October 26, 2009 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to dismiss filed by defendant Ann M. Frohman, Director of Insurance, in her capacity as Liquidator for an insolvent insurer, American Growers Insurance Company ("Growers"), (filing no. 47 ), is denied. Ho wever, the claim by Granite Reinsurance Company, LTD against the Liquidator is remanded to the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska. The Clerk shall mail by certified mail return receipt requested a copy of this memorandum and order to the Cl erk of the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska so that the state court is apprised of the remand of Granite's claim against the Liquidator. The motion to transfer filed by defendants Federal Crop Insurance Corporation and Risk Managemen t Agency, (filing no. 46 ), is granted, and the claim by Granite Reinsurance Company, LTD against defendants Federal Crop Insurance Corporation and Risk Management Agency shall be transferred to United States District Court for the District of Colum bia. The Clerk is directed to transmit the file in this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. There being nothing further required of this Court in this forum, the Clerk shall terminate this case for statistical purposes. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER - On the court's own motion, the deadline for the parties to meet, confer, and file a Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Conference, currently set for September 21, 2009, is continued and will be reset, as needed, after the court rules on the State defendant's motion to dismiss and the United States defendants' motion to transfer venue. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to continue, (filing no. 50 ), is granted, and the plaintiff's response to the State defendant's motion to dismiss 47 and the United States defendants' motion to transfer venue 46 shall be filed on or before September 28, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motions to remand, or in the alternative to abstain or stay this lawsuit, filed by plaintiff Granite Reinsurance Company, LTD, and defendant Ann Frohman, Director of the Nebraska Department of Insurance, (filing nos. 9 & 13 ), are denied. To the extent the government's response on the motions for remand requests transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, the request is denied without prejudice to consideration upon a properly filed and fully submitted motion to transfer venue. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|
May 14, 2009 |
Filing
41
ORDER - The Court finds that the Motion, filing no. 39 , is unopposed and should be granted. The STATE OF NEBRASKA, ex. rel., ANN M. FROHMAN, DIRECTOR OF INSURANCE OF THE STATE OF NEBRASKA, in her capacity as Liquidator of AMERICAN GROWERS INSURANCE COMPANY, in liquidation, ("Liquidator"), therefore may file her Reply Brief on or before May 23, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (GJG) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|
April 21, 2009 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon the courts own motion and in response to the status report filed by the government, there appears no reason why this court should not proceed with deciding the motions to remand. IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED: Defendants are given until May 8, 2009 to file their responses to the pending motions to remand, filing no. 9 filing no. 13 . Reply briefs may be filed on or before May 16, 2009, at which time the matters will be deemed submitted. Counsel for the parties shall notify this court immediately of any ruling on the contempt issue made by the state district court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH) [Transferred from Nebraska on 3/11/2010.]
|