KINDIG v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: MARION KINDIG
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01919
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 159 Order Dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 9/20/2013. (lcak1)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 114 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accompanying Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 3/13/2013. (lcak1)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Plaintiff's Motions 85 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/20/2012. (lcak1)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 36 third-party defendant Arega's motion to dismiss, 37 third-party defendant USA Parking, LLC's motion to dismiss/motion to compel arbitration, and 47 plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 20, 2011. (AG) Modified on 9/20/2011 to correct links (AG).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINDIG v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION KINDIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Bennett Caplis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?