AL-ZAHRANI v. DONALD RUMSFELD, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: TALAL AL-ZAHRANI and ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI
Defendant: DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR., DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, JOHN DOES 1-100 and UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2009cv00028
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 4, 2010. (AG)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence, 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence filed by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI. (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 5/3/2010. (gdf)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 34 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions for Reconsideration and for Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs' reply is due by May 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 20, 2010. (AG)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions for Reconsideration and for Leave to Amend by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Errata re 32 Memorandum in opposition by UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)(MacWilliams, Philip) Modified on 4/19/2010 to add linkage(jf, ).
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence, 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence filed by UNITED STATES. (MacWilliams, Philip)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence, 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence filed by DONALD ARTHUR, MIKE BUMGARNER, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL COWAN, BANTZ CRADDOCK, THOMAS R. CULLISON, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JOHN EDMONDSON, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, DAVID TORNBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ERRATA by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence filed by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CORRECTED Motion for Reconsideration)(Kebriaei, Pardiss)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/15/2010 (gdf)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response due by 4/15/2010 (tr)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants' response is due by April 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 17, 2010. (AG)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Leave to Amend by DONALD ARTHUR, MIKE BUMGARNER, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL COWAN, BANTZ CRADDOCK, THOMAS R. CULLISON, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JOHN EDMONDSON, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, DAVID TORNBERG, UNITED STATES, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR (Werner, Paul)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Amended Complaint,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Harper's Magazine Article, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint (red-line))(Kebriaei, Pardiss)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Substitute Party,,,, in Light of Newly-Discovered Evidence by ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI, TALAL AL-ZAHRANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kebriaei, Pardiss)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 13 defendants' Motion to Dismiss, granting 14 the United States' Motion to Substitute Party, granting 15 the United States' Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' complaint for reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 16, 2010. (lcesh1)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 16, 2010. (lcesh1)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DONALD ARTHUR, MIKE BUMGARNER, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL COWAN, BANTZ CRADDOCK, THOMAS R. CULLISON, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JOHN EDMONDSON, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, DAVID TORNBERG, UNITED STATES, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Recent Cert. Decisions)(Werner, Paul)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Substitute Party, 15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims I to IV and VII to XIV of the Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES. (MacWilliams, Philip)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Constitutional Claims filed by DONALD ARTHUR, MIKE BUMGARNER, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL COWAN, BANTZ CRADDOCK, THOMAS R. CULLISON, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JOHN EDMONDSON, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, DAVID TORNBERG, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR. (Werner, Paul)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ERRATA by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI 19 Memorandum in Opposition filed by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kebriaei, Pardiss)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 6, 2009.(AG)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION to Substitute Party, 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss Constitutional Claims filed by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI. (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs Response to the motions to dismiss and the motion to substitute due by 10/5/2009 and Reply due by 12/4/2009. (tr)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 14 MOTION to Substitute Party, and 13 MOTION to Dismiss: plaintiffs shall file their response to the motions to dismiss and the motion to substitute on or before October 5, 2009, and the Individual Named Defendants and the United States shall file their reply on or before December 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 23, 2009. (AG)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Substitute Party, 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 13 MOTION to Dismiss Constitutional Claims by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to the motion to dismiss and the motion to substitute due by 9/28/2009. Reply due by 11/30/2009. (gdf)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 17 the parties' Joint Motion to Set an Agreed Briefing Schedule with Respect to Individual Named Defendants' and United States' Motions to Dismiss and United States' Motion to Substitute. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the motions to dismiss and the motion to substitute on or before September 28, 2009, and the Individual Named Defendants and the United States shall file their replies on or before November 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/9/2009. (VT)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Carl Richter on behalf of JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, UNITED STATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE (Richter, Zachary)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss Claims Against the United States)(MacWilliams, Philip)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Party by UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Scope of Employment)(MacWilliams, Philip)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Constitutional Claims by JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Ronald L. Sollock by UNITED STATES. (Werner, Paul)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Elias Werner on behalf of JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, JOHN DOES 1-100, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE (Werner, Paul)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to the amended complaint due by 6/26/2009, (gdf)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 10 the United States' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to the amended complaint on or before June 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/26/2009. (VT)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to the complaint due by 5/27/2009. (gdf)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting [7, 8] Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to the complaint on or before May 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/29/2009. (VT)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI re 8 Errata (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERRATA by UNITED STATES 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Motion)(Werner, Paul)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 2/23/2009, answer due 4/24/2009; RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JAMES T. HILL served on 2/20/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; BANTZ CRADDOCK served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; MICHAEL LEHNERT served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; GEOFFREY MILLER served on 2/20/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; JAY HOOD served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; HARRY B. HARRIS, JR served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; TERRY CARRICO served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; ADOLPH MCQUEEN served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; NELSON J. CANNON served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; MIKE BUMGARNER served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; WADE DENNIS served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ served on 2/20/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; DAVID TORNBERG served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; MICHAEL COWAN served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; DONALD ARTHUR served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; JOHN EDMONDSON served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; RONALD L. SOLLOCK served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; THOMAS K. BURKHARD served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; THOMAS R. CULLISON served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; DONALD RUMSFELD served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; RICHARD MYERS served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009; PETER PACE served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jain, Meetali) Modified on 4/27/2009 (jf, ).
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 02/13/2009., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES served on 2/13/2009, answer due 4/14/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jain, Meetali)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Elias Werner on behalf of UNITED STATES (Werner, Paul)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Davis MacWilliams on behalf of UNITED STATES (MacWilliams, Philip)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Summons Issued (3)as to JAMES T. HILL, GEOFFREY MILLER, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ. (ls, )
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order SUMMONS (23) Issued as to JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, JOHN DOES 1-100, UNITED STATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, JOHN DOES 1-100, UNITED STATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE filed by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(nmw, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order SUMMONS (26) Issued as to JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES T. HILL, BANTZ CRADDOCK, MICHAEL LEHNERT, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAY HOOD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, TERRY CARRICO, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, WADE DENNIS, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR, DAVID TORNBERG, MICHAEL COWAN, DONALD ARTHUR, JOHN EDMONDSON, RONALD L. SOLLOCK, THOMAS K. BURKHARD, THOMAS R. CULLISON, JOHN DOES 1-100, UNITED STATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616017453) filed by TALAL AL-ZAHRANI, ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certification of Representation)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AL-ZAHRANI v. DONALD RUMSFELD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALAL AL-ZAHRANI
Represented By: Pardiss Kebriaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALI ABDULLAH AHMED AL-SALAMI
Represented By: Pardiss Kebriaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD RUMSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER PACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES T. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANTZ CRADDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LEHNERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY HOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY B. HARRIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY CARRICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADOLPH MCQUEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELSON J. CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE BUMGARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WADE DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WINKENWERDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID TORNBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL COWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN EDMONDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD L. SOLLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS K. BURKHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS R. CULLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?