SHERLEY et al v. SEBELIUS et al Featured Case

U.S. District Court Judge Royce Lamberth rules that stem cell "research is clearly research in which an embryo is destroyed," and therefore violates a federal law that "unambiguously prohibits the use of federal funds for all research in which a human embryo is destroyed."

Plaintiff: JAMES L. SHERLEY, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON, WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION and EMBRYOS
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS and NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Movant: COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH
Case Number: 1:2009cv01575
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE of Joint Appendix by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Johnson, Thomas)
October 28, 2010 Filing 73 REPLY to opposition to motion re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (Womack, Eric)
October 15, 2010 Filing 72 Memorandum in opposition to re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. James L. Sherley, # 2 Exhibit A to Sherley Declaration -- Letter from Dr. Kate A. Berg, # 3 Exhibit B to Sherley Declaration -- University of Utah Press Release)(Hungar, Thomas)
October 14, 2010 Filing 71 REPLY to opposition to motion re 61 MOTION for Leave to File filed by COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH. (Leise, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2010 Filing 70 REPLY to opposition to motion re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Response to Amici Curiae filed by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. James L. Sherley, # 2 Exhibit A to Sherley Declaration -- Letter from Dr. Kate A. Berg, # 3 Exhibit B to Sherley Declaration -- University of Utah Press Release)(Hungar, Thomas)
October 12, 2010 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Join the Amicus Brief filed by the COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH filed by by STATE OF WISCONSIN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
October 12, 2010 Filing 68 Memorandum in opposition to re 61 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by the Coalition for the Advancement of Medical Research filed by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- E-mail from Plaintiffs' Counsel to CAMR's Counsel)(Hungar, Thomas)
October 6, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Combined Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Response to Briefs of Amici Curiae due by 10/14/2010. Defendants' Reply in Support of the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment is due October 28, 2010 (rje, )
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 67 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Request to Set a Briefing Schedule and Extend the Length of Plaintiffs' Joint Reply, Opposition, and Response Memorandum. It is furthermore ORDERED that the briefing schedule is as follows: Plaintiffs' Combined Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Response to Briefs of Amici Curiae is due October 14, 2010; and Defendants' Reply in Support of the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment is due October 28, 2010. It is furthermore ORDERED that the page limitation on Plaintiffs' Combined Reply, Opposition, and Response Memorandum is extended to 55 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 5, 2010. (lcrcl4)
October 1, 2010 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Joint Reply, Opposition, and Response Memorandum and to Set a Briefing Schedule by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hungar, Thomas)
September 30, 2010 Filing 66 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1 of 41, # 2 Part 2 of 41, # 3 Part 3 of 41, # 4 Part 4 of 41, # 5 Part 5 of 41, # 6 Part 6 of 41, # 7 Part 7 of 41, # 8 Part 8 of 41, # 9 Part 9 of 41, # 10 Part 10 of 41, # 11 Part 11 of 41, # 12 Part 12 of 41, # 13 Part 13 of 41, # 14 Part 14 of 41, # 15 Part 15 of 41, # 16 Part 16 of 41, # 17 Part 17 of 41, # 18 Part 18 of 41, # 19 Part 19 of 41, # 20 Part 20 of 41, # 21 Part 21 of 41, # 22 Part 22 of 41, # 23 Part 23 of 41, # 24 Part 24 of 41, # 25 Part 25 of 41, # 26 Part 26 of 41, # 27 Part 27 of 41, # 28 Part 28 of 41, # 29 Part 29 of 41, # 30 Part 30 of 41, # 31 Part 31 of 41, # 32 Part 32 of 41, # 33 Part 33 of 41, # 34 Part 34 of 41, # 35 Part 35 of 41, # 36 Part 36 of 41, # 37 Part 37 of 41, # 38 Part 38 of 41, # 39 Part 39 of 41, # 40 Part 40 of 41, # 41 Part 41 of 41)(Moore, Tamra)
September 29, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE re: response to Plaintiffs' Notice re: Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH re 60 Notice (Other) (Karron, Andrew)
September 29, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Bowman on behalf of THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY (Bowman, Matthew)
September 28, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Andrew Goldfarb on behalf of GENETICS POLICY INSTITUTE, INC. (znmw, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by GENETICS POLICY INSTITUTE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 5 Exhibit A Part 1, # 6 Exhibit A Part 2, # 7 Exhibits B thru H)(znmw, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE regarding CAMR's Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY (Hungar, Thomas)
September 27, 2010 Filing 59 RESPONSE re 55 to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts filed by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (Womack, Eric) Modified on 9/28/2010 to add linkage (rdj).
September 27, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Story Landis, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
September 27, 2010 Filing 57 Memorandum in opposition to re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (Womack, Eric)
September 27, 2010 Filing 56 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Notice of Filing of Administrative Record by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (McElvain, Joel)
September 9, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. James L. Sherley, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Theresa Deisher, # 3 Declaration of Steven H. Aden, # 4 Exhibit A to Aden Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Aden Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Aden Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Aden Declaration, # 8 Exhibit E to Aden Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F to Aden Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Aden Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Aden Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Aden Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Aden Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Aden Declaration, # 15 Exhibit L to Aden Declaration, # 16 Exhibit M to Aden Declaration, # 17 Exhibit N to Aden Declaration, # 18 Exhibit O to Aden Declaration, # 19 Exhibit P to Aden Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Q to Aden Declaration, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Hungar, Thomas)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Coalition for the Advancement of Medical Research's Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 7, 2010. (lcrcl4)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 48 defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 7, 2010. (lcrcl4)
September 3, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae by COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Brief, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Brief, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
September 3, 2010 Filing 51 Memorandum in opposition to re 48 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 45 Order Pending AppealEmergency MOTION to Stay re 45 Order Pending Appeal filed by THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Theresa Deisher, # 2 Declaration Exhibit B - Declaration of Dr. James L. Sherley, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion To Stay)(Hungar, Thomas)
September 3, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Johnson on behalf of THERESA DEISHER, JAMES L. SHERLEY (Johnson, Thomas)
September 1, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamra Tyree Moore on behalf of FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS (Moore, Tamra)
September 1, 2010 USCA Case Number 10-5287 for 47 Notice of Appeal filed by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS. (rdj)
September 1, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Opposition due by 9/3/2010. (rje, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 48 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 45 Order Pending Appeal by FRANCIS S. COLLINS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Francis Collins, # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal), # 4 Text of Proposed Order (Motion for Expedited Briefing and Consideration))(Freeny, Kyle)
August 31, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 44 Memorandum & Opinion, 45 Order by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Freeny, Kyle)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER that plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by September 3, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 31, 2010. (lcrcl4)
August 24, 2010 Filing 46 ENTERED IN ERROR......MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 38 Notice of Appeal, filed by THERESA DEISHER, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, PATRICIA FLYNN, JAMES L. SHERLEY, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, WILLIAM FLYNN, EMBRYOS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON ; USCA Case Number 09-5374. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court be reversed with respect to the dismissal of the plaintiffs' claims for lack of standing insofar as it applies to the Doctors and be affirmed in all other respects; the order dismissing as moot plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction be reversed; and the matter be remanded to the district court for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. (kb) (Document entered in duplicate.) Modified on 8/24/2010 (kb).
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting plaintiffs' Motion 3 for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/23/2010. (lcrcl2, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION setting forth the Court's reasoning for GRANTING plaintiffs' motion 3 for a preliminary injunction. A separate order shall issue this date. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/23/2010. (lcrcl2, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 43 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 38 Notice of Appeal, Ordered and Adjudged that the judgement of the District Court be reversed with respect to the dismissal of the plaintiffs' claim for lack of standing insofar as it applies to the Doctors and be affirmed in all other respects; the order dismissing as moot plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction be reversed; and the matter be remanded to the district court for further proceedings, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date. filed by THERESA DEISHER, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, PATRICIA FLYNN, JAMES L. SHERLEY, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, WILLIAM FLYNN, EMBRYOS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON ; USCA Case Number 09-5374. (ls, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Letter Invoking Statutory Right to Expedited Appeal by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Lingo, Bradley)
November 2, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Letter Ordering Transcript by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Lingo, Bradley)
October 30, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. Attorney Ryan G. Koopmans terminated. (Koopmans, Ryan)
October 29, 2009 Filing 39 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 38 Notice of Appeal,. (rdj)
October 29, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-5374 for 38 Notice of Appeal, filed by THERESA DEISHER, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, PATRICIA FLYNN, JAMES L. SHERLEY, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, WILLIAM FLYNN, EMBRYOS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (znmw, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 35 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 37 Order by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616024999. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (rdj)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying as moot plaintiffs' Motion 3 for Preliminary Injunction, and Motion 4 to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 27, 2009 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: defendants' Motion 22 to Dismiss. A separate Order shall issue this dte. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting defendants' Motion 22 to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan G. Koopmans on behalf of all plaintiffs (Koopmans, Ryan)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying defendants' Objection 19 to Plaintiffs' Related Case Designation. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/15/2009. (lcrcl2, )
October 14, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2009. Motion on Preliminary Injuction heard and held in abeyance. (Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen.) (rje, )
October 8, 2009 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Womack, Eric)
September 28, 2009 Filing 31 Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald Stoddart in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hungar, Thomas)
September 28, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Proposed Order by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Hungar, Thomas)
September 28, 2009 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (Hungar, Thomas)
September 28, 2009 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re 4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (Hungar, Thomas)
September 18, 2009 Filing 27 REPLY re 19 Notice (Other) Defendants' Reply Regarding Their Objection to Plaintiffs' Related Case Designation filed by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (McElvain, Joel)
September 16, 2009 Filing 26 RESPONSE re 19 Notice (Other) of Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Related Case Designation filed by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (Lingo, Bradley)
September 14, 2009 Filing 25 Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem filed by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeny, Kyle)
September 14, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Renee Freeny on behalf of all defendants (Freeny, Kyle)
September 14, 2009 Filing 23 Memorandum in opposition to re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH. (Womack, Eric)
September 14, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting defendants' Unopposed Motion 20 for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/14/2009. (lcrcl2, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
September 11, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Related Case Designation by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH re 2 Notice of Related Case (McElvain, Joel)
September 2, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Casey on behalf of all plaintiffs (Casey, Samuel)
September 1, 2009 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Aden, Steven)
September 1, 2009 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/23/09. (Aden, Steven)
September 1, 2009 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/24/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Aden, Steven)
September 1, 2009 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FRANCIS S. COLLINS served on 8/21/2009, answer due 10/20/2009. (Aden, Steven)
September 1, 2009 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to KATHLEEN SEBELIUS served on 8/24/2009, answer due 10/23/2009. (Aden, Steven)
August 28, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Womack on behalf of all defendants (Womack, Eric)
August 28, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition briefs due by 9/14/2009. Reply briefs due by 9/28/2009. (rje)
August 27, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. McElvain on behalf of all defendants (McElvain, Joel)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the Joint Motion 8 for Extension of Time to File; Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition briefs are due on or before 9/14/2009. Any reply briefs are due on or before 9/28/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/2009. (lcrcl2, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Motion 6 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/2009. (lcrcl2, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Set Briefing Schedule by KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Womack, Eric)
August 27, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Henry Aden on behalf of WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Aden, Steven)
August 26, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel B. Casey, :Firm- Advocates International, :Address- 8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 300, Springfield, VA 22151. Phone No. - 703-894-1076. by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, EMBRYOS, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hungar, Thomas)
August 26, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Jason Lingo on behalf of all plaintiffs (Lingo, Bradley)
August 19, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Ronald L. Stoddart, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj)
August 19, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Bradley J. Lingo, # 3 Bradley J. Lingo Exhibit A, # 4 Bradley J. Lingo Exhibit B, # 5 Bradley J. Lingo Exhibit C, # 6 Bradley J. Lingo Exhibit D, # 7 Declaration Dr. James Sherley, # 8 Declaration Dr. Theresa Deisher, # 9 Declaration Ronald L. Stoddart, # 10 Declaration Mrs. Tina Nelson, # 11 Declaration William T. Flynn)(rdj)
August 19, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. Case related to Case No. 01-502. (rdj)
August 19, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616023260) filed by WILLIAM FLYNN, PATRICIA FLYNN, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, JAMES L. SHERLEY, THERESA DEISHER, NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS, SHAYNE NELSON, TINA NELSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj)
August 19, 2009 SUMMONS (6) Issued as to KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, FRANCIS S. COLLINS, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERLEY et al v. SEBELIUS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. SHERLEY
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA DEISHER
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIGHT-LIGHT CHRISTIAN ADOPTIONS
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAYNE NELSON
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA NELSON
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FLYNN
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA FLYNN
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMBRYOS
Represented By: Steven Henry Aden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS S. COLLINS
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Represented By: Kyle Renee Freeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: COALITION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH
Represented By: Andrew Tanner Karron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?