U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. E-SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: E-SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC., IVI SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC., INTERMARKET VENTURES, INC., MARY A. GRACE, TAMIO SAITO, KENNETH A. WOLKOFF, GEORGE SOBOL and ROBERT J. ROWEN
Case Number: 1:2011cv00895
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 839 Final Order and Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/14/2016. (lcjeb2)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 785 Order granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 725 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/13/15. (lcjeb1)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 654 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 653 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/30/15. (lcjeb2)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 599 Order on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant Grace. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 02/12/15. (lcjeb3)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Memorandum Opinion re 586 Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant Grace on Counts I and II. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/21/14. (lcjeb3)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Memorandum Opinion re 244 Order on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/12/2014. (lcjeb4)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has determined that its 28 Memorandum Opinion and Order contains errors in the Legal Standard section -- namely, that it sets forth the standard for subject-matter jurisdiction, rather than personal j urisdiction and venue. The Court will issue an Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order to correct this error. This correction in no way changes the analysis or outcome of the Opinion or otherwise affects the case. In fact, the only changes are to the Legal Standard section. The Court, accordingly, ORDERS that the attached Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order hereby replaces ECF No. 28.. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/1/13. (lcjeb4)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that: 1) 45 Defendant Rowen's Motion to Stay is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and 2) Defendant's Answer is deemed FILED. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/26/2012. (lcjeb1)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS that Defendant Rowen shall file an Answer on or before Dec. 30, 2011, or risk the entry of default. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/12/2011. (lcjeb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. E-SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Frederick L. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVI SMART TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERMARKET VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY A. GRACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMIO SAITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH A. WOLKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE SOBOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. ROWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?