UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T INC. et al Featured Case

AT&T is sued by the U.S. Department of Justice in an antitrust dispute over the telecom's proposed acquisition of T-Mobile, the American unit of Deutsche Telekom, AG.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF WASHINGTON, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Defendant: AT&T INC., T-MOBILE USA, INC. and DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG
Movant: GOOGLE INC.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01560
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Filing 99 STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hammond, Matthew)
December 13, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/18/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 12, 2011. (lcesh1)
December 12, 2011 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Stay & Proposed Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In view of the proceedings this date, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: By 12 p.m. on Tuesday, December 13, plaintiffs shall file a motion regarding future proceedings in this matter, and address what legal effect, if any, a ruling from this Court on the merits of plaintiffs' claims would have on related proceedings before the Federal Communications Commission. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall file any response by 5 p.m. on Wednesday, December 14, and that arguments will be heard on Thursday, December 15, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 9, 2011. (lcesh1)
December 9, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 12/9/2011. Order forthcoming. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus) (gdf)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 95 Motion to Quash. Signed by Special Master Richard Levie on 12/06/2011. (Levie, Richard)
December 6, 2011 Filing 95 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by LIGHTSQUARED GP, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia Robbins, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Giordano on behalf of LIGHTSQUARED GP, INC. (jf, )
November 29, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (AG)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, due to the Court's scheduling conflict, the status conference set for 2 p.m. on November 30, 2011, is hereby vacated and is reset for 10 a.m. on December 9, 2011, in Courtroom 23A, before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 28, 2011. (lcesh1)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 90 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon review and consideration of the Motion to Admit Kenneth R. O'Rourke to Practice Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Kenneth R. O'Rourke be permitted to represent Defendants Deutsche Telekom AG and T-Mobile USA, Inc. and participate in any proceedings in the above captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 28, 2011. (AG)
November 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Second Motion for Order and 92 Memorandum. Signed by Judge Richard Levie (Ret.) on 11/27/2011. (Levie, Richard) (Main Document 93 replaced on 11/28/2011) (jf, ).
November 23, 2011 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Governing Trial Preparation)(Hansen, Mark)
November 23, 2011 Filing 91 Second MOTION for Order to Facilitate More Efficient Trial Preparation and Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Special Master Order No.__)(Hammond, Matthew)
November 23, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth R. O'Rourke, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 400 South Hope St., Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - (213) 430-7281. Fax No. - (213) 430-6407 by DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Dyer, Courtney)
November 23, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney B. Dyer on behalf of DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Dyer, Courtney)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 84 Motion Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Trial Preparation. Signed by Judge Richard Levie (Ret.) on 11/21/11. (Levie, Richard)
November 21, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Burns on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Burns, Mary Ellen)
November 19, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY to opposition to motion re 84 MOTION Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Trial Preparation filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hammond, Matthew)
November 18, 2011 Filing 85 Memorandum in opposition to re 84 MOTION Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Trial Preparation filed by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
November 16, 2011 Filing 84 MOTION Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Trial Preparation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order by Special Master)(Hammond, Matthew)
November 14, 2011 Filing 83 RESPONSE re 81 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Filing Regarding Proposed Orders Governing Trial Witnesses Plaintiffs Response filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hammond, Matthew)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Filing Regarding Proposed Orders Governing Trial Witnesses. Plaintiffs' response, if any, is due by 11/14/2011. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 14, 2011. (lcesh1)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On November 11, 2011, Google, Inc. filed 80 a Notice of Withdrawal as to 34 Google's Motion To Intervene and for Additional Relief Under The Protective Order. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that 34 Google's Motion to Intervene is terminated as withdrawn pursuant to Google's Notice of Withdrawal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 14, 2011. (AG)
November 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SCHEDULING ORDER approving in part and denying in part Memorandum in Support of Defendants Proposed Order Governing Trial Witnesses [Doc. 71], Plaintiffs Statement Respecting Trial Witnesses [Doc. 72], Plaintiffs Supplemental Statement Respecting Trial Witnesses [Doc. 77], and Memorandum in Support of Defendants Proposed Order Governing Trial Witnesses [Doc. 78]. Signed by Judge Richard Levie (Ret.) on 11/13/2011. (Levie, Richard)
November 11, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Filing Regarding Proposed Orders Governing Trial Witnesses by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Hansen, Mark)
November 11, 2011 Filing 80 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by GOOGLE INC. re 34 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Keeley, Michael)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 10, 2011. (lcesh1)
November 9, 2011 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Mark)
November 9, 2011 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Statement Respecting Trial Witnesses by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Trial Witnesses)(Hill, Christine)
November 8, 2011 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Second Amended Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Changes to Amended Protective Order)(Hammond, Matthew)
November 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Compel; denying 67 Motion to Quash; Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive production due by 11/21/2011. Signed by Special Master Levie on 11/06/11. (Levie, Richard)
November 5, 2011 Filing 74 RESPONSE re 73 Surreply filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara L. Reinhart, # 2 Notice Regarding Filing of Sealed Material)(Reinhart, Tara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2011: # 3 Sealed Response, # 4 Declaration of Tara L. Reinhart (SEALED), # 5 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit 2 (SEALED), # 7 Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 4 (SEALED)) (jf, ).
November 4, 2011 Filing 73 SURREPLY to Sprint's 67 Motion to Quash filed by AT&T INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Benz, Steven)
November 4, 2011 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Statement Respecting Trial Witnesses by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Re: Trial Witnesses)(Hill, Christine)
November 4, 2011 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Governing Trial Witnesses)(Hansen, Mark)
November 3, 2011 Filing 70 REPLY to opposition to motion re 67 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tara S. Emory, # 2 Notice Regarding Filing of Sealed Material)(Reinhart, Tara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2011: # 3 Exhibit 1 and 2 (SEALED)) (jf, ).
November 2, 2011 Filing 69 Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by AT&T INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Steven F. Benz), # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Notice Regarding Filing of Sealed Material, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Benz, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2011: # 11 Exhibit 4 (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 12 Exhibit 5 (FILED UNDER SEAL) , # 13 Exhibit 6 (FILED UNDER SEAL)) (jf, ).
October 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying in part and deferring ruling on in part 63 Motion to Compel; Set/Reset Deadlines: AT&T shall identify and withdraw from its subpoena request documents produced by Sprint and supplied to AT&T by DOJ by 11/5/2011. Signed by Special Master Richard Levie on 10/29/2011. (Levie, Richard)
October 28, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Compliance with Rule 7(m), # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Declaration of Tara L. Reinhart with Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reinhart, Tara)
October 25, 2011 Filing 66 REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 MOTION to Compel Responses by Sprint Nextel Corp. filed by AT&T INC.. (Benz, Steven)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for 2 p.m. on November 30, 2011, in Courtroom 23A, before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, by November 23, 2011, a Joint Status Report informing the Court of any issues the parties would like the Court to address at the status conference. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 25, 2011. (lcesh1)
October 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2011 re 52 MOTION to Intervene filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION, CORR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, L.L.C., CELLULAR SOUTH, INC. (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus) (gdf)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 52 the Motion to Intervene by Sprint, Cellular South, and Corr Wireless, and denying the Joint Motion to Amend the Protective Order attached thereto, for the reasons stated today in open court. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 24, 2011.(lcesh1)
October 24, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Benz on behalf of AT&T INC. (Benz, Steven)
October 24, 2011 Filing 64 Memorandum in opposition to re 63 MOTION to Compel Responses by Sprint Nextel Corp. filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reinhart, Tara)
October 21, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Compel Responses by Sprint Nextel Corp. by AT&T INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Benz, Steven)
October 20, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Elizabeth Patterson on behalf of AT&T INC. (Patterson, Donna)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: This matter came before the Court on the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel filed by Hillary B. Burchuk. This Court, having considered the motion and being otherwise fully advised in the premise, hereby ORDERS that the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel filed by plaintiff United States of America's counsel Hillary B. Burchuk is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 20, 2011. (AG)
October 20, 2011 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hillary B. Burchuk by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel)(Burchuk, Hillary)
October 19, 2011 Filing 60 REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 MOTION to Intervene Petitioners' Reply Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Amend the Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(c) filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION. (Craig, Gregory)
October 18, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Chadwick O Brooker on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Brooker, Chadwick)
October 17, 2011 Filing 58 Memorandum in opposition to re 52 MOTION to Intervene filed by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 13, 2011 Filing 57 ERRATA by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. 50 Memorandum in Opposition filed by DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC., AT&T INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hansen, Mark)
October 13, 2011 Filing 56 Order regarding Motion for Additional Relief under the Protective Order filed by Google, Inc. 34 , and the letters filed by Google 53 and by AT&T et al. 55 . Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/13/2011.(AG)
October 12, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. re 53 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Hansen, Mark)
October 12, 2011 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM re 52 MOTION to Intervene filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION, CORR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, L.L.C., CELLULAR SOUTH, INC. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hill, Christine)
October 12, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE re 34 MOTION to Intervene by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Keeley, Michael) .
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re 52 MOTION to Intervene filed by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION, CORR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, L.L.C., CELLULAR SOUTH, INC.: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Intervene filed by nonparties Sprint Nextel Corporation, Cellular South, Inc., and Corr Wireless Communications, L.L.C. ("Petitioners"), the parties are directed to file responses, if any, on or before Monday, October 17, 2011, and Petitioners are directed to file a reply, if any, on or before Wednesday, October 19, 2011. The Court will address Petitioners' Joint Motion at the hearing set for Monday, October 24, 2011, at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 12, 2011. (AG)
October 11, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION to Intervene by SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION, CELLULAR SOUTH, INC., CORR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Motion to Intervene, # 2 Exhibit Joint Motion to Amend Protective Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order to Joint Motion to Amend Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit to Joint Motion to Expedite, # 5 Text of Proposed Order to Joint Motion to Expedite, # 6 Declaration of Tara L. Reinhart, # 7 Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of Tara L. Reinhart)(jf, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 51 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Google Inc.'s Motion for Additional Relief Under the Protective Order)(Hill, Christine)
October 11, 2011 Filing 50 Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION to Intervene & [34-3] MOTION for Additional Relief Under the Protective Order filed by AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
October 11, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Hill on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hill, Christine)
October 7, 2011 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(b)(3) and 28 US Code 455 by RICHARD A. LEVIE. (jeb, )
October 7, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Franck on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Franck, Michael)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting the 45 motion to appoint Richard A. Levie as a Special Master in this action. (Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/7/2011). (tj )
October 6, 2011 NOTICE OF ERROR re 44 Answer to Amended Complaint; emailed to mhansen@khhte.com, cc'd 51 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel is instructed to select all filers/defendants represented in future filings. (znmw, )
October 6, 2011 NOTICE OF ERROR re 43 Notice of Appearance; emailed to michael.franck@state.ma.us, cc'd 51 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect document/case, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Attached appearance is for another attorney/plaintiff; please refile. (znmw, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Appoint a Special Master by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Appoint Special Master)(Hammond, Matthew)
October 5, 2011 Filing 44 ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint, by AT&T INC., T-MOBILE USA, DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG. Related document: 39 Amended Complaint, filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON.(Hansen, Mark) Modified to add filers on 10/6/2011 (znmw, ).
October 5, 2011 Filing 43 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Franck on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Franck, Michael) (Main Document 43 replaced on 10/5/2011) (jf, ). Modified on 10/6/2011 (znmw, ).
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/30/11. (gdf)
October 4, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Siegel on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Siegel, Matthew) (Main Document 41 replaced on 10/5/2011) (jf, ).
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: it is hereby ORDERED that John D. Harkrider and Daniel S. Bitton are admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 4, 2011. (AG)
September 30, 2011 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality)(Hammond, Matthew)
September 30, 2011 Filing 39 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. filed by STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO.(znmw, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE of Second Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
September 29, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerayln Jeanette Trujillo on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Trujillo, Gerayln)
September 26, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel S. Bitton, :Firm- AXINN, VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP, :Address- 114 West 47th Street, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 728-2239. by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(znmw, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Harkrider, :Firm- AXINN, VELTROP & HARKRIDER LLP, :Address- 114 West 47th Street, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 728-2210. by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(znmw, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Intervene by GOOGLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Motion for Additional Relief, # 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Additional Relief, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G)(znmw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2011: # 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (znmw, ).
September 26, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/10/2012. Plaintiff Rule 26a2 due by 11/22/2011. Defendant Rule 26a2 due by 11/22/2011. Bench Trial set for 2/13/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting forth deadlines. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/23/11. (jeb, )
September 23, 2011 Filing 32 AT&T Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., and Deutsche Telekom AG ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint, by AT&T INC.. Related document: 28 Amended Complaint, filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF NEW YORK, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF ILLINOIS.(Hansen, Mark)
September 23, 2011 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM re 29 Notice of Proposed Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by AT&T INC.. (Hansen, Mark)
September 23, 2011 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM re 29 Notice of Proposed Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hammond, Matthew)
September 23, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Proposed Order Stipulated Scheduling and Case-Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Scheduling and Case-Management Order)(Hammond, Matthew)
September 21, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 9/21/2011. Status Conference set for 10/24/2011 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Chantal Geneus) (gdf)
September 20, 2011 NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE Status Conference set for 9/21/2011 at 2:00 PM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
September 16, 2011 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF WASHINGTON, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA.(jf, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by George S. Cary on behalf of DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Cary, George)
September 16, 2011 Filing 26 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Scheduling and Case-Management Order)(Hammond, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lawrence Rosen on behalf of AT&T INC. (Rosen, Richard)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIALITY setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 9/15/11. (Attachments: #(1) Appendix A) (gdf)
September 15, 2011 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality)(Hammond, Matthew)
September 15, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
September 13, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Martin Panner on behalf of AT&T INC. (Panner, Aaron)
September 12, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Parker on behalf of DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Parker, Richard)
September 12, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Shari Ross Lahlou on behalf of AT&T INC. (Ross Lahlou, Shari)
September 12, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Andrew Klapow on behalf of AT&T INC. (Klapow, Mark)
September 12, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn D Kirmayer on behalf of AT&T INC. (Kirmayer, Kathryn)
September 12, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Randolph Smith on behalf of AT&T INC. (Smith, William)
September 12, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 13 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.4 (b) OBTAINING AND USING ELECTRONIC FILING PASSWORD; SIGNATURE; CONSENT TO SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS) (jf, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Haidee L. Schwartz on behalf of DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Schwartz, Haidee)
September 9, 2011 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance of Wm. Randolph Smith, Kathryn D. Kirmayer, Mark A. Klapow, and Shari Ross Lahlou by AT&T INC. (Kirmayer, Kathryn) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jf, ).
September 9, 2011 Filing 12 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG (Nelson, Mark)
September 9, 2011 Filing 11 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Nelson, Mark)
September 9, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Nelson on behalf of DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Nelson, Mark)
September 9, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Webster on behalf of AT&T INC. (Webster, James)
September 9, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Kellogg on behalf of AT&T INC. (Kellogg, Michael)
September 9, 2011 Filing 7 AT&T Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., and Deutsche Telekom AG ANSWER to 1 Complaint by AT&T INC..(Hansen, Mark)
September 9, 2011 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AT&T INC. (Hansen, Mark)
September 9, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Hansen on behalf of AT&T INC. (Hansen, Mark)
September 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Telephone Conference held in Chambers on 9/6/2011. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Plan due by 9/16/2011. Status Conference set for 9/21/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Based on the telephone conference held with the parties on this date, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for 2 p.m. on September 21, 2011, in Courtroom 23A, before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle; and it is further ORDERED that, in lieu of a LCvR 16.3 report, the parties shall file, by September 16, 2011, a joint Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Plan, which will facilitate the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of all pretrial matters and the trial of this case; and it is further ORDERED that at the status conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the prospects for settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 6, 2011. (lcesh1)
September 6, 2011 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG waiver sent on 8/31/2011, answer due 10/30/2011. (Hammond, Matthew)
September 6, 2011 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. T-MOBILE USA, INC. waiver sent on 8/31/2011, answer due 10/30/2011. (Hammond, Matthew)
September 1, 2011 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. AT&T INC. waiver sent on 8/31/2011, answer due 10/30/2011. (Hammond, Matthew)
August 31, 2011 SUMMONS Not Issued as to AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (jf, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T INC., DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG, T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Hillary B. Burchuk
Represented By: Lawrence M. Frankel
Represented By: Matthew C. Hammond
Represented By: Claude F. Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Franklin Wayland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Joseph S. Betsko
Represented By: James A. Donahue, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: David M. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: William Thorn Matlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Richard L. Schwartz
Represented By: Geralyn Jeanette Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Robert W. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T INC.
Represented By: Mark C. Hansen
Represented By: Michael K. Kellogg
Represented By: Kathryn D Kirmayer
Represented By: Mark Andrew Klapow
Represented By: Aaron Martin Panner
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Rosen
Represented By: Shari Ross Lahlou
Represented By: William Randolph Smith
Represented By: James M. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-MOBILE USA, INC.
Represented By: George S. Cary
Represented By: Mark W. Nelson
Represented By: Richard G. Parker
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG
Represented By: George S. Cary
Represented By: Mark W. Nelson
Represented By: Richard G. Parker
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?