QUEEN et al v. SCHMIDT et al
Plaintiff: KATRINA QUEEN, KITT HASTON and WILLIAM QUEEN
Defendant: JANET SCHMIDT, MARK CERA, BONNIE MILLER and LEE HARRIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 1:2010cv02017
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ricardo M. Urbina
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION dismissing complaint without prejudice except as to plaintiffs' claim against defendants Cera and Miller for breach of fiduciary duty, which the Court previously dismissed with prejudice 57 . The Court will issue an order dismissing plaintiffs' complaint this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 12, 2016. (MA)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 62 Ms. Schmidt's motion to quash; and the Court's order to show cause of September 3, 2015 is discharged. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 18, 2015. (MA)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION rejecting the plaintiffs' request to remand this matter to the D.C. Superior Court. A separate Order will issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 3, 2015. (MA)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Queen v. Schmidt, Civil Action No. 11-2117, is stayed in its entirety pending the resolution of matters raised in supplemental briefing ordered by Judge Urbina in Queen v. Schmidt, Civil Action No. 10-2017, as set fo rth by minute order issued on September 30, 2011. If either party learns of additional information that would warrant lifting the stay, such information shall be filed promptly with the Court. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 15, 2012. (MA)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 9/14/2011. (lcrmu2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUEEN et al v. SCHMIDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA QUEEN
Represented By: Robert Phillip Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KITT HASTON
Represented By: Robert Phillip Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM QUEEN
Represented By: Robert Phillip Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE HARRIS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?