June 17, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs' counsel filed a statement of death [149 in Civil Action No. 10-0022] on March 12, 2019 to notify the Court of the death of plaintiff Aquilla A.D. Turner. Ms. Turner's claim has not yet been extinguished, but no party has moved to be substituted within 90 days after service of that statement. Nor is the Court able to identify the proper substitute given the lack of probate proceedings related to Ms. Turner, as reported by plaintiffs' counsel in its motion to withdraw as counsel [151 in Civil Action No. 10-0022]. Pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1), therefore, Ms. Turner's claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 17, 2019. (MA)
|
June 17, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. In view of the settlement agreement reached as to three plaintiffs' claims and the dismissal of Ms. Turner's claim on June 17, 2019, the only remaining plaintiff in this case is Mr. Rene Arturo Lopez. Counsel has been permitted to withdraw as Mr. Lopez's counsel for reasons explained in its motion to withdraw [151 in Civil Case No. 10-0022]. Thus, CAIR is directed to file a motion on or before July 1, 2019, suggesting how to proceed with the one remaining plaintiff, Mr. Lopez. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 17, 2019. (MA)
|
June 6, 2019 |
Filing 154
ORDER granting #153 joint motion to dismiss; the claims of plaintiffs Nur, Abdussalaam, and Saiyad are dismissed with prejudice from this case and related case, Civil Action No. 10-0023; the trial date currently set for September 9, 2019; the pretrial conference date set for September 4, 2019; and all related filing dates are vacated; and the Clerk of Court is directed to close Civil Action No. 10-0022 because the claims of the sole plaintiff, Mr. Saiyed, are dismissed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 6, 2019. (MA)
|
June 5, 2019 |
Filing 153
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
May 24, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2019. (lcgmh1)
|
May 22, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Telephone Conference held on 5/22/2019. (lcgmh1)
|
May 21, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Settlement Conference held on 5/21/2019. (lcgmh1)
|
May 13, 2019 |
Filing 152
Joint STATUS REPORT re Mediation by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED. (Yerushalmi, David)
|
May 9, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #151 the motion of plaintiffs' counsel to withdraw as attorneys of record for plaintiffs Rene Arturo Lopez and Aguilla A.D. Turner only. Attorneys Robert Joseph Muise and David Eliezer Yerushalmi terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 5/9/19). (tj)
|
April 8, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. At the request of the parties, the settlement conference currently scheduled for April 10, 2019, is ADJOURNED to May 21, 2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 4/8/19. (lcgmh1)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing 151
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaitiffs Lopez and Turner by RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
March 13, 2019 |
Filing 150
ORDER granting #148 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/13/19. (lcgmh1)
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing 149
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Turner by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Yerushalmi)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
March 8, 2019 |
Filing 148
Unopposed MOTION To Excuse Plaintiffs Nur and Saiyed from Personal Attendance at Mediation re #147 Order by BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
March 4, 2019 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcgmh1)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing 147
MEDIATION STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 2/28/19. (lcgmh1)
|
February 26, 2019 |
CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for settlement discussions. (zad)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing 146
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Harvey for settlement discussions. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 15, 2019 as to the status of their settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 26, 2019. (MA)
|
February 22, 2019 |
Filing 145
Joint STATUS REPORT re Mediation by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 31, 2019 |
Filing 144
ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 22, 2019 indicating whether mediation is a viable option at this time. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 31, 2019. (MA)
|
January 31, 2019 |
Filing 143
ORDER granting #142 joint motion to adjourn pretrial conference and trial date. The dates set forth in pretrial scheduling order dated September 13, 2018 #139 are VACATED; the joint pretrial statement is due on or before July 25, 2019; trial briefs, pretrial motions and motions in limine are due on or before July 25, 2019; voir dire and jury instructions are due on or before July 25, 2019; the pretrial conference will be held on September 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.; and jury trial shall begin on September 9, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. and should last no more than two weeks. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 31, 2019. (MA)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing 142
Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial conference and trial date by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gill, Faisal)
|
September 28, 2018 |
Filing 141
ORDER denying #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. ( Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/28/18). (tj)
|
September 28, 2018 |
Filing 140
OPINION denying #135 defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/28/18). (tj)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings: Trial Briefs, Proposed Voir Dire, Joint Pretrial Statement and Jury Instructions due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Jury Selection/Trial set for 3/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing 139
ORDER granting #138 joint motion to adjourn pretrial conference and trial date. The dates set forth in the January 8, 2018 pretrial scheduling order are vacated; joint pretrial statement, trial briefs, voir dire questions and jury instructions shall be filed on or before March 11, 2019; pretrial conference is scheduled for March 18, 2019 at 10:00am; and jury trial shall commence on March 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. and should last no more than two weeks. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2018. (MA)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Filing 138
Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Trial Brief due by 10/22/2018; Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Voir Dire due by 10/22/2018; Pretrial Statement due by 10/22/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
February 7, 2018 |
Filing 137
REPLY to opposition to motion re #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Gill, Faisal)
|
January 31, 2018 |
Filing 136
RESPONSE re #135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 24, 2018 |
Filing 135
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Gill, Faisal) Modified event title on 1/25/2018 (znmw).
|
January 22, 2018 |
Filing 134
Joint STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing 133
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The pretrial conference is scheduled for October 30, 2018 at 10:00am; and jury trial will commence on November 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. and should last no more than two weeks. A Joint pretrial statement shall be filed on or before October 22, 2018; separate trial briefs shall be filed on or before October 22, 2018; and proposed voir dire questions and jury instructions are due on or before October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2018. (MA)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 1/8/2018. Parties advise the court of the status of this action. Order from the court to follow. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico.) (tj)
|
January 8, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report indicating how the parties wish to proceed regarding mediation on or before January 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2018. (MA)
|
December 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the agreement of counsel set forth on the record during the status hearing conducted on this date, it is hereby ORDERED, subject to the approval of the assigned United States District Judge, that Plaintiffs may take a "follow-on deposition" of Defendant's legal expert, limited to the recently produced documents further described by counsel on the record, on 2/12/18. In so ruling, this court has taken into account that the February 2018 "follow-on deposition" will not serve an impediment to the January 2018 status conference now on the calendar of the assigned United States District Judge, and that all other discovery has been completed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 12/14/2017. (lcdar1)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Status Hearing held on 12/14/2017. Parties agree that Discovery is completed. Parties also agree to Deposition date being scheduled for 2/12/2018. Court Reporter FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [10:32:00 - 10:43:41]; Plaintiff Attorney: David Yerushalmi; Defense Attorney: Faisal Gill. (cal)
|
November 16, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #132 joint motion to permit counsel to attend status conference by telephone. Plaintiffs' counsel, David Yerushalmi, is directed to contact Judge Friedman's Courtroom Deputy, Tanya Johnson, for further instructions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 16, 2017. (MA)
|
November 9, 2017 |
Filing 132
Joint MOTION Leave to Attend Status Conf by Telephone by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing 131
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Eugene J Benick terminated. (Benick, Eugene)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing 130
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Ibrahim A. Moiz terminated. (Benick, Eugene)
|
October 11, 2017 |
Filing 129
MOTION to Continue (JOINT) REQUESTING ADJOURNMENT OF STATUS CONFERENCE by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Yerushalmi, David) Modified event title on 10/12/2017 (znmw).
|
October 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Request to Adjourn Status Conference #129 , the status conference set for October 16, 2017, is rescheduled to January 8, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 11, 2017. (MA)
|
October 10, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to appear at the status conference currently scheduled for October 16, 2017, or to file a notice on or before 12:00 p.m. on October 13, 2017, indicating the parties' joint request for a continuance. Should all parties agree to a continuance, the Court will vacate or reschedule the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 10, 2017. (MA)
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing 128
NOTICE of Appearance by Faisal Mahmood Gill on behalf of All Defendants (Gill, Faisal)
|
August 29, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER re (129 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-DAR, 127 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-DAR) amending Order: The Court's instruction from July 7, 2011, ordering further depositions be taken at the courthouse is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 08/29/2017. (lcdar3, )
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing 127
ORDER in reference to Notice #126 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-DAR filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. and Notice #128 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-DAR filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC., vacating the Court's Order of Deposition Monitoring signed on July 13, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/24/2017. (cal)
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing 126
NOTICE of Consensus to Vacate the Court's Order of Deposition Monitoring by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. re Order, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benick, Eugene)
|
August 21, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' Notice regarding monitoring of future depositions due by 8/23/17. (kk)
|
August 21, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a notice, by no later than Wednesday, August 23, 2017, indicating the consensus reached regarding any request that the 07/13/2011 Order requiring that "all future depositions in this case [] be monitored by this Court" be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/21/2017. (lcdar2)
|
August 14, 2017 |
Filing 125
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Defendant's #118 Motion to Strike Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 8/14/2017. (lcdar2)
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing 124
Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Benick, Eugene)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Minute Order and Entry for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2017. #122 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-DAR MOTION to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #121 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.; taken under advisement. #118 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-DAR MOTION to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.; taken under advisement. Order to be filed by the Court. Court Reporter FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: [2:00:34 - 3:24:13]; Plaintiff(s) Attorney: David Yerushalmi; Defense Attorneys: Eugene Benick and Ibrahim Moiz. (cal)
|
June 13, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: On the basis of counsel's agreement to confer regarding #118 Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball, further consideration of the pending motion, the memoranda in support thereof and in opposition thereto, and the reply, is hereby STAYED until Tuesday, June 20, 2017. Counsel for the parties shall file a joint status report by no later than Friday, June 23, 2017 to inform the court of any resolution reached by the parties with respect to the pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 6/13/2017. (lcdar2)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 123
REPLY to opposition to motion re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC., #118 MOTION Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene J. Benick, Esq., #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Certificate of Service)(Benick, Eugene)
|
June 2, 2017 |
Filing 122
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Eliezer Yerushalmi (Yerushalmi, David)
|
May 26, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Strike #118 set for 6/13/2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar2)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 121
Memorandum in opposition to re #118 MOTION Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Yerushalmi Dec. w/Exs. 1-3, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing 120
ORDER granting #119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and #119 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-DAR. ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-DAR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/5/2017. (cal)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing on Defendant CAIR National's Motion to Strike Expert Reports #118 scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, June 8, 2017 in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar2)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 119
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing 118
MOTION Motion to Strike Expert Reports of Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball re #117 SEALED MOTION filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit R, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Benick, Eugene)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing 117
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Mr. Joseph E. Schmitz and Dr. Ron Kimball, #2 Declaration of Eugene J. Benick, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Q, #15 Exhibit S)(Benick, Eugene) Modified event title on 4/25/2017 (znmw).
|
April 7, 2017 |
Filing 116
TRANSCRIPT OF AUDIO-RECORDED STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Alan Kay held on December 2, 2011; Page Numbers: 1-49. Date of Issuance: April 7, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017.(wz)
|
April 7, 2017 |
TRANSCRIPT OF AUDIO-RECORDED STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Alan Kay held on July 7, 2011; Page Numbers: 1-87. Date of Issuance: April 7, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from th e court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2017.(wz)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing 115
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Expert Report and Disclose Rebuttal Experts by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Benick, Eugene)
|
April 3, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #115 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Expert Reports and Disclose Rebuttal Experts. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion to Strike Expert Reports and Defendant's Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses are due by 4/24/2017; Plaintiffs' Opposition and Defendant's Reply are to be filed pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(b),(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 04/03/2017. (lcdar2)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing 114
TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on 10-5-2016; Page Numbers: 1 - 31. Date of Issuance:03-27-2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth Saint-Loth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
February 24, 2017 |
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for the management of discovery. (md)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing 113
ORDER REFERRING CASE to a magistrate judge for the management of discovery beginning immediately. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 24, 2017. (MA)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing 112
ORDER granting #111 joint motion to extend expert discovery deadlines (see order for specifics). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 24, 2017.(MA)
|
February 23, 2017 |
Filing 111
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Service of Expert Discovery Documents by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
October 26, 2016 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
October 24, 2016 |
Filing 110
SCHEDULING ORDER for expert discovery. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 24, 2016. (MA) The parties shall appear for a status conference on October 16, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss any remaining issues and to set a schedule for pretrial matters.
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing 109
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #108 Memorandum & Opinion Directing Filing of Joint Schedule for Expert Discovery filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moiz, Ibrahim)
|
October 7, 2016 |
Filing 108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that this case will proceed to trial; and the parties shall submit a joint schedule concerning expert discovery on or before October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 7, 2016. (MA)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 10/5/2016. Parties to submit a joint proposed order for the court's consideration by 10/14/16. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth St. Loth.) (tj)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 107
Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order)(Moiz, Ibrahim)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing 106
ORDER granting #104 motion for admission pro hac vice of Eugene J. Benick on behalf of defendant. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2016.(MA)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing 105
ORDER granting #103 defendant's consent motion to reschedule joint status report and status conference. The parties shall file their joint status report on or before September 28, 2016; and the parties shall appear for a joint status conference on October 5, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2016. (MA)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing 104
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eugene J. Benick, :Firm- NOVA Business Law Group, LLP, :Address- 4151 Chain Bridge Rd., Fairfax, VA 22030. Phone No. - 703-766-8081. Fax No. - 703-766-8085 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4672075. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eugene J. Benick, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moiz, Ibrahim)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing 103
Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference and Joint Status Report by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moiz, Ibrahim)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/28/2016 Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
September 12, 2016 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing 102
NOTICE of Appearance by Ibrahim A. Moiz on behalf of COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Moiz, Ibrahim)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing 101
STATUS REPORT by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Yerushalmi, David)
|
August 10, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report on or before September 7, 2016 addressing the parties' positions on how to proceed following the issuance of #100 the mandate by the Court of Appeals remanding this case for further proceedings. The parties shall also appear for a status conference at 10:00 a.m. on September 14, 2016 to discuss the same. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 10, 2016. (MA)
|
August 2, 2016 |
Filing 100
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (99 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF) Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, BAYENAH NUR, HASSAN AHMAD, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, (94 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, BAYENAH NUR, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM. USCA Case Number 15-7016 Consolidated with 15-7019. (Attachments: #1 judgment filed June 21, 2016)(zrdj)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing 99
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Reshad Staitieh terminated. (Staitieh, Reshad)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing 98
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Jenifer Wicks terminated. (Wicks, Jenifer)
|
February 25, 2015 |
Filing 97
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re USCA Appeal Fees ;USCA Case Number 15-7019. (td, )
|
February 25, 2015 |
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 4616068576 re #94 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, BAYENAH NUR, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM (td, )
|
February 23, 2015 |
USCA Case Number 15-7019 for #94 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, BAYENAH NUR, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM. (rd)
|
February 18, 2015 |
Filing 96
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals to correct fee status; The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #94 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw, )
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing 95
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #94 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (znmw, )
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing 94
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #92 Memorandum & Opinion, Order,, by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Parties have been notified. (Yerushalmi, David) Modified fee status on 2/18/2015 (znmw, ).
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing 93
OPINION granting CAIR's motion for summary judgment and rejecting the plaintiffs' request for partial summary judgment under Rule 56(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A separate Order accompanies this Opinion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 29, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing 92
ORDER granting defendant's motion for summary judgment [Dkt. No. 80 in Civil Action No. 10-0023]; and denying plaintiffs' request for the Court to enter partial judgment on their behalf under Rule 56(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court shall remove these consolidated cases from the Court docket. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 29, 2015.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing 91
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jenifer Wicks on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Gadeir Abbas and Lena F. Masri Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Wicks, Jenifer)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing 90
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jenifer Wicks on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Joseph A. Scrofano Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Wicks, Jenifer)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 89
NOTICE of Appearance by Lena F. Masri on behalf of All Defendants Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Masri, Lena)
|
July 10, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nina Kraut terminated in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nina Kraut terminated in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 10, 2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing 88
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Scrofano on behalf of COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Scrofano, Joseph)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 87
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Withdrawal of Appearance)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Kraut, Nina)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing 86
NOTICE of Change of Address by Nina Kraut Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Kraut, Nina)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing 85
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Nadhira Al-Khalili terminated. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing 84
NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Kraut on behalf of All Defendants Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Kraut, Nina)
|
June 3, 2013 |
Filing 83
NOTICE of POSSIBLE UNAUTHORIZED PRACTICE OF LAW AND IMPROPER MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 30, 2013 |
Filing 82
REPLY to opposition to motion re (81 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 81 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 86 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF, 86 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF) Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply BriefConsent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re (70 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Response to Document,,,,,, filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply Brief due by 1/30/2013. (zmm, )
|
January 15, 2013 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (81) plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Leave to File reply brief; granting (81) plaintiff's unopposed Motion in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF; granting (86) plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Leave to File reply brief; granting (86) plaintiff's unoppoed Motion in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF. Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief on or before January 30, 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 15, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
January 14, 2013 |
Filing 81
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief, Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re (70 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Response to Document,,,,,, by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Muise, Robert)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing 80
Memorandum in opposition to re (80 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF) MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing 79
ORDER denying the defendant's request for an extension until February 5, 2013 for its reply in support of its summary judgment motion (Dkt. 77 in Civ. No. 10-0022; Dkt. 82 in Civ. No. 10-0023). The defendant's reply remains due on January 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (lcplf2)
|
December 28, 2012 |
Set/Reset Deadline: Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 1/10/2013. (tth)
|
December 27, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and holding in abeyance in part #77 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ordered that the deadline for defendants reply in support of its summary judgment motion/response to plaintiffs cross-motion is extended to January 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 27, 2012. (lcplf1, )
|
December 24, 2012 |
Filing 78
Memorandum in opposition to re (82 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF, 77 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
December 21, 2012 |
Filing 77
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
December 21, 2012 |
Filing 76
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Def.'s Mot. for Summ. J. (previously filed under seal) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER re (70 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Response to Document,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Ex. A, #2 Exhibit 2 to Ex. A, #3 Exhibit 3 to Ex. A, #4 Exhibit 4 to Ex. A, #5 Exhibit 22 to Ex. A, #6 Exhibit 23 to Ex. A, #7 Exhibit 24 to Ex. A, #8 Exhibit 25 to Ex. A, #9 Exhibit 27 to Ex. A, #10 Exhibit 28 to Ex. A, #11 Exhibit 29 to Ex. A, #12 Exhibit 30 to Ex. A, #13 Exhibit 31 to Ex. A, #14 Exhibit 32 to Ex. A)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file on the public record a properly redacted copy of its motion for summary judgment and accompanying exhibits by 12/21/2012. (zmm, )
|
December 4, 2012 |
Filing 75
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting (63) plaintiffs' motion for an order requiring the defendant to file a redacted copy of its motion for summary judgment on the public record in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; granting (67) plaintiffs' motion for an order requiring the defendant to file a redacted copy of its motion for summary judgment on the public record in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF. On or before December 21, 2012, the defendant shall file on the public record a properly redacted copy of its motion for summary judgment and accompanying exhibits. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 4, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/28/2012. (zmm, )
|
November 30, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (74) defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time up to and including December 28, 2012 to file its reply to both plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 30, 2012. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing 74
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Response and Motion for Summary Judgment by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Expand Time)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing 73
LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32)(ztd, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2012: #14 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit F) (zdr)
|
November 25, 2012 |
Filing 72
NOTICE of Proposed Order by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER re (70 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK) Response to Document,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Plaintiffs' Opp. to Def.'s Mot. for Summ. J.)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
November 23, 2012 |
Filing 71
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to(70 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK) Response to Document,,,,,, by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
November 23, 2012 |
Filing 70
RESPONSE to Def.'s Mot. for Summ. J. filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #4 Exhibit 2 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #6 Exhibit 4 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #7 Exhibit 5 (to Ex. A), #8 Exhibit 6 (to Ex. A), #9 Exhibit 7 (to Ex. A), #10 Exhibit 8 (to Ex. A), #11 Exhibit 9 (to Ex. A), #12 Exhibit 10 (to Ex. A), #13 Exhibit 11 (to Ex. A), #14 Exhibit 12 (to Ex. A), #15 Exhibit 13 (to Ex. A), #16 Exhibit 14 (to Ex. A), #17 Exhibit 15 (to Ex. A), #18 Exhibit 16 (to Ex. A), #19 Exhibit 17 (to Ex. A), #20 Exhibit 18 (to Ex. A), #21 Exhibit 19 (to Ex. A), #22 Exhibit 20 (to Ex. A), #23 Exhibit 21 (to Ex. A), #24 Exhibit 22 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #25 Exhibit 23 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #26 Exhibit 24 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #27 Exhibit 25 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #28 Exhibit 26 (to Ex. A), #29 Exhibit 27 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #30 Exhibit 28 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #31 Exhibit 29 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #32 Exhibit 30 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #33 Exhibit 31 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #34 Exhibit 32 (to Ex. A) (redacted), #35 Exhibit 33 (to Ex. A), #36 Exhibit B, #37 Exhibit C, #38 Exhibit D, #39 Exhibit E, #40 Exhibit F, #41 Exhibit 1 (to Ex. F), #42 Exhibit 2 (to Ex. F), #43 Exhibit 3 (to Ex. F) (redacted), #44 Exhibit 4 (to Ex. F))Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing 69
ORDER granting ( #68 in 1:10-cv-022-PLF and #72 in 1:10-cv-023-PLF) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Opposition shall be filed by 11/26/2012. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/14/2012. (zmm, )
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing 68
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to motion for summary judgment filed as, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
November 7, 2012 |
Filing 67
ORDER granting (66 in 1:10-cv-022) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (70 in 1:10-cv-023) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/6/2012. (zmm, )
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 66
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defenant's Motion for Summary Judgment (if MSJ is properly filed/served) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
November 4, 2012 |
Filing 65
REPLY to opposition to motion re (67 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF, 63 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK) MOTION to Unseal Document (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement and supporting exhibits) filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing 64
Memorandum in opposition to re (67 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK) MOTION to Unseal Document (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement and supporting exhibits) filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing 63
MOTION to Unseal Document (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement and supporting exhibits) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing 62
ORDER granting #61 Defendant's Motion to Admit Attorneys Reshad Staitieh and Gadeir Abbas Pro Hac Vice; signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 9/4/12. (kk)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing 61
MOTION by Defendant COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. to Admit Attorneys Reshad Staitieh and Gadeir Abbas Pro Hac Vice. [Attorney Reshad Staitieh : 453 New Jersey Avenue, S.E., Washington, DC 20003, Phone No.: 202-742-6423, Fax No.: 202-488-0833; Attorney Gadeir Abbas : 453 New Jersey Avenue, S.E., Washington, DC 20003, Phone No.: 720-251-0425, Fax No.: 202-488-0833] (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Reshad Staitieh, #(2) Declaration of Gadeir Abbas)(kk)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Telephone Conference held on 8/2/2012. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(DM)
|
August 1, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER setting a brief Telephone Status Conference for 8/2/2012, at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Chambers will contact counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 08/01/12. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(DM)
|
June 6, 2012 |
Filing 60
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Muise on behalf of All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Muise, Robert)
|
April 19, 2012 |
MINUTE ORDER finding as moot (59) Motion to Modify in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; finding as moot (61) Motion to Modify in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK. The nonparty has agreed to produce the documents to counsel within five business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 04/19/12. (DM)
|
April 18, 2012 |
Filing 59
MOTION to Modify Court's Order by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing 58
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #53 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 02/16/12. (DM)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing 57
REPLY to opposition to motion re #53 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP Rule 37 filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing 56
Memorandum in opposition to re (56 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK, 56 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK, 56 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK) MOTION to Quash MOTION to Modify MOTION for Protective Order filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing 55
Memorandum in opposition to re #53 in 10-cv-22,(54 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK) MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP Rule 37 filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Yerushalmi, David) Modified on 12/16/2011 to add link(td, ).
|
December 5, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER: After comparing the privilege log documents [9,69,96] produced to the Plaintiffs with the documents provided to the Court, this Court sustains the redactions on documents 9 and 69 and notes that there are no redactions on document number 96. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/05/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(DM)
|
December 2, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/2/11 : Discovery Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter : Bowles Reporting Service) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK (kk)
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing 54
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part (48) Motion to Compel in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; granting in part and denying in part (50) Motion to Compel in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/02/11. (DM)
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing 53
MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP Rule 37 by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Grant Motion)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
November 22, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Conference regarding discovery issues on 12/2/2011, at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Chambers will initiate the call to both counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/22/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(DM)
|
November 15, 2011 |
Filing 52
MEMORANDUM ORDER setting forth privilege rulings resulting from this Court's in camera review of documents produced by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 11/15/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(DM)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing 51
REPLY to opposition to motion re (50 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK), ( #48 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK) MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK(Yerushalmi, David) Modified on 10/25/2011 (td, ).
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing 50
ERRATA by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. #49 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Actual Proposed Order)(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing 49
Memorandum in opposition to re (50 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK, 48 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK) MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
October 12, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER noting that chambers has contacted Defendant's counsel to provide clarification regarding some of the documents produced for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 10/12/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing 48
MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing 47
NOTICE of Clarification re Case Law re Atty-Client Privilege by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Telephone Conference held on 9/22/2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 21, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference for 9/22/2011, at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Counsel should jointly contact chambers at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/21/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 16, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 14, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER rescheduling the Telephone Conference that was set for today, which did not go forward because of a Court conflict. Telephone Conference reset for 9/16/2011, at 10:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Chambers will initiate the call with both counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/14/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 12, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference (per the request of counsel, to discuss document production prior to depositions) for 9/14/2011, at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Counsel should JOINTLY contact chambers at 202-354-3030, at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/12/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
September 6, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER: The deposition(s) to be held in the courthouse (in Courtroom 7) will begin at 10:00 AM on Monday, September 26, 2011, which is one of the possible dates conveyed by Plaintiffs' counsel. The parties' court reporter may set up in the courtroom at 9:30 AM. The undersigned will be available on that date to monitor the depositions in the event that any conflicts arise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 09/06/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing 46
ORDER granting #44 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK; granting #46 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 08/09/11. (DM)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing 45
MEMORANDUM ORDER ruling on deferred portion of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and ordering CAIR to provide non-redacted copies of the client lists noted herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 08/08/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing 44
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC., RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing 43
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice #39 Motion for Protective Order in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; denying without prejudice #37 Motion for Protective Order in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/13/11. (DM)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing 42
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part and deferring in part #37 Motion to Compel in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; granting in part and denying in part and deferring in part #35 Motion to Compel in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/13/11. (DM)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 7/7/11 : Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #39 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Depositions #37 , heard, argued and taken under advisement. Defendant directed to submit certain materials to the Court, in camera, by 8/4/11. Further depositions to be taken at the courthouse. (Court Reporter : Bowles Reporting Service) (kk)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing 41
REPLY to opposition to motion re (37 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK, 39 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK) MOTION for Protective Order (re Upcoming Depositions of Plaintiffs by Defendant CAIR) MOTION for Protective Order (re Upcoming Depositions of Plaintiffs by Defendant CAIR) filed by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Exhibits 1-2 Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2011: #2 Exhibit Sealed, #3 Exhibit Sealed, #4 Exhibit Sealed) (ztd, ).
|
June 22, 2011 |
Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2011, at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #37 and Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Depositions #39 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 06/22/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
June 17, 2011 |
Filing 40
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay held on 5/19/2011; Page Numbers: 1-84. Date of Issuance:6/17/2011. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Telephone number (860) 464-1083, For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2011.(znmw, )
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing 39
MOTION for Protective Order (re Upcoming Depositions of Plaintiffs by Defendant CAIR) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Filing Exhibits Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2011: #4 Exhibit Sealed, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (td, ).
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing 38
NOTICE Exhibits Filed Under Seal by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER re (37 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK) MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits Filed Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
June 6, 2011 |
Filing 37
MOTION to Compel by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
June 2, 2011 |
Set/Reset Deadlines : Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel to be filed by 6/6/11. (kk)
|
June 2, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER: The Court's March 3, 2011 Referral Order instructed counsel to place the initials of BOTH Judge Paul L. Friedman AND Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on all motions addressed to Judge Kay. Plaintiffs' counsel failed to comply with that instruction in preparing the motion for an extension of time submitted on May 31, 2011. In the future, such noncompliant motions may be summarily denied. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 2, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK (lcplf2)
|
June 1, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (36) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:10-cv-00022-PLF-AK; granting (34) Motion for Extension of Time to in case 1:10-cv-00023-PLF-AK. Plaintiffs shall have until June 6, 2011 to file their Motion to Compel. Defendant shall have 10 days thereafter to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 06/01/11, nunc pro tunc 05/31/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
May 31, 2011 |
Filing 36
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(Yerushalmi, David)
|
May 23, 2011 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY : Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 5/19/11 was corrected to reflect that the hearing took place on 5/19/11 instead of 5/20/11, as originally filed. (kk)
|
May 19, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Status Conference held on 5/19/2011. Plaintiff to file Motion to Compel Discovery within 10 (ten) days, Defendant have 10 (ten) days to reply. (Court Reporter Bowles Reporting Services.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(ldc, ) Modified on 5/23/11 (kk).
|
May 18, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER setting a Status Conference to address ongoing deposition disputes. Conference set for 5/19/2011, at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/18/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
May 13, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER directing lead counsel to JOINTLY contact chambers (at their earliest convenience) to set a date and time for an in-court conference to resolve the ongoing deposition disputes. Counsel are requested not to contact chambers via electronic mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 05/13/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(DM)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2011. (DM)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing 35
PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/16/11. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF -AK, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF -AK(lm, )
|
March 14, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order and approving the [Proposed] Protective Order attached as Exhibit A thereto. Counsel should submit a copy [hard copy or copy via electronic mail] of Exhibit A to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay, in chambers, for his signature. The Protective Order will then be signed and docketed by the Court as a separate document. Prior to submitting Exhibit A, the Protective Order, the word "proposed" should be removed; the name in the signature block should be changed and the format of the last page should be changed so that the signature block does not appear alone on the page. Counsel may contact chambers if they have questions relating to submission of the Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 03/14/11. (DM)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing 34
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on February 22, 2011; Page Numbers: 1 - 18. Date of Issuance:March 8, 2011. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing 33
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for Management and resolution of all Discovery-related issues, including pending Stipulated Motion for Prtective Order #30 . (ls, )
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing 32
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for management and resolution of all discovery-related issues beginning immediately. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 3, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing 31
ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for management and resolution of all discovery-related issues beginning immediately. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 3, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA) Modified on 3/4/2011 (zmm, ).
|
March 3, 2011 |
PLEASE DISREGARD #31 in Civil Action 10-0022 and #30 in Civil Action 10-0023 --ENTERED IN ERROR. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 3, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
March 2, 2011 |
Filing 30
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC., RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery to close 8/19/2011. Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 9/19/2011. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/19/2011. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(zmm, )
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing 29
SCHEDULING ORDER. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge for management of discovery, and a separate referral order will be issued shortly; fact discovery will close on or before August 19, 2011; defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before September 19, 2011; plaintiffs' opposition is due on or before October 19, 2011; defendant's reply shall be due on or before October 31, 2011. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 24, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF (MA)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Meet and Confer Status Conference held on 2/22/2011. Scheduling Order to enter. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.) Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(zmm, )
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing 28
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Attorney Adam Shartzer Caldwell and Leslie Gallagher Moylan terminated. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Moylan, Leslie)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing 27
NOTICE of Appearance by Nadhira Al-Khalili on behalf of COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Al-Khalili, Nadhira)
|
February 8, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER: A Meet and Confer Status Conference is set for 2/22/2011 @ 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/8/2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(zmm, )
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing 26
NOTICE -Supplemental-of Compliance with Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER re (25 in 1:10-cv-00023-PLF, 25 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 25
NOTICE of Compliance with Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) by MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, IFTIKHAR SAIYED, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER, MOHAMMED BARAKATULLAH ABDUSSALAAM, RENE ARTURO LOPEZ, BAYENAH NUR, AQUILLA A. D. TURNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 4, 2011 |
MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a request for the production of documents that was apparently served by the plaintiffs upon the Council on American-Islamic Relations -- Maryland, Inc. The plaintiffs are instructed, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a), that they are not to file or mail discovery documents to the Court. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 4, 2011. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF. (lcplf2)
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing 24
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Scheduling Order))Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Yerushalmi, David)
|
October 14, 2010 |
Filing 23
ANSWER to Complaint , First Amended filed by Rene Arturo Lopez, et al. by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC..Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Caldwell, Adam)
|
October 14, 2010 |
Filing 22
ANSWER to (3 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Amended Complaint, by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. Related document: (3 in 1:10-cv-00022-PLF) Amended Complaint, filed by IFTIKHAR SAIYED.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00022-PLF, 1:10-cv-00023-PLF(Caldwell, Adam)
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing 21
ORDER granting #6 defendant's motion to consolidate this case with Civil Action No. 10-0023; granting in part and denying in part #9 defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint; dismissing Count I of the complaint; consolidating this case with Civil Action No. 10-0023 for all purposes. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 30, 2010. (lcplf2)
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing 20
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #6 defendant's motion to consolidate this case with Civil Action No. 10-0023; granting in part and denying in part #9 defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint; dismissing Count I of the complaint; consolidating this case with Civil Action No. 10-0023 for all purposes. An Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 30, 2010. (lcplf2)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 19
NOTICE of Filing Decision in Related Case by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision in Related Case)(Caldwell, Adam)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 18
REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Memorandum in Support), #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support)(Caldwell, Adam)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 17
REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Caldwell, Adam)
|
April 22, 2010 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss and plaintiff's opposition to motion to transfer due by 5/17/2010. (zmm, )
|
April 22, 2010 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #16 defendant's consent Motion for Extension of Time up to and including May 17, 2010 to file its reply to plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss and plaintiff's opposition to motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 22, 2010. (MA)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing 16
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to (1) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and (2) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moylan, Leslie)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing 15
NOTICE OF SECOND CORRECTED FILING OF MISSING EXHIBIT by IFTIKHAR SAIYED re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, (Yerushalmi, David)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing 14
NOTICE OF CORRECTED FILING OF MISSING EXHIBIT by IFTIKHAR SAIYED re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, (Yerushalmi, David)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing 13
Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases /Transfer filed by IFTIKHAR SAIYED. (Yerushalmi, David)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing 12
Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by IFTIKHAR SAIYED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Yerushalmi, David)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to defendant's motions to dismiss and consolidate related cases due by 4/15/2010. (zmm, )
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 11
ORDER granting #10 plaintiff's consent Motion for Extension of Time up to and including April 15, 2010 to file his response to defendat's motions to dismiss and consolidate related cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on March 1, 2010. (MA)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 10
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by IFTIKHAR SAIYED (Yerushalmi, David)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 9
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moylan, Leslie)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 8
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (Moylan, Leslie)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moylan, Leslie)
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing 6
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Adam)
|
February 7, 2010 |
Filing 5
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. served on 1/15/2010, answer due 2/5/2010 (Yerushalmi, David)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to amended complaint due by 2/25/2010. (zmm, )
|
January 25, 2010 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #4 defendant's consent Motion for Extension of Time up to and including February 25, 2010 to file response to plaintiff's fist amended complaint. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 25, 2010. (MA)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 4
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moylan, Leslie)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Summons (1) Issued for Amended Complaint as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC.. (td, )
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT against COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. filed by IFTIKHAR SAIYED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit II, #4 Exhibit III, #5 Exhibit IV, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit VI, #8 Exhibit VII, #9 Exhibit VIII, #10 Exhibit IX, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit XI, #13 Exhibit XII, #14 Exhibit XIII, #15 Exhibit XIV)(td, )
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing 2
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by IFTIKHAR SAIYED. Case related to 09-7129 (D.C. Cir) (rdj)
|
January 6, 2010 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616026595) filed by IFTIKHAR SAIYED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - XIV, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj)
|
January 6, 2010 |
Summons (1) Issued as to COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS ACTION NETWORK, INC. (rdj)
|