NOKIA CORPORATION v. APPLE INC. Featured Case
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Petitioner: NOKIA CORPORATION
Respondent: ROBERT STERNE, GLENN PERRY, RICHARD COLLER and SALVADOR M. BEZOS
Case Number: 1:2011mc00284
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: MS:MiscOrd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Upon consideration of 6 the notice of motion to withdraw 1 the motion to compel, this matter is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 14, 2011. (lcegs2)
June 14, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NOKIA CORPORATION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Third Party Witnesses (Fitch, Patrick)
June 13, 2011 Filing 5 Memorandum in opposition to re 1 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony filed by SALVADOR M. BEZOS, RICHARD COLLER, GLENN PERRY, ROBERT STERNE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Certificate of Service)(Pickard, Byron)
May 27, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NOKIA CORPORATION. Case related to Case No. 11-mc-00295. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Fitch, Patrick)
May 19, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Errata by NOKIA CORPORATION re 1 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Revised Certificate of Service)(Brinkman, Paul)
May 19, 2011 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 2 Notice (Other) was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled with corrected document.(jf, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Errata by NOKIA CORPORATION re 1 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Revised Certificate of Service)(Brinkman, Paul) Modified on 5/19/2011 (jf, ).
May 17, 2011 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Third Party Witnesses (filing fee $39, receipt number 4616038910) by NOKIA CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rohan Kale, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E part 1, # 7 Exhibit E part 2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOKIA CORPORATION v. APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NOKIA CORPORATION
Represented By: Patrick A. Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBERT STERNE
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GLENN PERRY
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICHARD COLLER
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SALVADOR M. BEZOS
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?