BANNER HEALTH et al v. SEBELIUS
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH, ABBOTT NORTHWESTERN HOSPITAL, BUFFALO HOSPITAL, CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY HOSPITAL, NEW ULM MEDICAL CENTER, OWATONNA HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNITED HOSPITAL, UNITY HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC, CABELL-HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL, CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER, DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, HALIFAX COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM COLORADO SPRINGS, PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY VIEW HOSPITAL and WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Case Number: 1:2010cv01638
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 163 Order Granting Summary Judgment and Defendant's 155 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/31/2016. (lcckk2)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/2/2015. (lcckk2)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 7, 2014. (lcckk1)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 16, 2013. (lcckk1)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 26, 2012. (lcckk1)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 15, 2011. (lcckk3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANNER HEALTH et al v. SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANNER HEALTH
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABBOTT NORTHWESTERN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUFFALO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMBRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW ULM MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWATONNA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLINGS CLINIC
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CABELL-HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENVER HEALTH AND HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALIFAX COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM COLORADO SPRINGS
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY VIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS
Represented By: Stephen P. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?