HOLLISTER v. SOETORO et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: GREGORY S. HOLLISTER
Defendant: BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR. and DOES
Case Number: 1:2008cv02254
Filed: December 31, 2008
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James Robertson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 30 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marc Erik Elias on behalf of BARRY SOETORO Substituting for attorney Robert F. Bauer (Elias, Marc)
December 3, 2009 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Erik Elias on behalf of BARRY SOETORO (Elias, Marc)
May 4, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-5161 for 28 Notice of Appeal. (rdj)
April 20, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 28 Notice of Appeal (rdj)
April 16, 2009 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 27 Order. by Attorney John D. Hemenway. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616019917. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (rdj)
March 24, 2009 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER finding Rule 11 violation, reprimanding John D. Hemenway, discharging show cause order 22 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 24, 2009. (MT) Modified on 6/16/2009 (MT).
March 19, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-5080 for 24 Notice of Appeal filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (tg, )
March 17, 2009 26 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER re 24 Notice of Appeal, 23 Response to Order of the Court, 25 Response to Order of the Court (nmw, )
March 17, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 24 Notice of Appeal (tg, )
March 16, 2009 25 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (jeb, )
March 16, 2009 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 21 Memorandum & Opinion by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616019108. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, )
March 16, 2009 23 RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER OF THE COURT re: 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (jeb, )
March 5, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss 9 and John D. Hemenway is ordered to show cause within 11 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 5, 2009. (MT) (the ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE is DISCHARGED pursuant to Court Order entered 3/24/2009) Modified on 4/1/2009 (tg, ).
March 5, 2009 21 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 5, 2009. (MT)
March 2, 2009 20 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(tg, )
March 2, 2009 19 SURREPLY re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President Barack Obama and Vice President Joseph Biden filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (tg, )
March 2, 2009 18 MOTION to Vacate 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (nmw, )
February 26, 2009 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President Barack Obama and Vice President Joseph Biden filed by BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR. (Bauer, Robert)
February 26, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER that the Court's order to show cause 14 is discharged. Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 26, 2009. (MT)
February 26, 2009 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 14 Order to Show Cause filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (tr)
February 25, 2009 14 Featured Case DISCHARGED pursuant to Order entered 2/26/2009.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 25, 2009. (MT) Modified on 2/26/2009 (tg, ).
February 13, 2009 13 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President Barack Obama and Vice President Joseph Biden filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(nmw, )
February 11, 2009 12 Featured Case ORDER that defendants need not respond to the amended complaint and that plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due 2/13/09. Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 11, 2009. (MT)
February 9, 2009 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, DOES filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER.(nmw, )
February 4, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to file interpleader and deposit funds with the court 2 ; denying as moot plaintiff's motion to shorten time for defendants to respond to complaint 3 ; and holding in abeyance plaintiff's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice 4 and 5 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 4, 2009. (MT)
January 26, 2009 9 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by President Barack Obama and Vice President Joseph Biden by BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing)(Bauer, Robert)
January 26, 2009 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Felix Bauer on behalf of BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR (Bauer, Robert)
January 14, 2009 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BARRY SOETORO served on 1/6/2009, answer due 1/26/2009 (nmw, )
January 14, 2009 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR served on 1/6/2009, answer due 1/26/2009 (nmw, )
December 31, 2008 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lawrence J. Joyce, :Firm- Lawrence J. Joyce, Attorney at Law, :Address- 1517 N. Wilmot Road, Suite 215, Tucson, Arizona 85712. Phone No. - (520) 584-0236. by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (tg, )
December 31, 2008 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip J. Berg, :Firm- Law Offices of Philip J. Berg, :Address- 555 Andorra Glen Court, Suite 12, Lafayette Hill, PA 19444-2531. Phone No. - (610) 825-3134. Fax No. - (610) 834-7659 by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (tg, )
December 31, 2008 Summons (2) Issued as to BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR. (tg, )
December 31, 2008 3 MOTION Requesting an Order Shortening Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (tg, )
December 31, 2008 2 MOTION to File Interpleader and Deposit Funds with the Court by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER (tg, )
December 31, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against BARRY SOETORO, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, DOES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616017337) filed by GREGORY S. HOLLISTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, ) Modified to re-upload the complaint on 1/5/2009 (tg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLISTER v. SOETORO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY S. HOLLISTER
Represented By: John David Hemenway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY SOETORO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?