LANDIS v. TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: FLOYD LANDIS
Defendant: TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION, TAILWIND SPORTS, LLC, MONTGOMERY SPORTS, INC., CAPITAL SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., THOMAS W. WEISEL, LANCE ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM J. STAPLETON, BARTON B. KNAGGS, ROSS INVESTMENTS, INC., DOES and JOHAN BRUYNEEL
Intervenor_plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2010cv00976
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Robert L. Wilkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 602 , 603 , 604 orders. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/22/2018. (lccrc2)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 557 Government's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Douglas Kidder; granting in part and denying in part 558 Government's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. John Gleaves; and granting in part and denying in part 559 Defendant Armstrong's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Larry Gerbrandt, Brian Till, and Jonathan Walker. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/28/2017. (lccrc1)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 510 Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 512 CSE Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and 514 Armstrong's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/13/2017. (lccrc2)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relator's 497 Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/8/2016. (lccrc2)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 OPINION AND ORDER granting the Government's motion to compel, as reflected in its 515 Notice of Discovery Dispute. It is hereby ORDERED that Armstrong submit a set of Fourth Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories 16 through 19 by Friday, May 27, 2016. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/20/2016. (lccrc2)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 483 Government's Motion for Reconsideration and Response to Order to Show Cause; It is further ORDERED that summary judgment be GRANTED in favor of Defendants Lance Armstrong, Tailwind Sports Corporation, and Johan Bruyneel on Count 4 of the governments Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/7/2016. (lccrc2) Modified on 3/7/2016 to correct docket text (ztcr).
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Hearing no objections from the parties, the Court hereby issues an unredacted version of its 474 MEMORANDUM OPINION re CSE Defendants' 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/12/2016. (lccrc2)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 MEMORANDUM OPINION re CSE Defendants' 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2016. (lccrc2)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 302 CSE Defendants' Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement and Dismissal of the Qui Tam Action. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/9/2015. (lccrc2, )
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 213 United States and Relator's Joint Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, as to Certain Affirmative Defenses (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/12/2015. (lccrc2, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Armstrong's Motion to Compel. The motion is denied as it relates to the memoranda set forth in Exhibits D, E, and F and granted as it relates to the memoranda set forth in Exhibit G. It is further ORDERED that the Government shall produce to Armstrong the memoranda set forth in Exhibit G after redacting and logging any portions that include opinion work product, such as attorney notes or highlighting. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2015. (lccrc2, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion to Compel. It is further ORDERED that the Government shall provide documents or otherwise respond to Armstrongs First Request for the Production of Documents consistent with this Opinion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/30/2014. (lccrc2, )
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant JOHAN BRUYLEEN 84 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint; Defendant JOHAN BRUYLEEN 85 MOTION to Dismiss The United States' Complaint; Defendant ROSS INVESTMENTS, INC. and THOMAS W. WEISE L 88 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint; Defendants' TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION, TAILWIND SPORTS, LLC 91 TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION, TAILWIND SPORTS, LLC, Defendant LANCE ARMSTRONG 92 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of J urisdiction, Defendant LANCE ARMSTRONG 93 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint and Defendants CAPITAL SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC., BARTON B. KNAGGS, WILLIAM J. STAPLETON 94 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Co mplaint; For the foregoing reasons, the defendants motions are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Each defendant (or group of defendants) that filed a motion to dismiss shall confer with plaintiffs to settle an order regarding same (said order should explicitly reference the affected docket numbers), and file a proposed order by June 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/19/2014. (tcb).
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 142 MOTION to Strike 140 MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 Amended Complaint, (Conditional) ; it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike is hereby GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Conditional Motion to Amend is STRICKEN from the record. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/2/2014. (tcb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDIS v. TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD LANDIS
Represented By: Jon Linden Praed
Represented By: Lani Anne Remick
Represented By: Paul D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAILWIND SPORTS CORPORATION
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Rachel F. Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAILWIND SPORTS, LLC
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Rachel F. Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY SPORTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Marc S. Harris
Represented By: John Patrick Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. WEISEL
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Sharif E. Jacob
Represented By: John W. Keker
Represented By: Robert David Luskin
Represented By: Elliot R. Peters
Represented By: Tia A. Sherringham
Represented By: R. James Slaughter
Represented By: Benjamin Dalrymple Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM J. STAPLETON
Represented By: Marc S. Harris
Represented By: John Patrick Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARTON B. KNAGGS
Represented By: Marc S. Harris
Represented By: John Patrick Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS INVESTMENTS, INC.
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHAN BRUYNEEL
Represented By: Rebecca A. Worthington
Represented By: Thomas Edwin Zeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert E. Chandler
Represented By: David Michael Finkelstein
Represented By: Mercedeh Momeni
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?