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. The plaintiffs shall show cause by February 27, 2009, why this case should not be dismissed on the ground that the event about which the plaintiffs sought redress has been completed, and therefore the plaintiffs' claims have become moot. The plaintiffs' failure to show cause or seek an extension to respond to this Order by the February 27, 2009 deadline will result in the dismissal of this case.Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/10/2009. (lcrbw2)
February 4, 2009 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton of proceedings held on 1/15/09; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance:2/4/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202.354.3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2009.(Kerr, Catalina)
February 3, 2009 Filing 48 Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RICK WARREN. (td, )
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 41 Motion for Leave to File. Based on further review of the record, the affidavit required by the Court's previous February 3, 2009 minute order was attached at the back of the motion 39 and satisfies the requirements of the local rules. The Court therefore finds good cause to grant the motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/03/2009. (lcrbw2)
February 3, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Affidavit for counsel for defendant Warren due by 2/13/2009. (mpt, )
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In connection with defendant Warren's counsel's motion for leave to appear pro hac vic 39 , counsel represented to the Court at the January 15, 2009 hearing that he intended to shortly file the requisite affidavit required to be submitted along with the motion. To date, that affidavit has not been submitted to the Court. Counsel for defendant Warren shall file that affidavit by February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/03/2009. (lcrbw2)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion for Leave to File. This motion is denied as moot based upon the Court's grant of an identical motion on January 13, 2009. The amicus curiae brief was deemed filed as of that date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/22/08. (lcrbw2)
January 21, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 2/23/2009. (mpt, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The plaintiffs' motion seeking a preliminary injunction is denied. The plaintiffs shall show cause by February 23, 2009, why this Court should not dismiss this case based on the plaintiffs' lack of standing and issue preclusion as to plaintiff Newdow. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/16/09. (lcrbw2)
January 15, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File amica curie and brief of amica curiae by MARGARET DOWNEY (td, )
January 15, 2009 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 40 Memorandum in Opposition was entered in error and attached as an exhibit to docket entry no. 41 (td, )
January 15, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2009 re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ELIZA SUTTON, JOHN STOLTENBERG, STUART BECHMAN, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, JASON TORPY, MEL LIPMAN, JAY RICHARDSON, ELLERY SCHEMPP, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, ATHEISTS UNITED, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, KIRK HORNBECK, MICHAEL NEWDOW, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, CATHERINE LAMM, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, PAUL CASE, DAN BARKER, HERB SILVERMAN, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, ANNE PHILIP, MARGARET DOWNEY, ROBERT SHERMAN, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, HARRY GREENBERGER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR, DAN DUGAN, MARIE CASTLE, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, RICHARD WINGROVE, LOUIS ALTMAN, KATHERINE LACLAIR, JIM CORBETT, RICHARD RESSMAN. (Court Reporter Catalina Kerr.) (mpt, )
January 15, 2009 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Dr. Rick Warren's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by RICK WARREN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supporting Motion)(Simms, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2009: # 2 Exhibit Memorandum) (td, ).
January 15, 2009 Filing 40 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RICK WARREN. (Simms, J) Modified on 1/16/2009 (td, ).
January 15, 2009 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin E. Snider, :Firm- PACIFIC JUSTICE INSTITUTE, :Address- 9851 Horn Rd., Ste. 115, P.O. Box 276600, Sacramento, CA 95827. Phone No. - (916) 857-6900. Fax No. - (916) 857-6902 by RICK WARREN (Simms, J)
January 15, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by John Caviness O'Quinn on behalf of JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE (O'Quinn, John)
January 14, 2009 Filing 47 AMICUS BRIEF by MARGARET DOWNEY. (td, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 46 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE identifying Corporate Parent NONE for AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (td, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 45 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (td, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 44 AMICUS BRIEF by PETER R. HENRIQUES, FRED ANDERSON, JOHN E. FERLING, MARTHA SAXTON. (td, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE of Listing of Addresses by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jf, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Protective Order. The motion is granted in so far as it seeks leave to file the proffered affidavits and to keep the identity of the minor affiant and her parent under seal. While the plaintiffs shall be permitted to file the affidavits, the Court will give them no evidentiary weight in light of its concerns about the validity of the representations made therein, absent an opportunity for the defendants to cross-examine the affiants. The motion is denied in so far as it seeks a protective order to put the individual addresses of all parties to this litigation under seal. Due to the publicity generated in this case and the resulting public disclosure of the filings through various media outlets, and in light of the plaintiffs' failure to seek a protective order at the initiation of this lawsuit, to award the relief sought in that respect would be futile. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/14/09. (lcrbw2)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File; granting 32 Motion for Leave to File; granting 33 Motion for Leave to File. Leave to file is granted. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/14/09. (lcrbw2).
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER denying 27 Motion for Leave to File. Based on the representations of the plaintiffs, it is not apparent that the arguments and analyses presented in Brown v. Board of Education of Topeka are relevant to this proceeding. The motion is denied. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/14/09. (lcrbw2)
January 14, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order to Put Individual Addresses and Pseudonyms Under Seal by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Memoradum, # 2 Appendix Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Appendix Declaration of Michael Newdow and Redacted Declarations)(Ritter, Robert)
January 14, 2009 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,, (Amended Affidavit./Declaration) by MICHAEL NEWDOW. (NEWDOW, MICHAEL)
January 14, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic F. Perella on behalf of PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU (Perella, Dominic)
January 13, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by MARGARET DOWNEY (nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Disclosure Statement)(nmw, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion of the Plaintiffs for Judicial Notice of the Amicus Curiae Brief of the United States in Brown v. Board of Education of Topeka, Kansas by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief of the United States in Brown v. Board of Education, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ritter, Robert)
January 12, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by PETER R. HENRIQUES, FRED ANDERSON, JOHN E. FERLING, MARTHA SAXTON (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service)(nmw, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 26 DECLARATION re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MICHAEL NEWDOW. (td, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 25 AMICUS BRIEF by TEXAS, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, CALIFORNIA, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, FLORIDA, GEORGIA, HAWAII, IDAHO, ILLINOIS, INDIANA, IWOA, KANSAS, KENTUCKY, LOUISIANA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MICHIGAN, MINNESOTA, MISSISSIPPI, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, NEVADA, NEW HAMPSHIRE, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH DAKOTA, OHIO, OKLAHOMA, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE, UTAH, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON, WEST VIRGINIA, WISCONSIN, WYOMING, U.S. VIRGIN ISLANDS. (td, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae. The motion is granted, and the brief of the Amici Curiae is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/12/09. (lcrbw2)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 20 Motion for Leave to File and Explanation Regarding the Late Submission. The plaintiffs' motion to file the supplemental affidavit of plaintiff Newdow is granted; however, the plaintiffs must show cause in writing on or before 5 p.m. EST on Wednesday, January 14, 2009, why the Court should not exclude the representations made by plaintiff Newdow in paragraph three of his affidavit in its consideration of the merits of plaintiffs' motion for injunctive relief based upon plaintiff Newdow's failure to provide a basis for his knowledge as to the representations set forth in that paragraph. Unless plaintiff Newdow files an amended affidavit that satisfies the requirements of the Federal Rules of Evidence, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including Federal Rule 10(a), and the Local Rules, or otherwise shows cause prior to that time, the Court will not consider the representations in paragraph three of his affidavit. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/12/09. (lcrbw2) Modified on 1/12/2009 (lcrbw2, ).
January 12, 2009 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaratiion of Plaintff Michael Newdow filed by JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenberg, Brad)
January 12, 2009 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Explanation Regarding Late Submission of Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Declarations by MICHAEL NEWDOW (Ritter, Robert)
January 12, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Hoover on behalf of PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU (Hoover, Craig)
January 10, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Desmond Hogan on behalf of PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU (Hogan, E.)
January 10, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaratiion of Plaintff Michael Newdow by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Newdow)(Ritter, Robert)
January 10, 2009 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 2001 Objections to Magistrations Recommendations, # 2 Appendix 2005 Fed Def Memo in Opposition, # 3 Appendix Circuit Ct Dismissal)(Ritter, Robert)
January 9, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Beckenhauer on behalf of JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE (Beckenhauer, Eric)
January 9, 2009 Filing 14 ERRATA by JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE 13 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JOHN ROBERTS, JR., DIANNE FEINSTEIN, RICHARD J. ROWE, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rosenberg, Brad)
January 8, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amici Curiae by TEXAS, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, CALIFORNIA, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, FLORIDA, GEORGIA, HAWAII, IDAHO, ILLINOIS, INDIANA, IWOA, KANSAS, KENTUCKY, LOUISIANA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MICHIGAN, MINNESOTA, MISSISSIPPI, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, NEVADA, NEW HAMPSHIRE, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH DAKOTA, OHIO, OKLAHOMA, OREGON, PENNSYLVANIA, RHODE ISLAND, SOUTH CAROLINA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE, UTAH, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON, WEST VIRGINIA, WISCONSIN, WYOMING, U.S. VIRGIN ISLANDS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Brief)(td, )
January 8, 2009 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7: Groppel Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8: Minear Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
January 8, 2009 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, EMMETT BELIVEAU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hogan, E.)
January 8, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE Certificate of Service - Doc 4 - Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Ritter, Robert)
January 8, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE Certificate of Service - Doc 3 - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael Newdow by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Ritter, Robert)
January 7, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Motion Seeking Preliminary Injunction due by 1/8/2009; Reply due by 1/10/2009. (mpt, )
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion for Leave to File Addresses Under Seal. Counsel is reminded to comply with the Local Rules. Local Rule 7(m) imposes a duty upon the parties to confer before filing any nondispositive motion in a civil action, and "[a] party shall include in its motion a statement that the required discussion occurred, and a statement as to whether the motion is opposed." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/06/09. (lcrbw2)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The defendants shall file any opposition to the plaintiffs' motion seeking a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on Thursday, January 8, 2009, and the plaintiffs shall file any reply to the defendants' opposition to the plaintiff's motion by 5 p.m. on Saturday, January 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/06/09. (lcrbw2)
January 6, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Addresses Under Seal by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Ritter, Robert)
January 6, 2009 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad)
January 6, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Opposition to motion due by 1/7/2009 Reply due by 1/9/2009. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Based on the representations made to the Court in the filings, plaintiff Newdow's motion for admission pro hac vice is granted. The Court will hold a hearing on the pending motion for a preliminary injunction (essentially a motion seeking a temporary restraining order) on January 15, 2009, at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 16 of the E. Barrett Prettyman United States Courthouse, 333 Constitution Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20001. The defendants shall file any opposition to the plaintiffs' motion seeking a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on January 7, 2009, and the plaintiffs shall file any reply to the defendants' opposition to the plaintiff's motion by 5 p.m. on January 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01/05/09. (lcrbw2)
January 5, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of JOHN ROBERTS, JR, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE (Rosenberg, Brad)
January 5, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Ritter, Robert)
January 5, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Arthur Newdow, :Address- P.O. Box 233345, Sacramento, CA 95823. Phone No. - 916-427-6669. by MICHAEL NEWDOW (Ritter, Robert)
December 30, 2008 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA identifying Corporate Parent NONE for AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, ATHEISTS UNITED, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION. (td, )
December 30, 2008 SUMMONS (12) Issued as to JOHN ROBERTS, JR (individual and official capacity), PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE, RICK WARREN, JOE LOWERY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
December 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN ROBERTS, JR, PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES, DIANNE FEINSTEIN, ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE, RICHARD J. ROWE, RICK WARREN, JOE LOWERY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616017271) filed by ROBERT SHERMAN, MARGARET DOWNEY, AUGUST BERKSHIRE, MARIE CASTLE, STUART BECHMAN, MICHAEL NEWDOW, HERB SILVERMAN, JASON TORPY, HARRY GREENBERGER, KIRK HORNBECK, JIM CORBETT, CATHERINE LAMM, RICHARD WINGROVE, CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN, JOHN STOLTENBERG, KATHERINE LACLAIR, ELLERY SCHEMPP, LOUIS ALTMAN, PAUL CASE, JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN, ANNE PHILIP, JAY RICHARDSON, DAN DUGAN, ANNA MAE ANDREWS, ELIZA SUTTON, RICHARD RESSMAN, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, MEL LIPMAN, FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS, MINESOTA ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL, ATHEISTS UNITED, NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN, UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION, SEATTLE ATHEISTS, ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA, DAN BARKER, EMMETT BELIVEAU, ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWDOW et al v. ROBERTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL NEWDOW
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLERY SCHEMPP
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEL LIPMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN BARKER
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE-LAURIE GAYLOR
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHERMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET DOWNEY
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUST BERKSHIRE
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE CASTLE
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STUART BECHMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERB SILVERMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON TORPY
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY GREENBERGER
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK HORNBECK
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM CORBETT
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE LAMM
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WINGROVE
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ARNTZEN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN STOLTENBERG
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE LACLAIR
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS ALTMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL CASE
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY SCHIFFELBEIN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE PHILIP
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY RICHARDSON
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN DUGAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA MAE ANDREWS
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZA SUTTON
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD RESSMAN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILITARY ASSOICAITON OF ATHEISTS & FREETHINKERS
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINESOTA ATHEISTS
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHEISTS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHEIST ALLIANCE INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHEISTS UNITED
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW ORLEANS SECULAR HUMANIST ASSN
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON SECULAR STUDENT UNION
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEATTLE ATHEISTS
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHEISTS OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMETT BELIVEAU
Represented By: Robert V. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROBERTS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOINT CONGRESSIONAL COMMITTEE ON INAUGURAL CEREMONIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANNE FEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMED FORCES INAUGURAL COMMITTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE LOWERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?