HOWARD v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: GREGORY T. HOWARD
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2009cv01633
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying final order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/6/13.(ah)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 92 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 93 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/5/2011. (DJMAC, )
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/22/10. (DJMAC, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/22/10. (EHS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY T. HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?