MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ET AL. V. BARACK H. OBAMA, ET AL.
Petitioner: MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, SHARGOWI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ABU RAWDA, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR and EDRESS LNU
Respondent: MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD and BARACK OBAMA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00745
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1813 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Let this redacted copy be filed. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/8/14. (mpt)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1769 ORDER Vacating Prior Briefing Schedule, Setting a New Briefing Schedule, and Scheduling a Status Conference. On October 22, 2013, this Court held a status conference by telephone with counsel in this matter concerning this Court's Order 1768 setting a hearing date and briefing schedule on Petitioner's Motion 1748 for Partial Summary Judgment. Based on the representations of counsel for the parties during the status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule previ ously set by the Court is VACATED. The government shall file its response to Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by December 16, 2013. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment set by this Court in its previous Order 1768 is postponed pending further order of this Court. The Court shall hold a further status conference in this matter at 9:30 a.m. on December 18, 2013, and will set any further proceedings in this matter, if necessary, at that time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 23, 2013. (lcrcl2)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER granting 1763 Motion for Order; denying 1765 Motion to Stay. Upon consideration of Petitioner's Motion 1763 for an Order Setting a Hearing Date and Respondents' Motion 1765 to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion is GRANTED and Respondents' Motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that a hearing on Petitioner's Motion 1748 for Partial Summary Judgment is set for November 19, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Respondents shall file their opposition to the Petitioner's Motion by October 30, 2013, and Petitioner shall file his reply by November 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 16, 2013. (lcrcl2)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 ORDER granting 1728 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that David M. Barnes is admitted pro hac vice for purposes of this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 19, 2013. (lcrcl2)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1706 ORDER to disregard order to show cause filed with the Clerk of Court on April 10, 2013. The order was miscaptioned, filed erroneously and never docketed. This case remains active and has not been dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 29, 2013. (lcrcl2)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 ORDER re 1702 . Counsel for Petitioner NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY may file a Status Report no later than July 15, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 10, 2013. (lcrcl2)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 ORDER granting 1694 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 20, 2013. (lcrcl2)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1687 ORDER granting 1660 Sealed Motion to deem highlighted information protected. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 12, 2013. (lcrcl2)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 ORDER granting 1680 Motion to Continue. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 16, 2013.(lcrcl2)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1670 ORDER granting 1667 MOTION to Continue. Case is stayed until January 15, 2013, filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/6/12. (rje)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 ORDER granting 1646 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report. It is THEREFORE ORDERED THAT counsel for Petitioner may file a Status Report no later than 11/2/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/31/12. (rje)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 ORDER granting 1568 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner shall have until by 9/7/2011 to respond to Respondents' Motion for leave to File Motion for Expedited Judgment, nunc pro tunc, and the response filed that date shall be deemed timely. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/12. (rje)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 ORDER granting 1630 Motion for Leave to File Status Report. Further ORDERED that petitioners Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/4/12. (rje) (Modified on 6/5/2012 (rje, ).
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 ORDER granting 1599 Motion to Continue Stay.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/2/11. (rje, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER granting 1593 Joint Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice. ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Sharqawi Abdu Ali Al-Hajj be and hereby is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/11. (rje, )
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER granting 1586 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Petitioner Response to Respondents Motion for Expedited Judgment due by 10/27/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/12/11. (rje, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDERED that Respondents shall file notice under Section I.D.1 of Judge Hogan's Case Management Order by or on 10/3/2011. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall file a Traverse, or otherwise respond within 60 days of the date on which respondents file notice under Section I.D.1.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/12/11. (rje, )
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1573 ORDER granting re 1558 MOTION to Stay filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED indefinitely. Status Report due by 11/1/2011.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/30/11. (rje, )
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 ORDER granting 1544 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/25/11. (rje, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 ORDERED, that Petitioner's unopposed motion to seal the proposed public factual return is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/21/11. (rje, )
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ERRATA. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 8, 2011. (lcrcl2)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 ORDER granting 1493 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/2/11. (rje, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 ORDER granting re 1513 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Set New Briefing Schedule filed by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG Petitioner's Reply due by 4/25/2011.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/8/11. (rje, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 ORDERED re 1487 Status Report filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY is STAYED for a period of 120 days. FURTHERMORE ORDERED re 1432 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/11. (rje)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER denying as MOOT 1432 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/14/11. (rje)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/11. (rje, )
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 ORDER granting Respondent's 1482 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition by 2/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/14/11. (rje, )
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDERED Petitioner's Motions to strike due by 12/1/2010. Respondents' Response due by 1/21/2011 Petitioner's Reply due by 2/4/2011. Respondents'Notice, if any, that they will move to compel filing of a traverse due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/10. (rje, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER addressing ISN 685. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/16/10. (rje, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER granting David S. Marshall's Motion 1387 to withdraw as attorney for petitioner (ISN 30). The Federal Defender for the Northern District of Ohio is appointed as counsel for petitioner. A lawyer from that office shall file an appearance. Petitioner's traverse is due July 15, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/2010. (lcrcl2, )
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 ORDER requiring respondents to produce additional discovery with respect to ISN 1457. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/15/2010. (lcrcl2, )
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER granting respondents' Motion 1366 for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have until February 22, 2010 to respond to petitioner's motion for recusal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/16/2010. (lcrcl2, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER granting petitioner's Unopposed Motion 1354 for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Traverse. Petitioner's traverse is due by April 15, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/7/2010. (lcrcl2, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 ORDER denying petitioner's Motion 1316 for Additional Discovery, and granting respondents' Motion 1324 for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's discovery request nunc pro tunc. Respondents' opposition is deemed timely filed. It is further ORDERED that respondents' Motion 1345 for Extension of Time to to Respond to Petitioner's Proposed Factual Return for Public Filing is granted nunc pro tunc, and that respondents' Motion 1347 for Extension of Time to to Respond to Petitioner's Proposed Factual Return for Public Filing is granted. Respondents have until January 18, 2010 to respond to petitioner's proposed factual return for public filing. Pursuant to Judge Walton's Amende d CMO 797 , respondents' motion for judgment on the record is due within 14 days of the accompanying order, and petitioner's opposition and/or cross-motion is due 14 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/5/2010. (lcrcl2, )
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 ORDER granting respondents' Motion 1338 for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Proposed Factual Return for Public Filing. Respondents shall have until December 16, 2009 to respond to petitioner's proposed return for public filing. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/30/2009. (lcrcl2, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: ISN 685's Motion 902 for Expedited Judgment. This is the public version of the Memorandum delivered to the CSO on 9/24/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/24/2009. (lcrcl2, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 ORDER granting the parties' Consent Motion 1333 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Respondents shall complete the discovery ordered by the Court on September 4, 2009 by 11/25/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/9/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: respondents' Motion 1160 to Dismiss Petitioner (ISN 35) and petitioner's Motion 1241 for Direct Contact with Client, Motion 1242 to Compel Discovery Regarding Petitioner's Competence, Knowledge, and VOluntariness, and Motion 1245 for Exedited Ruling on Petitioner's Motion for Direct Contact. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/6/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 ORDER granting Motion 1315 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery as Required by the Court's September 4, 2009 Order. Respondents have until November 4, 2009 to complete the ordered discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/5/2009. (lcrcl2, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 SCHEDULING ORDER re: ISN 30. Respondents shall provide complete discovery within 30 days of this Order. Petitioner shall file his traverse within 60 days of respondents' final disclosures. The parties shall propose a schedule for judgment on the record within 14 days of the filing of the traverse. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2009. (lcrcl2, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 ORDER denying Motion 882 for Expedited Judgment as moot. Petitioner's motion is subject to renewal upon the completion of discovery and the filing of his traverse as required by the Court's Scheduling Order 1293 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/29/09. (lcrcl2, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER re: ISN 1457's Motion 1217 for leave to take discovery. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/4/2009. (lcrcl2, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 ORDER granting Motion 1271 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery nunc pro tunc. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/4/2009. (lcrcl2, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 ORDER denying Motion 1295 to Suspend Certain Scheduled Dates as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/1/2009. (lcrcl2, )
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 ORDER granting respondents' Third Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement the Factual Return for Petitioner ISN 685. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/2009. (lcrcl2, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 ORDER granting 1290 Motion to Stay as to petitioner ABDURAHMAN LNU. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/18/09. (lcrcl2, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 SCHEDULING ORDER as to petitioner Ahmed Adnan Ahjam (a/k/a Abu Rawda) (ISN 326). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/17/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1270 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Order 1248 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/24/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 SCHEDULING ORDER as to petitioner ABDURAHMAN LNU (ISN 441). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/20/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 ORDER granting 1255 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/8/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER granting 1226 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/8/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER granting in part and denying in part petitioner NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADOUN ALSA'ARY's First Motion for Leave to Take Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/22/09. (lcrcl2, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 ORDER DENYING without prejudice respondents' Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return as to Petitioner ABDUL RAZAK ALI (ISN 685) (filed June 5, 2009). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/2/09. (lcrcl2, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER granting 1227 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/2009. (lcrcl2, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 ORDER staying the June 15, 2009 deadline for respondents' Opposition to petitioner MATTAN's Motion for Expedited Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/11/09. (lcrcl2, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER granting 1189 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN's Motion for Expedited Judgment. Opposition due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/1/09. (lcrcl2, )
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER memorializing oral rulings from May 28, 2009 status conference as to ABDUL RAZAK ALI (ISN 685). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/28/09. (lcrcl2, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding scope of respondents' detention authority. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/21/09. (lcrcl2, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 ORDER denying 1163 Motion to Stay; granting 1183 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/19/09. (lcrcl2, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 ORDER granting 1152 Motion for Leave to File as to petitioner Abdul Razak Ali. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/13/09. (lcrcl2, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER granting 1159 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/29/09. (lcrcl2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ET AL. V. BARACK H. OBAMA, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN
Represented By: Gordon Samuel Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABDUL RAZAK ALI
Represented By: Shayana Devendra Kadidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHARGOWI LNU
Represented By: Kristin B. Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB
Represented By: Michael E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABU RAWDA
Represented By: David S. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABDURAHMAN LNU
Represented By: Jonathan P. Witmer-Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AHMED OMAR
Represented By: David S. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDRESS LNU
Represented By: Jonathan P. Witmer-Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MIKE BUMGARNER
Represented By: Kristina Ann Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAY HOOD
Represented By: Kristina Ann Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DONALD RUMSFELD
Represented By: Kristina Ann Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BARACK OBAMA
Represented By: Kristina Ann Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?