In re BLACK FARMERS DISCRIMINATION LITIGATION

Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: EDWARD T. SCHAFER
Case Number: 1:2008mc00511
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 519 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the Black Belt Justice Center's appeal 505 of Class Counsel's second review recommendation. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 7, 2018. (lcplf2)
January 10, 2018 501 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 496 Lead Class Counsel's motion to designate the cy pres beneficiaries recommended by class counsel and approve the proposed distribution of funds. An Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 10, 2018. (MA)
June 8, 2016 460 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re JAMS' final invoice for Track A and Track B Neutral services provided in implementing the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 8, 2016. (MA)
April 8, 2016 458 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court will enforce the cy pres provision of the Settlement Agreement as modified, Section V.E.13 405 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 8, 2016. (MA)
November 19, 2015 438 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding cy pres issues. The government shall file its memorandum of law on or before December 4, 2015; class counsel shall file its memorandum of law on or before December 18, 2015; any amicus brief shall be filed on or before December 31, 2015; the government's reply shall be due on or before January 15, 2016; and class counsel's reply shall be due on or before January 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 19, 2015. (MA)
September 3, 2015 430 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the parties shall submit memoranda addressing the issues outlined in this memorandum opinion and order on or before October 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2015.(MA)
March 5, 2014 401 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying [390, 391, 392, 393, 394] claimants' pro se motions seeking reconsideration of their claim determinations. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 5, 2014. (MA)
December 31, 2013 396 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/31/2013. (zmm, )
August 23, 2013 380 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 375 Lead Class Counsel's unopposed motion for approval of distribution of funds, and the payments detailed in the Corrected Preliminary Final Accounting (dated August 15, 2013) prepared by the Claims Administrator and attached as Exhibit A to the Notice of filing submitted by Lead Class Counsel on August 15, 2013 are approved. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 23, 2013. (MA)
July 11, 2013 370 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION granting class counsel's updated motion for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses. An order consistent with this opinion will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 11, 2013. (MA)
December 7, 2012 328 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION that the Court will decide the Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses based on the papers that have been filed and intends to issue a decision in January 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 7, 2012. (MA)
February 10, 2012 269 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 265 BFAA's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 10, 2012. (MA)
February 6, 2012 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE: APPOINTMENT OF OMBUDSMAN: Ordered that Stephen Carpenter is appointed as independent Ombudsman under the Settlement Agreement, effective February 6, 2012, and that Alva Waller is appointed Deputy Ombudsman, effective February 6, 2 012, each of whom shall have all of the responsibilities and obligations required under the Settlement Agreement and the October 27, 2011 Order and Judgment of this Court. See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/6/2012. (zmm, )
August 26, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING FAIRNESS HEARING Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/26/2011. (zmm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re BLACK FARMERS DISCRIMINATION LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD T. SCHAFER
Represented By: Michael Sitcov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Scott William Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?