NOKIA CORPORATION v. APPLE INC. Featured Case

Attorneys representing Apple file suit in D.C. federal court to quash Nokia's subpoenas to seeking to depose them.

The attorneys moving to quash Nokia's subpoenas represent Apple in patent litigation in Delaware federal court, and who are also working on Apple patent reexamination matters before the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.

Plaintiff: NOKIA CORPORATION
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Movant: ROBERT G. STERNE, Richard D. COLLER, GLENN J. PERRY and SALVADOR M. BEZOS
Case Number: 1:2011mc00295
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Robert L. Wilkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion to Quash Subpoenas
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2011 Upon consideration of 6 the Notice of Motion to Withdraw 1 the Motion to Compel, this matter is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/20/2011. (tcb)
June 16, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by SALVADOR M. BEZOS, Richard D. COLLER, GLENN J. PERRY, ROBERT G. STERNE re 1 MOTION to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Pickard, Byron)
June 13, 2011 Filing 5 REPLY to opposition to motion re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by SALVADOR M. BEZOS, Richard D. COLLER, GLENN J. PERRY, ROBERT G. STERNE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Pickard, Byron)
June 3, 2011 Filing 4 Memorandum in opposition to re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by NOKIA CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Declaration of Rohan Kale, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Brinkman, Paul)
May 24, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by SALVADOR M. BEZOS, Richard D. COLLER, GLENN J. PERRY, ROBERT G. STERNE re 1 MOTION to Quash (Pickard, Byron)
May 24, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SALVADOR M. BEZOS, Richard D. COLLER, GLENN J. PERRY, ROBERT G. STERNE. Case related to Case No. 11-mc-00284. (Pickard, Byron)
May 17, 2011 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash (filing fee $39, receipt number 461603897) by APPLE INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Byron L. Pickard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(smm) Modified on 5/20/2011 (smm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOKIA CORPORATION v. APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOKIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: ROBERT G. STERNE
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Richard D. COLLER
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: GLENN J. PERRY
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: SALVADOR M. BEZOS
Represented By: Byron L. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?