UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendants entered into five substantially similar agreements not to cold call employees. The agreements were between (1) Apple and Google, (ii) Apple and Adobe, (iii) Apple and Pixar, (iv) Google and Intel, and (v) Google and Intuit. Plaintiff alleged that Defendants' agreements were restraints of trade that were per se unlawful under Section 1 of the Sherman Act.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC., APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., INTEL CORPORATION, INTUIT, INC. and PIXAR
Case Number: 1:2010cv01629
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2011 Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/17/11. (mpt, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Final Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Compliance)(Struve, Ryan)
October 7, 2010 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE INC.. (Leddy, Mark)
October 6, 2010 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIXAR. (Foster, Brian)
October 6, 2010 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re 4 Notice of Tunney Act Requirements (Amended Proof of Service) by PIXAR. (Foster, Brian)
October 4, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by INTUIT, INC.. (Sims, Joe)
October 4, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Sims on behalf of INTUIT, INC. (Sims, Joe)
October 4, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Wager-Zito, Adrian)
October 4, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian Wager-Zito on behalf of ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. (Wager-Zito, Adrian)
October 4, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by APPLE INC.. (Smith, Micah)
October 4, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by GOOGLE INC.. (Leddy, Mark)
October 4, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Tunney Act 16(g) Compliance by INTEL CORPORATION (Gardiner, Avery)
October 4, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE OF TUNNEY ACT REQUIREMENTS by PIXAR. (Foster, Brian)
September 24, 2010 Filing 3 STIPULATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(td, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 2 COMPETITIVE IMPACT STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(td, )
September 24, 2010 SUMMONS Not Issued as to ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC., APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., INTEL CORPORATION, INTUIT, INC., PIXAR (td, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC., APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., INTEL CORPORATION, INTUIT, INC., PIXAR filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ryan Scott Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTUIT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIXAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?